SOLIS v. KORESKO et al
Plaintiff: HILDA L. SOLIS
Defendant: JOHN J. KORESKO, V, JEANNE BONNEY, PENN-MONT BENEFIT SERVICES, INC., KORESKO & ASSOCIATES, P.C., KORESKO LAW FIRM, P.C., COMMUNITY TRUST COMPANY, PENN PUBLIC TRUST, REGIONAL EMPLOYERS ASSURANCE LEAGUES VOLUNTARY EMPLOYEES' BENEFICIARY ASSOCIATION TRUST and SINGLE EMPLOYER WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN TRUST
Case Number: 2:2009cv00988
Filed: March 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: C. DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1880 MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER THAT WILMINGTON TRUST, THE COURT-APPOINTED TRUSTEE OF THE TRUSTS, MAY REQUEST AN AUTHORIZATION FROM EACH TRUST PARTICIPANT THAT RECEIVED A CASH DISTRIBUTION TO ASK THE INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ("IRS") FOR A RETURN O F THE SOCIAL SECURITY AND MEDICARE TAXES WITHHELD ON THE BEHALF OF THE TRUST EMPLOYERS AND PARTICIPANTS UNDER THE FEDERAL INSURANCE CONTRIBUTIONS TAX ACT; PROVIDED, HOWEVER, THAT THE COSTS OF REQUESTING SUCH AUTHORIZATIONS BE BORNE BY WILMINGTON TRUST. FURTHER INFORMATION OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 11/5/2019. 11/5/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1826 ORDERED THAT INTERVENORS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND CLARIFICATION AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT IS GRANTED IN PART AN DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 2/11/19. 2/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, COUNSEL AND EMAILED.(jaa, )
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1797 MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER THAT INTERVENORS' MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT (DOC. NOS. 1701 AND 1760 ) ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 11/5/2018.11/6/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1655 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT THE ANNUITY PROCEEDS WILL BE SUBJECT TO THE ASSET SHORTFALL DISCOUNT, AND DISTRIBUTED ALONG WITH ANY OTHER MING COURT ASSETS AS DETERMINED BY MARCUM AT THE TIME THE TRUSTS ARE LIQUIDATED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 1/30/2018. 1/31/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, COUNSEL AND J. KORESKO AND E-MAILED.(amas)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1554 ORDER THAT THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED. THE OBJECTION BY THE NEWELL PLAN (DOC. NO. 1441 ), IS SUSTAINED. THE NEWELL PLAN IS CONSIDERED SEPARATE FOR PURPOSES OF THE EQUITABLE DISTRIBUTION OF THE TRUSTS' ASSETS/ MARCUM A ND WILMINGTON TRUST WILL WORK TOGETHER TO DISENTANGLE THE NEWELL PLAN ASSETS AND ANY ISSUES THAT ARISE BY SUCH PROCESS ARE REFERRED TO JUDGE HEY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 8/8/2017. 8/8/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, COUNSEL AND J. KORESKO AND E-MAILED.(amas)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1490 ORDER THAT THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED. THE OBJECTION BY OMNI (DOC. NO. 1439 ) IS OVERRULED. OMNI IS CONSIDERED A CLOSED/TERMINATED PLAN FOR PURPOSES OF THE DISTRIBUTION OF TRUST ASSETS PURSUANT TO THE UNIFIED MODEL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 4/18/2017. 4/18/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, COUNSEL AND JOHN KORESKO AND E-MAILED.(amas)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1391 OPINION ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION IS DENIED. KORESKO IS PROHIBITED FROM SUBMITTING ANY FURTHER DOCUMENTS RELATING TO THIS CASE ABSENT LEAVE OF COURT. IN SEEKING LEAVE OF COURT, KORESKO MUST FIRST CERTIFY THAT THE CLAIMS HE WISHES TO PRESENT ARE NEW CLAIMS, NEVER BEFORE RAISED AND DISPOSED OF ON THE MERITS BY ANY FEDERAL COURT. UPON FAILURE TO CERTIFY OR UPON FALSE CERTIFICATION, KORESKO MAY BE FOUND IN CONTEMPT OF COURT AND PUNISHED ACCORDINGLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 8/29/2016. 8/31/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL, PRO SE AND JOHN KORESKO AND E-MAILED.(amas)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1198 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT THE MARCH 13 JUDGMENT AND ORDER (RE: DOC. NO. 1149 ), IS AMENDED TO REDUCE THE KORESKO DEFENDANTS' LIABILITY BY $79,568.74, FROM $38,417,106.63 TO $38,337,540.89. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/13/2015. 5/13/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SES AND E-MAILED.(amas)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 502 MEMORANDUM (RE. ORDER NO. 496 ). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/17/2013. 9/18/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER THAT THE KORESKO PARTIES' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDERS ENTERED ON 7/29/2013 (DOC. NO. 449 ), IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL FILE IN THIS COURT ON OR BEFORE 5:00 PM, ON 9/9/2013, A PROPOSED SCHEDULE FOR COMPLETION OF THE OUTSTANDING DEPOSITIONS AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/28/2013. 8/29/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC #69) IS DENIED INITS ENTIRETY FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/31/09. ) 9/1/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER THAT DEFT JEANNE BONNEY'S SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (DOC #51) IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT MS. BONNEY AND THE OTHER KORESKO DEFTS SHALL FILE THEIR JOINT RESPONSE TO PLFF'S COMPLAINT FORTHWITH. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/23/09. ) 6/25/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, AS SET FORTH IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLFF SHALL SERVE THE KORESKO DEFTS' BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL, POSTAGE PAID TO THE HOME AND OFFICE ADDRESSES OF JOHN J. KORESKO, V. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 5/20/09. ) 5/22/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFTS' EMERGENCY MOTION TO PLACE CASE UNDER SEAL AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF (DOC #6) AND EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TRO AND OTHER PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (DOC #7) ARE DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS IN THE MATTER SHALL BE FILED ONTHE PUBLIC RECORD. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 3/26/09. ) 3/31/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOLIS v. KORESKO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HILDA L. SOLIS
Represented By: JOAN M. ROLLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN J. KORESKO, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEANNE BONNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENN-MONT BENEFIT SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KORESKO & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KORESKO LAW FIRM, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY TRUST COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENN PUBLIC TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGIONAL EMPLOYERS ASSURANCE LEAGUES VOLUNTARY EMPLOYEES' BENEFICIARY ASSOCIATION TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SINGLE EMPLOYER WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?