ROBBINS et al v. LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT et al Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that Defendants issued students laptop computers equipped with webcams without disclosing that Defendant School District had the ability to capture webcam images from any location in which the laptop computer was kept.

Plaintiff: BLAKE J. ROBBINS, MICHAEL E. ROBBINS and HOLLY S. ROBBINS
Defendant: LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT, THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT and CHRISTOPHER W. MCGINLEY
Case Number: 2:2010cv00665
Filed: February 16, 2010
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: JAN E. DUBOIS
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1030 The Computer Fraud and Abuse Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2010 108 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 10/14/10. 10/15/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 15, 2010 107 Featured Case ORDER THAT MOTION OF THE NEILL FAMILY TO INTERVENE & FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 10/14/10. 10/15/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 15, 2010 106 Featured Case ORDER THAT MOTION OF COLLEEN AND KENNETH WORTLEY, FRANCES AND DAVID MCCOMB, & CHRISTOPHER AND LORENA CHAMBERS FOR INTERVENTION IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 10/14/10. 10/15/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 15, 2010 105 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLFFS' MOTION FOR INTERIM FEES IN ACCORDANCE WITH 8/30/10 COURT ORDER IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 10/14/10. 10/15/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 15, 2010 104 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLFFS' PETITION FOR LEAVE TO SETTLE OR COMPROMISE MINOR'S ACTION IS GRANTED. THE CLAIMS OF THE MINOR BLAKE ROBBINS, SHALL SETTLE FOR THE SUM OF $175,000.00 & SHALL BE DEPOSITED AS DESCRIBED HEREIN, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 10/14/10. 10/15/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 15, 2010 103 PETITION for leave t settle or compromise minor's action, Certificate of Service, filed by PLFFS by BLAKE J. ROBBINS, HOLLY S. ROBBINS, MICHAEL E. ROBBINS. (kw, )
October 13, 2010 102 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFTS' CROSS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PERMANENT EQUITABLE RELIEF IS DENIED AS MOOT.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 10/12/10.10/13/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND COPIES FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(kw, )
October 13, 2010 101 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 10/12/10.10/13/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND COPIES FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(kw, )
October 12, 2010 100 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE INJUNCTIVE RELIEF GRANTED IN THE COURT'S PRIOR ORDERS IN THIS ACTION IS SUPERSEDED BY THE RELIEF GRANTED IN THIS ORDER. THE LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT & ITS OFFICERS, EMPLOYEES, & AGENTS ARE PERMANENTLY ENJOINED FROM REMOTELY ACTIVATING, OR CAUSING TO BE REMOTELY ACTIVATED, WEBCAMS ON LAPTOP COMPUTERS ISSUED BY LMSD TO ITS STUDENTS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 10/12/10.10/13/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED: COPIES FAXED BY CHAMBERS ON 10/12/10.(kw, )
September 29, 2010 99 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS: Telephone Conference held on 9/21/10 (rf, )
September 14, 2010 98 Minute Entry/Time Sheet, re: Settlement Conference for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER on 9/13/10. (kw, )
September 14, 2010 97 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees in Accordance with 8/30/10 Court Order filed by BLAKE J. ROBBINS, HOLLY S. ROBBINS, MICHAEL E. ROBBINS.Proposed Order, Exhibits and Certificate of Service.(HALTZMAN, MARK)
September 7, 2010 96 Minute Entry/Time Sheet, re: Telephone Conference for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER on 9/2/10. (kw, )
September 1, 2010 95 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Position that the Court Need Not Make Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to Enter Equitable Relief on a Permanent Basis re 81 CROSS MOTION for Entry of Permanent Equitable Relief filed by LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT, CHRISTOPHER W. MCGINLEY, THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AP Article 5/14/10)(LANTIERI, PAUL)
August 30, 2010 ***Set/Reset Deadlines: MOTIONS DUE BY 9/13/2010. (kp, )
