PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND v. BIOVAIL CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Defendant: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM doing business as GLAXOSMITHKLINE, PLC, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC. and BIOVAIL CORPORATION
Petitioner: CONSUMERS UNION, AETNA, INC., THE AMERICAN ANTITRUST INSTITUTE, AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC. and FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Case Number: 2:2008cv02433
Filed: May 23, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: GERALD A MCHUGH
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ORDER APPROVING INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SECON AND FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF THE NET SETTLEMENT FUND. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 2/6/19.2/6/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 615 Declaration re #613 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds of Matthew Sears by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
January 17, 2019 Filing 614 Memorandum re #613 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
January 17, 2019 Filing 613 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.Certificate of Service.(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
February 13, 2018 Copy of Order dated 1/3/2018 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to AMBER M. NESBITT, JENNIFER FOUNTAIN CONN for the following reason: ATTEMPTED, NOT KNOWN. UNABLE TO FORWARD. (kp, )
January 29, 2018 Copy of Order dated 1/3/2018 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to AMANDA TESSAR, TAIMARIE NICOLE ADAMS, DANIELLE BARBOUR for the following reason: ATTEMPTED, NOT KNOWN. UNABLE TO FORWARD. (kp, )
January 25, 2018 Copy of Order dated 1/3/2018 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to JASON C. RAOFIELD, HENRY LIU for the following reason: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, UNABLE TO FORWARD.. (kp, )
January 24, 2018 Copy of Order dated 1/3/2018 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to DAVID SHAW, ANDREW M. BERNIE, CHARLES A. LOUGHLIN for the following reason: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, UNABLE TO FORWARD.. (kp, )
January 18, 2018 Copy of Order dated 1/3/2018 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to R. COREY WORCESTER for the following reason: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, UNABLE TO FORWARD.. (kp, )
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS MATTER CLOSED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 1/11/2018. 1/11/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER APPROVING INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF THE NET SETTLEMENT FUND AND APPLICATION FOR AWARD OF FEES.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 1/3/2018. 1/4/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
December 12, 2017 Filing 610 Declaration re #605 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds of Kenneth A. Wexler by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (RABINOVITZ, URIEL)
December 12, 2017 Filing 609 Declaration re #605 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds of Peter D. St. Phillip by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (RABINOVITZ, URIEL)
December 12, 2017 Filing 608 Declaration re #605 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds of Matthew B. Sears by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(RABINOVITZ, URIEL)
December 12, 2017 Filing 607 Declaration re #605 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds of Matthew B. Sears by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (RABINOVITZ, URIEL)
December 12, 2017 Filing 606 Memorandum re #605 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (RABINOVITZ, URIEL)
December 12, 2017 Filing 605 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(RABINOVITZ, URIEL)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER of USCA and Judgment that the orders of the District Court dated 5/11/2012 and 9/23/2015 are hereby affirmed, rendering the balance of the matters on appeal as moot. All of the above in accordance with the opinion of this court. The parties are to bear their own costs. (kp, )
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER of USCA as to #598 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM, #588 Notice of Appeal, filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, #596 Notice of Appeal,, filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS-UNITED ASSOCIATION LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, AETNA, INC., BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS LOCAL UNION NO. 5 OHIO HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND THAT THE CERTIFIED JUDGMENT ISSUED IN LIEU OF FORMAL MANDATE ON 8/31/2017 BE AND IS HEREBY RECALLED. (kp, ) (Main Document 603 replaced on 9/6/2017) (kp, ).
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ORDER AND JUDGMENT of USCA as to #598 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM, #588 Notice of Appeal, filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, #596 Notice of Appeal,, filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS-UNITED ASSOCIATION LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, AETNA, INC., BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS LOCAL UNION NO. 5 OHIO HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND THAT THE ORDERS DATED 5/11/2012 AND 9/23/2015 FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE HEREBY AFFIRMED, RENDERING THE BALANCE OF THE MATTERS ON APPEAL MOOT. ALL OF THE ABOVE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OPINION OF THIS COURT. THE PARTIES ARE TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS. (kp, )
June 5, 2017 Filing 601 NOTICE of Change of Address by GERALD LAWRENCE, JR(LAWRENCE, GERALD)
December 16, 2015 Filing 600 Copy of TPO Form re #598 Notice of Cross Appeal. (kp, ) Modified on 9/5/2017 (kp, ).
November 20, 2015 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #598 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. USCA Case Number 15-3681 (kp, ) Modified on 9/5/2017 (kp, ).
November 4, 2015 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #596 Notice of Appeal,, filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS-UNITED ASSOCIATION LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, AETNA, INC., BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS LOCAL UNION NO. 5 OHIO HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. USCA Case Number 15-3559 (kp, ) Modified on 9/5/2017 (kp, ).
November 4, 2015 Filing 599 Clerk's Notice to USCA re #598 Notice of Cross Appeal : (kp, )
November 4, 2015 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 130185 re #598 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM (kp, ) Modified on 9/5/2017 (kp, ).
November 3, 2015 Filing 598 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to #354 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), #91 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), Add and Terminate Parties, by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (JOHN, LESLIE) Modified on 11/5/2015 (tjd).
October 23, 2015 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 129578 re #596 Notice of Appeal,, filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS-UNITED ASSOCIATION LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, AETNA, INC., BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS LOCAL UNION NO. 5 OHIO HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND (fdc, ) Modified on 9/5/2017 (kp, ).
October 21, 2015 Filing 597 Clerk's Notice to USCA re #596 Notice of Appeal. (fdc) Modified on 9/5/2017 (kp, ).
October 21, 2015 Filing 596 NOTICE OF APPEAL RE #594 ORDER by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., AETNA, INC., BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS LOCAL UNION NO. 5 OHIO HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS-UNITED ASSOCIATION LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk. (RABINOVITZ, URIEL) Modified on 10/23/2015 (tjd). Modified on 11/2/2015 (tjd).
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 10/2/2015. 10/5/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ahf)
September 23, 2015 Filing 594 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT GSK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS (DOC. 575) IS GRANTED. GSK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE TO LACK OF CAUSATION (DOC. 573) IS GRANTED IN PART. GSK'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF JEFFREY LEITZINGER (DOC. 570) IS GRANTED. GSK'S MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF CHERYL BLUE (DOC. 572) AND MEREDITH ROSENTHAL (DOC. 571) ARE DENIED AS MOOT. THE PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF MARTIN ADELMAN (DOC. 569) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/23/2015. 9/23/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
September 23, 2015 Filing 593 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/23/2015. 9/23/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
September 14, 2015 Copy of Notice dated 8/25/2015 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to CHARLES A. LOUGHLIN for the following reason: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED. (kp, )
September 4, 2015 Copy of Order dated and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to TAIMARIE NICOLE ADAMS for the following reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD. (jl, )
September 2, 2015 Copy of Order dated 8/25/2015 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to R. COREY WORCESTER for the following reason: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, UNABLE TO FORWARD. (kp, )
August 25, 2015 Filing 592 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #591 Transcript - PDF, 8/25/2015 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (kp, )
August 25, 2015 Filing 591 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 7/29/2015, before Judge McLaughlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber ESR/ Diana Doman Transcribing LLC. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2015. (kp, )
August 21, 2015 Filing 590 PLAINTIFF'S SUBMISSION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING POWERPOINT PRESENTATIONS by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
August 10, 2015 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #588 Notice of Appeal, filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. USCA Case Number 15-2875 (kp, ) Modified on 9/5/2017 (kp, ).
August 5, 2015 Filing 589 Clerk's Notice to USCA re #588 Notice of Appeal. (kp, ) Modified on 9/5/2017 (kp, ).
August 4, 2015 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 125347 re #588 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 573 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), GRANT OF PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAL PURSUANT TO FRCP 23(f) FILED BY INDIRECT PURCHASER CLASS (kp, ) Modified on 8/5/2015 (kp, ). Modified on 9/5/2017 (kp, ).
July 31, 2015 Filing 588 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #573 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), GRANT OF PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAL PURSUANT TO FRCP 23(f) FILED BY INDIRECT PURCHASER CLASS. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 125347. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk. (kp, )
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ORDER of USCA as to #425 Notice of Appeal filed by BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., SMITHKLINE BEECHAM, BIOVAIL CORPORATION THAT THE FOREGOING PETITION AND MOTIONS TO SEAL ARE HEREY GRANTED. SIGNED MICHAEL A. CHAGARES, CIRCUIT JUDGE(kp, )
July 27, 2015 Copy of Order dated 6/30/2015 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to MARGARET OSBORNE PADILLA for the following reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD. RESENT TO: Margaret Suzanne Osborne Padilla, Ballard Spahr LLP1735 Market St., 51st Fl., Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19103-7599. (kp, )
July 14, 2015 Filing 586 PLAINTIFFS' CORRECTED MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO GSK'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF CHERYL BLUME, PH.D. filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER THAT SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXCESS PAGES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. GSK'S 18 PAGE MEMORANDUM OF LAW FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE CLERK'S OFFICE IS HEREBY ACCEPTED FOR CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/13/2015.7/13/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXCESS PAGES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. GSK'S 45-PAGE MEMORANDUM OF LAW FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE CLERK'S OFFICE IS HEREBY ACCEPTED FOR CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/13/2015.7/13/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
July 9, 2015 Filing 583 PLAINTIFFS' REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF MARTIN J. ADELMAN. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
July 9, 2015 Filing 581 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO INDIRECT PURCHASERS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO GSK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RELATED TO THE CLASS' CARTWRIGHT ACT CAUSE OF ACTION (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
July 9, 2015 Filing 580 EXHIBIT A TO GSK'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF PAGE LIMITATIONS FOR REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
July 9, 2015 Filing 579 GSK'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF CHERYL BLUME, PH.D. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
July 9, 2015 Filing 578 GSK'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF JEFFREY J. LEITZINGER, PH.D. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
July 9, 2015 Filing 577 EXHIBIT A TO GSK'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF PAGE LIMITATIONS FOR REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE TO LACK OF CAUSATION. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
July 9, 2015 Filing 576 GSK'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF MEREDITH ROSENTHAL, PH.D. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
July 9, 2015 Filing 575 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for GSK's Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment on All Claims filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.Certificate of Service.(ANTHONY, JESSICA)
July 9, 2015 Filing 574 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for GSK's Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Due to Lack of Causation filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.Certificate of Service.(ANTHONY, JESSICA)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER THAT GSK'S MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE IPC IS GRANTED. GSK'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF MEREDITH ROSENTHAL IS GRANTED. THE IPC'S MOTION UNDER RULE 702 TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF BRUCE A. STROMBOM IS DENIED. THE INDIRECT PURCHASER LITIGATION CLASS CERTIFIED BY THE COURT'S ORDERS OF 8/12/2011 AND 8/30/2011 IS DECERTIFIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/30/2015. 6/30/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
June 30, 2015 Filing 572 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/30/2015. 6/30/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 571 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS AND GSK SHALL HAVE UNTIL 7/9/2015 TO FILE REPLIES IN SUPPORT OF ALL PENDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS. GSK SHALL HAVE UNTIL 7/9/2015 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO GSK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RELATED TO THE CLASS' CARTWRIGHT ACT CAUSE OF ACTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/25/2015. 6/25/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
June 19, 2015 Filing 570 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #569 Transcript - PDF. 6/22/2015 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (kp, )
June 19, 2015 Filing 569 TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument held on 5/29/2015, before Judge McLaughlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber ESR/Diana Doman Transcribing, Inc.. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2015. (kp, )
June 15, 2015 Filing 568 NOTICE by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND re #567 Notice (Other) re RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (RABINOVITZ, URIEL)
June 11, 2015 Filing 567 Letter NOTICE by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Modafinil Opinion)(JOHN, LESLIE) Modified on 6/16/2015 (tjd).
June 1, 2015 Filing 566 EXHIBITS 800-1008 IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
June 1, 2015 Filing 565 APPENDIX B TO PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO GSK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
June 1, 2015 Filing 564 APPENDIX A TO PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO GSK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
June 1, 2015 Filing 563 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC AND SMITHKLINE BEECHMAN CORPORATION D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE'S (GSK) STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
June 1, 2015 Filing 562 PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED STATEMENT OF FACTS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
June 1, 2015 Filing 561 PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO GSK'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF CHERYL BLUME, PH.D, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
June 1, 2015 Filing 560 PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO GSK'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF JEFFREY J. LEITZINGER, PH.D., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
June 1, 2015 Filing 559 PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO GSK'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF MEREDITH ROSENTHAL, PH.D, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
June 1, 2015 Filing 558 INDIRECT PURCHASER CLASS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO GSK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RELATED TO THE CLASS' CARTWRIGHT ACT CAUSE OF ACTION. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
June 1, 2015 Filing 557 PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO GSK'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE TO LACK OF CAUSATION (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
June 1, 2015 Filing 556 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN Motion Hearing held on 5/29/2015 re #507 MOTION filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM Court Reporter: ESR. (kp, )
May 29, 2015 Filing 555 GSK'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF MARTIN J. ADELMAN. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 554 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING THE FILING OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/28/2015. 5/28/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 553 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF AND GSK'S RESPONSES TO MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 5/29/2015. PLAINTIFF AND GSK'S REPLIES TO MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 7/2/2015.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/15/2015. 5/18/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL BRING THEIR EXPERTS TO THE SCHEDULED ORAL ARGUMENT. THE COURT MAY CALL UPON DR. ROSENTHAL, MR. DEBREE, AND DR. STROMBOM TO HEAR THEIR TESTIMONY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/11/2015. 5/11/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
May 7, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #537 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #534 MOTION to Exclude, #536 MOTION to Exclude, #532 MOTION to Exclude, #535 MOTION to Exclude, #539 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #528 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Bruce A. Strombom. MOTION HEARING SET FOR 5/29/2015 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN. (tjd)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER THAT THE ORAL ARGUMENT IS RESCHEDULED FOR 5/29/2015 AT 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM 13-A BEFORE HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/7/2015. 5/7/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
May 7, 2015 Filing 550 Letter by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND re #549 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, (RABINOVITZ, URIEL) Modified on 5/14/2015 (tjd).
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER THAT LINDSAY D. BREEDLOVE'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/5/2015.7/10/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 549 ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE PENDING MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF CLASS AND RELATED DAUBERT MOTIONS IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER IS SCHEDULED FOR 5/20/15 AT 1:30 P.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/5/15. 5/5/15 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED.(jl, ) Modified on 5/5/2015 (ems).
