HELMS et al v. AIRCO, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JUDY K. HELMS
Defendant: SEARS ROEBUCK & CO., BRIGGS FILTRATION CO., 3M COMPANY, ALLIED SIGNAL, INC., CONTINENTAL BOILERS, INC., BELMONT PACKING COMPANY, PACCAR INC., SEPCO CORPORATION, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY, JOHN DEERE & COMPANY, MINNESOTA MINING, PFIZER INCORPORATED, INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY, MACK TRUCKS, INC., ZURN INDUSTRIES INC., GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), INC., BORG-WARNER CORPORATION, AMERICAN OPTICAL COMPANY, EXXON MOBIL OIL CORPORATION, ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, WHEELER SALES COMPANY, CRANE CO., INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, AIRCO, INC., GREENE TWEED & COMPANY, WARREN PUMPS LLC, GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION, WACO, INC., DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, JOHN CRANE INC, GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION, CAPCO PIPE CO., INC., AMERICAN STANDARD, INCORPORATED, SEARS TERMINATED, HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, BRIGGS MANUFACTURING COMPANY TERMINATED, SHELL CHEMICAL COMPANY, DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY, OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC., THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC., WEIL-MCLAIN, UNIROYAL HOLDINGS, INC., GOODRICH CORPORATION, CATERPILLAR, INC., FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., BONDEX INTERNATIONAL, INC., GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE, INC., MAREMONT CORPORATION, RILEY POWER, INC., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC., LEAR SIEGLER, INC., DANA CORPORATION, VIACOM, INC., RPM, INC., DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION, KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC., ALLIEDSIGNAL INC. TERMINATED, BELL & GOSSETT, CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, CLEAVER-BROOKS, MANCHESTER TANK & EQUIPMENT, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, FURNACE ROAD CORPORATION TERMINATED, INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION, NATIONAL SERVICE INDUSTRIES, INC., A. W. CHESTERTON, INC., ATLAS ASBESTOS COMPANY, LTD., KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC., MORTON INTERNATIONAL, BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC., STANDCO INDUSTRIES, INC., INDUSTRIAL RUBBER & SPECIALTY COMPANY, EMPIRE ACE INSULATION MANUFACTURING and IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Petitioner: JOHN CRANE INC.
Case Number: 2:2009cv93419
Filed: December 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST ALL VIABLE DEFENDANTS IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT A ARE DISMISSESD PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(2). SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/29/10. 4/30/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(lbc, )
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST ALL THE VIABLE DEFENDANTS IN THE CASES LISTED IN "EXHIBIT A", ATTACHED, ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO FILE SEVERED AND AMENDED COMPLAINTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/13/2010. 4/25/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (aeg, )
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON APRIL 27, 2010 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11A. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE CONFERENCE SHALL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, AS TO ALL OPEN CASES, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL BE PREPARED TO PROVIDE AT THE HEARING THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/29/10. 4/5/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ah)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT A RULE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WILL BE HELD ON APRIL 13, 2010 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11A. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL'S FAILURE TO APPEAR OR TO BE EXCUSED FROM APPEARING WILL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THAT PLAINTIFF'S CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/18/10. 3/29/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ah)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS IS ALLOWED AND ALL CLAIMS AGAINST THE DEFENDANTS, ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/1/2010. 3/11/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
February 16, 2010 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss all defendants filed by JUDY K. HELMS.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLACK, JANET)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER THAT, WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS, EACH INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ONE SEVERED AND AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THIS COURT. THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IS DIRECTED TO ASSIGN CIVIL ACTION NUMBERS TO EACH INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFF. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS SECTION OF THE INSTANT ORDER MAY RESULT, UPON MOTION BY ANY CONCERNED DEFENDANT OR BY RULE TO SHOW CAUSE ISSUED BY THE COURT, IN THE DISMISSAL OF THAT SPECIFIC PLAINTIFFS CIVIL ACTION WITH PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(B), ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (uh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HELMS et al v. AIRCO, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEARS ROEBUCK & CO.
Represented By: MCRAY JUDGE, II
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: TERESA F. LAZZARONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIGGS FILTRATION CO.
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: JEFFREY A. KADIS
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIED SIGNAL, INC.
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTINENTAL BOILERS, INC.
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELMONT PACKING COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY W. BOUCH
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR INC.
Represented By: TIMOTHY W. BOUCH
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEPCO CORPORATION
Represented By: MONICA F. PATTERSON
Represented By: OLLIE M. HARTON
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: TERESA F. LAZZARONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: KIRK G. WARNER
Represented By: SUSAN H. HARGROVE
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. KIGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DEERE & COMPANY
Represented By: PAUL JOSEPH OSOWSKI
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA MINING
Represented By: JEFFREY A. KADIS
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER INCORPORATED
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACK TRUCKS, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD J. KESHIAN
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: JOHN J. O'BRIEN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURN INDUSTRIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), INC.