August 30, 2010 94 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR INTERIM ATTORNEY FEES IS HEREBY GRANTED IN PART, AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PARTIES THROUGH COUNSEL SHALL MEET AND CONFER IN AN EFFORT TO REACH AGREEMENT ON AN AMENDED FEE MOTION THAT IS IN CONFORMANCE WITH THE MEMORANDUM BY 9/8/2010, AND SUBMITTED TO COURT BY 9/13/2010. IN THE EVENT NO AGREEMENT IS REACHED, PLAINTIFFS SHALL SUBMIT THEIR AMENDED FEE MOTION BY 9/13/2010, AND DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE THEIR RESPONSE BY 9/20/2010. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 8/30/2010. 8/30/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED, FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(kp, )
August 30, 2010 93 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 8/30/2010. 8/30/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
August 24, 2010 92 REPLY to Response to Motion re 84 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. Section 1988 AMENDED filed by BLAKE J. ROBBINS, HOLLY S. ROBBINS, MICHAEL E. ROBBINS. (HALTZMAN, MARK)
August 23, 2010 91 REPLY to Response to Motion re 84 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. Section 1988 filed by BLAKE J. ROBBINS, HOLLY S. ROBBINS, MICHAEL E. ROBBINS. (HALTZMAN, MARK)
August 18, 2010 90 Memorandum of Law in Support of the Position that Findings of Fact and Conclusions o Law are Required to Be Made Prior to the Isuance of a Permanant Injunction, Regardless of Whether said Injunction is Opposed or Issued by Consent re 81 CROSS MOTION for Entry of Permanent Equitable Relief filed by BLAKE J. ROBBINS, HOLLY S. ROBBINS, MICHAEL E. ROBBINS. (HALTZMAN, MARK)
August 12, 2010 89 Supplemental Exhibit E to Motion filed by BLAKE J. ROBBINS, HOLLY S. ROBBINS, MICHAEL E. ROBBINS, Certificate of Service.(HALTZMAN, MARK) Modified on 8/13/2010 (nd).
August 12, 2010 88 RESPONSE in Opposition re 84 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. Section 1988 filed by LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT, CHRISTOPHER W. MCGINLEY, THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- 5/14/10 AP Article, # 2 Exhibit B -- Medlawguard Forensics Invoice)(LANTIERI, PAUL)
July 30, 2010 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS: Status Conference held on 7/29/2010. Court Reporter: ESR. (kp, )
July 30, 2010 86 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE TIME IN WHICH PLAINTIFFS MUST RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PERMANENT EQUITABLE RELIEF (DOC NO 81) IS EXTENDED UNIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR MEMORANDUM (DOC NO 85) IS HEREBY GRANTED. THE PARTIES AND COUNSEL SHALL MEET IN AN EFFORT TO RESOLVE ANY ISSUES REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR INTERIM ATTORNEY FEES (DOC NO 84), AND SHALL JOINTLY REPORT TO THE COURT (BY LETTER TO CHAMBERS, ROOM 12613)BY 8/6/2010. IF NO AGREEMENT IS REACHED, DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE THEIR RESPONSE BY 8/12/2010. THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT MEMORANDA OF LAW, PLAINTIFFS BY 8/18/2010, DEFENDANTS BY 9/1/2010. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 7/29/2010. 7/30/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(kp, )
July 28, 2010 85 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration filed by LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT, CHRISTOPHER W. MCGINLEY, THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(IGOE, WILLIAM)
July 26, 2010 84 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. Section 1988 filed by BLAKE J. ROBBINS, HOLLY S. ROBBINS, MICHAEL E. ROBBINS.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(HALTZMAN, MARK)
July 23, 2010 83 RESPONSE in Opposition re 73 First MOTION to Certify Class filed by CHRISTOPHER CHAMBERS, LORENA CHAMBERS, DAVID MCCOMB, FRANCES MCCOMB, COLLEEN WORTLEY, KENNETH WORTLEY, Certificate of Service. (BONI, MICHAEL) Modified on 7/26/2010 (lisad, ).
July 22, 2010 82 Featured Case ORDER THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 7/29/2010 AT 2:00 P.M. IN CHAMBERS, ROOM 12613, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 7/21/10. 7/23/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED: COPIES FAXED BY CHAMBERS ON 7/22/10.(kw, )
July 16, 2010 81 Memorandum of Law in Opposition re 73 First MOTION to Certify Class and CROSS-MOTION for Entry of Permanent Equitable Relief with Memorandum in Support filed by LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT, CHRISTOPHER W. MCGINLEY, THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: # 1 Cross-Motion for Entry of Permanent Equitable Relief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Cross-Motion and Permanent Equitable Relief, # 3 Exhibit A - Report of Independent Investigation Regarding Remote Monitoring of Student Laptop Computers by the Lower Merion School District, # 4 Exhibit B (part 1 of 2) - L-3 Report, # 5 Exhibit B (part 2 of 2) - L-3 Report, # 6 Exhibit C - Letter, # 7 Exhibit D - Letter, # 8 Exhibit E - News Article, # 9 Exhibit F - News Article)(LANTIERI, PAUL) Modified on 7/19/2010 (nd).
