MOODY et al v. A.C. & S., INC. (ARMSTRONG CONTRACTING & SUPPLY) et al
Plaintiff: JEFFERSON E. MOODY and REGINA MOODY
Defendant: AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC., WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE COMPANY, MORSE-DIESEL INTERNATIONAL, INC., GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION, A.P. GREEN SERVICES, INC., AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC., KAISER ALUMINUM & CHEMICAL CORPORATION, FREIGHTLINER CORPORATION, DB RILEY, INC., UNION CARBIDE, Rhone Poulenc, INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION, PROKO INDUSTRIES INC., ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, CRANE CO., PATTERSON PUMP COMPANY, OAKFABCO, INC., PORTER HAYDEN COMPANY, WEIL-MCLAIN, FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, PFIZER, INC. (PFIZER), MAREMONT CORP., DEERE & CO., VIACOM, INC., HARBISON WALKER REFRACTORIES COMPANY, QUIGLEY COMPANY, INC., WABCO, PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC., OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC., A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, BMCE INC., PACCAR, INC., U.S. RUBBER COMPANY (UNIROYAL), DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY, CONGOLEUM CORPORATION, MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES, INC., GIBRALTAR INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC., DANA CORPORATION, MACK TRUCKS, INC., A.C. & S., INC. (ARMSTRONG CONTRACTING & SUPPLY), KEELER-DORR-OLIVER BOILER COMPANY, LIPE-AUTOMATION CORP., FULTON BOILER WORKS, INC., SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC., PERKINS ENGINES, INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC., RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION, J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY, PATTERSON KELLY DIVISION, GOULD PUMPS, INC., GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY, BURNHAM CORPORATION, REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY, BORG-WARNER CORPORATION, PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION, CERTAIN TEED CORPORATION, DRESSER INDUSTRIES, INC., WORTHINGTON CORPORATION, MCCORD CORPORATION, CATERPILLAR, INC., A.P. GREEN INDUSTRIES, INC., INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION, OKONITE COMPANY, INC., AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION, GOODYEAR CANADA, INC, KOHLER CO., FORD MOTOR COMPANY, CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC., CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, INC., H.B. FULLER COMPANY, NORTH AMERICAN REFRACTORIES COMPANY (NARCO), FEDERAL MOGUL PRODUCTS, INC., GARLOCK, INC., KENTILE FLOORS, INC., PLIBRICO COMPANY, LOCKHEED MARTIN CORP. and TDY INDUSTRIES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2007cv66709
Filed: July 16, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT LOCKHEED MARTIN CORP. IS DISMISSED AND THAT ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS CLAIMS BY CO-DEFENDANTS AND THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS ARE HEREBY DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/02/2012. 11/5/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jmf, )
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER DEFENDANT BORG-WARNER CORPORATION ONLY IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/31/2012. 11/01/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(va, )
January 5, 2011 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTIN M. KASMIR on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY (KASMIR, JUSTIN)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST ALL THE VIABLE DEFENDANTS IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, ARE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(A) (2); THAT THE CASES WILL BE TRANSFERRED TO THE "BANKRUPTCY ONLY" DOCKET; AND THAT EACH OF THESE CASES SHALL BE MARKED CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/1/2010. 6/26/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (aeg, )
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE CAPTIONED CASES ON 6/1/2010 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11A, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE CONFERENCE SHALL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/29/2010. 5/7/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(SEE PAPER # 7201 IN 01-MD-875 FOR CASE LIST).(ah)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT CONSENT TO THE SUBSITUTION OF MICHAEL A. TANENBAUM, ESQ. OF SEDGWICK, DETERT, MORAN & ARNOLD LLP, AS ATTORNEYS FOR THE DEFT. FOSTER WHELLER, LLC IN ALL MATTERS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED DOCKET SHEET. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/23/10. 3/26/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(er, )
August 31, 2009 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by GERARD CEDRONE on behalf of FREIGHTLINER CORPORATION (CEDRONE, GERARD)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT A RULE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AND/OR A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE CASES ON THE ATTACHED LIST ON 8/25/2009 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11A, UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106; FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE HEARING AND/OR CONFERENCE SHALL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/6/2009. 8/10/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ccg, )
July 24, 2009 Filing 7 NOTICE by MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES, INC. of Substitution of Attorney; Appearance of RUSSELL PEPE; Withdrawal of CLAUDE D. MONTGOMERY (PEPE, RUSSELL) Modified on 7/28/2009 (md).