May 4, 2015 Filing 548 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BREEDLOVE, LINDSAY)
April 21, 2015 Filing 547 NOTICE by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM re #546 Notice (Other), Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority. Certificate of Service. (JOHN, LESLIE) Modified on 4/22/2015 (tjd).
April 17, 2015 Filing 546 NOTICE by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND re #507 MOTION of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Byrd v. Aarons, Inc., 14-3050 (3d Cir. Apr. 16, 2015))(RABINOVITZ, URIEL)
April 9, 2015 Filing 545 DEFENDANTS SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE AND GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THEIR #532 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF MEREDITH ROSENTHAL REGARDING ASCERTAINABILITY filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
April 9, 2015 Filing 544 INDIRECT PURCHASER CLASS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS #528 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Bruce A. Strombom (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
March 30, 2015 Filing 543 DEFENDANTS SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE AND GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF CLASS. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
March 30, 2015 Filing 542 DEFENDANTS SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE AND GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION UNDER RULE 702 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF EVIDENCE TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF BRUCE A. STROMBOM (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
March 30, 2015 Filing 541 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO GSK'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF PROFESSOR ROSENTHAL REGARDING ASCERTAINABILITY (FILED UNDER SEAL). (kp, )
March 30, 2015 Filing 540 DECLARATION OF PETER ST. PHILLIP, JR. IN OPPOSITION TO GSK'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF PROFESSOR ROSENTHAL REGARDING ASCERTAINABILITY. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
March 20, 2015 Filing 539 GSK'S MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
March 20, 2015 Filing 538 GSK'S STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
March 20, 2015 Filing 537 GSK'S MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE TO LACK OF CAUSATION. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
March 20, 2015 Filing 536 GSK'S MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF CHERYL BLUME, PHD. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
March 20, 2015 Filing 535 GSK'S MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF MEREDITH ROSENTHAL, PHD. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
March 20, 2015 Filing 534 GSK'S MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF JEFFREY LEITZINGER, PHD. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
March 20, 2015 Filing 533 PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF MARTIN J. ADELMAN AND SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF DAVID F. SORENSEN (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
March 9, 2015 Filing 532 DEFENDANTS SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE AND GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF MEREDITH ROSENTHAL REGARDING ASCERTAINABILITY AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
March 9, 2015 Filing 531 DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO GSK'S MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF CLASS AND IN SUPPORT OF INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION UNDER FR EVID. 702 TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF BRUCE A. STROMBOM. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
March 9, 2015 Filing 530 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO GSK'S MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF CLASS(FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
March 9, 2015 Filing 529 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THE INDIRECT PURCHASER CLASS' MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Bruce A. Strombom. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
March 9, 2015 Filing 528 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Bruce A. Strombom filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., AETNA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
February 25, 2015 Copy of Order dated 1/26/2015 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to TAIMARIE NICOLE ADAMS for the following reason: ATTEMPTED, NOT KNOWN. (kp, )
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 527 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE COURT EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR SERVICE OF GSK'S EXPERT REBUTTAL REPORTS TO 2/24/2015. THE DEADLINES FOR ALL OTHER PROCEEDINGS REMAIN UNCHANGED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/18/2015. 2/19/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 526 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL UNTIL 2/16/15 TO SERVE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORTS. ALL OTHER DEADLINES INCLUDING THOSE SET FORTH IN THE COURTS 8/11/14 SCHEDULING ORDER (DOC. 555) REMAIN IN FULL FORCE AND EFFORT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/6/15. 2/6/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (kp, )
January 27, 2015 Copy of Order dated 1/13/2015 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to TAIMARIE NICOLE ADAMS for the following reason: ATTEMPTED, NOT KNOWN.. (kp, )
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER THAT THE INDIRECT PURCHASER CLASS' MOTION FOR INTERIM REIMBURSEMENT OF CERTAIN ADMINISTRATION AND DISCOVERY EXPENSES IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 1/26/2015.1/28/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 524 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORTS ARE DUE 2/9/2015, AND EXPERT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 2/24/2015.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 1/13/2015. 1/14/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
January 13, 2015 Filing 523 NOTICE by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC. attaching STIPULATION AND PROPOSED AMENDMENT TO SCHEDULING ORDER**(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY, COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)** (RABINOVITZ, URIEL) Modified on 1/15/2015 (tjd).
January 5, 2015 Filing 522 MOTION FOR INTERIM REIMBURSEMENT OF CERTAIN ADMINISTRATION AND DISCOVERY EXPENSES FROM THE BIOVAIL SETTLEMENT FUND filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, Proposed Order)(RABINOVITZ, URIEL)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER THAT INDIRECT PURCHASER CLASS' MOTION TO COMPEL IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 12/10/2014.12/11/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
December 5, 2014 Filing 520 RESPONSE in Opposition re #518 MOTION to Compel DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANTS SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE AND GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service)(JOHN, LESLIE)
December 1, 2014 Filing 519 Declaration re #518 MOTION to Compel DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANTS SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE AND GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
December 1, 2014 Filing 518 MOTION to Compel DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANTS SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE AND GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC..Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Compelling Deposition Testimony)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
November 19, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #507 MOTION. RESPONSES DUE BY 3/9/2015. REPLIES DUE BY 3/30/2015. (kp, )
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 517 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 12/31/2014. DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 3/9/2015. FURTHER DEADLINES AND INSTRUCTIONS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 11/19/2014. 11/19/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 516 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL PRODUCE CHERYL BLUME FOR A DEPOSITION ON 12/16/14. GSK SHALL SERVE RESPONSIVE EXPERT REPORTS ON OR BEFORE 12/23/14. PLAINTIFFS SHALL SERVE REBUTTAL REPORTS, IF ANY, ON OR BEFORE 1/26/15.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 11/19/14. 11/19/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
November 17, 2014 Copy of Orders dated 10/3/2014,10/17/2014,10/31/2014 and envelopes returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to TAIMARIE NICOLE ADAMS for the following reason: ATTEMPTED, NOT KNOWN. UNABLE TO FORWARD.. (kp, )
November 10, 2014 Filing 515 NOTICE by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM re #513 Order, Letter to the Court (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 2)(JOHN, LESLIE)
November 10, 2014 Filing 514 MOTION to Enter Scheduling Order and Proposed Order filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND..(LENISKI, JOE) Modified on 11/13/2014 (tjd).
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A REPORT BY NOVEMBER 10, 2014, REGARDING THE SCHEDULING ISSUES DISCUSSED AT THE ABOVE-MENTIONED CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 10/31/14. 10/31/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 10/31/2014 (jaa, ).
October 17, 2014 Filing 512 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN: Status Conference held on 10/17/2014. (kp, )
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO STRIKE IS DENIED FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE AFOREMENTIONED CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 10/17/2014.10/17/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. kp, )DUE TO E-MAIL FAILURE, MAILED TO ATTORNEY AMANDA TESSAR ON 10/22/2014.( Modified on 10/22/2014 (kp, ).
October 15, 2014 Filing 510 RESPONSE in Opposition re #508 MOTION to Strike #507 MOTION to Decerify Indirect Purchaser Class filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(JOHN, LESLIE)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER THAT A MOTION HEARING IS SET FOR 10/17/2014 AT 09:30 AM IN JUDGES CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 10/3/2014. 10/3/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp,)
October 2, 2014 Filing 508 MOTION to Strike #507 MOTION to Decerify Indirect Purchaser Class filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(RABINOVITZ, URIEL)
September 22, 2014 Filing 507 MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF CLASS filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM..(FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
August 11, 2014 Filing 506 STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER THAT FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE 9/4/2014, AND EXPERT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 2/6/2015. DAUBERT OR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 3/20/2015, MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 3/20/2015.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/11/2014. 8/11/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF IMPROPERLY CLAWED-BACK DOCUMENTS IS HEREBY DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/14/2014. 7/14/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
July 1, 2014 Filing 504 NOTICE by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM re #503 Order, Letter re: Documents for In Camera Review (KASTENBERG, STEPHEN)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER THAT GLAXOSMITHKLINE, PLC SHALL PRODUCE TO THE COURT FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW, BY 7/3/2014, THE SEVEN DOCUMENTS IN DISPUTE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/27/2014. 6/27/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
June 23, 2014 Filing 502 PLAINTIFFS' REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF IMPROPERLY CLAWED-BACK DOCUMENTS by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
June 16, 2014 Filing 501 GSK'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER THAT ALL REMAINING FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 7/31/2014. ANY DAUBERT OR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 2/5/2015. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 2/5/2015. FURTHER DEADLINES AND INSTRUCTIONS ARE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/12/2014. 6/12/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
June 11, 2014 Filing 499 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #3 Certificate of Service)(JOHN, LESLIE)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 498 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE MAY FILE ITS REPSONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL ON OR BY 6/16/2014.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/2/2014. 6/2/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
May 16, 2014 Filing 497 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF IMPROPERLY CLAWED-BACK DOCUMENTS. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (kp, )
March 11, 2014 Filing 496 NOTICE of Appearance by MARCEL S. PRATT on behalf of SMITHKLINE BEECHAM with Certificate of Service(PRATT, MARCEL)
March 11, 2014 Filing 495 NOTICE of Appearance by LINDSAY D. BREEDLOVE on behalf of SMITHKLINE BEECHAM with Certificate of Service(BREEDLOVE, LINDSAY)
February 18, 2014 Copy of Order dated 2/4/2014 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to TAIMARIE NICOLE ADAMS for the following reason: ATTEMPTED, NOT KNOWN. RETURN TO SENDER. (kp, )
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 494 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 11/7/2014. ANY DAUBERT OR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 12/8/2014. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 12/8/2014.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/11/2014. 2/11/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT TRANSFER SAID CASES FROM THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE TO THE CURRENT DOCKET FOR FINAL DISPOSITION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/5/2014. 2/5/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL CONTINUE TO DISCUSS THE ISSUES RAISED IN THE COURT'S 1/17/2014 ORDER, AND THE PARTIES SHALL REPORT TO THE COURT BY JOINT OR SEPARATE LETTERS AS TO THEIR RESPECTIVE POSITIONS ON THE ISSUES RAISED ON OR BEFORE 2/7/2014. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 1/31/2014. 2/4/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL REPORT TO THE COURT BY LETTER ON OR BEFORE 1/31/2014 AS TO THEIR RESPECTIVE POSITIONS ON THE ISSUES OUTLINED HEREIN AND ANY OTHER ISSUES THE PARTIES CONSIDER RELEVANT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 1/16/2014. 1/17/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
January 14, 2014 Filing 490 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #489 Transcript - PDF, 1/15/2014 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed. (kp, )
January 14, 2014 Filing 489 TRANSCRIPT of FAIRNESS HEARING held on 12/19/2013, before Judge MCLAUGHLIN. Court Reporter/Transcriber KATE FURPHY. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/4/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/14/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2014. (kp, )
January 14, 2014 Filing 488 EXHIBITS 1 TO 3 TO DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' POST-ARGUMENT SUBMISSION RE: FTC V. ACTAVIS (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
December 19, 2013 Filing 487 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN: Oral Argument held on 12/19/2013. Court Reporter: KATIE FURPHY. (kp, )
December 19, 2013 Filing 486 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN: Oral Argument held on 12/19/13. Court Reporter: K. FURPHY. (rf, )
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDERTHAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE PARTIES' POSITIONS REGARDING THE APPLICABILITY OF FTC V. ACTAVIS, INC., 133 S.CT. 2223 (2013), TO THE PATENT SETTLEMENT AT ISSUE IN THIS LITIGATION, IS SCHEDULED FOR 12/19/2013 AT 9:30 A.M., IN COURTROOM 13A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 10/28/2013. 10/28/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
October 10, 2013 Filing 484 NOTICE by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM re #470 Order, Reply Memorandum of Law Regarding the Applicability of FTC v. Actavis (KASTENBERG, STEPHEN)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER THAT FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (DOC. 477) AND THE MOTION OF THE AMERICAN ANTITRUST INSTITUTE AND CONSUMER UNION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AS AMICI CURIAE (DOC. 488) ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 10/3/2013.10/4/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
October 3, 2013 Filing 482 RESPONSE in Opposition re #478 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae , Certificate of Service filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(JOHN, LESLIE)
October 3, 2013 Filing 481 RESPONSE in Opposition re #477 MOTION to File Amicus Brief , Certificate of Service filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (JOHN, LESLIE)
September 27, 2013 Filing 480 NOTICE by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM re #478 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae, #477 MOTION to File Amicus Brief , Letter to Court (JOHN, LESLIE)
September 26, 2013 Filing 479 NOTICE by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., AETNA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND re #474 Notice (Other), #470 Order, The End-Payer Plaintiffs' Response to GSK's Memorandum of Law Regarding the Applicability of FTC v. Actavis (ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
September 26, 2013 Filing 478 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae filed by CONSUMERS UNION, THE AMERICAN ANTITRUST INSTITUTE.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave, #2 Exhibit Brief Amici Curiae, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(SHADOWEN, STEVE)
September 26, 2013 Filing 477 MOTION to File Amicus Brief filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to File, #2 Proposed Brief as Amicus Curiae, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(MEIER, MARKUS)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED, AND THE DEADLINE FOR SUBMISSION OF INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' BRIEF SHALL BE 9/26/2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP. AND GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC SHALL RECEIVE AN ADDITIONAL SEVEN DAYS, FOURTEEN DAYS TOTAL, TO FILE A REPLY TO INDIRECT PURCHASE PLAINTIFFS' BRIEF.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/3/2013.9/3/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
September 3, 2013 Filing 475 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' briefing regarding the applicability of FTC v. Actavis, 133 S. Ct. 2223 (2013), filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RABINOVITZ, URIEL)
August 5, 2013 Filing 474 NOTICE by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM re #470 Order, Memorandum of Law Regarding The Applicability of FTC v. Actavis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KASTENBERG, STEPHEN)
July 22, 2013 Filing 473 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND AWARDING INCENTIVE PAYMENTS, FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/22/2013. 7/23/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(stwe, )
July 18, 2013 Filing 472 Letter to the Court by VALENT HOLDINGS (BARBADOS) SRL, VALENT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. Letter to the Court (LAZEROW, ANDREW) Modified on 7/19/2013 (ke, ).
