UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ex rel, et al., v. ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., et al.,
Plaintiff: |
MAX H. WEATHERSBY, JR and MK LITIGATION PARTNERSHIP 2011, LLP |
Defendant: |
ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS HOLDINGS, INC. and JAMES R. HAILEY |
Intervenor_plaintiff: |
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA |
Case Number: |
2:2010cv02039 |
Filed: |
May 4, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Philadelphia Office |
County: |
Philadelphia |
Presiding Judge: |
STEWART DALZELL |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
31 U.S.C. § 3729 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 15, 2015 |
Filing
79
ORDER THAT THE STAY ENACATED BY ORDER OF THIS COURT ON 3/27/2014 IS LIFTED. RYANS MOTION FOR A RELATOR'S SHARE AWARD IS GRANTED FOR WHICH SHE SHALL RECEIVE A RELATOR'S SHARE AWARD OF 24% AND THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE C.A. NOS. 05-3450, 10-2039 AND 11-7767 FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 7/15/2015. 7/15/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED, MAILED TO DHILLON.(sg, )
|
October 22, 2014 |
Filing
70
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS ARE UNSEALED: THE COURT ORDER OF 9/19/2005 GRANTING AN EXTENSION OF THE SEAL [#3]; THE COURT ORDER OF 3/14/2006 RE-ASSIGNING THIS CASE [#5]; THE COURT ORDER OF 9/15/2006, RELATING TO THE SEAL [#6]; TH E STATE OF MONTANA'S NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION [#9]; THE COURT ORDER OF 11/15/2010, PERMITTING LIMITED DISCLOSURE OF COMPLAINTS TO THE RELATORS [#11]; THE PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS AND RELATED ORDERS FILED AND ENTERED IN JANUARY AND MARCH 2011 [#S 13,14,15,16,17 AND 18]; AND THE COURT ORDER OF 1/13/2012, WHICH PERMITTED THE LIMITED DISCLOSURE OF THE COMPLAINTS TO DEFENDANT ENDO. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS REMAIN UNDER SEAL: THE FIRST MOTION FILED BY THE GOVERNMENT ON 9/15/2005, FOR AN EXTENSION OF THE SEAL AND AN EXTENSION OF THE EVALUATOR PERIOD [#2]; THE UNOPPOSED MOTION FILED BY THE GOVERNMENT ON 3/13/2006, FOR AN EXTENSION OF THE SEAL, AND TO PLACE THE MATTER IN CIVIL SUSPENSE [#4]; THE EX P ARTE APPLICATION FOR LIMITED DISCLOSURE OF THE COMPLAINT FILED BY THE GOVERNMENT ON 11/15/2010 [#10]; THE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LIMITED DISCLOSURE OF THE COMPLAINT FILED BY THE GOVERNMENT ON 11/29/2010 [#19]; AND ANY AND ALL OTHER EX PARTE SUBMISSIONS AND CORRESPONDENCE OF THE GOVERNMENT TO THIS COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 10/22/2014. 10/22/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO DHILLON AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
|
October 1, 2014 |
Filing
67
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT RELATOR GURSHEEL S. DHILLON'S PRO SE "MOTION TO SET ASIDE COURTS [SIC] DECISION AND FOR RECONSIDERATION OF APPEALATE [SIC] BOND BY THREE JUDGE PANEL" [#60] IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 10/1/2014. 10/2/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO DHILLON AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
|
August 25, 2014 |
Filing
63
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT RELATOR GURSHEEL S. DHILLON'S PRO SE "MOTION TO SET ASIDE THE COURTS [SIC] DECISION AND MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL ORAL ARGUEMENT [SIC] REQUESTED" IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 8/25/2014. 8/26/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO DHILLON, AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
|
June 23, 2014 |
Filing
43
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF, PEGGY RYAN'S "MOTION TO DETERMINE THAT RELATOR PEGGY RYAN IS THE SOLE RELATOR ENTITLED TO A RELATOR'S SHARE AWARD" IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF RYAN IS THE SOLE RELATOR ELIGIBLE TO RECEIVE A PORTION OF THE SETTLEMENT AWARD UNDER 31 USC SECTION 3730(d)(1). SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 6/23/2014. 6/24/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?