PERELMAN et al v. PERELMAN
Plaintiff: JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, FRANK KATZ and JEP MANAGEMENT, INC.
Defendant: RAYMOND G. PERELMAN and RONALD PERELMAN
Counter Defendant: MARSHA R. PERELMAN
Case Number: 2:2009cv04792
Filed: October 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: MARY A MCLAUGHLIN
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER of USCA as to #102 Notice of Appeal filed by RAYMOND G. PERELMAN THAT THE JUDGMENT OF THE EDPA ENTERED 5/2/2012 IS HEREBY AFFIRMED IN CASE NUMBER 13-2521, AND THE JUDGMENT OF THE EDPA ENTERED 5/22/2013 IS HEREBY AFFIRMED IN CASE NUMBER 13-2658. COSTS TO BE TAXED AGAINST THE APPELLANT IN BOTH CASES. ALL IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OPINION OF THIS COURT. (kk, )
May 30, 2013 Filing 103 Clerk's Notice to USCA re #102 Notice of Appeal (uh, )
May 30, 2013 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number PPE082596 re #102 Notice of Appeal filed by RAYMOND G. PERELMAN (aeg, )
May 30, 2013 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #102 Notice of Appeal filed by RAYMOND G. PERELMAN. USCA Case Number 13-2521 (ems)
May 29, 2013 Filing 102 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #101 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), #100 Memorandum and/or Opinion by RAYMOND G. PERELMAN. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and Certificate of Service. (ECKERT, ANDREW) Modified on 5/30/2013 (nd, ).
May 2, 2013 Filing 101 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS (DOC. NO.45)IS GRANTED. ALL OF RAYMOND'S COUNTERCLAIMS ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. COUNT I OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT, THE SOLE REMAINING COUNT IN THIS CASE, IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. THE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS ALSO DENIED AS MOOT. THE CLERK SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/2/2013. 5/2/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (kk, )
May 2, 2013 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION RE: PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS (DOC. NO.45). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/2/2013. 5/2/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kk, )
March 14, 2013 Filing 99 REPLY to Response to Motion re #97 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Counterclaims of Raymond PerelmanJoint MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count I of the Amended Complaint filed by JEP MANAGEMENT, INC., FRANK KATZ, FRANK KATZ, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, MARSHA R. PERELMAN. (SMITH, JAMES)
March 6, 2013 Filing 98 RESPONSE in Opposition re #97 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Counterclaims of Raymond PerelmanJoint MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count I of the Amended Complaint filed by RAYMOND G. PERELMAN. (ECKERT, ANDREW)
February 4, 2013 Filing 97 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Counterclaims of Raymond Perelman, Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count I of the Amended Complaint filed by JEP MANAGEMENT, INC., FRANK KATZ, FRANK KATZ, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, MARSHA R. PERELMAN.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum Consolidated Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims and for Summary Judgment on Count I of the Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Tab A to Memorandum of Law - Comparison of allegations of Complaint in Philadelphia County, Petition in Montgomery County, and Counterclaims in federal court, #4 Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Count I of the Amended Complaint, #5 Appendix Cover Page and Table of Contents to Appendix of Exhibits, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 16, #22 Exhibit 17, #23 Exhibit 18, #24 Exhibit 19, #25 Exhibit 20, #26 Exhibit 21, #27 Exhibit 22, #28 Exhibit 23, #29 Exhibit 24, #30 Exhibit 25, #31 Exhibit 26, #32 Exhibit 27)(SMITH, JAMES)
January 15, 2013 Filing 96 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/14/2013. (kk, )
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE ANY MOTION TO DISMISS WITH RESPECT TO COUNT I OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 2/4/2013, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 1/15/2013. 1/15/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
January 11, 2013 Filing 94 STIPULATION of Dismissal by RONALD PERELMAN. (HOEFFNER, TIMOTHY)
January 9, 2013 Filing 93 Letter in Response to Court's Order of December 21, 2012 (Docket No. 91) regarding how to proceed in this case by RAYMOND G. PERELMAN. (ECKERT, ANDREW) Modified on 1/10/2013 (lisad, ).
