ITOCHU INTERNATIONAL INC. v. DEVON ROBOTICS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ITOCHU INTERNATIONAL INC.
Defendant: DEVON ROBOTICS, LLC, DEVON HEALTH SERVICES and JOHN A. BENNETT
Counter Claimant: DEVON HEALTH SERVICES, JOHN A. BENNETT and DEVON ROBOTICS, LLC
Counter Defendant: ITOCHU INTERNATIONAL INC.
Case Number: 2:2009cv04123
Filed: September 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: J. CURTIS JOYNER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH THE SUBPOENA IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 10/8/2014. 10/9/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER THAT ITOCHU INTERNATIONAL INC.'S MOTION FOR ORDER DETERMINING OWNERSHIP OF DR. JOHN BENNET'S EIGHT VEHICLES IS GRANTED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. DR. JOHN BENNETT'S REQUEST FOR A FULL EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON THE MOTION IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, IMMEDIATELY UPON ENTRY OF THIS ORDER, ITOCHU INTERNATIONAL, INC. SHALL BE ENTITLED TO COLLECT THE MONEY OBLIGATED TO IT PURSUANT TO THE BOND ENTERED ON 1/27/2014, BETWEEN DR. JOHN BENNETT AND NANCE DIROCCO AS PRINCIPALS AND INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SURETY IN THE FULL AMOUNT $87,236.00. ETC... SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 5/22/2014. 5/28/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED, USM.(kp, ) Modified on 5/28/2014 (afm, ).
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS ITOCHU INTERNATIONAL INC., et al.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED AS TO COUNT II FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AGAINST DEFENDANTS ITOCHU AND MED SURG. THE MOTION IS GRANTED AS TO ALL OTHER REMAINI NG COUNTS. DEFENDANT/COUNTER-CLAIMANT MEDSURG SPECIALTY DEVICES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED. PLAINTIFF ITOCHU INTERNATIONAL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 8/23/2012; 8/23/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ITOCHU INTERNATIONAL INC. v. DEVON ROBOTICS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ITOCHU INTERNATIONAL INC.
Represented By: JASON A. LEVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEVON ROBOTICS, LLC
Represented By: MARK L. RHOADES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEVON HEALTH SERVICES
Represented By: MARK L. RHOADES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN A. BENNETT
Represented By: MARK L. RHOADES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: DEVON HEALTH SERVICES
Represented By: MARK L. RHOADES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: JOHN A. BENNETT
Represented By: MARK L. RHOADES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: DEVON ROBOTICS, LLC
Represented By: MARK L. RHOADES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: ITOCHU INTERNATIONAL INC.
Represented By: JASON A. LEVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?