BUTT, ET AL v. UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS & JOINERS OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: SHENECQUA BUTT
Defendant: UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS & JOINERS OF AMERICA, CARPENTERS HEALTH & WELFARE FUND OF PHILADELPHIA & VICINITY, EDWARD CORYELL and MARK DURCKLEC
Case Number: 2:2009cv04285
Filed: September 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M. BAYLSON
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER THAT PADDICK'S MOTION FOR ORDER OF CONTEMPT IS GRANTED. THOMPSON WILL BE HELD IN CIVIL CONTEMPT FOR HER NON-COMPLIANCE WITH OUR 6/18/2018 ORDER (DOC. 381). THOMPSON SHALL COMPENSATE PADDICK $14,760.50 FOR THE ATTORNEY TIME HE INCURRED AS A RESULT OF HER NON-COMPLIANCE WITH OUR ORDER. THIS PAYMENT SHALL BE MADE BY 1/10/2019. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 12/27/18. 12/28/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED: COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES.(kw, )
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ENTER JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE FULTON BANK FOR $57,960.28. GARNISHEE FULTON BANK SHALL DISTRIBUTE $57,960.28 TO PADDICK, AS WELL AS $3.45 IN DAILY INTEREST FROM MAY 24, 2018 UNTIL THE DATE PAYMENT IS MADE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 10/9/18. 10/9/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES, MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ti, )
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER THAT 370 MOTION TO STAY IS DENIED. THOMPSON SHALL DISBURSE FUNDS IN ESCROW ACCOUNT IN ACCORDANCE WITH OUR 369 5/24/18 ORDER BY 6/25/18. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 6/18/18. 6/18/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ke)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER THAT THOMPSON SHALL DISBURSE TO PADDICK HIS AWARD OF 54,562.73 BY 6/1/2018. THOMPSON MAY DISBURSE THE REMAINDER OF THE $133,000 ATTORNEY FEE, $78,437.27, TO HERSELF, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 5/24/18. 5/24/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR RECUSAL IS DENIED. PADDICK'S MOTION FOR RECOGNITION AND ENFORCEMENT OF LIEN IS GRANTED AND HE IS AWARDED THE SUM OF $54,562.73 FOR WORK DONE UNDER THE CONTINGENCY FEE AGREEMENT. HIS CLAIM TO THE AMOUNT OF $13, 757.50 IS DENIED. BUTT'S MOTION FOR RECOGNITION AND ENFORCEMENT OF LIEN IS DENIED. AS CUSTODIAN OF THE ESCROW ACCOUNT PURSUANT TO OUR 12/28/2017 ORDER, THOMPSON SHALL RELEASE FUNDS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS ORDER WITHIN 10 DAYS FROM TODAY'S DATE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 4/27/18. 4/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MEMORANDUM ORDER STATING REASONS FOR ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/15/17. 5/16/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE PERTIANING TO THE CENTER FOR FORENSIC ECONOMIC STUDIES "CFES" (DOC. 143) IS GRANTED. PLFFS ARE PRECLUDED FROM OFFERING THE OPINION EVIDENCE OF CFES OR THE STATISTICAL DATA UPON WHICH IT RELIES. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 6/16/16. 6/17/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. PLFFS' COMPLAINTS IN THIS CONSOLIDATED CASE ARE DISMISSED. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFTS & AGAINST PLFFS. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 1/26/12. 1/27/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED, EXCEPT AS NOTED IN THE FOREGOING MEMORANDUM. PLFFS MAY FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 14 DAYS AS OUTLINED IN THE FOREGOING MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/19/10. 5/20/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUTT, ET AL v. UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS & JOINERS OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHENECQUA BUTT
Represented By: ARI RISSON KARPF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS & JOINERS OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARPENTERS HEALTH & WELFARE FUND OF PHILADELPHIA & VICINITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD CORYELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK DURCKLEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?