January 9, 2013 Filing 92 Letter in Response to Court's Order of December 21, 2012 (Docket No. 91) regarding how to proceed in this case by JEP MANAGEMENT, INC., FRANK KATZ, FRANK KATZ, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, MARSHA R. PERELMAN. (SMITH, JAMES) Modified on 1/10/2013 (lisad, ).
December 21, 2012 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO LIFT THE STAY AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS (DOC. NO.79) IS DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART. THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER WITH COUNTERCLAIMS IS DENIED. THE PARTIES SHALL INFORM THE COURT IN WRITING ON OR BEFORE 1/9/2013 ON HOW THEY WOULD LIKE TO PROCEED IN THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 12/21/2012. 12/21/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
December 21, 2012 Filing 90 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION RE:DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO LIFT THE STAY AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS (DOC. NO.79). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 12/21/2012. 12/21/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
November 14, 2012 Filing 89 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by HOLLY ROGERS on behalf of RAYMOND G. PERELMAN. Certificate of Service. (ROGERS, HOLLY) Modified on 11/15/2012 (lisad, ).
November 14, 2012 Filing 88 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MARJORIE M. OBOD on behalf of RAYMOND G. PERELMAN. Certificate of Service. (OBOD, MARJORIE) Modified on 11/15/2012 (lisad, ).
November 14, 2012 Filing 87 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by PATRICK M. NORTHEN on behalf of RAYMOND G. PERELMAN. Certificate of Service. (NORTHEN, PATRICK) Modified on 11/15/2012 (lisad, ).
November 14, 2012 Filing 86 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by LAWRENCE G. MCMICHAEL on behalf of RAYMOND G. PERELMAN. Certificate of Service. (MCMICHAEL, LAWRENCE) Modified on 11/15/2012 (lisad, ).
November 14, 2012 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW E. MCGUIRE on behalf of RAYMOND G. PERELMAN. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCGUIRE, MATTHEW) Modified on 11/15/2012 (lisad, ).
November 14, 2012 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW ECKERT on behalf of RAYMOND G. PERELMAN. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ECKERT, ANDREW) Modified on 11/15/2012 (lisad, ).
October 25, 2012 Filing 83 Memorandum of Law in Opposition re #79 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims and to Lift the Stay Response in Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaims filed by JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Appendix Cover Page for Appendix of Exhibits, #3 Appendix Index to Contents of Appendix of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21)(SMITH, JAMES) Modified on 10/26/2012 (nd, ).
October 24, 2012 Filing 82 NOTICE by RONALD PERELMAN of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (HOEFFNER, TIMOTHY)
October 10, 2012 Copy of Order dated 10/3/2012 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to SANDRA SCHULTZ NEWMAN for the following reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD. (kk, )
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER THAT THE REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS (DOC. NO.79) IS GRANTED. A RESPONSE SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 10/25/2012. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 10/3/2012. 10/4/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
October 1, 2012 Copy of Order dated 9/25/2012 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to SANDRA SCHULTZ NEWMAN for the following reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD. (kk, )
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO LIFE THE STAY IS GRANTED. THIS CASE IS HEREBY TAKEN OUT OF SUSPENSE. AS TO ALL OTHER ASPECTS OF THE MOTION, THE COURT WILL AWAIT ANY OPPOSITION BEFORE ISSUING A DECISION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/25/2012. 9/25/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
September 24, 2012 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims and to Lift the Stay filed by RAYMOND G. PERELMAN.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit 1 - Amended Answer and Counterclaims, #3 Exhibit A through H to Amended Answer and Counterclaims, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(MCMICHAEL, LAWRENCE)
November 30, 2011 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by SANDRA SCHULTZ NEWMAN on behalf of RAYMOND G. PERELMAN with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(kk, )
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO DEPOSE IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SEE ATTACHED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 10/7/10.10/7/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dp, )
October 6, 2010 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN: Telephone Conference held on 10/4/10 (dp, )
October 1, 2010 Filing 75 EXHIBIT A and EXHIBIT B to #74 Reply Memorandum In Support of #70 Motion to Depose by RAYMOND G. PERELMAN.(OBOD, MARJORIE) Modified on 10/1/2010 (md).