July 17, 2013 Filing 471 Report Of Final Tally of Filed Claims Following the July 12, 2013 Extended Claims Deadline by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC.. (ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER THAT COURT WILL CONSIDER BRIEFING ON THE QUESTION OF WHETHER ACTAVIS APPLIES TO THE PATENT SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS AT ISSUE IN THIS LITIGATION BEFORE DISCOVERY, ETC. THE COURT WOULD LIKE THE BRIEF FROM GSK ON OR BEFORE 8/5/13 AND FROM THE PLAINTIFFS ON OR BEFORE 9/5/13. GSK MAY THEN DO A REPLY BRIEF WITHIN 7 DAYS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/11/2013. 7/11/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
June 27, 2013 Filing 469 NOTICE by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM letter to Judge McLaughlin re: GSK's proposal for further proceedings (KASTENBERG, STEPHEN)
June 26, 2013 Filing 468 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #467 Transcript - PDF, 6/26/2013 Entered and Copies E-mailed and Mailed. (tomg, )
June 26, 2013 Filing 467 TRANSCRIPT of FAIRNESS HEARING held on 6/18/2013, before Judge MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN. Court Reporter/Transcriber ESR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/17/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2013. (tomg, )
June 25, 2013 Filing 466 Supplemental APPLICATION for Attorney Fees Supplemental Application for Awards of Incentive Payments, Fees and Reimbursements of Expenses from the Proposed Class Action Settlement filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(WEXLER, KENNETH) Modified on 6/26/2013 (lisad, ).
June 20, 2013 Filing 465 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN: Hearing held on 6/18/2013. Court Reporter: Milahn Hull. (ems)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER THAT PARTIES SHALL DISCUSS WITH EACH OTHER HOW THEY WOULD LIKE TO PROCEED IN THE CASE AND THEN NOTIFY THE COURT HOW THEY WOULD LIKE TO PROCEED BY 6/27/2013. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/17/2013. 6/17/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
June 14, 2013 Filing 463 Declaration re #457 MOTION for Approval of Final Approval of Settlement with the Valeant Defendants by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (RABINOVITZ, URIEL)
June 10, 2013 Filing 462 NOTICE by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND of Letter to the Court (NESBITT, AMBER)
May 31, 2013 Filing 461 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF END PAYOR CLASS SETTLEMENT, AND APPROVING PROPOSED FORM OF NOTICE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/31/2013. 6/3/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
May 31, 2013 Filing 460 NOTICE by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC. of Letter to the Court, with Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RABINOVITZ, URIEL) Modified on 6/3/2013 (md).
May 15, 2013 Filing 459 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Award of Incentive Payments filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.Memorandum, Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' and Class Counsel's Application for Awards of Incentive Payments, Fees, and Reimbursement of Expenses from the Proposed Class Action Settlement, #2 Declaration Declaration of Peter St. Phillip, Jr. in Support of (1) Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Application for Awards of Incentive Payments, Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses from the Proposed Class Action Settlement and (2) Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Class Counsel, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V)(WEXLER, KENNETH)
May 15, 2013 Filing 458 Memorandum re #457 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement with the Valeant Defendants filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (WEXLER, KENNETH) Modified on 5/16/2013 (md).
May 15, 2013 Filing 457 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement with the Valeant Defendants filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WEXLER, KENNETH) Modified on 5/16/2013 (md).
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF ENDPAYER CLASS SETTLEMENT, AND APPROVING PROPOSED FORM OF NOTICE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/22/2013. 2/22/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER THAT THE STAY IN THE CASE SHALL REMAIN IN EFFECT PENDING THE SUPREME COURT'S DECISION IN FTC V. WATSON PHARMACEUTICS INC. WITH THE CONTINUING EXCEPTION THAT DISCOVERY IN THE FORM OF DOCUMENT PRODUCTION MAY PROCEED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/22/2013. 2/22/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
February 15, 2013 Filing 454 Declaration re #452 MOTION for Approval for Preliminary Approval of Indirect Purchasers' Class Settlement (Unopposed) of Peter D. St. Phillip by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(RABINOVITZ, URIEL)
February 15, 2013 Filing 453 Memorandum re #452 MOTION for Approval for Preliminary Approval of Indirect Purchasers' Class Settlement (Unopposed) filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (RABINOVITZ, URIEL)
February 15, 2013 Filing 452 MOTION for Approval for Preliminary Approval of Indirect Purchasers' Class Settlement (Unopposed) filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RABINOVITZ, URIEL)
January 25, 2013 Filing 451 Letter to Honorable Mary A. McLaughlin by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM re #450 Order, that the parties shall inform the Court on or before January 25, 2013, their position with respect to continuing the stay until the Supreme Court decision in the FTC case (ANTHONY, JESSICA) Modified on 1/28/2013 (lisad, ).
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL INFORM THE COURT ON OR BEFORE 1/25/2013, THEIR POSITION WITH RESPECT TO CONTINUING THE STAY UNTIL THE SUPREME COURT DECISION IN THE FTC CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 1/18/2013. 1/18/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF THOMAS A. DOYLE, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 11/15/2012. 11/16/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
November 15, 2012 Filing 448 APPLICATION for PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION of (Thomas A. Doyle) filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. PROPOSED ORDER, SPONSORS STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (FEE PAID PPE072319) (kk, )
November 14, 2012 Filing 447 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #446 Transcript - PDF, 11/14/12 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (rf, )
November 14, 2012 Filing 446 TRANSCRIPT of Settlement Hearing held on 11/7/12, before Judge MCLAUGHLIN. Court Reporter/Transcriber M. HULL. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/5/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2013. (rf, )
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION AND GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS IS HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DISCOVERY IN THE FORM OF DOCUMENT PRODUCTION MAY PROCEED. IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS THE CASE WILL BE STAYED PENDING THE SUPREME COURT'S DECISION ON WHETHER TO GRANT CERTIORARI IN IN RE K-DUR ANTITRUST LITIGATION AND/OR FTC VS. WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. AFTER THE SUPREME COURT MAKES ITS DECISION ON THE REQUESTS FOR CERTIORARI, THE COURT WILL DISCUSS WITH COUNSEL WHETHER TO CONTINUE THE STAY, AND UNDER WHAT CIRCUMSTANCES.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 11/7/2012.11/7/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
November 6, 2012 Filing 444 RESPONSE in Opposition re #442 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Resolution of Supreme Court Proceedings in In re K-Dur Antitrust Litigation and/or FTC v. Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., or in the Alternative, for Extension of Discovery Deadlines, filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS LOCAL UNION NO. 5 OHIO HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS-UNITED ASSOCIATION LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(RABINOVITZ, URIEL)
October 31, 2012 Filing 443 NOTICE by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM re #442 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Resolution of Supreme Court Proceedings in In re K-Dur Antitrust Litigation and/or FTC v. Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., or in the Alternative, for Extension of Discovery Deadlines, -- Letter to the Court Requesting Conference (OSBORNE PADILLA, MARGARET)
October 24, 2012 Filing 442 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Resolution of Supreme Court Proceedings in In re K-Dur Antitrust Litigation and/or FTC v. Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., or in the Alternative, for Extension of Discovery Deadlines, filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(OSBORNE PADILLA, MARGARET)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF URIEL RABINOVITZ, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/10/2012. 9/11/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
September 10, 2012 Filing 440 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Of Uriel Rabinovitz filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC..Sponsor's Statement and Certificate of Service.(ST. PHILLIP, PETER) (FEE PAID PPE069450, $40.00)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. 410 & 411 IN 08-CV-2431; DOC. 378 & 379 IN 08-2433) ARE DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE EXTENT THAT THEY REMAIN UNDECIDED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/6/12. 8/7/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED(tomg, )
August 6, 2012 Filing 438 *** Per telephone call from counsel, terminated attorneys JOHN M. DESMARAIS and MICHAEL P. STADNICK from receiving notices in this case. (afm, )
August 6, 2012 Filing 437 STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 2/28/2013. RENEWED MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 3/14/2013, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/3/2012; 8/6/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
August 3, 2012 Filing 436 NOTICE by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM August 3, 2012 Letter to Court attaching Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order (ANTHONY, JESSICA)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER of USCA dated 7/26/2012 THAT THE FOREGOING PETITION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL PURSUANT TO F. R. CIV. P. 23(f) IS HEREBY DENIED. (ems)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES NEED NOT SUBMIT A PROPOSED DATE FOR ORAL ARGUMENT DURING THE WEEK OF 7/30/2012. ON OR BEFORE 8/3/2012, THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A JOINT PROPOSAL (OR SEPERATE PROPOSALS, IF NECESSARY) FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS IN THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/20/2012; 7/20/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/17/2012; 7/17/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW OF JOB ITZKOWITZ IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/9/2012;7/9/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 6, 2012 Filing 431 NOTICE by VALENT HOLDINGS (BARBADOS) SRL, VALENT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. NOTICE OF CHANGE OF NAME OF ONE BIOVAIL DEFENDANT (LAZEROW, ANDREW)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER THAT MOTION OF SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION TO WITHDRAW SUSANNA GREENBERG AS COUNSEL IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/29/12. 7/3/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 2, 2012 Filing 429 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Job Itzkowitz as Counsel for Defendant filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ANTHONY, JESSICA) (Main Document 429 replaced on 7/5/2012) (nd, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/5/2012) (nd, ).
June 29, 2012 Filing 428 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Susanna Greenberg as Counsel for Defendant filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GREENBERG, SUSANNA)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER of USCA dated 5/29/2012 THAT THE MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION IS GRANTED. (ems)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER of USCA THAT PETITIONERS MOTION TO FILE PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAL AND VOLUME 2 OF THE APPENDIX TO THE PETITION UNDER SEAL IS HEREBY GRANTED. PETITIONER'S MOTION TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 23(f) IS HEREBY GRANTED.(kp, )
May 24, 2012 Filing 425 NOTICE OF APPEAL RE: CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER FROM USCA THAT PETITIONER'S MOTION TO FILE THE PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAL AND VOLUME 2 OF THE APPENDIX TO THE PETITION UNDER SEAL IS GRANTED, ETC. (tomg, ) Modified on 5/30/2012 (td, ).
May 22, 2012 Filing 424 DIRECT AND INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO GSK'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' POST-HEARING SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION REGARDING THE 150 DELAY TRANSACTION. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ems)
May 16, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to REPLIES DUE BY 5/22/2012. (tomg, )
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER THAT DIRECT AND INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A RESPONSE TO GSK'S BRIEF REGARDING THE "150 DELAY TRANSACTION" (DOC. 456 IN 08-2431, DOC. 422 IN 08-2433) IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS MAY FILE A REPLY TO GSK'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS POST HEARING SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSON ON OR BEFORE 5/22/12., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/15/2012;5/17/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
May 15, 2012 Filing 422 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File a Response to GSK's Brief Regarding the "150 Delay Transaction" filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(NESBITT, AMBER)
May 14, 2012 Filing 421 GSK'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' POST-HEARING SUBMISSION IN OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ems)
May 11, 2012 Filing 420 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT THE BIOVAIL DEFTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. #378) AND THE GSK DEFTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. #379) ARE GRANTED IN PART. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/11/2012; 5/11/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
May 11, 2012 Filing 419 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION RE: MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/11/2012; 5/11/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAW OF J. MAREN SCHMIDT AS COUNSEL OF RECORD. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/9/2012;5/9/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
May 7, 2012 Filing 417 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney J. Maren Schmidt filed by VALENT HOLDINGS (BARBADOS) SRL, VALENT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC... (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LAZEROW, ANDREW)
April 30, 2012 Filing 416 PLAINTIFFS' POST HEARING SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION IN OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tomg, )
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. #414) IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE THE PLAINTIFFS' POST-HEARING SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION IN OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT UNDER SEAL. DEFTS MAY RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFFS' POST HEARING SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION WITH RESPECT TO THE "150 DELAY TRANSACTION" ON OR BEFORE 5/14/2012. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 4/30/2012;4/30/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
April 25, 2012 Filing 414 DIRECT AND INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A POST-HEARING SUBMISSION IN OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ems)
April 19, 2012 Filing 413 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN: Telephone Conference held on 4/19/12 Court Reporter: ESR. (ti, )
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER THAT THE DEFTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER ENTERED 8/15/2011 GRANTING IN PART INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (DOC. #356) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 4/9/2012;4/10/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
April 5, 2012 Filing 411 BIOVAIL DEFENDANTS' EXHIBIT 145 IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO ALL CLAIMS BROUGHT BY THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(mbh, )
April 5, 2012 Filing 410 BIOVAIL DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO ALL CLAIMS BROUGHT BY THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (mbh, )
March 29, 2012 Filing 409 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #408 Transcript - PDF, 3/29/2012 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed. (tomg, )
March 29, 2012 Filing 408 TRANSCRIPT of MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT held on 3/20/2012, before Judge MCLAUGHLIN. Court Reporter/Transcriber MILAHN HULL. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/19/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2012. (tomg, )
March 21, 2012 Filing 407 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN: ORAL ARGUMENT held on 3/20/2012. (tomg, )
March 6, 2012 Filing 406 BIOVAIL DEFENDANTS CORRECTED REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO ALL CLAIMS BROUGHT BY THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS (FILED UNDER SEAL) (tomg, )
February 28, 2012 Filing 405 PRAECIPE TO ATTACH EXHIBIT D TO THE BIOVAIL DEFTS' REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO ALL CLAIMS BROUGHT BY THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS (EXHIBIT D ATTACHED) (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tomg, )
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. #401) IS GRANTED. GSK'S 50-PAGE MEMORANDUM OF LAW FILED UNDER SEAL YESTERDAY WITH THE COURT IS HEREBY ACCEPTED FOR CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/27/2012;2/28/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. #400) IS GRANTED. DEFTS 74-PAGE MEMORANDUM OF LAW IS ACCEPTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/27/2012.2/28/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
February 24, 2012 Filing 402 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Corrected Version) filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GREENBERG, SUSANNA)
February 24, 2012 Filing 401 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for GSK's Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GREENBERG, SUSANNA)
February 24, 2012 Filing 400 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by VALENT HOLDINGS (BARBADOS) SRL, VALENT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC..Certificate of Service.(BOLAND, DANIEL)
February 23, 2012 Filing 399 GSK'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (FILED UNDER SEAL) (tomg, )
February 23, 2012 Filing 398 BIOVAIL DEFENDANTS' REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO ALL CLAIMS BROUGHT BY THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTFFS AND DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS (FILED UNDER SEAL)(tomg, )
February 23, 2012 Filing 397 BIOVAILS SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF MATERIAL UNDISPUTED FACTS IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THE PORTION OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING CLAIMS THAT THE ANCHEN SETTLEMENT IS INDEPENDENTLY ACTIONABLE (FILED UNDER SEAL)(tomg, )
February 23, 2012 Filing 396 BIOVAIL DEFENDANTS INDEX OF SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS TO REPLY STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS AND REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (FILED UNDER SEAL)(tomg, )
February 23, 2012 Filing 395 BIOVAILS REPLY STATEMENT OF MATERIAL UNDISPUTED FACTS IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO ALL CLAIMS BROUGHT BY THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS (FILED UNDER SEAL) (tomg, )
February 21, 2012 Filing 394 PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE TO BIOVAIL AND GSK PROPOSED STATEMENTS OF UNDISPUTED FACTS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tomg, )
February 21, 2012 Filing 393 PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED CONSOLIDATED STATEMENT OF FACTS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FILED UNDER SEAL) (tomg, )
February 21, 2012 Filing 392 PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT (FILED UNDER SEAL)(tomg, )
February 8, 2012 Filing 391 STIPULATION AND SIXTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ANY REPLIES IN SUPPORT OF THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 2/23/2012, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/8/2012; 2/8/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION NUNC PRO TUNC FOR A ONE-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 1/30/2012.1/31/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
January 30, 2012 Filing 389 DIRECT AND INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED EXHIBIT LIST AND PROPOSED ORDER (FILED UNDER SEAL)(tomg, )
January 30, 2012 Filing 388 DIRECT AND INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS PROPOSED STATEMENTS OF UNDISPUTED FACTS (FILED UNDER SEAL)(tomg, )
January 30, 2012 Filing 387 DIRECT AND INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED STATEMENT OF FACTS (FILED UNDER SEAL)(tomg, )
January 30, 2012 Filing 386 DIRECT AND INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT (FILED UNDER SEAL)(tomg, )
January 30, 2012 Filing 385 EXHIBITS 1-768 TO INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT (FILED UNDER SEAL)(rf, )
January 30, 2012 Filing 384 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #379 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #378 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WEXLER, KENNETH)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 383 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DUE 12/22/11. ALL OTHER SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 12/27/2011. 12/28/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
December 22, 2011 Filing 382 BIOVAIL DEFENDANTS' APPENDICES EXHIBITS VOLUMES I- VI TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTFILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO THIS COURTS 8/21/2009 ORDER (FILED UNDER SEAL)(tomg, )
December 22, 2011 Filing 381 BIOVAIL DEFENDANTS STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS AS TO WHICH THERE IS NO GENUINE ISSUE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO ALL CLAIMS BROUGHT BY THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO THIS COURTS 8/21/09 ORDER (FILED UNDER SEAL)(tomg, )
December 22, 2011 Filing 380 BIOVAIL DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO ALL CLAIMS BROUGHT BY THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO THIS COURTS 8/21/09 ORDER (FILED UNDER SEAL) (tomg, )
December 22, 2011 Filing 379 GLAXOSMITHKLINE, PLC MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, MEMORANDUM OF LAW, STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND APPENDIX (FILED UNDER SEAL)(rf, )
December 22, 2011 Filing 378 BIOVAIL DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO ALL CLAIMS BROUGHT BY THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by VALENT HOLDINGS (BARBADOS) SRL, VALENT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC...(rf, )
December 21, 2011 Filing 377 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including VALENT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. by VALENT HOLDINGS (BARBADOS) SRL., with Certificate of Service.(tomg, )
December 21, 2011 Filing 376 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by VALENT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., with Certificate of Service.(tomg, )
December 21, 2011 Filing 375 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF NAMES OF BIOVAIL DEFTS FILED BY VALENT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., VALENT HOLDINGS (BARBADOS) SRL WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(tomg, )
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER THAT THE REQUEST IS GRANTED. THE ORAL ARGUMENT IS POSTPONED AND RESCHEDULED FOR 3/20/2012 AT 9:30 A.M., IN COURTROOM 13A, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 12/16/2011. 12/19/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL BY ANDREW M. BERNIE IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 10/20/2011.10/21/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
October 4, 2011 Filing 372 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew M. Bernie filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC... (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(SCHMIDT, J.)