July 13, 2010 80 Letter from Neill W. Clark to Judge DuBois re: Extension of time to file response to motion for class certification. (amas)
July 13, 2010 79 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE REQUEST OF THE WORTLEY INTERVENORS TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION ON OR BEFORE JULY 23, 2010, IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 7/13/2010. 7/14/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
July 7, 2010 78 Fax Letter from Mark S. Haltzman, Esq., dated 7/6/10, re: In receipt of Paul Lantieri's Request for an extension of time to respond to plff's motion for class certification, etc. (kw, )
July 7, 2010 77 Fax Letter from Paul Lantieri, III, Esq., dated 7/6/10, re: Request for an extension of time until 7/16/10 to respond to plff's motion for class certification. (kw, )
July 7, 2010 76 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFENSE COUNSEL'S REQUEST FOR AN ADDITIONAL EXTENSION OF TIME TO 7/16/2010, BY WHICH TO RESPOND TO PLFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IS GRANTED, & THE TIME FOR RESPONDING TO PLFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IS EXTENDED TO 7/16/2010, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 7/6/10. 7/7/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
June 16, 2010 75 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFENSE COUNSEL'S REQUEST FOR A 2 WEEK EXTENSION OF THE DATE FOR RESPONDING TO PLFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IS GRANTED & THE TIME FOR RESPONDING TO PLFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IS EXTENDED FOR 2 WEEKS FROM 6/24/2010 TO 7/8/2010. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 6/16/10. 6/16/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
June 9, 2010 74 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLFFS' COMPUTER FORENSIC EXPERT, JOHN STEINBACH, SHALL BE PROVIDED THE OPPORTUNITY TO VERIFY A SUBSSET OF FINDINGS REPORTED BY DEFTS' FORENSIC CONSULTANT, L-3 SERVICES, INC. MR. STEINBACH' REVIEW WILL BE PERFORMED AT L-3'S OFFICES AT A MUTUALLY AGREED UPON TIME & DATE, IT BEING AGREED THAT SUCH REVIEW WILL BEGIN DURING THE WEEK OF 6/7/2010, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 6/9/10. 6/10/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
June 7, 2010 73 First MOTION to Certify Class filed by BLAKE J. ROBBINS, HOLLY S. ROBBINS, MICHAEL E. ROBBINS.Memorandum, Certificates of Counsel and Certificate of Service.(HALTZMAN, MARK)
May 28, 2010 72 Reply Memorandum of law in support of motion of Colleen and Kenneth Wortley, Frances and David McComb, and Christopher and Lorena Chambers for intervention, filed by CHRISTOPHER CHAMBERS, LORENA CHAMBERS, DAVID MCCOMB, FRANCES MCCOMB, COLLEEN WORTLEY, KENNETH WORTLEY. (kw, )
May 28, 2010 71 Featured Case ORDER THAT MOTION OF WORTLEY INTERVENORS TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR INTERVENTION MOTION IS GRANTED. THE REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF COLLEEN & KENNETH WORTLEY, FRANCES & DAVID MCCOMMB, & CHRISTOPHER & LORENA CHAMBERS FOR INTERVENTION, SHALL BE DOCKETED BY THE DEPUTY CLERK.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 5/28/10.6/1/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED: COPIES FAXED BY CHAMBERS ON 5/28/10.(kw, )
May 28, 2010 70 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of their Intervention Motion filed by CHRISTOPHER CHAMBERS, LORENA CHAMBERS, DAVID MCCOMB, FRANCES MCCOMB, COLLEEN WORTLEY, KENNETH WORTLEY.Reply Memorandum, Certificate of Service, Proposed Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply Memo of Law in Support of Motion for Intervention, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(CLARK, NEILL)
