GREENE v. STREET et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: CARL R. GREENE
Defendant: JOHN F. STREET, JANNIE L. BLACKWELL, DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING and NELLIE W. REYNOLDS
Case Number: 2:2010cv04529
Filed: September 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: RONALD L. BUCKWALTER
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2013 Filing 143 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER: Settlement Conference held on 2/22/2013. (sg, )
February 27, 2013 Filing 142 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER: Settlement Conference held on 2/21/2013. (sg, )
February 25, 2013 Filing 141 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re 140 Transcript - PDF, 137 Transcript - PDF, 139 Transcript - PDF, 138 Transcript - PDF, 2/26/2013 Entered and Copies Emailed. (sg, )
February 25, 2013 Filing 140 TRANSCRIPT of TRIAL held on 2/4/2013, before Judge RONALD L. BUCKWALTER. Court Reporter/Transcriber MATTHEW HIGGINS. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2013. (sg, )
February 25, 2013 Filing 139 TRANSCRIPT of TRIAL held on 1/31/2013, before Judge RONALD L. BUCKWALTER. Court Reporter/Transcriber MATTHEW HIGGINS. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2013. (sg, )
February 25, 2013 Filing 138 TRANSCRIPT of TRIAL held on 1/30/2013, before Judge RONALD L. BUCKWALTER. Court Reporter/Transcriber MATTHEW HIGGINS. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2013. (sg, )
February 25, 2013 Filing 137 TRANSCRIPT of TRIAL held on 1/29/2013, before Judge RONALD L. BUCKWALTER. Court Reporter/Transcriber MATTHEW HIGGINS. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2013. (sg, )
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 02/25/2013. 02/25/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(mh, )
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDERED THAT THE TRIAL DATE SET FOR 2/25/2013 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 14A BEFORE HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 2/15/2013. 2/15/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
February 14, 2013 Filing 134 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER: Settlement Conference held on 2/13/2013. (sg, )
February 5, 2013 Filing 133 Audio File 2-5-13 1:16PM, regarding Non Jury Trial Day (5) PM SESSION held on 2-5-13, before HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER (jlr, )
February 5, 2013 Filing 132 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER: Settlement Conference held on 2/4/2013. (sg, )
February 5, 2013 Filing 131 Audio File 2-5-13 9:37AM, regarding Non Jury Trial Day (5) AM SESSION held on 2-5-13, before HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER (jlr, )
February 4, 2013 Filing 130 Audio File 2/4/2013 1:47:50pm-3:50:44pm, regarding Civil Trial-testimony from pm session day 4 held on 2/4/2013, before HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER (ch, )
February 4, 2013 Filing 129 Audio File 2-4-13 9:35AM, regarding Non Jury Trial Day (4) AM SESSION held on 2-4-13, before HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER (jlr, )
February 1, 2013 Filing 128 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER: Bench Trial DAY 3 held on 1/31/2013. Court Reporter: MATTHEW J. HIGGINS. (kp, )
February 1, 2013 Filing 127 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER: Bench Trial DAY 2 held on 1/30/2013. Court Reporter: MATTHEW J. HIGGINS. (kp, )
February 1, 2013 Filing 126 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER: Bench Trial DAY 1 held on 1/29/2013. Court Reporter: MATTHEW J. HIGGINS. (kp, )
February 1, 2013 Filing 125 Audio File 1-30-13 4:10PM, regarding Non Jury Trial Day (2) PM Session held on 1-30-13, before HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER (jlr, )
February 1, 2013 Filing 124 Audio File 1-31-13 9:37AM, regarding Non Jury Trial Day (3) held on 1-31-13, before HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER (jlr, )
January 31, 2013 Filing 123 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER: Settlement Conference held on 1/30/2013. (sg, )
January 30, 2013 Filing 122 Audio File 1-30-13 9:29AM, regarding Civil Non Jury Trial Day (2) held on 1-30-13, before HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER (jlr, )
January 29, 2013 Filing 121 Audio File 1/29/2013 1:54PM, regarding CIVIL NON-JURY TRIAL DAY 1 - OPENING STATEMENTS held on 1/29/2013, before HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER (uh, )
January 27, 2013 Filing 120 Exhibit List Second Revised Trial Exhibit List by CARL R. GREENE.. Certificate of Service (HAINES, CLIFFORD)
January 27, 2013 Filing 119 Exhibit List Amended by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY.. Certificate of Service (AHUMADA, LORENA)
January 26, 2013 Filing 118 REVISED PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by CARL R. GREENE. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WARNER, LAUREN) Modified on 1/28/2013 (lisad, ).