September 27, 2011 Filing 371 OPPOSITION to Defts' Response in Further Support of their Motion for Reconsideration filed by PLAINTIFFS'. (tomg, )
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFTS' RESPONSE IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS HEREBY DIRECTED TO FILE THE OPPOSITION.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/27/2011.9/27/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
September 26, 2011 Filing 369 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Defendants' Response in Further Support of Motion for Reconsideration filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(WEXLER, KENNETH)
September 26, 2011 Filing 368 DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A RESPONSE IS HEREBY GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS HEREBY DIRECTED TO FILE THE RESPONSE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/26/2011.9/26/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND EXPEDITED CROSS-MOTION TO STRIKE, ARE HEREBY DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/26/2011.9/26/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER THAT COURT WILL HOLD ORAL ARGUMENT ON ANY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 3/1/2012 09:30 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/22/11. 9/26/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
September 22, 2011 Filing 364 DEFT'S MOTION for Leave to File a response in further support of its Motion for Reconsideration. (FILED UNDER SEAL).(tomg, )
September 22, 2011 Filing 363 NOTICE by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM of Corrected Letter in Response to Court's September 13 Order (GREENBERG, SUSANNA)
September 22, 2011 Filing 362 NOTICE by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM of Letter in Response to Court's September 13 Order (GREENBERG, SUSANNA)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL CONFER AND INFORM THE COURT REGARDING AGREEABLE DATES AND TIMES FOR A RESCHEDULED ORAL ARGUMENT DURING THE WEEK OF 2/6/2012; THE WEEK OF 2/13/2012; THE WEEK OF 3/5/2012 OR ON 2/29/2012, 3/1/2012, OR 3/2/2012.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/13/2011. 9/13/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER THAT PARAGRAPH 5 OF THE COURT'S CORRECTED CLASS CERTIFICATION ORDER (DOC. #357) IS AMENDED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/13/2011. 9/13/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
September 12, 2011 Filing 359 STIPULATION AND FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/9/2011. 9/12/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
September 2, 2011 Filing 358 RESPONSE in Opposition re 356 MOTION for Reconsideration re #354 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion) filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
August 31, 2011 Filing 357 CORRECTED ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (DOC. #109) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/30/2011. 8/31/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
August 26, 2011 Filing 356 Defts' Motion for Reconsideration of Order entered 8/15/2011 granting in part Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (FILED UNDER SEAL).(tomg, )
August 15, 2011 Filing 355 Defts' OPPOSITION to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Protective Order and expedited cross-motion to strike the 7/22/2011 declaration of Meredith Rosenthal, PH.D. regarding impact and damages. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(tomg, )
August 15, 2011 Filing 354 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (DOC. #109) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/12/2011. 8/15/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
August 15, 2011 Filing 353 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION RE: MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (DOC. #109). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/12/2011. 8/15/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF PAGE LIMITATIONS FOR DEFTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER IS GRANTED. DEFTS MAY FILE THE 13 PAGE MEMORANDUM OF LAW ANNEXED TO THEIR MOTION.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/12/2011.8/15/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
August 11, 2011 Filing 351 RESPONSE in Opposition re 350 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
August 9, 2011 Filing 350 MOTION of Defts for extension of page limitations for defts' opposition to plaintiff's motion for protective order and expedited cross-motion to strike the 7/22/2011 declaration of Meredith Rosenthal, PH.D. regarding impact and damages. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(tomg, )
August 9, 2011 Filing 349 STIPULATION of Plaintiffs and GSK Concerning Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Depositions of Defendants SmithKline Beecham Corp. and GlaxoSmithKline PLC by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (NESBITT, AMBER)
August 9, 2011 Filing 348 STIPULATION of Plaintiffs and Biovail Concerning Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Depositions Directed to Biovail Defendants by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (NESBITT, AMBER)
August 9, 2011 Filing 347 STIPULATION of the Parties Concerning the Defendants' Common Interest Claims by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (NESBITT, AMBER)
August 9, 2011 Filing 346 EXHIBITS 1 AND 2 of Declaration of Peter D. St. Phillip, Jr., in support of plaintiff's motion for a protective order or, in the alternative, for leave to file Dr. Rosenthal's classwide damage calculations on a date certain. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (tomg, )
August 8, 2011 Filing 345 FOURTH STIPULATION AND ORDER OF PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS EXTENDING TIME TO NEGOTIATE RESOLUTION OF PLAINTIFFS' PENDING RULE 30(b)(6) NOTICES TO DEFTS BY TWO BUSINESS DAYS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/8/2011. 8/9/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
August 8, 2011 Filing 344 Proposed Order RE: MOTION for Protective Order filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND..(ST. PHILLIP, PETER) Modified on 8/9/2011 (nd, ).
August 8, 2011 Filing 343 Declaration re: MOTION for Protective Order filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-7) (ST. PHILLIP, PETER) Modified on 8/9/2011 (nd).
August 8, 2011 Filing 342 MOTION for Protective Order filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER THAT THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY CONCERNING DEFTS' BASIS FOR THE UNDERLYING INFRINGEMENT ACTIONS AND CITIZEN PETITION OR TO PROHIBIT DEFTS FROM OFFERING EVIDENCE REFERRING TO COMMUNICATIONS WITH THEIR COUNSEL CONCERNING THE SAME (DOC. #340, C.A. 08-2431) AND INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' JOINDER (DOC. #333, C.A. 08-2433) ARE DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/29/2011. 8/1/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 27, 2011 Filing 340 THIRD STIPULATION AND ORDER OF PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS EXTENDING TIME TO NEGOTIATE RESOLUTION OF PLAINTIFFS' PENDING RULE 30(b)(6) NOTICES TO DEFTS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/27/2011. 7/27/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 15, 2011 Filing 339 STIPULATION AND THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: DISCOVERY DUE BY 11/17/2011. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 12/16/2011, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/15/2011. 7/18/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD ORAL ARGUMENT ON ANY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 2/22/2012 AT 9:30 A.M., IN COURTROOM 13-A.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/15/2011. 7/18/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 13, 2011 Filing 337 SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER OF PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS EXTENDING TIME TO NEGOTIATE RESOLUTION OF PLAINTIFFS' PENDING RULE 30(b)(6) NOTICES TO DEFTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/13/2011. 7/13/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED (tomg, )
July 11, 2011 Filing 336 Memorandum in Opposition to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery or to Prohibit Defts from offering evidence referring to communications with their counsel filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (tomg, )
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 335 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF FACTS CONCERNING ACTAVIS (ABRIKA PHARMACEUTICALS) AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/7/2011. 7/7/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 334 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO NEGOTIATE RESOLUTION OF PLAINTIFFS' PENDING RULE 30(b)(6) NOTICES TO DEFTS AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/6/2011. 7/7/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
June 29, 2011 Filing 333 NOTICE by AETNA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND of Joinder in the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery Concerning Defendants' Basis for the Underlying Infringement Actions and Citizen Petition or to Prohibit Defendants from Offering Evidence Referring to Communications with their Counsel Concerning the Same (WEXLER, KENNETH)
June 14, 2011 Filing 332 Memorandum in Support re #109 MOTION to Certify Class of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs (corrected copy) filed by AETNA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Certificate of service. (ST. PHILLIP, PETER) Modified on 6/15/2011 (nd, ).
June 13, 2011 Filing 331 Memorandum of Law on Choice of Law in Further Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (tomg, )
June 13, 2011 Filing 330 Memorandum in Support re #109 MOTION to Certify Class of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs filed by AETNA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES MAY SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL CHOICE OF LAW BRIEFS ON OR BEFORE 6/13/2011.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/8/2011. 6/9/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
June 6, 2011 Filing 328 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #327 Transcript - PDF, 6/7/2011 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (tomg, )
June 6, 2011 Filing 327 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 5/27/2011, before Judge McLAUGHLIN. Court Reporter/Transcriber M. Hull. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/24/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2011. (tomg, )
May 27, 2011 Filing 326 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN: Oral Argument on Motion for Class Certification held on 5/27/2011 (tomg, )
May 26, 2011 Filing 325 Declaration of Eric Meyers in support of Exhibit A to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Post-Hearing Memorandum In Support Of Their Motion For Class Certification by AETNA, INC.. (ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
May 20, 2011 Filing 324 DEFTS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN ADVANCE OF 5/27/2011 ORAL ARGUMENT IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FILED BY SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (tomg, )
May 20, 2011 Filing 323 Memorandum In Support re #109 MOTION to Certify Class of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs filed by AETNA, INC., BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS LOCAL UNION NO. 5 OHIO HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS-UNITED ASSOCIATION LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Aetna Purchase Data, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
May 10, 2011 Filing 322 STIPULATION AND SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 10/14/2011. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 11/4/2011, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/9/2011. 5/11/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD ORAL ARGUMENT ON ANY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 1/12/2012 AT 9:30 A.M., IN COURTROOM 13A, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/10/2011. 5/11/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
May 10, 2011 Filing 320 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #319 Transcript - PDF, 5/10/11 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (rf, )
May 10, 2011 Filing 319 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 4/5/11, before Judge MCLAUGHLIN. Court Reporter/Transcriber M. HULL. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/31/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2011. (rf, )
May 10, 2011 Filing 318 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #317 Transcript - PDF, 5/11/2011 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (tomg, )
May 10, 2011 Filing 317 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 4/29/2011, before Judge McLAUGHLIN. Court Reporter/Transcriber MILAHN HULL. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/31/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2011. (tomg, )
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IS SCHEDULED FOR 5/27/2011 AT 9:30 A.M., IN COURTROOM 13-A, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/9/2011. 5/9/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
May 3, 2011 Filing 315 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN: Motion Hearing re: motion for class certification held on 4/29/2011 (tomg, )
April 21, 2011 Filing 314 DEFTS' sur-reply in oppostion to indirect purchaser plaintiffs' motion for class certification (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tomg, )
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER THAT DEFTS' UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (DOC. #311) IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE THE SUR-REPLY ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT A TO THE DEFTS' MOTION UNDER SEAL.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 4/21/2011.4/22/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC. #255) IS DENIED AS MOOT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 4/21/2011.4/22/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
April 20, 2011 Filing 311 DEFTS' UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO INDRIECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (FILED UNDER SEAL)..(tomg, )
April 18, 2011 Filing 310 NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET S. OSBORNE on behalf of SMITHKLINE BEECHAM with Certificate of Service(OSBORNE, MARGARET)
April 14, 2011 Filing 309 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREA MARIE DEVRIES on behalf of BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC. with certificate of service.(tomg, )
April 11, 2011 Filing 308 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA MOLTISANTI ANTHONY on behalf of SMITHKLINE BEECHAM with Certificate of Service(ANTHONY, JESSICA)
April 7, 2011 Filing 306 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #305 Transcript - PDF, 4/7/2011 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (tomg, )
April 7, 2011 Filing 305 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 3/29/2011, before Judge Honorable Mary A. McLaughlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Raymond Wolf. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2011. (tomg, )
April 5, 2011 Filing 307 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN: Motion Hearing on Class Certification held on 4/5/2011. (afm, )
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW COUNSEL OF RECORD IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 4/4/2011.4/4/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
April 4, 2011 Filing 303 NOTICE by IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation and Contact Information (ROUCO, RICHARD)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ANDREW M. BERNIE, DAVID J. SHAW, JASON C. ROAFIELD, DANIELLE S. BARBOUR, HENRY B. LIU, J. MAREN SCHMIDT ARE GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 4/1/2011. 4/4/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
April 1, 2011 Filing 301 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(PRIMIS, CRAIG)
April 1, 2011 Filing 300 NOTICE by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC. OF CHANGE IN CONTACT INFORMATION (BOLAND, DANIEL)
March 31, 2011 Filing 299 APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice Of J. Maren Schmidt filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC..Certificate of Service. (FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE040595)(BOLAND, DANIEL) Modified on 4/1/2011 (tomg, ). Modified on 4/1/2011 (lisad, ).