May 17, 2010 69 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLFFS' MOTION TO MODIFY COURT ORDER OF 2/22/2010, AS AMENDED BY ORDER OF 3/10/10, AS SUPPLEMENTED BY ORDER OF 4/14/2010, IS MARKED "WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE." SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 5/14/10. 5/17/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 14, 2010 68 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE INJUNCTIVE RELIEF GRANTED IN THE ORDER ENTERED ON 2/23/2010, AS AMENDED BY THE ORDER ENTERED ON 3/11/2010, & AS SUPPLEMENTED BY THE ORDER ENTERED ON 4/15/2010, AS AMENDED BY THE ORDER ENTERED ON 5/10/2010, SHALL REMAIN IN FULL FORCE & EFFECT EXCEPT TO THE EXTENT THAT IT IS SUPERSEDED BY THE RELIEF GRANTED IN THIS ORDER. THE LOWER MERION SCHOL DISTRICT & ITS OFFICERS, EMPLOYEES & AGENTS ARE ENJOINED FROM REMOTELY ACTIVATING, OR CAUSING TO BE REMOTELY ACTIVATED, WEBCAMS ON LAPTOP COMPUTERS ISSUED BY LMSD TO ITS STUDENTS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 5/14/10. 5/14/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 14, 2010 67 Featured Case ORDER THAT TO THE EXTENT THAT THE LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT OR ITS AGENTS ARE IN POSSESSION OF WEBCAM PHOTOGRAPHS &/OR SCREENSHOTS CAPTURED FROM CERTAIN LAPTOP COMPUTERS ISSUED BY THE DISTRICT TO ITS HIGH SCHOOL STUDENTS, STUDENTS WHO POSSESSED THOSE LAPTOPS WHILE THEFTTRACK WAS ACTIVATED, &/OR THE AFFECTED STUDENTS' PARENTS OR GUARDIANS, SHALL BE PROVIDED AN OPPORTUNITY TO VIEW SUCH IMAGES PURSUANT TO THE TERMS OF THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 5/14/10. 5/14/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 11, 2010 66 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE ORDER OF MAY 7, 2010 IS AMENDED SO AS TO PROVIDE THAT, IN ADDITION TO AMENDING THE ORDER OF FEBRUARY 20, 2010, AS AMENDED BY THE ORDER OF MARCH 10, 2010, THE MAY 7, 2010 ORDER AMENDS THE ORDER OF APRIL 14, 2010. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, EXCEPTING ONLY AS NOTED ABOVE, THE ORDER OF MAY 7, 2010, CONTINUES IN EFFECT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 5/11/10. 5/12/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(kp, )
May 11, 2010 65 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BY 6/7/2010.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 5/11/10. 5/12/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(kp, )
May 11, 2010 64 Letter from Mark S. Haltzman, Re: request for extension of time to file for motion for class certification. (kp, )
May 11, 2010 63 RESPONSE to Motion re 21 MOTION to Intervene, 36 Emergency MOTION to InterveneEmergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by BLAKE J. ROBBINS, HOLLY S. ROBBINS, MICHAEL E. ROBBINS. (HALTZMAN, MARK)
May 11, 2010 62 RESPONSE to Motion re 21 MOTION to Intervene, 36 Emergency MOTION to InterveneEmergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT, CHRISTOPHER W. MCGINLEY, THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT. (LANTIERI, PAUL)
May 10, 2010 61 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO MODIFY THE COURT'S ORDER IS GRANTED. THE ORDER OF 2/20/2010, AS AMENDED BY THE ORDER OF 3/10/2010, IS FURTHER AMENDED, SO AS TO PERMIT THE GOVERNMENT ACCESS TO THE COMPUTERS AND SERVERS OF THE LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT NOW IN CUSTODY OF LEVEL 3 COMMUNICATIONS, AND TO ANY DATA CONTAINED IN SUCH COMPUTERS AND SERVERS, AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 5/7/2010.5/10/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED; AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(jaa, )
May 5, 2010 60 RESPONSE to Motion re 49 MOTION to Modify Plaintiffs' Response to the Government's Motion to Modify the Court's Order of April 14, 2010 filed by BLAKE J. ROBBINS, HOLLY S. ROBBINS, MICHAEL E. ROBBINS, Certificate of Service. (HALTZMAN, MARK) Modified on 5/6/2010 (nd, ).