January 25, 2013 Filing 117 Exhibit List by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY.. Certificate of Service (AHUMADA, LORENA)
January 25, 2013 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by HOLLIE B. KNOX on behalf of CARL R. GREENE with certificate of service(KNOX, HOLLIE)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION OF PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLC TO QUASH SUBPOENAS IS GRANTED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 1/24/2013. 1/25/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
January 24, 2013 Filing 114 RESPONSE in Opposition re 110 MOTION to Quash and Certificate of Service filed by CARL R. GREENE. (HAINES, CLIFFORD)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE (DOCUMENT NO. 77) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ALL TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE (DOCUMENT NO. 78) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ALL TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE (DOCUMENT NO 79) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE (DOCUMENT NO. 80) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE (DOCUMENT NO. 81) IS GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE (DOCUMENT NO. 83) IS GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE (DOCUMENT NO. 84) IS DENIED WITH PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE (DOCUMENT NO. 85) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE (DOCUMENT NO. 86) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE (DOCUMENT NO. 87) IS GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY (DOCUMENT NO. 88) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING APPLICATION (DOCUMENT NO. 89) IS GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 1/23/2013.1/23/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jmf, )
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOCUMENT NUMBER 102) TO QUASH SUBPOENAS AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED ON BEHALF OF THE HONORABLE MICHAEL A. NUTTER AND THE HONORABLE ALAN BUTKOVITZ IS GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SUBPOENAS DIRECTING THE APPEARANCE AND TESTIMONY OF MAYER NUTTER AND CONTROLLER BUTKOVITZ AT TRIAL OF THIS MATTER ARE HEREBY QUASHED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 1/23/2013.1/23/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jmf, )
January 22, 2013 Filing 111 RESPONSE in Opposition re 102 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas Certificate of Service filed by CARL R. GREENE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(HAINES, CLIFFORD)
January 18, 2013 Filing 110 MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS, filed by PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK, LLC, MARK FAZLOLLAH, JENNIFER LIN, WENDY RUDERMAN. PROPOSED ORDER, MEMO, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, EXHIBITS..(sg, )
January 18, 2013 Filing 109 Objections by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY to Portions of the Deposition Testimony of Melissa Shingles. (AHUMADA, LORENA)
January 18, 2013 Filing 108 Objections by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY to Portions of the Deposition Testimony of Carolyn Griffith Amrein. (AHUMADA, LORENA)
January 18, 2013 Filing 107 REPLY to Response to Motion re 89 MOTION in Limine Regarding the Attorney Client Privilege, 88 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Women Allegedly Harassed by Plaintiff, 83 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Pennsylvania Human Relations Commission's Finding of Probable Cause in the matter of Elizabeth Helm, 85 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Kelvin Jeremiah, Elias Rosario, Stacey Thomas, Estelle Richman, and Robert Sullivan filed by CARL R. GREENE. (HAINES, CLIFFORD)
January 16, 2013 Filing 106 REPLY Brief in Further Support re 81 MOTION in Limine to Exclude News Reporters as Witnesses and Emails Between Reporters and John F. Street filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY. Certificate of Service. (AHUMADA, LORENA) Modified on 1/17/2013 (lisad, ).
January 16, 2013 Filing 105 REPLY Brief in Further Support re 79 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Concerning Motives filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY. Certificate of Service. (AHUMADA, LORENA) Modified on 1/17/2013 (lisad, ).
