NAZARETH HOSPITAL et al v. SEBELIUS
Plaintiff: NAZARETH HOSPITAL and ST. AGNES MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: KATHLEEN SEBELIUS
Case Number: 2:2010cv03513
Filed: July 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: EDMUND V. LUDWIG
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS NAZARETH HOSPITAL AND ST. AGNES MEDICAL CENTER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED, AND THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED. THE DECISION OF DEFENDANT KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, SECR ETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, OF 9/11/2012, IS REVERSED, AND JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFFS AND AGAINST DEFENDANT, AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDMUND V. LUDWIG ON 4/8/2013. 4/8/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(md)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS NAZARETH HOSPITAL AND ST. AGNES MEDICAL CENTER FOR AMENDMENT AND CLARIFICATION OF THE COURT'S 7/12/2012 ORDER (DOC, #41) IS GRANTED IN PART, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDMUND V. LUDWIG ON 10/16/2012. 10/16/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, )
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DECIDE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO AMEND AND CLARIFY ORDER OF 7/12/2012 (DOC. #48) IS DENIED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDMUND V. LUDWIG ON 8/9/2012; 8/9/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, )
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDMUND V. LUDWIG ON 8/7/2012; 8/7/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT THE SECRETARY SHALL MAKE FINDINGS AND CONCLUSIONS AND RETURN THE REMANDED DECISION BY 9/14/2012, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDMUND V. LUDWIG ON 7/11/2012; 7/12/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NAZARETH HOSPITAL et al v. SEBELIUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAZARETH HOSPITAL
Represented By: MARK H. GALLANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. AGNES MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: MARK H. GALLANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN SEBELIUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?