May 5, 2010 59 First MOTION to Modify Motion to Modify Court Order of February 22, 2010, as Amended by Court Order of March 10, 2010 as Supplemented by Order of April 14, 2010 filed by BLAKE J. ROBBINS, HOLLY S. ROBBINS, MICHAEL E. ROBBINS.Certificate of Service.(HALTZMAN, MARK)
May 4, 2010 58 RESPONSE to Motion re 49 MOTION to Modify Court's Order of April 14, 2010 filed by LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT, CHRISTOPHER W. MCGINLEY, THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT. (LANTIERI, PAUL)
April 27, 2010 57 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT CAROL CAFIERO'S TWO COMPUTERS WILL BE PROMPTLY PROVIDED TO PLFF'S EXPERT, VESTIGE, LTD. VESTIGE, LTD. SHALL MAKE A MIRROR IMAGE OF THE HARD DRIVES OF THE TWO COMPUTERS. VESTIGE SHALL RETAIN POSSESSION OF THE VESTIGE COPIES & NOT DELIVER OR DISCLOSE THE CONTENTS OF SAME TO PLFFS, THEIR COUNSEL, OR ANYONE ELSE, SUBJECT TO FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 4/27/10. 4/28/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
April 27, 2010 56 Featured Case ORDER THAT PARTIES SHALL, ON OR BEFORE THE CLOSE OF BUSINESS ON 5/4/2010, FILE & SERVE RESPONSES TO MOTION TO MODIFY, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 4/26/10. 4/27/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
April 26, 2010 55 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE ORDER OF 4/14/2010, IS AMENDED AS FOLLOWS: THE DATE FOR SUBMITTING A PROPOSED AGREED-UPON PROTECTIVE ORDER AS REQUIRED BY THE ORDER OF 4/14/2010, PARAGRAPH 2, PAGE 2, IS EXTENDED FROM 4/26/2010 TO THE CLOSE OF BUSINESS ON 4/28/2010, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 4/23/10. 4/27/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED: COPIES FAXED BY CHAMBERS ON 4/26/10.(kw, )
April 23, 2010 54 Minute Entry, re: Telephone Conference for proceedings held before HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS on 4/23/10. Court Reporter: ESR. (kw, )
April 23, 2010 53 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLFFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER DATED 4/1/2010, IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 4/23/10.4/26/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
April 23, 2010 52 Sealed Document Received. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kw, )
April 23, 2010 51 Sealed Document Received. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kw, )
April 23, 2010 50 NOTICE of Appearance by MARY KAY COSTELLO, MICHAEL L. LEVY on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (kw, )
April 23, 2010 49 MOTION TO MODIFY THE COURT'S ORDER, STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(kw, )
April 21, 2010 48 Minute/Time Sheet, re: Settlement Conference for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER on 4/21/10. (kw, )
April 20, 2010 47 Minute Entry. re: Telephone Status Conference for proceedings held before HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS on 4/19/10. Court Reporter: ESR. (kw, )
April 20, 2010 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re 44 MOTION for Sanctions Against Carol Cafiero for Failure to Comply with April 1, 2010 Order filed by CAROLYN CAFIERO. (Attachments: # 1 memorandum of law, # 2 certificate of service)(MANDRACCHIA, CHARLES)
April 5, 2010 37 NOTICE of Appearance by THERESA E. LOSCALZO on behalf of EVAN A. NEILL, RICHARD A. NEILL, ELAINE LOUISE REED with Certificate of Service(LOSCALZO, THERESA)
April 5, 2010 36 Emergency MOTION to Intervene, Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by EVAN A. NEILL, RICHARD A. NEILL, ELAINE LOUISE REED.Brief, Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Complaint in Intervention, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(SHAPIRO, STEPHEN)
April 1, 2010 35 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CAROL CAFIERO IS GRANTED & MOTION OF CAROL CAFIERO TO QUASH SUBPOENA IS DENIED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 4/1/10.4/2/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
March 31, 2010 34 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO MOTION TO INTERVENE IS GRANTED. PLFFS SHALL FILE & SERVE THEIR RESPONSE TO THE MOTION FOR INTERVENTION ON OR BEFORE 4/28/2010, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 3/30/10. 4/1/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
March 30, 2010 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re 24 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by BLAKE J. ROBBINS, HOLLY S. ROBBINS, MICHAEL E. ROBBINS. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoena, # 2 proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(HALTZMAN, MARK)
March 29, 2010 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CAROLYN CAFIERO re 31 Memorandum, 30 Response in Opposition to Motion to compel her appearance at deposition (MANDRACCHIA, CHARLES)
