NIPPO CORPORATION/INTERNATIONAL BRIDGE CORPORATION v. AMEC EARTH & ENVIRONMENTAL, INC.
Plaintiff: NIPPO CORPORATION/INTERNATIONAL BRIDGE CORPORATION
Defendant: AMEC EARTH & ENVIRONMENTAL, INC.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00956
Filed: March 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the U.S.
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M. RUFE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION IS GRANTED. THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION IS ADOPTED. DEFENDANT'S UNTIMELY MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SUBMIT OBJECTIONS IS DENIED. PLAINTIFF& #039;S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO SUBMIT OBJECTIONS IS GRANTED. THE SUR-REPLY ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT A TO THE MOTION IS DEEMED FILED. ANY MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 12/29/14. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 12/3/14. 12/4/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 4/1/2013. 4/2/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (aeg, )
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER THAT AMEC'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE JOINT VENTURE'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING UNDISPUTED CHANGE ORDERS IS GRANRED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART.SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/21/11. 9/22/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT AMEC'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE DELCARATION OF RICHARD ROOT IS GRANTED. THE JOINT VENTURE'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: LIQUIDATED DAMAGES, THE JOINT VENTURE'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: UNDISP UTED CHANGE ORDERS AND AMEC'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE STAYED PENDING FURTHER ACTION FROM THIS COURT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MRK THIS ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACE THE MATTER IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 3/30/11. 3/31/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED NOTICE OF RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION IS DENIED, DISMISSED AND OVERRULED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/12/2010. 2/16/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 12/11/2009. 12/14/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NIPPO CORPORATION/INTERNATIONAL BRIDGE CORPORATION v. AMEC EARTH & ENVIRONMENTAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIPPO CORPORATION/INTERNATIONAL BRIDGE CORPORATION
Represented By: CRAIG A. CROTTEAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMEC EARTH & ENVIRONMENTAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?