MONARCH LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. THE ESTATE OF ROBERT TARONE, III et al
Plaintiff: |
MONARCH LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY |
Defendant: |
LAURA SIPIO, THE ESTATE OF ROBERT TARONE, III and JAMES P. MCEVILLY, JR. |
Counter_claimant: |
JAMES P. MCEVILLY, JR. and LAURA SIPIO |
Cross_defendant: |
JAMES P. MCEVILLY, JR. and THE ESTATE OF ROBERT TARONE, III |
Cross_claimant: |
LAURA SIPIO |
Counter_defendant: |
MONARCH LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY |
Case Number: |
2:2009cv00734 |
Filed: |
February 20, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Philadelphia Office |
County: |
Outside the State of PA. |
Presiding Judge: |
JACOB P. HART |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 10, 2011 |
Filing
110
ORDER THAT THE SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED; INTERPLEADER PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO PAY ALL AS-YET UNPAID BENEFITS; MONEYS PAID BY INTERPLEADER PLAINTIFF INTO ESCROW DURING THE PENDENCY OF THIS CASE ARE TO BE DISTRIBUTED TO THE ESTATE OF ROBERT J. TARONE, III; THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 5/10/11. 5/10/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
|
March 23, 2011 |
Filing
98
AMENDED ORDER AND OPINION THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 3/23/11. 3/23/11 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
|
March 22, 2011 |
Filing
101
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE FILED AS DOCUMENT 70 IS GRANTEDSIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 3/21/11. 3/23/11 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
|
January 26, 2010 |
Filing
29
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF LAURA SIPIO'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 19 , THE RESPONSE THERETO 22 , THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF THE ESTATE OF ROBERT TARONE, III, AND JAMES P. MCEVILLY, THE ESTATE'S EXECUTOR 20 AND 21 , SIP IO'S RESPONSE THERETO 23 , PARTIES' EXHIBITS, AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT SIPIO'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED; THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF THE ESTATE AND MCEVILLY IS DENIED; AND BY 2/15/2010, PARTIES SHALL NOTIFY THE COURT BY FAX REGARDING WHETHER THEY HAVE COMPLETED DISCOVERY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE STEWART DALZELL ON 1/26/10. 1/26/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: MONARCH LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. THE ESTATE OF ROBERT TARONE, III et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: JAMES P. MCEVILLY, JR. |
Represented By: |
JAMES P. MCEVILLY, JR. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: LAURA SIPIO |
Represented By: |
CHARLES H. NUGENT, JR. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: LAURA SIPIO |
Represented By: |
CHARLES H. NUGENT, JR. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: THE ESTATE OF ROBERT TARONE, III |
Represented By: |
MARY C. KENNEY |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: JAMES P. MCEVILLY, JR. |
Represented By: |
JAMES P. MCEVILLY, JR. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Cross_defendant: JAMES P. MCEVILLY, JR. |
Represented By: |
JAMES P. MCEVILLY, JR. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Cross_defendant: THE ESTATE OF ROBERT TARONE, III |
Represented By: |
MARY C. KENNEY |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Cross_claimant: LAURA SIPIO |
Represented By: |
CHARLES H. NUGENT, JR. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: MONARCH LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY |
Represented By: |
DOUGLAS F. JOHNSON |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: MONARCH LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY |
Represented By: |
DOUGLAS F. JOHNSON |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?