October 1, 2010 Filing 74 Memorandum In Support re #70 MOTION to Depose Arlin Adams filed by RAYMOND G. PERELMAN. (OBOD, MARJORIE)
September 24, 2010 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re #70 MOTION to Depose Arlin Adams with Certificate of Service filed by JEP MANAGEMENT, INC., FRANK KATZ, FRANK KATZ, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, MARSHA R. PERELMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SMITH, JAMES)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED, PLAINTIFFS/COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE THEIR RESPONSE ON OR BEFORE 9/24/10. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/14/10. 9/14/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dp, )
September 14, 2010 Filing 71 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #70 MOTION to Depose Arlin Adams filed by JEP MANAGEMENT, INC., FRANK KATZ, FRANK KATZ, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, MARSHA R. PERELMAN.Uncontested Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Depose, with Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WARD, REBECCA)
September 3, 2010 Filing 70 MOTION to Depose Arlin Adams filed by RAYMOND G. PERELMAN.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(OBOD, MARJORIE)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACE THE MATTER IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/25/10. 6/28/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dp, )
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SANCTIONS IS DENIED. SEE ATTACHED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/25/10.6/28/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dp, )
June 24, 2010 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re #51 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 against Counterclaim Defendant Raymond G. Perelman filed by FRANK KATZ, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, MARSHA R. PERELMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SMITH, JAMES)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS APPROVED BY THE COURT. THE NEW DEADLINES FOR COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS TO FILE THEIR REPLY IS 6/24/10.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/14/10. 6/16/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dp, )
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST IS GRANTED. THE PLAINTIFFS MAY SUBMIT THEIR RESPONSE TO THE DEFENDANTS' LETTERS ON OR BEFORE 6/24/10.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/15/10. 6/16/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dp, )
June 16, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #51 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 against Counterclaim Defendant Raymond G. Perelman. REPLIES DUE BY 6/24/2010. (dp, )
June 11, 2010 Filing 64 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims of Raymond G. Perelman filed by FRANK KATZ, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, MARSHA R. PERELMAN. (SMITH, JAMES)
June 8, 2010 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re #51 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 against Counterclaim Defendant Raymond G. Perelman filed by RAYMOND G. PERELMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(OBOD, MARJORIE)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS APPROVED BY THE COURT. THE NEW DEADLINE FOR COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS TO FILE THEIR REPLY IS 6/11/10. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/2/10. 6/3/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dp, )
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFFS' AND COUNTERCLAIM-DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. DISCOVERY IS STAYED UNTIL 7/1/10. ON OR BEFORE THAT DATE, COUNSEL SHALL INFORM THE COURT AS TO THE STATUS OF THE PARALLEL STATE COURT ACTION.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/1/10. 6/3/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dp, )
June 2, 2010 Filing 60 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #45 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims of Raymond G. Perelman, #57 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by FRANK KATZ, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, MARSHA R. PERELMAN.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WARD, REBECCA) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 6/3/2010 (nd, ).
June 2, 2010 Filing 59 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN: Status Conference held on 6/1/10. (dp, )
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER HTAT THE STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME IS APPROVED BY THE COURT. THE NEW DEADLINE FOR COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION FOR SANCTIONS IS 6/8/10.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/27/10. 5/28/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dp, )
May 27, 2010 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims of Raymond G. Perelman filed by RAYMOND G. PERELMAN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(OBOD, MARJORIE)
May 27, 2010 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK M. NORTHEN on behalf of RAYMOND G. PERELMAN with Certificate of Service(NORTHEN, PATRICK)
May 26, 2010 Filing 55 STIPULATION re #51 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 against Counterclaim Defendant Raymond G. Perelman Stipulation for Extension of Time for Counterclaim Plaintiff Raymond G. Perelman to Respond to the Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by JEP MANAGEMENT, INC., FRANK KATZ, FRANK KATZ, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, MARSHA R. PERELMAN, RAYMOND G. PERELMAN, RONALD PERELMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(OBOD, MARJORIE) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO CLERK/JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 5/27/2010 (nd).