March 31, 2011 Filing 298 APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice Of Henry B. Liu filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC..Certificate of Service. (FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE040595) (BOLAND, DANIEL) Modified on 4/1/2011 (tomg, ). Modified on 4/1/2011 (lisad, ).
March 31, 2011 Filing 297 APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice Of Danielle S. Barbour filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC..Certificate of Service. (FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE040595)(BOLAND, DANIEL) Modified on 4/1/2011 (tomg, ). Modified on 4/1/2011 (lisad, ).
March 31, 2011 Filing 296 APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice Of Jason C. Raofield filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC..Certificate of Service. (FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE040595) (BOLAND, DANIEL) Modified on 4/1/2011 (tomg, ). Modified on 4/1/2011 (lisad, ).
March 31, 2011 Filing 295 APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice Of David J. Shaw filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC..Certificate of Service. (FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE040595) (BOLAND, DANIEL) Modified on 4/1/2011 (tomg, ). Modified on 4/1/2011 (lisad, ).
March 31, 2011 Filing 294 APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice of Andrew M. Bernie filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC..Certificate of Service. (FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE040595) (BOLAND, DANIEL) Modified on 4/1/2011 (tomg, ). Modified on 4/1/2011 (lisad, ).
March 28, 2011 Filing 293 NOTICE of Appearance by JOB MICHAEL ITZKOWITZ on behalf of SMITHKLINE BEECHAM with Certificate of Service(ITZKOWITZ, JOB)
March 28, 2011 Filing 292 NOTICE of Appearance by LESLIE E. JOHN on behalf of SMITHKLINE BEECHAM with Certificate of Service(JOHN, LESLIE)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD AN ON-THE-RECORD TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ON 3/29/2011 AT 1:00 P.M., TO DISCUSS GSK'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/17/2011. 3/18/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF CHARLES LOUGHLIN TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/16/2011.3/16/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
March 14, 2011 Filing 289 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of CHARLES A. LOUGHLIN filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE..(tomg, )
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL OF R. COREY WORCESTER IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/11/2011.3/14/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
March 11, 2011 Filing 287 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' reply MEMORANDUM of law in further support of their Motion for Class Certification; and DECLARATION of Peter D. St. Phillip, Jr., and EXHIBITS. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tomg, )
March 11, 2011 Filing 286 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of R. Corey Worcester with Certificate of Service.(tomg, )
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER THAT THE COURT WOULD LIKE TO SCHEDULE A CONFERENCE TO DISCUSS THE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (DOC. #255). THE COURT HAS THE AVAILABILITY ON 3/21, 3/22, AND 3/25. THE COURT INVITES COUNSEL TO CONFER AMONGST THEMSELVES AND AGREE TO A DATE AND TIME FOR THE CONFERENCE, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/10/2011. 3/10/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR WITHDRAWL OF COUNSEL BY M. SEAN ROYALL, MONIQUE DRAKE, GEORGE A. NICOUD III, MALACHI BOYULS, ASHLEY JOHNSON, SARAH V. TORAASON, LAWRENCE VANDYKE, AND SCOTT H. MELLON IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/8/2011.3/10/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF SIMEON G. PAPACOSTAS, ESQUIRE, IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/8/2011. 3/9/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
March 8, 2011 Filing 282 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(ROYALL, MICHAEL)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD A HEARING ON THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION ON 4/29/2011 AT 9:30 A.M., IN COURTROOM 13A. THE PARTIES MAY PRESENT LIVE TESTIMONY.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/8/2011. 3/8/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
March 7, 2011 Filing 280 APPLICATION for PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION of (SIMEON G. PAPACOSTAS) filed by (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM), statement and certificate of service. (FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT # PPE038996)(tomg, )
March 4, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to REPLIES DUE BY 3/11/2011. (tomg, )
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE FOR THE SUBMISSION OF INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' CLASS CERTIFICATION REPLY BRIEF SHALL BE 3/11/2011.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/3/2011.3/4/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF EMILY P. HUGHES, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/2/ 2011.3/4/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED(tomg, )
March 2, 2011 Filing 277 APPLICATION for PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION of (EMILY P. HUGHES) filed by (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM), statement and certificate of service. (FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE038578) (tomg, )
March 2, 2011 Filing 276 NOTICE by AETNA, INC. Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to Enlarge Number of Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation Concerning Depositions, #2 Certificate of Service)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
March 2, 2011 Filing 275 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by AETNA, INC... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
February 17, 2011 Filing 274 REPLY in Support of Motion re #255 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Regarding Other Antidepressants filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (PRIMIS, CRAIG) Modified on 2/18/2011 (nd, ).
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER THAT #271 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY SAMANTHA GINGOLD GUILDER IS GRANTED SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/10/2011.2/11/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jcab)
February 10, 2011 Filing 271 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re Samantha Guilder filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM..(GUILDER, SAMANTHA)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD A HEARING ON THE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION ON 4/5/2011 AT 9:30 A.M., IN COURTROOM 13A.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/9/2011. 2/15/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
February 8, 2011 Filing 270 RESPONSE in Opposition re #255 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Regarding Other Antidepressants filed by AETNA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Gerald Lawrence, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Eric Meyers)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
February 7, 2011 Filing 269 RESPONSE in Opposition re #255 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Regarding Other Antidepressants filed by AETNA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Gerald Lawrence, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Eric Meyers)(ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
January 31, 2011 Filing 268 ANSWER to #249 Amended Complaint, /ANSWER OF BIOVAIL DEFENDANTS TO THE SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND FOR END PAYORS by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC..(BOLAND, DANIEL)
January 28, 2011 Filing 267 Defts' Memorandum in Opposition to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (FILED UNDER SEAL) by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (tomg, )
January 28, 2011 Filing 266 ANSWER to #249 Amended Complaint, by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM with Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service. (PRIMIS, CRAIG) Modified on 1/31/2011 (nd, ).
January 25, 2011 Filing 265 Copy of letters of request to the Ministry of the Attorney General of Ontario, Canada directed to Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP. 1/26/2011 entered and original mailed to counsel. (tomg, )
January 25, 2011 Filing 264 Copy of letters of request to the Sheriff of Alberta directed to Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP. 1/26/2011 entered and original mailed to counsel. (tomg, )
January 25, 2011 Filing 263 Copy of letters of request to the Ministry of the Attorney General of Ontario, Canada directed to Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP. 1/26/2011 entered and original mailed to counsel. (tomg, )
January 25, 2011 Filing 262 Copy of letters of request to the Foreign Minister Sheikh Abdullah bin Zayed Al Nahyan directed to Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP. 1/26/2011 entered and original mailed to counsel. (tomg, )
January 25, 2011 Filing 261 Copy of letters of request to the Ministere de la Justice Direction des Affaires Civiles et du Sceau Bureau de l'entraide civile et commerciale international (D3) directed to Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP. 1/26/2011 entered and original mailed to counsel. (tomg, )
January 25, 2011 Filing 260 Copy of letters of request to the Ministry of the Attorney General of Ontario, Canada directed to Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP. 1/26/2011 entered and original mailed to counsel. (tomg, )
January 25, 2011 Filing 259 Copy of letters of request to the Ministry of the Attorney General of Ontario, Canada directed to Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP. 1/26/2011 entered and original mailed to counsel. (tomg, )
January 25, 2011 Filing 258 Copy of letters of request to the Registrar of the Supreme Court of Barbados directed to Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP. 1/26/2011 entered and original mailed to counsel. (tomg, )
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO ISSUE LETTERS OF REQUEST IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 1/24/2011.1/25/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF R. COREY WORCESTER, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 1/21/2011.1/24/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
January 21, 2011 Filing 255 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Regarding Other Antidepressants filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Proposed Order)(PRIMIS, CRAIG)
January 21, 2011 Filing 254 Memorandum in Support re #253 MOTION to Issue Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for an Order to Issue Letters of Request filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (WEXLER, KENNETH)
January 21, 2011 Filing 253 MOTION to Issue Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for an Order to Issue Letters of Request filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A to Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit B to Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit C to Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit D to Proposed Order, #6 Exhibit E to Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit F to Proposed Order, #8 Exhibit G to Proposed Order, #9 Exhibit H to Proposed Order)(WEXLER, KENNETH)
January 18, 2011 Filing 252 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Of R. Corey Worcester filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC..Sponsor's Statement and Certificate of Service.(BOLAND, DANIEL) (FILING FEE RECEIVED, RECEIPT # 035938) Modified on 1/19/2011 (jcab).
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL BY AMANDA TESSAR IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 1/13/2011.1/13/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
January 12, 2011 Filing 250 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Amanda Tessar filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(TESSAR, AMANDA)
January 7, 2011 Filing 249 Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand For End Payors with Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhbit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(tomg, )
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF THOMAS A. ISAACSON, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 1/3/2011.1/4/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
January 3, 2011 Filing 247 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Thomas A. Isaacson filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC..Sponsor's Statement and Certificate of Service (FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE035144)(BOLAND, DANIEL) Modified on 1/3/2011 (tomg, ).
December 29, 2010 Filing 246 Memorandum re #245 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Enlarge Number of Depositions to be Taken in These Cases filed by AETNA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (NESBITT, AMBER)
December 29, 2010 Filing 245 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Enlarge Number of Depositions to be Taken in These Cases filed by AETNA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.Motion. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(NESBITT, AMBER)
December 23, 2010 Filing 244 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #243 Transcript - PDF, 12/23/2010 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (tomg, )
December 23, 2010 Filing 243 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 12/14/2010, before Judge Honorable Mary A. McLaughlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Raymond Wolf. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/10/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2011. (tomg, )
December 22, 2010 Filing 242 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDMENT TO THEIR FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (DOC. #196) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 12/21/2010. 12/22/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
December 22, 2010 Filing 241 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. #196). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 12/21/2010. 12/22/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF CHARLES A. LOUGHLIN., ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 12/16/2010.12/16/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED(tomg, )
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JOHN W. NIELDS, JR., ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 12/15/2010.12/16/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED(tomg, )
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ANDREW D. LAZEROW, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 12/15/2010.12/16/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED(tomg, )
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ASHLEY E. BASS, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 12/15/2010.12/16/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
December 16, 2010 Filing 236 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission Of Charles A. Loughlin filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC..Certificate of Service. (FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE034502)(BOLAND, DANIEL) Modified on 12/16/2010 (tomg, ).
December 15, 2010 Filing 235 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of John W. Nields, Jr. filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC..Sponsor's Statement and Certificate of Service. (FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE034475)(BOLAND, DANIEL) Modified on 12/16/2010 (tomg, ).
December 15, 2010 Filing 234 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Andrew D. Lazerow filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC..Sponsor's Statement and Certificate of Service.(FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE034475) (BOLAND, DANIEL) Modified on 12/16/2010 (tomg, ).
December 15, 2010 Filing 233 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Ashley E. Bass filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC..Sponsor's Statement and Certificate of Service. (FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE034475)(BOLAND, DANIEL) Modified on 12/16/2010 (tomg, ).
December 14, 2010 Filing 232 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THE REQUESTED EXTENSION IS GRANTED AND THE COURT'S ORDER OF 8/5/2009, 3/10/2010, AND 8/9/2010 ARE AMENDED AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 12/14/2010. 12/14/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
December 14, 2010 Filing 231 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN: Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2010 (tomg, )
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER THAT DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS SHALL SUBMIT A SHORT LETTER STATING THEIR POSITION ON THIS MATTER ON OR BEFORE 12/13/10.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 12/9/2010. 12/10/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JUSTIN BOLEY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 12/8/10. 12/9/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
December 8, 2010 Filing 228 APPLICATION for PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION of (JUSTIN N. BOLEY) filed by (PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND), statement and certificate of service. (FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE034079) (tomg, )
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE THE PLAINTIFFS' CORRECTED NOTICE OF REVISED CLASS DEFINITION IN PENDING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (DOC. #226) UNDER SEAL.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 12/1/2010. 12/1/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
November 30, 2010 Filing 226 NOTICE by AETNA, INC. Plaintiffs' Corrected Notice of Revised Class Definition in Pending Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(FILED UNDER SEAL PER THIS COURT'S ORDER DOC. #227)(LAWRENCE, GERALD) Modified on 12/1/2010 (tomg, ).