January 16, 2013 Filing 104 REPLY Brief in Further Support re 86 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Kafi Lindsay and James Eisenhower as Witnesses filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY. Certificate of Service. (AHUMADA, LORENA) Modified on 1/17/2013 (lisad, ).
January 16, 2013 Filing 103 REPLY Brief in Further Support re 87 MOTION in Limine for a Ruling That Certain Witnesses Are Unavailable to Testify in Person at Trial and That Their Videotaped Depositions May be Used in Lieu of Their Live Testimony filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY. Certificate of Service. (AHUMADA, LORENA) Modified on 1/17/2013 (lisad, ).
January 16, 2013 Filing 102 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas filed by ALAN L. BUTKOVITZ, MICHAEL A. NUTTER. Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(MATTIONI, ELIZABETH) Modified on 1/17/2013 (lisad, ).
January 14, 2013 Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re 86 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Kafi Lindsay and James Eisenhower as Witnesses filed by CARL R. GREENE. Certificate of Service. (HAINES, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/15/2013 (lisad, ).
January 14, 2013 Filing 100 RESPONSE in Opposition re 80 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Current and Former Public Officials and PHA Residents as Witnesses filed by CARL R. GREENE. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(HAINES, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/15/2013 (lisad, ).
January 14, 2013 Filing 99 RESPONSE in Opposition re 78 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Investigation and Report filed by CARL R. GREENE. Certificate of Service. (HAINES, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/15/2013 (lisad, ).
January 14, 2013 Filing 98 RESPONSE in Opposition re 87 MOTION in Limine for a Ruling That Certain Witnesses Are Unavailable to Testify in Person at Trial and That Their Videotaped Depositions May be Used in Lieu of Their Live Testimony filed by CARL R. GREENE. Certificate of Service. (HAINES, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/15/2013 (lisad, ).
January 14, 2013 Filing 97 RESPONSE in Opposition re 81 MOTION in Limine to Exclude News Reporters as Witnesses and Emails Between Reporters and John F. Street filed by CARL R. GREENE. Certificate of Service. (HAINES, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/15/2013 (lisad, ).
January 14, 2013 Filing 96 RESPONSE in Opposition re 89 MOTION in Limine Regarding the Attorney Client Privilege filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(AHUMADA, LORENA) Modified on 1/15/2013 (lisad, ).
January 14, 2013 Filing 95 RESPONSE in Opposition re 85 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Kelvin Jeremiah, Elias Rosario, Stacey Thomas, Estelle Richman, and Robert Sullivan filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(AHUMADA, LORENA) Modified on 1/15/2013 (lisad, ).
January 14, 2013 Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition re 83 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Pennsylvania Human Relations Commission's Finding of Probable Cause in the matter of Elizabeth Helm filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D, # 2 Exhibit E-F)(AHUMADA, LORENA) Modified on 1/15/2013 (lisad, ).
January 14, 2013 Filing 93 RESPONSE in Opposition re 84 MOTION in Limine Regarding the Burden of Proof filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY. Certificate of Service. (AHUMADA, LORENA) Modified on 1/15/2013 (lisad, ).
January 14, 2013 Filing 92 RESPONSE in Opposition re 88 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Women Allegedly Harassed by Plaintiff filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY. Certificate of Service.(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(AHUMADA, LORENA) Modified on 1/15/2013 (lisad, ).
January 14, 2013 Filing 91 RESPONSE in Opposition re 79 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Concerning Motives filed by CARL R. GREENE. Certificate of Service. (HAINES, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/15/2013 (lisad, ).
January 14, 2013 Filing 90 RESPONSE in Opposition re 77 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Reputational Harm Evidence filed by CARL R. GREENE. Certificate of Service. (HAINES, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/15/2013 (lisad, ).