May 25, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #45 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims of Raymond G. Perelman. RESPONSES DUE BY 5/27/2010. (kp, )
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 6/1/2010 AT 01:30 PM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN TO DISCUSS THE PENDING MOTIONS, DOCKET NUMBERS 44, 45, AND 51.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/25/2010. 5/25/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS APPROVED BY THE COURT. THE NEW DEADLINE FOR COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DISMISS IS 5/27/2010.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/25/2010. 5/25/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
May 25, 2010 FILED IN ERROR(kp, ).
May 24, 2010 Filing 52 STIPULATION re #45 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims of Raymond G. Perelman Stipulation of Extension of Time for Counterclaim Plaintiff Raymond G. Perelman to Respond to the Motion to Dismiss by JEP MANAGEMENT, INC., FRANK KATZ, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, MARSHA R. PERELMAN, RAYMOND G. PERELMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(OBOD, MARJORIE) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 5/25/2010 (nd, ).
May 18, 2010 Filing 51 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 against Counterclaim Defendant Raymond G. Perelman filed by FRANK KATZ, FRANK KATZ, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, MARSHA R. PERELMAN.Motion, with Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Preliminary Objections, #2 Exhibit B - Dismissal Order, #3 Exhibit C, D and E - Submitted in camera only, #4 Exhibit F - Fortune article, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(SMITH, JAMES)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS APPROVED. THE NEW DEADLINE FOR COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS IS 5/24/2010.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/14/10. 5/17/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
May 14, 2010 Filing 49 STIPULATION re #45 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims of Raymond G. Perelman Stipulation of Extension of Time for Counterclaim Plaintiff Raymond G. Perelman to Respond to the Motion to Dismiss by JEP MANAGEMENT, INC., FRANK KATZ, FRANK KATZ, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, MARSHA R. PERELMAN, RAYMOND G. PERELMAN, RONALD PERELMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (OBOD, MARJORIE) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO CLERK/JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 5/14/2010 (nd).
May 12, 2010 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by FRANK KATZ, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, MARSHA R. PERELMAN. (SMITH, JAMES)
May 5, 2010 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by RONALD PERELMAN. (FLAHERTY, BRIAN)
May 5, 2010 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by RAYMOND G. PERELMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(OBOD, MARJORIE)
May 3, 2010 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims of Raymond G. Perelman filed by FRANK KATZ, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, MARSHA R. PERELMAN.Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims, with Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Answer and Counterclaims of Raymond G. Perelman, #2 Exhibit 2 - Agreement of Trust, #3 Exhibit 3 - Stock Purchase Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Stock Purchase Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Stock Purchase Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Stock Purchase Agreement, #7 Exhibit 7 - Stock Purchase Agreement, #8 Exhibit 8 - Stock Purchase Agreement, #9 Exhibit 9 - Stock Purchase Agreement, #10 Exhibit 10 - Stock Purchase Agreement, #11 Exhibit 11 - Stock Purchase Agreement, #12 Exhibit 12 - Stock Purchase Agreement, #13 Exhibit 13 - Asset Purchase Agreement, #14 Exhibit 14 - Asset Purchase Agreement, #15 Exhibit 15 - State Court Complaint, #16 Exhibit 16 - State Court Preliminary Objections, #17 Exhibit 17 - Transcript of Oral Argument on Preliminary Objections, #18 Exhibit 18 - March 25, 2010 Order Sustaining Preliminary Objections and Dismissing State Court Complaint with Prejudice, #19 Exhibit 19 - Raymond Perelman's Motion for Reconsideration, #20 Exhibit 20 - Jeffrey Perelman's Answer and Brief in Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration, #21 Exhibit 21 - Raymond Perelman's Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration, #22 Exhibit 22 - April 27, 2010 Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration, #23 Text of Proposed Order)(SMITH, JAMES)