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF GREGORY A. MORRIS, ESQUIRE, IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 11/29/2010. 11/30/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
November 15, 2010 Filing 224 APPLICATION for PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION of (GREGORY A. MORRIS) filed by (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM), statement and certificate of service. (FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE032728) (tomg, )
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER THAT THE ORAL ARGUMENT PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR 11/23/2010 IS RESCHEDULED FOR 12/14/2010 AT 9:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 13-A.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 11/9/2010. 11/10/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY GREGG F. LOCASCIO for SMITHKLINE BEECHAM IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 11/3/2010. 11/5/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT IS GRANTED, AN ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/23/2010 01:00 PM IN COURTROOM 13-A BEFORE HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 11/3/2010. 11/5/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
November 2, 2010 Filing 220 APPLICATION for PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION of (Gregg LoCascio) filed by (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM), Sponsor's Statement, Certificate of Service, and Proposed Order.(FEE PAID PPE032017) (kk, )
October 28, 2010 Filing 219 BIOVAIL DEFENDANTS' SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (tomg, )
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER THAT BIOVAIL DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FILED ON 10/15/2010 IS GRANTED. THE CLERK SHALL FILE BIOVAIL'S SURREPLY, WHICH IS ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT A TO BIOVAIL'S MOTION.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 10/28/2010.10/29/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
October 28, 2010 Filing 217 NOTICE by AETNA, INC. Plaintiffs' Notice of Revised Class Definition in Pending Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LAWRENCE, GERALD)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CRAIG PRIMIS for SMITHKLINE BEECHAM IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 10/15/2010. 10/19/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
October 15, 2010 Filing 215 RESPONSE to Motion re #196 MOTION for Leave to File an Amendment to Their First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint - SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC.. (ROYALL, MICHAEL)
October 15, 2010 Filing 214 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ROYALL, MICHAEL)
October 15, 2010 Filing 213 APPLICATION for PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION of (Craig Primis) filed by (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM) Sponsor's Statement and Certficate of Service. (Fee Paid PPE031067)(kk, )
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY JOSHUA LIPTON (DOC. NO.211) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 10/13/2010.10/14/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
October 13, 2010 Filing 211 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Joshua Lipton filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(LIPTON, JOSHUA)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR WITHDRAW OF COUNSEL BY CHONG S. PARK IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 10/12/2010.10/13/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
October 11, 2010 Filing 209 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(PARK, CHONG)
October 8, 2010 Filing 208 RESPONSE in Support re #196 MOTION for Leave to File an Amendment to Their First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (WEXLER, KENNETH)
October 5, 2010 Filing 207 NOTICE by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM of Withdrawal of Counsel re Christine Willgoos (PARK, CHONG)
October 1, 2010 Filing 206 NOTICE of Appearance by KAREN IANNACE on behalf of AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC. (tomg, ) Modified on 7/6/2011 (tomg, ).
October 1, 2010 Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD LAWRENCE, JR on behalf of AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC. (tomg, ) Modified on 7/6/2011 (tomg, ).
October 1, 2010 Filing 204 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER ST. PHILLIP on behalf of AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC. (tomg, ) Modified on 7/6/2011 (tomg, ).
October 1, 2010 Filing 203 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD W. COHEN on behalf of AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC. (tomg, ) Modified on 7/6/2011 (tomg, ).
October 1, 2010 Filing 202 RESPONSE in Opposition re #196 MOTION for Leave to File an Amendment to Their First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(ROYALL, MICHAEL)
October 1, 2010 Filing 201 RESPONSE in Opposition re #196 MOTION for Leave to File an Amendment to Their First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(PARK, CHONG)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER THAT AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE CLASS REPRESENTATIVE AND TO APPOINT SUBSTITUTE INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL (DOC. #182) IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/21/2010.9/23/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
September 22, 2010 Filing 199 NOTICE by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND of Supplemental Authority in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Aetna Health of California, Inc Motion to Substitute Class Representative (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(WEXLER, KENNETH)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE (DOC. #184) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC. #185) IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/17/2010.9/20/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
September 14, 2010 Filing 197 Memorandum re #196 MOTION for Leave to File an Amendment to Their First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(WEXLER, KENNETH)
September 14, 2010 Filing 196 MOTION for Leave to File an Amendment to Their First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WEXLER, KENNETH)
September 9, 2010 Filing 195 REPLY in SUPPORT of its Motion to Strike Deposition Errata and Motion to Compel Production from Local 572 regarding formularies (FILED UNDER SEAL) filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (tomg, )
September 7, 2010 Filing 194 REPLY to Response to Motion re #182 MOTION to Substitute Class Representative and to Appoint Substitute Interim Co-Lead Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) MOTION to Substitute Class Representative and to Appoint Substitute Interim Co-Lead Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) filed by AETNA, INC., IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(WEXLER, KENNETH)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR WITHDRAW OF COUNSEL (DOC. NO.191) AMEET A. MODI; MICHAEL P. STADNICK; JOHN M. DESMARAIS and XIAO LI IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/31/2010.9/1/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
August 31, 2010 Filing 192 RESPONSE in Opposition re 184 MOTION to Strike, 185 MOTION to Compel filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kk, )
August 31, 2010 Filing 191 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(STADNICK, MICHAEL)
August 30, 2010 Filing 190 RESPONSE in Opposition re #182 MOTION to Substitute Class Representative and to Appoint Substitute Interim Co-Lead Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) MOTION to Substitute Class Representative and to Appoint Substitute Interim Co-Lead Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC.. (VANDYKE, LAWRENCE)
August 30, 2010 Filing 189 RESPONSE in Opposition re #182 MOTION to Substitute Class Representative and to Appoint Substitute Interim Co-Lead Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) MOTION to Substitute Class Representative and to Appoint Substitute Interim Co-Lead Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(PARK, CHONG)
August 30, 2010 Filing 188 RESPONSE in Opposition re 184 MOTION to Strike, 185 MOTION to Compel (Redacted) filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (WEXLER, KENNETH)
August 24, 2010 Filing 187 Certification of Counsel for GSK'S motion to compel discovery from Local 572 regarding formularies (FILED UNDER SEAL) by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (tomg, )
August 24, 2010 Filing 186 Certification of Counsel for GSK'S motion to strike deposition errata sheet of Christopher Mayo (FILED UNDER SEAL) by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (tomg, )
August 16, 2010 Filing 185 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Local 572 Regarding Formularies filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (FILED UNDER SEAL).(tomg, )
August 16, 2010 Filing 184 MOTION to Strike Deposition Errata Sheet of Christopher Mayo filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (FILED UNDER SEAL).(tomg, )
August 13, 2010 Filing 183 Memorandum re #182 MOTION to Substitute Class Representative and to Appoint Substitute Interim Co-Lead Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) MOTION to Substitute Class Representative and to Appoint Substitute Interim Co-Lead Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) filed by AETNA, INC., PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Certificate of service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gerald Lawrence, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Gerald Lawrence)(WEXLER, KENNETH) Modified on 8/16/2010 (nd, ).
August 13, 2010 Filing 182 MOTION to Substitute Class Representative and to Appoint Substitute Interim Co-Lead Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) filed by AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC.., PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WEXLER, KENNETH) Modified on 7/6/2011 (tomg, ).
August 10, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to MOTION HEARING SET FOR 3/3/2011 09:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN. MOTION HEARING SET FOR 12/2/2011 09:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN. (afm, )
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER THAT THE COURT'S ORDERS OF 8/5/2009 AND 3/10/2010 ARE AMENDED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/9/2010. 8/9/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 21, 2010 Filing 180 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT THE COURT GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE'S MOTION AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE COURT GRANTS THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE THE CLASS REPRESENTATIVE; AND THE COURT DENIES AETNA'S MOTION FOR INTERVENTION. THE PARTIES SHALL CONFER TO REESTABLISH A CLASS CERTIFICATION AND DISCOVERY SCHEDULE FOR THESE CASES; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/21/2010. 7/21/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 21, 2010 Filing 179 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION RE: MOTIONS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/21/2010. 7/21/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR WITHDRAWL OF COUNSEL BY MICHELE A. CASEY IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/20/10. 7/20/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF LAURA ALEXANDER, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/12/2010. 7/13/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JULIE PENG, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/13/2010. 7/13/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 9, 2010 Filing 175 APPLICATION OF PRO HAC VICE LAURA ALEXANDER FOR DEFENDANT SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. SPONSOR STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (PAID $40 RECEIPT# PPE025910) (dp, )
July 9, 2010 Filing 174 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF JULIE PENG FOR DEFENDANT SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.SPONSOR STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (PAID $40 RECEIPT# PPE025910) (dp, )
June 21, 2010 Filing 173 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #172 Transcript - PDF, 6/22/2010 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (tomg, )
June 21, 2010 Filing 172 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Conference held on 6/16/2010, before Judge Honorable Mary A. McLaughlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Raymond Wolf. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/9/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/19/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2010. (tomg, )
June 14, 2010 Filing 171 RESPONSE in Opposition re #149 MOTION to Intervene - Bioval Defendants' Response to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Statement in Support of Aetna, Inc.'s Motion for Intervention Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 24(a)(2) and 24(b)(1)(B) filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC.. (ROYALL, MICHAEL)
June 10, 2010 Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER ST. PHILLIP on behalf of AETNA, INC. (ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
June 9, 2010 Filing 169 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support re #149 MOTION to Intervene Under Rules 24(a)(2) and 24(b)(1)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by AETNA, INC., Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LAWRENCE, GERALD) Modified on 6/10/2010 (lisad, ).
June 9, 2010 Filing 168 Statement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Statement in Support of Aetna Inc.'s Motion for Intervention Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 24(a)(2) and 24(b)(1)(B) by IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Certificate of Service. (WEXLER, KENNETH) Modified on 6/10/2010 (lisad, ).
June 9, 2010 Filing 167 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michele A Casey filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CASEY, MICHELE) Modified on 6/10/2010 (lisad, ).
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD THE ORAL ARGUMENT ON-THE-RECORD ON THE TELEPHONE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/9/2010. 6/9/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
June 7, 2010 Filing 165 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #164 Transcript - PDF, 6/8/2010 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (tomg, )
June 7, 2010 Filing 164 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Conference held on 5/26/2010, before Judge Honorable Mary A. McLaughlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Raymond Wolf. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/25/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2010. (tomg, )
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE ABOVE MOTIONS ON 6/16/2010 AT 9:30 A.M., IN COURTROOM 13-A; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/4/2010. 6/7/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF KAREN IANNACE, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/2/2010. 6/3/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
June 2, 2010 Filing fee: $ 40, receipt number PPE023885 (rf, )
June 2, 2010 Filing 161 APPLICATION for PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF (KAREN IANNACE) filed by (AETNA, INC.), Statement and Certificate of Service. (FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE023589) (tomg, )
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF LAWRENCE VANDYKE, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/1/2010.6/2/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
June 1, 2010 Filing 159 RESPONSE in Opposition re #149 MOTION to Intervene filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Aetna, Inc.'s Motion for Intervention Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 24(a)(2) and 24(b)(1)(B))(TORAASON, SARAH)
June 1, 2010 Filing 158 RESPONSE in Opposition re #149 MOTION to Intervene filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(PARK, CHONG)
June 1, 2010 Filing 157 NOTICE by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AFFILIATION AND APPEARANCE (STADNICK, MICHAEL)
June 1, 2010 Filing 156 NOTICE by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AFFILIATION AND APPEARANCE (STADNICK, MICHAEL)
June 1, 2010 Filing 155 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission Of Lawrence VanDyke filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC..Certificate of Service.(BOLAND, DANIEL)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER THAT JENNIFER FOUNTAIN CONNOLLY'S MOTION FOR WITHDRAW OF COUNSEL IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/26/2010. 5/27/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER THAT THESE ACTIONS SHALL REMAIN IN CIVIL SUSPENSE UNTIL THE COURT DECIDES THE MOTIONS PENDING BEFORE IT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/26/2010. 5/27/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF XIAO LI, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/25/2010. 5/26/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
May 25, 2010 Filing 151 STATUS REPORT Direct and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Status Report by IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (WEXLER, KENNETH)
May 25, 2010 Filing 150 APPLICATION for PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION of (XIAO LI) filed by (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM), Statement and Certificate of Service. (tomg, )
May 13, 2010 Filing 149 MOTION to Intervene filed by AETNA, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A (Proposed Complaint in Intervention), #3 Exh. A to Proposed Complaint, #4 Exh. B to Proposed Complaint, #5 Exh. C to Proposed Complaint, #6 Exh. D to Proposed Complaint, #7 Exh. E to Proposed Complaint, #8 Exh. F to Proposed Complaint, #9 Exh. G to Proposed Complaint, #10 Exh. H to Proposed Complaint, #11 Exh. I to Proposed Complaint, #12 Exhibit B)(LAWRENCE, GERALD)
May 7, 2010 Filing 148 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CONNOLLY, JENNIFER)
April 20, 2010 Filing 147 NOTICE by PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND of Firm Name Change (MILLER, MARVIN)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THESE ACTIONS IN CIVIL SUSPENSE FOR 30 DAYS. COUNSEL IS TO REPORT BACK TO THE COURT ON THE STATUS OF THE CASES ON OR BEFORE 5/7/2010.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 4/7/2010. 4/8/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE STIPULATED AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER DATED 11/19/2010 IS MODIFIED FOR PURPOSES OF CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION MATERIALS ONLY; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 4/5/2010. 4/5/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE STIPULATED AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER DATED 11/19/2009 IS MODIFIED FOR PURPOSES OF ABRIKA, IMPAX, AND TEVA MATERIALS ONLY; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 4/5/2010. 4/5/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
March 23, 2010 Filing 143 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #142 Transcript - PDF,, 3/24/2010 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (tomg, )
March 23, 2010 Filing 142 TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE held on 3/17/2010, before Judge Honorable Mary A. McLaughlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Raymond Wolf. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2010. (tomg, ).
