HARRIS v. PAIGE et al
Plaintiff: JAMES HARRIS
Defendant: MICHAEL PAIGE and CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Case Number: 2:2008cv02126
Filed: May 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: ROBERT F. KELLY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES ARE GRANTED AND HARRIS IS AWARDED A TOTAL OF $76,206.00 IN ATTORNEY'S FEES. HARRIS' REQUEST FOR POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST IS GRANTED. HARRIS' REQUEST FOR COSTS IS DENIED. HARRIS' REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES FOR ANTHONY McKNIGHT IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 9/3/13. 9/3/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MICHAEL PAIGE'S MOTON FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 5/9/11. 5/9/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO AMEND IS DENIED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE IS GRANTED AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN OPPOSITION IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 4/4/11. 4/5/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MICHAEL PAIGE'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND STRIKE IS DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART. THE MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I, II, III, V, VI, VII, VIII, IX, X, XI AND XII IS DENIED. THE MOTION IS GRANTED WITH RESPECT TO COUNT IV. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES IS DENIED. PLAINTIFF'S PRAECIPE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT MICHAEL PAIGE IS DENIED. DEFENDANT MICHAEL PAIGE'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S PRAEC IPE TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT MICHAEL PAIGE IS DENIED AS MOOT AND DEFENDANT MICHAEL PAIGE SHALL ANSWER THE COMPLAINT WITHIN 20 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 9/22/2009. 9/23/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO REINSTATE CIVIL ACTION AND LIFT STAY FILED BY PLAINTIFF IS GRANTED AND MICHAEL PAIGE'S APPLICATION FOR ADDITIONAL STAY IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 7/17/2009. 7/20/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARRIS v. PAIGE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES HARRIS
Represented By: BRIAN FRANCIS HUMBLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL PAIGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?