December 31, 2012 Filing 89 MOTION in Limine Regarding the Attorney Client Privilege filed by CARL R. GREENE.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(HAINES, CLIFFORD)
December 31, 2012 Filing 88 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Women Allegedly Harassed by Plaintiff filed by CARL R. GREENE.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(HAINES, CLIFFORD)
December 31, 2012 Filing 87 MOTION in Limine for a Ruling That Certain Witnesses Are Unavailable to Testify in Person at Trial and That Their Videotaped Depositions May be Used in Lieu of Their Live Testimony filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(AHUMADA, LORENA)
December 31, 2012 Filing 86 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Kafi Lindsay and James Eisenhower as Witnesses filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(AHUMADA, LORENA)
December 31, 2012 Filing 85 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Kelvin Jeremiah, Elias Rosario, Stacey Thomas, Estelle Richman, and Robert Sullivan filed by CARL R. GREENE.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(HAINES, CLIFFORD)
December 31, 2012 Filing 84 MOTION in Limine Regarding the Burden of Proof filed by CARL R. GREENE.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(HAINES, CLIFFORD)
December 31, 2012 Filing 83 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Pennsylvania Human Relations Commission's Finding of Probable Cause in the matter of Elizabeth Helm filed by CARL R. GREENE.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Serivce. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(HAINES, CLIFFORD)
December 20, 2012 Filing 82 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER: Pretrial Conference held on 12/17/2012. (sg, )
December 11, 2012 Filing 81 MOTION in Limine to Exclude News Reporters as Witnesses and Emails Between Reporters and John F. Street filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(AHUMADA, LORENA)
December 5, 2012 Filing 80 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Current and Former Public Officials and PHA Residents as Witnesses filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(AHUMADA, LORENA)
December 5, 2012 Filing 79 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Concerning Motives filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(AHUMADA, LORENA)
December 5, 2012 Filing 78 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Investigation and Report filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(AHUMADA, LORENA)
December 5, 2012 Filing 77 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Reputational Harm Evidence filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G)(AHUMADA, LORENA)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/17/2012 11:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER., MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 12/31/2012., PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 12/31/2012., DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 12/31/2012., TRIAL DATE SET FOR 1/28/2013 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 14A BEFORE HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 9/17/2012. 9/17/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
September 12, 2012 Filing 75 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by KATHLEEN MILSARK on behalf of CARL R. GREENE, Certificate of Service. (MILSARK, KATHLEEN) Modified on 9/13/2012 (fh)
September 7, 2012 Filing 74 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY Certificate of Service. (AHUMADA, LORENA)
September 7, 2012 Filing 73 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by CARL R. GREENE Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit 2-Plaintiff's Proposed Points for Charge)(HAINES, CLIFFORD)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS JOHN F. STREET, DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, AND NELLIE W. REYNOLDS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR DEPRIVATION OF LIBERTY INTEREST IN REPUTATION WITHOUT DUE PROCESS OF LAW IS GRANTED AND JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS JOHN F. STREET, DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, AND NELLIE W. REYNOLDS; AND DEFENDANT PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF OF CONTRACT CLAIM IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 8/29/2012. 8/31/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 30, 2012 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 8/29/2012. 8/31/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS MAY DEPOSE PLAINTIFF IN PERSON IN THE STATE OF GEORGIA, AND IT FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS, INCLUDING TRAVEL EXPENSES, ASSOCIATED WITH THE DEPOSITION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 7/11/2012. 7/13/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 11, 2012 Filing 69 REPLY to Response to Motion re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CARL R. GREENE. Certificate of Service.(HAINES, CLIFFORD) Modified on 7/12/2012 (ahf, ).
July 2, 2012 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET. (AHUMADA, LORENA)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DEPOSITION TESTIMONY IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR EXPENSES IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 6/26/2012. 6/27/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
June 27, 2012 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 6/26/2012. 6/27/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
June 21, 2012 Filing 65 Memorandum of Law in Support of Opposition re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CARL R. GREENE, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(HAINES, CLIFFORD) Modified on 6/22/2012 (nd, ).