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Represented By: ROBERT N. SPINELLI
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: LINDSAY P. THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORG-WARNER CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN A. GARDNER, III
Represented By: SHANNON STRICKLAND FRANKEL
Represented By: DANA HEFTER DAVIS
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN OPTICAL COMPANY
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXXON MOBIL OIL CORPORATION
Represented By: STANLEY BOYD GREEN
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: RICHARD EDWIN MORTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY W. BOUCH
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHEELER SALES COMPANY
Represented By: KIRK G. WARNER
Represented By: SUSAN H. HARGROVE
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. KIGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: EDWARD KENNETH BROOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIRCO, INC.
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: CLARE M. MAISANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENE TWEED & COMPANY
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS LLC
Represented By: JOSHUA H. BENNETT
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: I. TIMOTHY ZARSADIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION
Represented By: KENNETH K. KYRE, JR.
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WACO, INC.
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: WILLIAM DAVID CONNER
Represented By: JOEL M. BONDURANT, JR.
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE INC
Represented By: MARK E. ANDERSON
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: THOMAS M. BUCKLEY
Represented By: EDWARD KENNETH BROOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
Represented By: KIRK G. WARNER
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. KIGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPCO PIPE CO., INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM DAVID CONNER
Represented By: JOEL M. BONDURANT, JR.
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN STANDARD, INCORPORATED
Represented By: RICHARD V. BENNETT
Represented By: JOSHUA H. BENNETT
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: THOMAS FRANK DOUGALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEARS TERMINATED
Represented By: MCRAY JUDGE, II
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: TERESA F. LAZZARONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIGGS MANUFACTURING COMPANY TERMINATED
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELL CHEMICAL COMPANY
Represented By: STEVEN B. KANTROWITZ
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Represented By: RICHARD S. RANIERI
Represented By: ROBERT O. MERIWETHER
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.
Represented By: ROBERT O. MERIWETHER
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: KELLY BROOKS JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: TIMOTHY W. BOUCH
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIL-MCLAIN
Represented By: FRANK J. GORDON
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIROYAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: JOEL M. BONDURANT, JR.
Represented By: CRAIG E. BRASFIELD
Represented By: ALISON O'NEAL MCMINN
Represented By: RICHARD L. FORMAN
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODRICH CORPORATION
Represented By: A. TODD BROWN, SR.
Represented By: JOHN D. EPPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR, INC.
Represented By: D. BRAD COLLINS
Represented By: H. RANDOLPH SUMNER
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM DAVID CONNER
Represented By: JOEL M. BONDURANT, JR.
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BONDEX INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD V. BENNETT
Represented By: JOSHUA H. BENNETT
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY W. BOUCH
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE, INC.
Represented By: DAVID M. DUKE
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAREMONT CORPORATION
Represented By: JAMES D. GANDY, III
Represented By: JAMES G. KENNEDY
Represented By: CARTER T. LAMBETH
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RILEY POWER, INC.
Represented By: MONICA F. PATTERSON
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: TERESA F. LAZZARONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Represented By: WILLIAM DAVID CONNER
Represented By: JOEL M. BONDURANT, JR.
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JAMES D. GANDY, III
Represented By: CARTER T. LAMBETH
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: DAVID B. YARBOROUGH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEAR SIEGLER, INC.
Represented By: DAVID M. DUKE
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA CORPORATION
Represented By: WILLIAM DAVID CONNER
Represented By: JOEL M. BONDURANT, JR.
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM, INC.
Represented By: IVAN A. GUSTAFSON
Represented By: C. MICHAEL EVERT, JR.
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: ALEXANDER M. BULLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPM, INC.
Represented By: JOSHUA H. BENNETT
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION
Represented By: KIRK G. WARNER
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. KIGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD V. BENNETT
Represented By: JOSHUA H. BENNETT
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: THOMAS FRANK DOUGALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIEDSIGNAL INC. TERMINATED
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELL & GOSSETT
Represented By: MICHAEL C. GRIFFIN
Represented By: MARY E.H. YOOST
Represented By: J. MARK LANGDON
Represented By: MARISA B NYE
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAINTEED CORPORATION
Represented By: WILLIAM DAVID CONNER
Represented By: JOEL M. BONDURANT, JR.
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER-BROOKS
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: STEPHEN B. WILLIAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANCHESTER TANK & EQUIPMENT
Represented By: TIMOTHY W. BOUCH
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: KEITH E. COLTRAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FURNACE ROAD CORPORATION TERMINATED
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION
Represented By: LISA R. GORDON
Represented By: RICHARD B. NORTH, JR.
Represented By: ROBERT A. MEYNARDIE
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL SERVICE INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JAMES D. GANDY, III
Represented By: JAMES G. KENNEDY
Represented By: CARTER T. LAMBETH
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. W. CHESTERTON, INC.
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: MARK S. THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLAS ASBESTOS COMPANY, LTD.
Represented By: ROBERT O. MERIWETHER
Represented By: WILLIAM STUART DAVIES, JR.
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM DAVID CONNER
Represented By: JOEL M. BONDURANT, JR.
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM DAVID CONNER
Represented By: JOEL M. BONDURANT, JR.
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANDCO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: STEPHANIE G. FLYNN
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL RUBBER & SPECIALTY COMPANY
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMPIRE ACE INSULATION MANUFACTURING
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD V. BENNETT
Represented By: JOSHUA H. BENNETT
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDY K. HELMS
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOHN CRANE INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. SMITH
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?