March 29, 2010 31 Memorandum of Law in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Compel Appearance of Carol Cafiero at Deposition filed by CAROLYN CAFIERO. (MANDRACCHIA, CHARLES)
March 29, 2010 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Compel Appearance of Carol Cafiero at Deposition filed by CAROLYN CAFIERO. (MANDRACCHIA, CHARLES)
March 23, 2010 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Motion to Intervene filed by CHRISTOPHER CHAMBERS, LORENA CHAMBERS, DAVID MCCOMB, FRANCES MCCOMB, COLLEEN WORTLEY, KENNETH WORTLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(BONI, MICHAEL)
March 22, 2010 28 NOTICE of Appearance by BART D. COHEN on behalf of CHRISTOPHER CHAMBERS, LORENA CHAMBERS, DAVID MCCOMB, FRANCES MCCOMB, COLLEEN WORTLEY, KENNETH WORTLEY with Certificate of Service(COHEN, BART)
March 22, 2010 27 NOTICE of Appearance by NEILL WILSON CLARK on behalf of CHRISTOPHER CHAMBERS, LORENA CHAMBERS, DAVID MCCOMB, FRANCES MCCOMB, COLLEEN WORTLEY, KENNETH WORTLEY with Certificate of Service(CLARK, NEILL)
March 22, 2010 26 RESPONSE to Motion re 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Motion to Intervene filed by LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT, CHRISTOPHER W. MCGINLEY, THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT. (LANTIERI, PAUL)
March 22, 2010 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Motion to Intervene filed by BLAKE J. ROBBINS, HOLLY S. ROBBINS, MICHAEL E. ROBBINS.Certificate of Service.(HALTZMAN, MARK)
March 19, 2010 23 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID E. ROMINE on behalf of CHRISTOPHER CHAMBERS, LORENA CHAMBERS, DAVID MCCOMB, FRANCES MCCOMB, COLLEEN WORTLEY, KENNETH WORTLEY with Certificate of Service(ROMINE, DAVID)
March 19, 2010 22 NOTICE of Appearance by LARRY D. SILVER on behalf of CHRISTOPHER CHAMBERS, LORENA CHAMBERS, DAVID MCCOMB, FRANCES MCCOMB, COLLEEN WORTLEY, KENNETH WORTLEY with Certificate of Service(SILVER, LARRY)
March 18, 2010 24 MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATION OF COUNSEL, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY CAROLYN CAFIERO.(kw, )
March 18, 2010 21 MOTION to Intervene filed by CHRISTOPHER CHAMBERS, LORENA CHAMBERS, DAVID MCCOMB, FRANCES MCCOMB, COLLEEN WORTLEY, KENNETH WORTLEY.order, complaint in intervention, brief, declaration, certificate of service. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment to Motion, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Memorandum of Law, # 4 Declaration, # 5 Certificate of Service)(BONI, MICHAEL)
March 18, 2010 20 MOTION to Compel Appearance of Carol Cafiero at Deposition filed by BLAKE J. ROBBINS, HOLLY S. ROBBINS, MICHAEL E. ROBBINS.Certification of Counsel Pursuant to Rule 37(a), proposed Order and Certificate of Service.(HALTZMAN, MARK)
March 10, 2010 19 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFTS HAVE UNTIL 4/26/2010 TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT. PLFFS SHALL FILE & SERVE A RESPONSE TO ANY MOTION TO DISMISS WITHIN 30 DAYS OF SERVICE OF ANY SUCH MOTION, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 3/10/10. 3/11/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
February 24, 2010 18 Minute Entry, re: Telephone Conference for proceedings held before HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS on 2/23/10. (kw, )
February 24, 2010 17 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK SCHWARTZ on behalf of BLAKE J. ROBBINS, HOLLY S. ROBBINS, MICHAEL E. ROBBINS with Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(SCHWARTZ, FRANK)
February 23, 2010 16 Minute Entry, re: Telephone Conference for proceedings held before HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS on 2/22/10. Court Reporter: ESR. (kw, )
February 23, 2010 15 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFTS SHALL FILE & SERVE A RESPONSE(S) TO THE COMPLAINT WITHIN 30 DAYS; PLFFS SHALL FILE & SERVE A RESPONSE(S) TO ANY MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITHIN 30 DAYS OF SERVICE OF ANY SUCH MOTIONS, ETC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT INITIAL DISCLOSURE UNDER F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) SHALL BE COMPLETED WITHIN 30 DAYS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 2/22/10. 2/23/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
February 23, 2010 14 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF AN EMERGENCY TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER & IMPOSITION OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 65 IS MARKED "WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE." SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 2/22/10.2/23/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
February 22, 2010 13 Brief of Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union of Pennsylvania supporting issuance of injunction, filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF PA. (kw, )