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER THAT TWO MOTIONS ARE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. COURT FURTHER ORDERS THAT THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS ARE TO INFORM THE COURT ON OR BEFORE 3/31/10, OF THE STATUS OF THEIR DISCUSSIONS WITH THE DEFENDANTS TO REACH AGREEMENT ON THE ISSUES PRESENTED IN THE PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY THE DEFENDANTS. COURT ORDERDS DEFENDANT GSK TO PROVIDE THE PLAINTIFFS WITH PRIVILEGE LOGS ON A ROLLING BASIS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/17/2010.3/19/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
March 17, 2010 Filing 140 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #139 Transcript - PDF, 3/17/2010 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (tomg, )
March 17, 2010 Filing 139 TRANSCRIPT of held on 3/3/2010, before Judge Honorable Mary A. McLaughlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Raymond Wolf. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/5/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/14/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/14/2010. (tomg, )
March 15, 2010 Filing 138 RESPONSE in Opposition re #128 MOTION to Compel Discovery Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant Biovails Motion to Compel Production of Discovery From Painters District Council No. 30 Health and Welfare Fund filed by IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(CONNOLLY, JENNIFER)
March 12, 2010 Filing 137 GSK'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY DEFENDANTS WITH PROPOSED ORDER. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (tomg, )
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF SAMANTHA GINGOLD GUILDER, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/11/2010. 3/12/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
March 12, 2010 Filing 135 RESPONSE to Motion re #127 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC.. (DRAKE, MONIQUE)
March 11, 2010 Filing 134 APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of (Samantha Gingold Guilder) filed by (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM), Statement and Certificate of Service. (tomg, )
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER THAT ALL CLASS ACTION DISCOVERY SHALL CONCLUDE ON 4/26/2010; THE COURT SHALL HOLD A HEARING ON THE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION ON 8/6/2010 AT 9:30 A.M., IN COURTROOM 13A; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/10/2010. 3/10/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF AMEET A. MODI, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/10/2010. 3/10/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
March 9, 2010 Filing 131 MOTION EXTEND CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADLINES; REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED TREATMENT ; UNOPPOSED filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADLINES; REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED TREATMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADLINES)(TORAASON, SARAH)
March 8, 2010 Filing 130 APPLICATION for PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION of (AMEET A. MODI) filed by (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM), statement and Certificate of service. (tomg, )
March 2, 2010 Filing 129 EXHIBIT 3 TO MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY DEFENDANTS by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(rf, )
March 1, 2010 Filing 128 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Biovail Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(TORAASON, SARAH)
March 1, 2010 Filing 127 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants filed by IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 (under seal), #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(CONNOLLY, JENNIFER)
February 24, 2010 Filing 126 MODIFICATION OF STIPULATED AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER DATED NOVEMBER 19, 2009 FOR PURPOSES OF ANCHEN MATERIALS ONLY.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/24/2010. 3/1/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JASON R. PARISH, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/24/2010. 3/1/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF SCOTT H. MELLON, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/23/2010.2/24/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JOSHUA LIPTON, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/23/2010.2/24/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
February 24, 2010 Filing 122 APPLICATION for PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION of (JASON R. PARISH) filed by (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM), Statement and Certificate of Service. (tomg, )
February 19, 2010 Filing 121 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Scott H. Mellon, Esquire filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL.Applicant's Statement, Sponsor's Statement and Certifcate of Serivce. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BOLAND, DANIEL)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ELIZABETH T. BERNARD, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/18/2010. 2/18/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF CHRISTINE WILLGOOS, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/18/2010. 2/18/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
February 17, 2010 Filing 118 APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of (ELIZABETH T. BERNARD) filed by (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM), Statement and Certificate of Service. (tomg, )
February 17, 2010 Filing 117 APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of (CHRISTINE WILLGOOS) filed by (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM), Statement and Certificate of Service (tomg, )
February 16, 2010 Filing 115 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission Of Joshua Lipton filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL.Certificate of Service.(FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT # PPE017704)(BOLAND, DANIEL)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER OF MODIFICATION OF STIPULATED AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER DATED 11/19/2009 FOR PURPOSES OF WATSON MATERIALS ONLY.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/9/2010. 2/17/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF SARAH V. TORAASON, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/9/2010.2/12/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
February 8, 2010 Filing 113 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Sarah V. Toraason, Esquire filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL.Applicant's Statement and Sponsor's Statement. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE017449)(BOLAND, DANIEL) Modified on 2/8/2010 (tomg, ).
January 12, 2010 Filing 112 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by STEPHEN EDWARD CONNOLLY on behalf of MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS-UNITED ASSOCIATION LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN(CONNOLLY, STEPHEN)
December 14, 2009 Filing 111 Declaration OF Jennifer fountain connolly in support of End Payor Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (tomg, )
December 14, 2009 Filing 110 Memorandum OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF END PAYORS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (tomg, )
December 14, 2009 Filing 109 MOTION to Certify Class filed by IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CONNOLLY, JENNIFER)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER THAT, UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE CLASS CERTIFICATION REPLIES, PLAINTIFFS' DEADLINE FOR REPLIES SHALL BE 4/16/2010.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 12/7/2009. 12/8/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(tomg, )
December 7, 2009 Filing 107 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE CLASS CERTIFICATION REPLIES filed by IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS-UNITED ASSOCIATION LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS LOCAL UNION NO. 5 OHIO HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CONNOLLY, JENNIFER)
November 19, 2009 Filing 106 STIPULATED AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 11/19/2009. 11/19/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF KARLA M. GLUEK (DOC. #103) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 11/5/2009.11/5/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DANIEL E. GUSTAFSON (DOC. #102) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 11/5/2009.11/5/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
November 3, 2009 Filing 103 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Karla M. Gluek filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.Certificate of Service.(FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE011964)(COHEN, DAVID) Modified on 11/5/2009 (tomg, ).
November 3, 2009 Filing 102 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Daniel E. Gustafson filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.Certificate of Service.(FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE011964)(COHEN, DAVID) Modified on 11/5/2009 (tomg, ).
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF MICHELE A. CASEY, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/25/2009. 9/28/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
September 22, 2009 Filing 100 APPLICATION OF PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF (MICHELE A. CASEY) FILED by (PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.), STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (tomg, )
September 17, 2009 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN EDWARD CONNOLLY on behalf of MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS-UNITED ASSOCIATION LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN with Certificate of Service(CONNOLLY, STEPHEN)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/21/09. 8/21/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED.(lisad, )
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING DEADLINES SHALL APPLY TO THIS LITIGATION: ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE 2/18/2011. ANY SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 3/18/2011, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/17/09. 8/17/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED.(lisad, )
August 14, 2009 Filing 96 STIPULATION of the Parties Regarding Discoverability of Certain Types of Expert Witness Information by IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS-UNITED ASSOCIATION LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS LOCAL UNION NO. 5 OHIO HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NESBITT, AMBER) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 8/17/2009 (nd, ).
August 12, 2009 Filing 93 ANSWER to #70 Amended Complaint by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM, Certificate of Service. (GREENBERG, SUSANNA) Modified on 8/14/2009 (fh)
August 11, 2009 Filing 95 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #94 Transcript - PDF, 8/12/09 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed. (ti, )
August 11, 2009 Filing 94 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 8/4/09, before Judge Mary A. McLaughlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Raymond Wolf. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/1/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/11/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2009. (ti, )
August 11, 2009 Filing 92 ANSWER to #70 Amended Complaint,,, by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL.(JOHNSON, ASHLEY)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT )DOCKET NOS. 77 & 78) ARE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW SIGNED ON 7/30/09, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/30/09. 7/31/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(lisad, )
July 31, 2009 Filing 90 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/30/09. 7/31/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(lisad, )
June 24, 2009 Filing 89 RESPONSE in Opposition re #78 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint SUR-REPLY IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO BIOVAIL'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS-UNITED ASSOCIATION LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS LOCAL UNION NO. 5 OHIO HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (NESBITT, AMBER)
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FILE A SUR-REPLY IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO THE DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS, THE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/23/2009. 6/24/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(la, )
June 15, 2009 Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Biovail's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS-UNITED ASSOCIATION LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS LOCAL UNION NO. 5 OHIO HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CONNOLLY, JENNIFER)
May 29, 2009 Filing 86 REPLY Brief in Support of Motion re #77 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM, Certificate of Service. (GREENBERG, SUSANNA) Modified on 6/1/2009 (nd).
May 29, 2009 Filing 85 Memorandum /Reply Brief in Support re #78 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint with Certificate of Service. filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL. (BOLAND, DANIEL)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' JOINT AND UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF PAGE LIMITS IS GRANTED. ACCORDINGLY: BIOVAIL'S AND GSK'S REPLIES TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS INDIRECT PURCHASERS' FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT SHALL EACH BE LIMITED TO 35 PAGES IN LENGTH. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/26/09. 5/26/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(lisad, )
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' JOINT AND UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR EXTENSION AND ENLARGEMENT OF PAGE LIMITS IS GRANTED. ACCORDINGLY: DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 5/29/09, TO FILE REPLIES TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS INDIRECT PURCHASERS' FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; AND BIOVAIL'S AND GSK'S RESPECTIVE REPLIES TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS INDIRECT PURCHASERS' FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT SHALL EACH BE LIMITED TO 25 PAGES IN LENGTH. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/18/09. 5/19/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED.(lisad, )
May 15, 2009 Filing 82 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Replies to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Indirect Purchasers' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL.Certificate of Service.(ZEMAITIS, THOMAS)
May 15, 2009 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition re #77 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #78 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS-UNITED ASSOCIATION LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS LOCAL UNION NO. 5 OHIO HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Appendix 1-12)(CONNOLLY, JENNIFER)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF CHONG S. PARK, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/4/09. 5/4/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(lisad, )
May 1, 2009 Filing 79 APPLICATION by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM for Pro Hac Vice admission of Chong S. Park. Sponsor Statement. (FEE PAID, #16) (lisad, )
April 30, 2009 Filing 78 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL.Certificate of Service.(BOLAND, DANIEL)
April 30, 2009 Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(GREENBERG, SUSANNA)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF GEORGE A. NICOUD, III, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IN REPRESENTATION OF BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC. AND BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 4/7/09. 4/8/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(lisad, )
April 6, 2009 Filing 75 APPLICATION by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL for Pro Hac Vice admission of George A. Nicoud, III. Sponsor Statement, Certificate of Service. (FEE PAID, #956402) (lisad, )
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, SMITHKLINE BEECHAM, CORP. AND GLAXOSMITHKLINC PLC SHALL HAVE UNTIL 4/30/09, TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 4/5/09. 4/6/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ah)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF AMANDA J. TESSAR, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IN REPRESENTATION OF BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC. AND BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/30/09. 3/31/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(lisad, )
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS (DOCKET NOS. 46 & 47) ARE DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/26/09. 3/27/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(lisad, )
March 27, 2009 Filing 71 APPLICATION by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL for Pro Hac Vice admission of Amanda J. Tessar. Sponsor Statement, Certificate of Service. (FEE PAID, #956170) (lisad, )
March 26, 2009 Filing 70 FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND FOR END PAYORS against BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, SMITHKLINE BEECHAM, filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(lisad, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2009: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (lisad, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2009: #11 Certificate of Service) (gs, ).
March 17, 2009 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re #47 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Indirect Purchaser Complaint Against Defendant SmithKline Beecham Corp. OPPOSITION TO #63 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM filed by IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS-UNITED ASSOCIATION LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS LOCAL UNION NO. 5 OHIO HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Certificate of Service. (CONNOLLY, JENNIFER) Modified on 3/18/2009 (nd, ).
March 17, 2009 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by TAIMARIE NICOLE ADAMS on behalf of SMITHKLINE BEECHAM with Certificate of Service(ADAMS, TAIMARIE)
March 17, 2009 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSANNA R. GREENBERG on behalf of SMITHKLINE BEECHAM (GREENBERG, SUSANNA)
March 10, 2009 Filing 66 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #65 Transcript - PDF, 3/10/09 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed. (lisad, )
March 10, 2009 Filing 65 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 2/26/09, before Judge Mary A. McLaughlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Raymond Wolf. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/31/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2009. (lisad, )
March 6, 2009 Filing 64 NOTICE by IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS-UNITED ASSOCIATION LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(CONNOLLY, JENNIFER)
March 3, 2009 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Support re #47 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Indirect Purchaser Complaint Against Defendant SmithKline Beecham Corp. Supplemental Memorandum filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (ROGERS, EDWARD)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF RICHARD P. ROUCO, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/26/09. 2/27/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(lisad, )
February 26, 2009 Filing 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN: Oral Argument held on the record on 2/26/09. Court Reporter: RAY WOLF. (rf, )
February 13, 2009 Filing 60 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice of Richard P Rouco by IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN. (COHEN, DAVID)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT IS SET FOR 2/26/2009 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 13A. FURTHER ORDERED THAT IN REGARDS TO THE INDIRECT CLASS ACTION THE COURT WILL HEAR ARGUMENTS ONLY AS TO THE ISSUES OF (1) THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS STANDING TO ASSERT CLAIMS ARISING UNDER THE LAWS OF STATES IN WHICH THEY ALLEGE NO INJURY TO THEMSELVES (2) THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS UNDER THE LAWS OF ILLINOIS, OHIO AND TENNESSEE AND (3) THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FOR UNJUST ENRICHMENT.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/9/09. 2/9/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO CONNOLL, EMAILED.(rf, )
December 30, 2008 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD D. ROGERS on behalf of SMITHKLINE BEECHAM with Certificate of Service(ROGERS, EDWARD)
December 17, 2008 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Support re #47 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Indirect Purchaser Complaint Against Defendant SmithKline Beecham Corp. filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1)(MAKADON, ARTHUR)
December 17, 2008 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL. (BOLAND, DANIEL)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS' JOINT AND UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND ENLARGEMENT OF PAGE LIMITS IS GRANTED. DEEFNDANTS SHALL AHVE UNTIL DECEMBER 17, 2008 TO FILE REPLIES TO BOTH PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFEDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS DIRECT PURCHASERS' CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT AND PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS INDIRECT PURCHASERS' CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT; DEFENDANTS' REPLIES TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DIMSISS DIRECT PURCHASERS' CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT SHALL BE LIMITED TO 20 PAGES IN LENGTH; AND DEFENDANTS' REPLIES TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS INDIRECT PURCHASERS' CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT SHALL BE LIMITED TO 25 PAGES IN LENGTH. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 12/8/08. 12/8/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(lisad, )
December 2, 2008 Filing 54 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File And Enlargement Of Page Limits filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.Certificate of Service.(BOLAND, DANIEL)
November 11, 2008 Filing 53 APPENDICES TO #52 END PAYOR PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED OPPOSITION TO #46 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #47 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Indirect Purchaser Complaint Against Defendant SmithKline Beecham Corp. filed by IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS-UNITED ASSOCIATION LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (CONNOLLY, JENNIFER) Modified on 11/12/2008 (fh)
November 11, 2008 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #46 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #47 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Indirect Purchaser Complaint Against Defendant SmithKline Beecham Corp. filed by IBEW-NECA LOCAL 505 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS-UNITED ASSOCIATION LOCAL 119 HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 30 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND with Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(CONNOLLY, JENNIFER) Modified on 11/13/2008 (le, ).
September 23, 2008 Filing 51 NOTICE by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND of Firm Name Change , CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (CONNOLLY, JENNIFER) Modified on 9/24/2008 (afm, ).
