ASCENTIVE, LLC v. GOOGLE, INC. Featured Case
Plaintiff: ASCENTIVE, LLC
Defendant: GOOGLE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2009cv02871
Filed: June 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: JUAN R. SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF DISMISSES ABOVE ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/30/09. 7/31/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 30, 2009 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ASCENTIVE, LLC As To Google, Inc.(ARENA, ALEXIS)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/30/2009 11:00 AM.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/27/09. 7/27/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 24, 2009 Filing 13 Memorandum of Law in Support of Expedited Discovery RE: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ASCENTIVE, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(ARENA, ALEXIS) Modified on 7/27/2009 (nd, ).
July 24, 2009 Filing 12 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction RE: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ASCENTIVE, LLC..(ARENA, ALEXIS) Modified on 7/27/2009 (nd, ).
July 24, 2009 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ASCENTIVE, LLC.Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Rule to Show Cause, # 3 Certificate of Service)(ARENA, ALEXIS)
July 24, 2009 Filing 10 Declaration of Adam Schran RE: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ASCENTIVE, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(ARENA, ALEXIS) Modified on 7/27/2009 (nd, ).
July 24, 2009 Filing 9 Declaration of Alexis Arena RE: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ASCENTIVE, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(ARENA, ALEXIS) Modified on 7/27/2009 (nd, ).
July 22, 2009 Filing fee: $ 40, receipt number PPE005862 (rf, )
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MARGARET M. CARUSO IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/14/09. 7/23/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 21, 2009 Filing 7 Application for Pro Hac Vice of Margaret M. Caruso filed by GOOGLE, INC..Certificate of Good Standing, Sponsor's Statement and Certificate of Service.(WOOD, LARRY) Modified on 7/22/2009 (le, ).
July 17, 2009 Filing 6 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer the complaint. GOOGLE, INC. answer due 8/19/2009, with Clerk's approval. (rf, )
July 7, 2009 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ASCENTIVE, LLC re: Darin Fain served Summons and Complaint upon GOOGLE, INC. by Personal Service. GOOGLE, INC. served on 6/30/2009, answer due 7/20/2009. (ARENA, ALEXIS)
June 26, 2009 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ABBE F. FLETMAN on behalf of ASCENTIVE, LLC with Certificate of Service(FLETMAN, ABBE)
June 25, 2009 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 3,091,824. 3,533,775. 3,580,255. 3,580,254. 3,580,253. 3,580,252. 3,580,251. 2,510,313. 2,757,848. 77681970. 77681963. 77625345. 77625523. 77625710. 77625343. 77625848. (jeb, )
June 25, 2009 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ASCENTIVE, LLC.(jeb, )
June 25, 2009 Summons Issued as to GOOGLE, INC.. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/26/09 (jeb, )
June 25, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GOOGLE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number PPE003916.), filed by ASCENTIVE, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(jeb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASCENTIVE, LLC v. GOOGLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENTIVE, LLC
Represented By: ABBE F. FLETMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?