June 4, 2012 Filing 64 EXHIBIT F TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, by DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET. (FILED UNDER SEAL.)(sg, )
June 4, 2012 Filing 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET.Memorandum, Affidavit, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-C, # 3 Exhibit D-M, # 4 Exhibit N part 1, # 5 Exhibit N part 2, # 6 Exhibit N part 3, # 7 Exhibit N part 4, # 8 Exhibit O-Q)(AHUMADA, LORENA)
June 1, 2012 Filing 62 REPLY to Response to Motion re 58 MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony of Plaintiff filed by DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E-F)(AHUMADA, LORENA)
May 24, 2012 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re 58 MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony of Plaintiff , Certificate of Service filed by CARL R. GREENE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(HAINES, CLIFFORD)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO COMPEL IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF ON OR BEFORE 5/24/2012. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 5/16/2012. 5/16/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
May 16, 2012 Filing 59 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 58 MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony of Plaintiff filed by CARL R. GREENE.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(MILSARK, KATHLEEN)
April 30, 2012 Filing 58 MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony of Plaintiff filed by DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET.Memorandum; Affidavit; Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D)(AHUMADA, LORENA)
April 10, 2012 Filing 57 PROTECTIVE ORDER ENTERED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 4/10/2012. 4/11/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING SCHEDULING ORDER. DISCOVERY DUE BY 5/28/2012., TRIAL POOL SET FOR 6/28/2012. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 3/27/2012. 3/27/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION BY ORAL EXAMINATION IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL KEEP CONFIDENTIAL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FOR 10 DAYS. DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR EXPENSES IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 3/26/2012. 3/27/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
March 27, 2012 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN MILSARK on behalf of CARL R. GREENE with Certificate of Service(MILSARK, KATHLEEN)
March 16, 2012 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re 51 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Deposition by Oral Examination and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for a Protective Order filed by DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "C")(AHUMADA, LORENA)
March 12, 2012 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re 51 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Deposition by Oral Examination filed by CARL R. GREENE. (CATES, LAUREN)
February 27, 2012 Filing 51 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Deposition by Oral Examination filed by DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET.Memorandum, Affidavit, Certification of Counsel and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-b)(AHUMADA, LORENA)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DETERMINE THE SCOPE OF THE DEPOSITION OF NON-PARTY WITNESS, CAROLYN GRIFFITH IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER IS DENIED. DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR EXPENSES IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 2/16/2012. 2/17/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL PROVIDE FULL, COMPLETE, AND SPECIFIC ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORY NUMBERS 1,2, AND 3 OF DEFENDANTS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES WITHIN 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, ETC.. DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR EXPENSES IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 2/16/20212.2/17/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
February 14, 2012 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re 47 MOTION for Protective Order and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Determine theScope of the Deposition of Non-Party Witness, Carol N. Griffith And IN SUPPORT of Defendants' Motion to Determine Scope of the Deposition of Non-Party Witness, Carolyn Griffith filed by DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET. (SCHREINER, ERIC)
February 10, 2012 Filing 47 MOTION for Protective Order and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Determine theScope of the Deposition of Non-Party Witness, Carol N. Griffith filed by CARL R. GREENE.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service.(HAINES, CLIFFORD)
February 7, 2012 Filing 46 MOTION for Discovery To Determine Scope of Deposition of Non-Party Witness filed by DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET.Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H)(SCHREINER, ERIC)
February 3, 2012 Filing 45 REPLY BRIEF in Further Support of Motion re 43 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery with Certificate of Service filed by DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET. (AHUMADA, LORENA) Modified on 2/6/2012 (nd).
January 24, 2012 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re 43 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery and Certificate of Service filed by CARL R. GREENE. (CATES, LAUREN)
January 10, 2012 Filing 43 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery filed by DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET.Memorandum, Certification of Counsel and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - I)(AHUMADA, LORENA)
December 15, 2011 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by LORENA E. AHUMADA on behalf of DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET with Certificate of Service(AHUMADA, LORENA)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SCHEDULING ORDER: DISCOVERY DUE BY 4/13/2012. TRIAL POOL SET FOR 5/14/2012. SIGNED BY MICHAEL E. KUNZ ON 8/16/2011. 8/16/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 7, 2011 Filing 40 ANSWER to 28 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Certificate of Service by DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET.(SCHREINER, ERIC) Modified on 7/8/2011 (ahf, ).