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JOHN M. DESMARAIS, ESQUIRE ARE GRANTED AND MR. DESMARAIS IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/15/08. 9/16/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (jpd)
September 11, 2008 Filing 49 APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT SMITHKLINE BEECHAM FOR JOHN M. DESMARAIS, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (FILING FEE PAID IN 08-CV-2433). (jpd) (FILED IN ERROR DUPLICATE FILING SEE PAPER #48).
September 11, 2008 Filing 48 APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT SMITHKLINE BEECHAM FOR JOHN M. DESMARAIS, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (FILING FEE PAID). (jpd)
September 10, 2008 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Indirect Purchaser Complaint Against Defendant SmithKline Beecham Corp. filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Indirect Purchaser Complaint Against Defendant SmithKline Beecham Corp.)(MAKADON, ARTHUR)
September 10, 2008 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL.. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Memorandum of Law in Support, #3 Appendix A, #4 Appendix B, #5 Certificate of Service)(BOLAND, DANIEL)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER THAT THE APPICATION OF ASHLEY JOHNSON, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/8/08. 9/8/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (jpd)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER THAT THE APPICATION OF MONIQUE DRAKE, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/8/08. 9/8/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (jpd)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER THAT THE APPICATION OF MALACHI BOYULS, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/8/08. 9/8/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (jpd)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF TIMOTHY K. GILMAN, ESQ., AND MICHAEL P. STANDNICK, ESQ., ARE GRANTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/5/08. 9/9/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (jpd)
September 4, 2008 Filing 41 APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL. FOR ASHLEY JOHNSON, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), FILING FEE PAID, STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jpd)
September 4, 2008 Filing 40 APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL. FOR MONIQUE DRAKE, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), FILING FEE PAID, STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jpd)
September 4, 2008 Filing 39 APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL.FOR MALACHI BOYLUS, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), FILING FEE PAID, STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jpd)
August 29, 2008 Filing 38 APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT SMITHKLINE BEECHAM FOR MICHAEL P. STADNICK, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jpd)
August 29, 2008 Filing 37 APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT SMITHKLINE BEECHAM FOR TIMOTHY K. GILMAN, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jpd)
August 20, 2008 Filing 36 PRETRIAL ORDER #1. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/20/08. 8/20/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jpd)
August 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JAMES G. STRANCH, III, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/20/08. 8/20/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (jpd) (FILING FEE NOT PAID).
August 11, 2008 Filing 34 MOTION for Order Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Entry of [Proposed] Pretrial Order No. 1 filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(CONNOLLY, JENNIFER)
August 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE JUDGE BRUCE W. KAUFFMAN TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE JUDGE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT MICHAEL E. KUNZ ON 8/6/08. 8/6/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILE AND E-MAILED. (jpd)
August 4, 2008 Filing 32 APPLICATION OF PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND FOR JAMES G. STANCH, III, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LAOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jpd)
July 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR REASSIGNMENT ARE GRANTED. ACCORDINGLY, CIVIL ACTION NOS. 08-2431, 08-2433, 08-2462, 08-2464, 08-2686, 08-2688, 08-2712 AND 08-3404 ARE REFERRED TO THE CLERK OF THE COURT FOR RANDOM REASSIGNMENT, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BRUCE W. KAUFFMAN ON 07/30/2008.08/01/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nds)
July 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JOE P. LENISKI, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BRUCE W. KAUFFMAN ON 7/24/08. 7/25/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (jpd)
July 24, 2008 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS E. ZEMAITIS on behalf of BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(jpd, )
July 23, 2008 Filing 28 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JEREMY D. HEEP on behalf of BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL(HEEP, JEREMY)
July 22, 2008 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. BOLAND on behalf of BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(jpd)
July 16, 2008 Filing 25 APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND FOR JOE P. LENISKI, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jpd)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF M. SEAN ROYALL, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BRUCE W. KAUFFMAN ON 7/18/08. 7/21/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (jpd)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF J. GERARD STRANCH, IV, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BRUCE W. KAUFFMAN ON 7/14/2008. 7/15/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ap, )
July 10, 2008 Filing 23 CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMEAND FOR END PAYORS AGAINST DEFENDANTS BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, SMITHKLINE BEECHAM, FILED BY PLAINITFFS PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Certificate of Service) (jpd)
July 8, 2008 Filing 22 APPLICATION Pro Hac Vice by J. Gerard Stranch, IV, Esq. by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. SPONSOR'S STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (ap, )
July 8, 2008 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.(KASTENBERG, STEPHEN)
July 1, 2008 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of M. Sean Royall filed by BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL.Certificate of Service.(HEEP, JEREMY)
June 30, 2008 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Reassign Case filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (LECKERMAN, JASON)
June 26, 2008 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Reassign Case filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(COHEN, DAVID)
June 26, 2008 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Biovail Corporation with Certificate of Service by BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL.(HEEP, JEREMY)
June 26, 2008 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Biovail Corporation with Certificate of Service by BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC..(HEEP, JEREMY)
June 26, 2008 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by BIOVAIL CORPORATION.(HEEP, JEREMY)
June 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS, BY 7/10/08, SHALL PREPARE AND FILE TWO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINTS, ONE CONSOLIDATING ALL "DIRECT PURCHASER" CLAIMS BEING ASSERTED AGAINST DEFENDANTS AND THE OTHER CONSOLIDATING ALL "INDIRECT PURCHASER" CLAIMS BEING ASSERTED AGAINST DEFENDANTS. DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 9/10/08, TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO SAID COMPLAINTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BRUCE W. KAUFFMAN ON 6/24/08. 6/26/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jpd)
June 24, 2008 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN J. KASTENBERG on behalf of SMITHKLINE BEECHAM with Certificate of Service(KASTENBERG, STEPHEN)
June 20, 2008 Filing 12 Consent Stipulation for Leave to File filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM..(LECKERMAN, JASON) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 6/24/2008 (nd).
June 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR ADMISSION OF AMBER M. NESBITT, JENNIFER FOUNTAIN CONNOLLY AND KENNETH A. WEXLER, PRO HAC VICE ARE GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BRUCE W. KAUFFMAN ON 6/17/08. 6/17/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (jpd)
June 16, 2008 Filing 11 NOTICE OF JOINDER OF DEFENDANTS BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, (jpd, )
June 12, 2008 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND FOR AMBER M. NESBITT, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jpd)
June 12, 2008 Filing 6 MOTION to Reassign Case filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.Proposed Order, Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(LECKERMAN, JASON)
June 11, 2008 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND FOR KENNETH A. WEXLER, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jpd)
June 11, 2008 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND FOR JENNIFER FOUNTAIN CONNOLLY, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jpd)
June 9, 2008 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND re: Matthew Guida served Summons and Complaint upon BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC. by Personal Service. BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC. served on 6/4/2008, answer due 6/24/2008. (COHEN, DAVID)
June 9, 2008 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND re: Matthew Guida served Summons and Complaint upon BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL by Personal Service. BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL served on 6/4/2008, answer due 6/24/2008. (COHEN, DAVID)
June 9, 2008 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND re: Matthew Guida served Summons and Complaint upon BIOVAIL CORPORATION by Personal Service. BIOVAIL CORPORATION served on 6/4/2008, answer due 6/24/2008. (COHEN, DAVID)
June 5, 2008 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND re: John C. Manton served Summons and Complaint upon SMITHKLINE BEECHAM by Personal Service. SMITHKLINE BEECHAM served on 6/4/2008, answer due 6/24/2008. (COHEN, DAVID)
May 23, 2008 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (tj, )
May 23, 2008 Summons Issued; 4 Mailed to counsel 5/27/08 as to BIOVAIL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC., BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL, SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (tj, )
May 23, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 948581.), filed by PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.(tj, ) (tj, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/27/2008: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D, #5 Ex. E, #6 Ex. F, #7 Ex. G, #8 Ex. H, #9 Ex. I) (tj, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND v. BIOVAIL CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 572 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Represented By: DANIEL E. GUSTAFSON
Represented By: JENNIFER FOUNTAIN CONNOLLY
Represented By: J. GERARD STRANCH, IV
Represented By: PATRICK HOWARD
Represented By: KENNETH A. WEXLER
Represented By: KARLA M. GLUEK
Represented By: JUSTIN N. BOLEY
Represented By: DAVID J. COHEN
Represented By: PETER D. ST. PHILLIP
Represented By: DAVID S. NALVEN
Represented By: THOMAS M. SOBOL
Represented By: URIEL RABINOVITZ
Represented By: JOE P. LENISKI, JR.
Represented By: MICHELE A. CASEY
Represented By: THOMAS A. DOYLE
Represented By: AMBER M. NESBITT
Represented By: JAMES G. STRANCH, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CONSUMERS UNION
Represented By: STEVE D. SHADOWEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AETNA, INC.
Represented By: GERALD LAWRENCE, JR.
Represented By: KENNETH A. WEXLER
Represented By: PETER D. ST. PHILLIP
Represented By: RICHARD W. COHEN
Represented By: KAREN IANNACE
Represented By: AMBER M. NESBITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THE AMERICAN ANTITRUST INSTITUTE
Represented By: STEVE D. SHADOWEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC.
Represented By: GERALD LAWRENCE, JR.
Represented By: KENNETH A. WEXLER
Represented By: URIEL RABINOVITZ
Represented By: PETER D. ST. PHILLIP
Represented By: RICHARD W. COHEN
Represented By: KAREN IANNACE
Represented By: AMBER M. NESBITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Represented By: MARKUS MEIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM doing business as GLAXOSMITHKLINE, PLC
Represented By: MARCEL S. PRATT
Represented By: LINDSAY D. BREEDLOVE
Represented By: JASON A. LECKERMAN
Represented By: LAURA M. ALEXANDER
Represented By: STEPHEN J. KASTENBERG
Represented By: ELIZABETH T. BERNARD
Represented By: CRAIG PRIMIS
Represented By: JASON R. PARISH
Represented By: JESSICA MOLTISANTI ANTHONY
Represented By: CHONG S. PARK
Represented By: GREGORY A. MORRIS
Represented By: SUSANNA R. GREENBERG
Represented By: EDWARD D. ROGERS
Represented By: JOHN M. DESMARAIS
Represented By: TIMOTHY K. GILMAN
Represented By: CHRISTINE WILLGOOS
Represented By: EMILY P. HUGHES
Represented By: SIMEON G. PAPACOSTAS
Represented By: ARTHUR MAKADON
Represented By: XIAO LI
Represented By: AMEET A. MODI
Represented By: SAMANTHA GINGOLD GUILDER
Represented By: MARGARET OSBORNE PADILLA
Represented By: MICHAEL P. STADNICK
Represented By: TAIMARIE NICOLE ADAMS
Represented By: GREGG F. LOCASCIO
Represented By: JULIE PENG
Represented By: JOB MICHAEL ITZKOWITZ
Represented By: DANIEL J. BOLAND
Represented By: LESLIE E. JOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIOVAIL LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL SRL
Represented By: THOMAS E. ZEMAITIS
Represented By: SCOTT H. MELLON
Represented By: JEREMY HEEP
Represented By: MONIQUE DRAKE
Represented By: ASHLEY JOHNSON
Represented By: LAWRENCE VANDYKE
Represented By: HENRY B. LIU
Represented By: DAVID J. SHAW
Represented By: ANDREA MARIE DEVRIES
Represented By: THOMAS A. ISAACSON
Represented By: MICHAEL SEAN ROYALL
Represented By: J. MAREN SCHMIDT
Represented By: ASHLEY E. BASS
Represented By: ANDREW D. LAZEROW
Represented By: AMANDA TESSAR
Represented By: JOHN W. NIELDS, JR.
Represented By: ANDREW M. BERNIE
Represented By: CHARLES A. LOUGHLIN
Represented By: JASON C. RAOFIELD
Represented By: SARAH V. TORAASON
Represented By: GEORGE A. NICOUD, III
Represented By: DANIEL J. BOLAND
Represented By: MALACHI BOYULS
Represented By: JOSHUA LIPTON
Represented By: DANIELLE S. BARBOUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIOVAIL LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS E. ZEMAITIS
Represented By: SCOTT H. MELLON
Represented By: JEREMY HEEP
Represented By: MONIQUE DRAKE
Represented By: ASHLEY JOHNSON
Represented By: LAWRENCE VANDYKE
Represented By: HENRY B. LIU
Represented By: DAVID J. SHAW
Represented By: ANDREA MARIE DEVRIES
Represented By: THOMAS A. ISAACSON
Represented By: MICHAEL SEAN ROYALL
Represented By: J. MAREN SCHMIDT
Represented By: ASHLEY E. BASS
Represented By: ANDREW D. LAZEROW
Represented By: AMANDA TESSAR
Represented By: JOHN W. NIELDS, JR.
Represented By: ANDREW M. BERNIE
Represented By: CHARLES A. LOUGHLIN
Represented By: JASON C. RAOFIELD
Represented By: SARAH V. TORAASON
Represented By: GEORGE A. NICOUD, III
Represented By: DANIEL J. BOLAND
Represented By: MALACHI BOYULS
Represented By: JOSHUA LIPTON
Represented By: DANIELLE S. BARBOUR
Represented By: R. COREY WORCESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIOVAIL CORPORATION
Represented By: THOMAS E. ZEMAITIS
Represented By: SCOTT H. MELLON
Represented By: JEREMY HEEP
Represented By: MONIQUE DRAKE
Represented By: ASHLEY JOHNSON
Represented By: LAWRENCE VANDYKE
Represented By: HENRY B. LIU
Represented By: DAVID J. SHAW
Represented By: ANDREA MARIE DEVRIES
Represented By: THOMAS A. ISAACSON
Represented By: MICHAEL SEAN ROYALL
Represented By: J. MAREN SCHMIDT
Represented By: ASHLEY E. BASS
Represented By: ANDREW D. LAZEROW
Represented By: AMANDA TESSAR
Represented By: JOHN W. NIELDS, JR.
Represented By: ANDREW M. BERNIE
Represented By: CHARLES A. LOUGHLIN
Represented By: JASON C. RAOFIELD
Represented By: SARAH V. TORAASON
Represented By: GEORGE A. NICOUD, III
Represented By: DANIEL J. BOLAND
Represented By: MALACHI BOYULS
Represented By: JOSHUA LIPTON
Represented By: DANIELLE S. BARBOUR
Represented By: R. COREY WORCESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?