April 21, 2010 Filing 44 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by JEP MANAGEMENT, INC., FRANK KATZ, FRANK KATZ, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, MARSHA R. PERELMAN.Motion, Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - March 25, 2010 Order of the Honorable Albert W. Sheppard, Jr., of the Philadelphia County Court of Common Pleas, #3 Exhibit B - Preliminary Objections filed in state court)(SMITH, JAMES)
April 15, 2010 ***Update Answer Deadline (dp, )
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT EXTENSION OF TIME FOR COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE PLEAD PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 7.4(B)(2). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 4/9/10. 4/12/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dp, )
April 9, 2010 ***Set/Reset Deadlines: JEFFREY E. PERELMAN answer due 5/7/2010. (dp, )
April 9, 2010 ***Update Answer Deadline (md)
April 8, 2010 Filing 42 Consent Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer re #39 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by stipulation under Local Civil Rule 7.4(b)(2) filed by JEP MANAGEMENT, INC., FRANK KATZ, FRANK KATZ, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, JEFFREY E. PERELMAN, MARSHA R. PERELMAN.Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead in Response to Counterclaims under Local Civil Rule 7.4(b)(2), with Certificate of Service.(WARD, REBECCA) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO CLERK/JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 4/9/2010 (nd).
March 31, 2010 Filing 41 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE as to Summons Issued, #39 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Rebecca D. Ward, Esquire Re: accepted summons and complaint for MARSHA R. PERELMAN on 3/31/2010, answer due 4/21/2010. (OBOD, MARJORIE)
March 22, 2010 Filing 40 STATUS REPORT Letter to the Honorable Mary McLaughlin regarding status of Stipulated Order for Exchange of Confidential Information by JEP MANAGEMENT, INC., FRANK KATZ, JEFFERY E. PERELMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WARD, REBECCA)
March 19, 2010 Summons Issued as to MARSHA R. PERELMAN. Forwarded To: ATTORNEY on 3/23/10 (dp, )
March 19, 2010 Filing 39 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with COUNTERCLAIMS against JEFFREY E. PERELMAN Individually and as Trustee, and against FRANK KATZ as Trustee, and against MARSHA R. PERELMAN Individually, filed by RAYMOND G. PERELMAN, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(OBOD, MARJORIE) Modified on 3/23/2010 (md).
March 19, 2010 Filing 38 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by RONALD PERELMAN.(COZEN, STEPHEN)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING ORDER: DISCOVERY DUE BY 10/31/2010.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/17/10. 3/19/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dp, )
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER THAT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/1/2010 04:30 PM BEFORE HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/17/10. 3/19/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dp, )
March 16, 2010 Filing 35 Discovery Plan by JEP MANAGEMENT, INC., FRANK KATZ, JEFFERY E. PERELMAN, RAYMOND G. PERELMAN, RONALD PERELMAN. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Judge McLaughlin enclosed joint proposed Scheduling Order for discovery)(WARD, REBECCA)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH RONALD PERELMAN SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UNTIL 3/19/2010. THIS STIPULATION GRANTS AN EXTENSION OF TIME THAT DOES NOT EXCEED 30 DAYS. NO PRIOR EXTENSION HAS BEEN REQUESTED BY RONALD RELATED TO THIS PLEADING. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/3/10. 3/3/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dp, )
February 25, 2010 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER MICHAEL RYAN on behalf of RONALD PERELMAN with Certificate of Service(RYAN, PETER)
February 24, 2010 Filing 32 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BRIAN P. FLAHERTY on behalf of RAYMOND G. PERELMAN(FLAHERTY, BRIAN)
February 24, 2010 Filing 31 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by STEPHEN A. COZEN on behalf of RAYMOND G. PERELMAN(COZEN, STEPHEN)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A JOINT LETTER TO THE COURT DETAILING THE OUTCOME OF THAT CONFERENCE. IN THE EVENT THAT THE PARTIES CANNOT REACH AN AGREEMENT ON SCHEDULING, THEY SHALL SEPARATELY SUBMIT SUCH A LETTER DETAILING THEIR RESPECTIVE WISHES. THE PARTIES SHALL HAVE UNTIL 3/15/10, TO SUBMIT, JOINTLY OR SEPARATELY, SUCH LETTERS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/22/10. 2/23/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dp, )
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. THE DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 3/19/10 SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/23/10.2/23/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dp, )
