BROWN v. KRAVCO SIMON COMPANY
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER E. BROWN
Defendant: KRAVCO SIMON COMPANY, PS COURT ASSOCIATES, LP and KING OF PRUSSIA ASSOCIATES
Case Number: 2:2009cv03026
Filed: July 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: LEGROME D DAVIS
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON JUNE 16, 2010. JUNE 16, 2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(dc,)
June 15, 2010 Filing 28 NOTICE by CHRISTOPHER E. BROWN, KING OF PRUSSIA ASSOCIATES, KRAVCO SIMON COMPANY, PS COURT ASSOCIATES, LP JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (FROELICH, JAMES)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER THAT TRIAL IN THIS MATTER SHALL COMMENCE ON 6/17/2010 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 6A. ON OR BEFORE 6/15/2010, EACH PARTY SHALL FILE A PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 6/11/2010. 6/14/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER THAT TRIAL IN THIS MATTER SHALL COMMENCE ON 6/17/2010 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 6A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 6/8/2010. 6/9/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
April 16, 2010 Filing 25 THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ANY DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 5/31/2010. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 4/15/2010. 4/16/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
April 15, 2010 Filing 24 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions filed by CHRISTOPHER E. BROWN, KING OF PRUSSIA ASSOCIATES, KRAVCO SIMON COMPANY, PS COURT ASSOCIATES, LP..(FROELICH, JAMES)
March 2, 2010 Filing 23 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL FACTUAL AND EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 4/1/2010. ANY DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 4/15/2010. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 3/2/2010. 3/3/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 1, 2010 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and File Dispositive Motions filed by CHRISTOPHER E. BROWN, KING OF PRUSSIA ASSOCIATES, KRAVCO SIMON COMPANY, PS COURT ASSOCIATES, LP..(FROELICH, JAMES)
February 25, 2010 Filing 21 LETTER RE: STATUS REPORT by CHRISTOPHER E. BROWN, KING OF PRUSSIA ASSOCIATES, KRAVCO SIMON COMPANY, PS COURT ASSOCIATES, LP. (FROELICH, JAMES) Modified on 2/26/2010 (nd, ).
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL NOTIFY THIS COURT IN WRITING OF THE STATUS OF THEIR PRIVATE SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS NO LATER THAN 5:00 PM ON 2/25/2010. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 2/9/2010. 2/9/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
February 1, 2010 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT by CHRISTOPHER E. BROWN, KING OF PRUSSIA ASSOCIATES, PS COURT ASSOCIATES, LP, KRAVCO SIMON COMPANY. (FROELICH, JAMES)
January 7, 2010 Filing 18 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: DISCOVERY DUE BY 3/1/2010., MOTIONS DUE BY 3/15/2010; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 1/6/2010. 1/7/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(tomg, )
January 5, 2010 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and of All Pretrial Deadlines filed by CHRISTOPHER E. BROWN, KING OF PRUSSIA ASSOCIATES, PS COURT ASSOCIATES, LP, KRAVCO SIMON COMPANY..(FROELICH, JAMES)
December 22, 2009 Filing 16 Statement under FRCP 7.1 by KING OF PRUSSIA ASSOCIATES, PS COURT ASSOCIATES, LP, KRAVCO SIMON COMPANY. (MCHUGH, H.)
December 1, 2009 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT Plaintiff's Amended Status Letter by CHRISTOPHER E. BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Specific Barriers List)(FROELICH, JAMES)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT DISCOVERY DUE BY 1/22/2010. IF A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS NOT REQUESTED, ANY DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 5, 2010. RESPONSES TO ANY DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED WITHIN FOURTEEN (14)DAYS OF THE ORIGINAL MOTION.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 11/23/09. 11/25/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dp, )
November 20, 2009 Filing 13 Response to Plaintiff's Status Report Letter of 11/20/09 re #11 Status Report by KING OF PRUSSIA ASSOCIATES, PS COURT ASSOCIATES, LP, KRAVCO SIMON COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplement Letter Response) (MCHUGH, H.)
November 20, 2009 Filing 12 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by KING OF PRUSSIA ASSOCIATES, PS COURT ASSOCIATES, LP, KRAVCO SIMON COMPANY.(MCHUGH, H.)
November 20, 2009 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT Plaintiff's Letter Identifying Any Areas of Agreement and/or Dispute by CHRISTOPHER E. BROWN. (FROELICH, JAMES)
October 30, 2009 Filing 10 Minute Entry for a Rule 16 Conference held on 10/13/2009 before Judge Davis. (mbh, )
October 23, 2009 Filing 9 First Amended Complaint against KRAVCO SIMON COMPANY, KING OF PRUSSIA ASSOCIATES and PS COURT ASSOCIATES, LP filed by CHRISTOPHER E. BROWN.(mbh, )
October 23, 2009 Summons Issued as to KING OF PRUSSIA ASSOCIATES, PS COURT ASSOCIATES, LP. Forwarded To: J. Christopher Froelich, Esquire on 10/23/2009 (mbh, )
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ANY MOTION TO DISMISS OR ADD DEFENDANTS ON OR BEFORE 10/23/2009. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 10/13/2009. 10/15/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 30, 2009 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CHRISTOPHER E. BROWN.(FROELICH, JAMES)
September 15, 2009 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING: RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR TUESDAY 10/13/2009 10:30 AM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS ROOM 6614 BEFORE HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS.(cls, )
September 4, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE OF HEARING: RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR TUESDAY 9/15/2009 03:00 PM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS ROOM 6614 BEFORE HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS.(cls, )
August 31, 2009 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by KRAVCO SIMON COMPANY.(MCHUGH, H.)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL FILE A PLEADING IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT BY 8/31/2009. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 8/17/2009. 8/18/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
August 4, 2009 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER E. BROWN re: Jeffrey Nugent served Summons and Complaint upon KRAVCO SIMON COMPANY by Summons and Complaint. KRAVCO SIMON COMPANY served on 7/23/2009, answer due 8/12/2009. (FROELICH, JAMES)
July 6, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KRAVCO SIMON COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number PPE004767.), filed by CHRISTOPHER E. BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2012: #2 Designation Form) (lboy, ).
July 6, 2009 Summons Issued as to KRAVCO SIMON COMPANY. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/8/09 (cw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. KRAVCO SIMON COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRAVCO SIMON COMPANY
Represented By: H. FINTAN MCHUGH
Represented By: JAMES CHRISTOPHER FROELICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PS COURT ASSOCIATES, LP
Represented By: H. FINTAN MCHUGH
Represented By: JAMES CHRISTOPHER FROELICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KING OF PRUSSIA ASSOCIATES
Represented By: H. FINTAN MCHUGH
Represented By: JAMES CHRISTOPHER FROELICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER E. BROWN
Represented By: JAMES CHRISTOPHER FROELICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?