February 22, 2010 12 Featured Case ORDER THAT AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF PENNSYLVANIA'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AS AMICUS CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF INJUNCTION IS GRANTED & AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF PA, THROUGH COUNSEL, SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PARTICIPATE IN THE HEARING ON 2/22/10, ON PLFF'S MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF AN EMERGENCY TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 65. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 2/22/10. 2/23/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
February 22, 2010 11 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT LMSD, THEIR EMPLOYEES, AGENTS, SERVANTS & REPRESENTATIVES ARE PROHIBITED FROM REMOTELY ACTIVATING ANY & ALL WEB CAMS EMBEDDED IN LAP TOP COMPUTERS ISSUED TO STUDENTS WITHIN THE LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT OR FROM REMOTELY TAKING SCREENSHOTS OF SUCH COMPUTERS. DURING THE PENDENCY OF THIS ACTION, LMSD & ITS EMPLOYEES, AGENTS, SERVANTS & REPRESENTATIVES SHALL NOT CONTACT ANY MEMBER OF THE PUTATIVE CLASS REGARDING THE ISSUES RAISED BY PLFFS' COMPLAINT, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 2/20/10. 2/23/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
February 22, 2010 10 Minute Entry, re: Telephone Conference for proceedings held before HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS on 2/22/2010. Court Reporter: ESR. (kw, )
February 22, 2010 9 Featured Case ORDER THAT A HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF AN EMERGENCY TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER IS SCHEDULED FOR 2/22/2010 02:30 PM IN COURTROOM 12-B BEFORE HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 2/22/10. 2/22/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(kk, )
February 22, 2010 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MARY CATHERINE ROPER on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF PA with Certificate of Service(ROPER, MARY)
February 22, 2010 7 MOTION to File Amicus Brief filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF PA.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Amicus Brief, # 3 Certificate of Service)(ROPER, MARY)
February 20, 2010 6 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM B. IGOE on behalf of LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT, CHRISTOPHER W. MCGINLEY, THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT with Certificate of Service(IGOE, WILLIAM)
February 20, 2010 5 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL LANTIERI, III on behalf of LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT, CHRISTOPHER W. MCGINLEY, THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT with Certificate of Service(LANTIERI, PAUL)
February 20, 2010 4 NOTICE of Appearance by HENRY E. HOCKEIMER, JR on behalf of LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT, CHRISTOPHER W. MCGINLEY, THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT with Certificate of Service(HOCKEIMER, HENRY)
February 20, 2010 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ARTHUR MAKADON on behalf of LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT, CHRISTOPHER W. MCGINLEY, THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT with Certificate of Service(MAKADON, ARTHUR)
February 19, 2010 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Imposition of Permanent Injunction Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65 filed by BLAKE J. ROBBINS, MICHAEL E. ROBBINS, HOLLY S. ROBBINS.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Brief in Support of Motion, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service for Motion)(LEVIN, STEPHEN)
February 16, 2010 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BLAKE J. ROBBINS, MICHAEL E. ROBBINS, HOLLY S. ROBBINS. (cw, )
February 16, 2010 Summons Issued as to LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT, THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT, CHRISTOPHER W. MCGINLEY. Three Forwarded To: Counsel on 2/17/10 (cw, )
February 16, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT, THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT, CHRISTOPHER W. MCGINLEY ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number PPE017742.), filed by BLAKE J. ROBBINS, MICHAEL E. ROBBINS, HOLLY S. ROBBINS.(cw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBBINS et al v. LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLAKE J. ROBBINS
Represented By: MARK S. HALTZMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL E. ROBBINS
Represented By: MARK S. HALTZMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOLLY S. ROBBINS
Represented By: MARK S. HALTZMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER W. MCGINLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?