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT BLACKWELL'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF PLAINTIFF'S SCOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED IN ITS ENTIRETY AS TO DEFENDANT BLACKWELL. DEFENDANTS STREET, BRADY, EIDING, AND REYNOLDS'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S BREACH OF CONTRACT CLAIM IS GRANTED. COUNT II IS DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANTS STREET, BRADY, EIGING, AND REYNOLDS. DEFENDANTS STREET, BRADY, EIDING, AND REYNOLDS'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR DEPRIVATION OF LIBERTY INTEREST IN REPUTATION WITHOUT DUE PROCESS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 6/22/2011. 6/23/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sg, )
June 22, 2011 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 6/22/2011. 6/23/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
April 29, 2011 Filing 37 NOTICE by JANNIE L. BLACKWELL re 36 Response in Support of Motion, of Joinder to Defendants' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (SCHEFF, RICHARD)
April 27, 2011 Filing 36 REPLY BRIEF in Further Support re 32 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 12(b)(6) filed by DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET, Certificate of Service. (SCHREINER, ERIC) Modified on 4/28/2011 (nd, ).
April 15, 2011 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re 32 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 12(b)(6), 31 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Substitute Parties and Amend the Caption with Exhibit filed by CARL R. GREENE, Certificate of Service. (CATES, LAUREN) Modified on 4/18/2011 (lisad, ).
March 28, 2011 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN J. ENGELMYER on behalf of PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY with Certificate of Service(ENGELMYER, STEVEN)
March 28, 2011 Filing 33 NOTICE by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY of Entry of Appearance of Eric J. Schreiner, Esquire (SCHREINER, ERIC)
March 25, 2011 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 12(b)(6) filed by JOHN F. STREET.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(SCHREINER, ERIC)
March 25, 2011 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Substitute Parties and Amend the Caption with Exhibit filed by JANNIE L. BLACKWELL.Proposed Order, Brief, Certificate of Service.(MADVA, STEPHEN)
March 18, 2011 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Joseph Marano re: served summons and 2nd Amended Complaint to the Philadelphia Housing Authority upon J. Walker by hand delivery on 03/18/2011 (HAINES, CLIFFORD)
March 11, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN J. ENGELMYER on behalf of JOHN F. STREET, DEBA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS with Certificate of Service. (ENGELMYER, STEVEN) Modified on 3/14/2011 (lisad, ).
March 11, 2011 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JANNIE L. BLACKWELL, DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET, PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, filed by CARL R. GREENE. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBITS)(sg, )
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT SHALL BE FILED BY THE CLERK. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 3/10/2011.3/11/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
March 11, 2011 Summons Issued as to PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 3/11/2011 (sg, )
February 24, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. SCHREINER on behalf of JOHN F. STREET with Certificate of Service and Notice of Appearance of Steven J. Engelmyer and Withdrawal of Appearance of Richard A. Sprague, Esquire, Joseph R. Podraza, Jr., Esquire and Thomas E. Groshens, Esquire(SCHREINER, ERIC)
February 11, 2011 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint filed by CARL R. GREENE.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2)(CATES, LAUREN)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO JOIN DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT ETC. IS GRANTED AND THAT COUNTS I AND II OF PLAITNIFF'S COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT JANNIE L. BLACKWELL ARE DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 1/31/2011. 2/1/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
January 27, 2011 Filing 23 MOTION for Joinder by Defendant Jannie L. Blackwell in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and for this Court to amend its Jan. 20, 2011 Order filed by JANNIE L. BLACKWELL.Certificate of Service.(SCHEFF, RICHARD)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HERE IN. MOVING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS BREACH OF CONTRACT CLAIM IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF MAY FILE A MOTION SEEKING LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH RESPECT TO THE ISSUE AS WELL AS THE DEPRIVATION OF LIBERTY INTEREST IN REPUTATION ISSUE. THIS MOTION MUST BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 2/11/2011, FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE UPON MOTION OF DEFENDANTS. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 1/20/2011. 1/21/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