February 23, 2010 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Amended Complaint (Uncontested) filed by RAYMOND G. PERELMAN.Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(OBOD, MARJORIE)
February 23, 2010 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by LAWRENCE G. MCMICHAEL on behalf of RAYMOND G. PERELMAN with Certificate of Service(MCMICHAEL, LAWRENCE)
February 23, 2010 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by MARJORIE M. OBOD on behalf of RAYMOND G. PERELMAN with Certificate of Service(OBOD, MARJORIE)
February 23, 2010 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by HOLLY ROGERS on behalf of RAYMOND G. PERELMAN with Certificate of Service(ROGERS, HOLLY)
February 12, 2010 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DIMISS THE AMENDED COMPALINT (DOC. NO. 11) AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 13) ARE DENIED FOR REASONS STATED IN A MEMORANDUM OF LAW BEARING TODAY'S DATE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/12/10. 2/12/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kk, )
February 12, 2010 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION RE: DEFENDANT RAYMOND PERELMAN'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO.11), MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO.13), AND PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE, AND DEFENDANTS REPLY THERETO. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/12/10. 2/12/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kk, )
February 4, 2010 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT re #11 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Letter to the court with affidavit of Ruth Perelman by RAYMOND G. PERELMAN. (COZEN, STEPHEN)
January 27, 2010 Filing 21 Withdrawal of Appearance of Attorney George M. Gowan by RAYMOND G. PERELMAN. (GOWEN, GEORGE)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 12/9/2009. 12/9/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ap, )
December 9, 2009 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by JEFFERY E. PERELMAN, FRANK KATZ, JEP MANAGEMENT, INC..Sur-Reply, proposed Order and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Sur-Reply)(SMITH, JAMES)
December 7, 2009 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by RAYMOND G. PERELMAN. (COZEN, STEPHEN)
December 1, 2009 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN: Telephone Conference held on 12/1/2009 (ap, )
November 30, 2009 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, #13 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (redacted) filed by JEFFERY E. PERELMAN, FRANK KATZ, JEP MANAGEMENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter to the Honorable Mary A. McLaughlin, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Declaration of James T. Smith (with 2 exhibits - 10-19-09 Emails to Matthew Kamens), #4 Exhibit B - Declaration of Diane Canning, #5 Exhibit C - October 21, 2009 State Court Order to Seal, #6 Exhibit D - State Court Docket, #7 Exhibit E - Preliminary Objections (submitted in camera only, wiht Exhibits), #8 Exhibit F - Memorandum of Law in Support of Preliminary Objections (submitted in camera only), #9 Index of Redactions from text of Memorandum of Law)(SMITH, JAMES)
November 25, 2009 Filing 15 Statement regarding intention to file documents sealed by state court, and requesting clarification of procedure in federal court by JEFFERY E. PERELMAN, FRANK KATZ, JEP MANAGEMENT, INC.. (SMITH, JAMES)
November 20, 2009 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN: Conference held on 11/20/2009. (ap, )
November 19, 2009 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by RONALD PERELMAN.Certificate of Service.(COZEN, STEPHEN)
November 19, 2009 Filing 12 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE Re: accepted summons and complaint for RONALD PERELMAN on 11/19/2009, answer due 12/9/2009. (WARD, REBECCA)
November 16, 2009 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by RAYMOND G. PERELMAN.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(COZEN, STEPHEN)
November 12, 2009 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against RONALD PERELMAN, RAYMOND G. PERELMAN, filed by JEFFERY E. PERELMAN, FRANK KATZ, JEP MANAGEMENT, INC. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(ap, )
November 12, 2009 1 Original Summons Issued as to RONALD PERELMAN. Forwarded To: Counsel on 11/13/2009 (ap, )
November 10, 2009 Filing 9 NOTICE by JEFFERY E. PERELMAN, FRANK KATZ, JEP MANAGEMENT, INC. re #1 Complaint Notice of Filing of Amended Complaint as of Right Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 15(a)(1)(A) (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(SMITH, JAMES) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE IN HARD COPY) Modified on 11/12/2009 (lisad, ).
