WARREN PUBLISHING COMPANY et al v. J. DAVID SPURLOCK D/B/A VANGUARD PRODUCTIONS, INC. Featured Case

Use of monster images on magazine covers in book are Fair Use. See http://ipspotlight.com/2009/08/07/reproductions-of-famous-monsters-art-work-ruled-fair-use-when-used-in-biography-of-artist/

Plaintiff: WARREN PUBLISHING COMPANY and JAMES WARREN
Defendant: J. DAVID SPURLOCK
Case Number: 2:2008cv03399
Filed: July 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Copyright Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M. BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:501 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER THAT WITHIN 14 DAYS DEFENDANTS SHALL SUBMIT TO PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL A COPY OF ALL BILLS AND INVOICES SUBMITTED TO THEIR CLIENTS IN CONNECTION WITH THIS CASE, TOGETHER WITH ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS AND EXPENSES, INCLUDING ANY DISCOUNTS OR SPECI AL TERMS OF PAYMENT APPLICABLE TO THIS CASE. WITHIN 14 DAYS PLAINTIFFS SHALL COMMUNICATE TO DEFENDANT ANY QUESTIONS, OBJECTIONS OR REQUESTS FOR FURTHER INFORMATION CONCERNING THE AWARD OF FEES IN THIS CASE. WITH 14 DAYS THEREAFTER, THE PARTIES SHALL FILE IF THEY CAN AGREEE A STIPULATION OF THE AMOUNT OF FEES AND EXPENSES TO BE PAID ETC,. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 3/3/2010. 3/4/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND FOR SANCTIONS IS DENIED. DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. FINAL JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT ON ALL OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNTS; DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS TO PRECLUDE DENIS KITCHEN AND JEFFREY ROVIN ARE DENIED AS MOOT. THE CLERK SHALL MARK THIS CASE AS CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/4/09. 8/5/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ah)
July 21, 2008 Filing 1
COMPLAINT against VANGUARD PRODUCTIONS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 950107.), filed by WARREN PUBLISHING COMPANY, JAMES WARREN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Case Management Track, # 3 Designation Form)(cw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARREN PUBLISHING COMPANY et al v. J. DAVID SPURLOCK D/B/A VANGUARD PRODUCTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WARREN PUBLISHING COMPANY
Represented By: MANNY D. POKOTILOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES WARREN
Represented By: MANNY D. POKOTILOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. DAVID SPURLOCK
Represented By: M. KELLY TILLERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?