January 20, 2011 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 1/20/2011. 1/21/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
November 19, 2010 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET. (GROSHENS, THOMAS)
November 12, 2010 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by CARL R. GREENE. (CATES, LAUREN)
November 2, 2010 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN CATES on behalf of CARL R. GREENE with Certificate of Service(CATES, LAUREN)
October 22, 2010 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A(a) to A(j), # 3 Exhibit A(k) to A(r), # 4 Exhibit A(s) to A(x))(GROSHENS, THOMAS)
October 22, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by TRICIA J. SADD on behalf of JANNIE L. BLACKWELL with Certificate of Service(SADD, TRICIA)
October 21, 2010 Filing 15 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by RICHARD A. SPRAGUE on behalf of JANNIE L. BLACKWELL(SPRAGUE, RICHARD)
October 21, 2010 Filing 14 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JOSEPH R. PODRAZA, JR on behalf of JANNIE L. BLACKWELL(PODRAZA, JOSEPH)
October 21, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by THOMAS E. GROSHENS on behalf of JANNIE L. BLACKWELL(GROSHENS, THOMAS)
October 21, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD L. SCHEFF on behalf of JANNIE L. BLACKWELL with Certificate of Service(SCHEFF, RICHARD)
October 21, 2010 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN A. MADVA on behalf of JANNIE L. BLACKWELL with Certificate of Service(MADVA, STEPHEN)
October 7, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS E. GROSHENS on behalf of JANNIE L. BLACKWELL, DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET with Certificate of Service(GROSHENS, THOMAS)
October 7, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH R. PODRAZA, JR on behalf of JANNIE L. BLACKWELL, DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET with Certificate of Service(PODRAZA, JOSEPH)
October 7, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD A. SPRAGUE on behalf of JANNIE L. BLACKWELL, DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET with Certificate of Service(SPRAGUE, RICHARD)
October 6, 2010 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CARL R. GREENE. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. EXHIBITS ATTACHED ON HARD COPY.(sg, )
September 24, 2010 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARL R. GREENE re: Jeff Bergman served Summons and Complaint upon NELLIE W. REYNOLDS by Personal Service. NELLIE W. REYNOLDS served on 9/23/2010, answer due 10/14/2010. (HAINES, CLIFFORD)
September 24, 2010 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARL R. GREENE re: Mark Sobel served Summons and Complaint upon JOHN F. STREET by Personal Service upon Designee. JOHN F. STREET served on 9/23/2010, answer due 10/14/2010. (HAINES, CLIFFORD)
September 24, 2010 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARL R. GREENE re: Mark Sobel served Summons and Complaint upon JANNIE L. BLACKWELL by Personal Service. JANNIE L. BLACKWELL served on 9/23/2010, answer due 10/14/2010. (HAINES, CLIFFORD)
September 24, 2010 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARL R. GREENE re: Mark Sobel served Summons and Complaint upon PATRICK J. EIDING by Personal Service. PATRICK J. EIDING served on 9/23/2010, answer due 10/14/2010. (HAINES, CLIFFORD)
September 24, 2010 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARL R. GREENE re: Mark Sobel served Summons and Complaint upon DEBRA L. BRADY by Personal Service. DEBRA L. BRADY served on 9/23/2010, answer due 10/14/2010. (HAINES, CLIFFORD)
September 7, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JANNIE L. BLACKWELL, DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 029123.), filed by CARL R. GREENE. (Attachments: # 1 Designation Form, # 2 Case Management Track Form)(jwl, )
September 7, 2010 Summons Issued as to JANNIE L. BLACKWELL, DEBRA L. BRADY, PATRICK J. EIDING, NELLIE W. REYNOLDS, JOHN F. STREET. Five Forwarded To: Counsel on 9/8/10 (jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREENE v. STREET et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL R. GREENE
Represented By: LAUREN CATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN F. STREET
Represented By: THOMAS E. GROSHENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANNIE L. BLACKWELL
Represented By: STEPHEN A. MADVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA L. BRADY
Represented By: THOMAS E. GROSHENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK J. EIDING
Represented By: THOMAS E. GROSHENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NELLIE W. REYNOLDS
Represented By: THOMAS E. GROSHENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?