October 27, 2009 Filing 8 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by George M. Gowen III, Esq. Re: accepted summons and complaint for RAYMOND G. PERELMAN on 10/27/2009, answer due 11/16/2009. (WARD, REBECCA)
October 26, 2009 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing:RULE 16 STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/20/2009 10:00 AM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS, ROOM 13614, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA, BEFORE THE HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN.(cps, )
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION TO SEAL COMPLAINT AND TO ISSUE INTERIM ORDER THAT PROCEEDINGS BE SEALED AND PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL FILING IN SUPPORT OF THEIR EX PARTE MOTION TO SEAL COMPLAINT, SAID MOTION IS DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 10/23/2009. 10/26/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ap, )
October 23, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE M. GOWEN, III, BRIAN P. FLAHERTY, STEPHEN A. COZEN on behalf of RAYMOND G. PERELMAN with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Attachments: #1 COS)(ap, )
October 19, 2009 Filing 4 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Filing in Support of Their Ex Parte Motion to Seal Complaitn adn to Issue Interim Order that Proceedings be Sealed by JEFFERY E. PERELMAN, FRANK KATZ, JEP MANAGEMENT, INC.. with DECLARATION (ap, )
October 19, 2009 Filing 3 PLAITNIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION TO SEAL COMPLAINT AND TO ISSUE INTERIM ORDER THAT PROCEEDINGS BE SEALED filed by JEFFERY E. PERELMAN, FRANK KATZ, JEP MANAGEMENT, INC...(ap, )
October 19, 2009 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by JEP MANAGEMENT, INC..(ap, )
October 19, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RAYMOND G. PERELMAN ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 011126.), filed by JEFFERY E. PERELMAN, FRANK KATZ, JEP MANAGEMENT, INC..(ap, )
October 19, 2009 1 Original Summons Issued as to RAYMOND G. PERELMAN. Forwarded To: Counsel on 10/22/2009 (ap, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERELMAN et al v. PERELMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY E. PERELMAN
Represented By: JAMES T. SMITH
Represented By: REBECCA D. WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK KATZ
Represented By: JAMES T. SMITH
Represented By: REBECCA D. WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEP MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: JAMES T. SMITH
Represented By: REBECCA D. WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYMOND G. PERELMAN
Represented By: ANDREW C. ECKERT
Represented By: BRIAN P. FLAHERTY
Represented By: GEORGE M. GOWEN, III
Represented By: HOLLY REBECCA ROGERS
Represented By: LAWRENCE G. MCMICHAEL
Represented By: MARJORIE M. OBOD
Represented By: MATTHEW E. MCGUIRE
Represented By: PATRICK M. NORTHEN
Represented By: SANDRA SCHULTZ NEWMAN
Represented By: STEPHEN A. COZEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD PERELMAN
Represented By: BRIAN P. FLAHERTY
Represented By: CARL W. HITTINGER
Represented By: JOHN D. HUH
Represented By: PETER MICHAEL RYAN
Represented By: STEPHEN A. COZEN
Represented By: TIMOTHY E. HOEFFNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: MARSHA R. PERELMAN
Represented By: JAMES T. SMITH
Represented By: REBECCA D. WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?