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT A RULE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AND/OR A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE CASES ON THE ATTACHED LIST ON 7/28/2009 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11A, UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106; FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE HEARING AND/OR CONFERENCE SHALL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/8/2009. 7/13/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(stwe, )
June 25, 2009 Filing 5 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(JONES, CHRISTI)
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT WEITZ & LUXENBERG, P.C. WILL BE SUBSTITUTED BY EDWARD O. MOODY, P.A. AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS. 4/23/08 SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAMES T. GILES. 6/2/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(sc, )
July 16, 2007 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL (mcma, )
July 16, 2007 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONS TO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES, DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (mcma, )
July 16, 2007 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER NO. 53 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASES FROM THE U.S.D.C. EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (mcma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOODY et al v. A.C. & S., INC. (ARMSTRONG CONTRACTING & SUPPLY) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORSE-DIESEL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.P. GREEN SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER ALUMINUM & CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREIGHTLINER CORPORATION
Represented By: GERARD CEDRONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB RILEY, INC.
Represented By: DONALD J. FAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhone Poulenc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION
Represented By: CYNTHIA WEISS ANTONUCCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROKO INDUSTRIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: CYNTHIA WEISS ANTONUCCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATTERSON PUMP COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OAKFABCO, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD H. RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTER HAYDEN COMPANY
Represented By: TODD SCHLEIFSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIL-MCLAIN
Represented By: WILLIAM J. BRADLEY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL ALAN TANENBAUM
Represented By: JUDITH ANN LOCKHART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC. (PFIZER)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAREMONT CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEERE & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM, INC.
Represented By: CORI LE LEAVITT
Represented By: WILLIAM T. MIEDEL
Represented By: WILLIAM J. BRADLEY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARBISON WALKER REFRACTORIES COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUIGLEY COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WABCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW ROBERT STRAUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMCE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR, INC.
Represented By: CYNTHIA WEISS ANTONUCCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. RUBBER COMPANY (UNIROYAL)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONGOLEUM CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: RUSSELL A. PEPE
Represented By: BENJAMIN R. HARTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIBRALTAR INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACK TRUCKS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.C. & S., INC. (ARMSTRONG CONTRACTING & SUPPLY)
Represented By: RICHARD PATRICK O'LEARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEELER-DORR-OLIVER BOILER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIPE-AUTOMATION CORP.
Represented By: IAN R. GRODMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULTON BOILER WORKS, INC.
Represented By: SUZANNE M. HALBARDIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERKINS ENGINES, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM F. KINIRY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATTERSON KELLY DIVISION
Represented By: JOHN S. HOWARTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULD PUMPS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY
Represented By: ERIN M. PERADOTTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURNHAM CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY
Represented By: RAYMOND F. GEOFFREY, III
Represented By: ROBERT M. ROLFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORG-WARNER CORPORATION
Represented By: ANNA MARIA DILONARDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN TEED CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRESSER INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORTHINGTON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCCORD CORPORATION
Represented By: JULIE R. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM F. KINIRY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.P. GREEN INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKONITE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: COLLEEN M. CRONIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION
Represented By: RICHARD PATRICK O'LEARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR CANADA, INC
Represented By: ERIN M. PERADOTTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOHLER CO.
Represented By: MARC SCOTT GAFFREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: JUSTIN M. KASMIR
Represented By: LARRY D. BLOOMSTEIN
Represented By: ROBERT G. SCUMACI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. FULLER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH AMERICAN REFRACTORIES COMPANY (NARCO)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL MOGUL PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLOCK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENTILE FLOORS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLIBRICO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOCKHEED MARTIN CORP.
Represented By: MATTHEW ROBERT STRAUS
Represented By: ANNA MARIA DILONARDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDY INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFERSON E. MOODY
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REGINA MOODY
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?