SELZER et al v. DUNKIN' DONUTS INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: HAROLD SELZER, SAUL LEVITT, AAA DEVELOPMENT & MANAGEMENT, INC., AAA DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC, AAA YOWZA, L.P. and YOWZA ENTERPRISES, LLC
Defendant: DUNKIN' DONUTS INCORPORATED, BASKIN-ROBBINS, USA, CO. and DUNKIN' DONUTS FRANCHISED RESTAURANTS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv05484
Filed: November 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Bucks
Presiding Judge: GENE E.K. PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (DOCKET NO. 184) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/15/15. 6/15/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(rab, )
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE (DOCKET NO. 118) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 4/3/14. 4/4/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION (DOCKET NOS. 75 AND 76) IS DENIED. DEFENDANTS' MOTION (DOCKET NO. 99) IS DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART. A STATUS CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THIS MATTER ON OCTOBER 11, 2013 AT 10:00 A.M. IN CHAMBERS, ROOM 10613. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 8/26/13. 8/28/13 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 10 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 4/20/11. 4/21/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SELZER et al v. DUNKIN' DONUTS INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD SELZER
Represented By: STEPHEN T. CARPENITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAUL LEVITT
Represented By: STEPHEN T. CARPENITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AAA DEVELOPMENT & MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN T. CARPENITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AAA DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN T. CARPENITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AAA YOWZA, L.P.
Represented By: STEPHEN T. CARPENITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YOWZA ENTERPRISES, LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN T. CARPENITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUNKIN' DONUTS INCORPORATED
Represented By: CRAIG R. TRACTENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASKIN-ROBBINS, USA, CO.
Represented By: CRAIG R. TRACTENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUNKIN' DONUTS FRANCHISED RESTAURANTS, LLC
Represented By: CRAIG R. TRACTENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?