PSC INFO GROUP v. LASON, INC. et al
Plaintiff: PSC INFO GROUP
Defendant: HOV SERVICES LIMITED and BAY AREA CREDIT SERVICE
Case Number: 2:2008cv02176
Filed: February 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM H. YOHN
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I OF THE COMPLAINT, WHICH ALLEGES TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRAC TUAL RELATIONS, IS GRANTED AS TO DEFENDANT LASON AND DENIED AS TO DEFENDANT HOV; DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I OF THE COMPLAINT, WHICH ALLEGES BREACH OF CONTRACT, IS GRANTED AS TO DEFENDANT HOV; DEFENSANTS; MOTION FOR SUM MARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT II OF THE COMPLAINT IS GRANTED AS TO ANY CLAIMS AGAINST BACS ARISING OUT OF BACS' USE OF OTHER VENDORS PRIOR TO 11/10/2007, AND DENIED AS TO SUCH CLAIMS AGAINST BACS FROM 11/10/2007 TO 5/31/2008,TRIAL DATE SET FOR 4/12/2010 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE WILLIAM H. YOHN JR. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WILLIAM H. YOHN, JR ON 2/3/10. 2/4/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kk, )
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS IS DENIED. SIMILARLY, DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS CONTAINED IN THEIR RESPONSE TO THE MOTION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 7/21/2009. 7/22/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER THAT BOTH SIDES SHALL PRODUCE THE DOCUMENTATION AND WITNESSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 5/19/2009. 5/21/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PSC INFO GROUP v. LASON, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PSC INFO GROUP
Represented By: DAVID T. SHULICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOV SERVICES LIMITED
Represented By: STEPHEN PAUL CHAWAGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAY AREA CREDIT SERVICE
Represented By: STEPHEN PAUL CHAWAGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?