PERELMAN v. PERELMAN et al
Plaintiff: |
JEFFREY E. PERELMAN |
Defendant: |
JASON GUZEK, GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY, RAYMOND G. PERELMAN and RONALD O. PERELMAN |
Case Number: |
2:2010cv05622 |
Filed: |
October 25, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Philadelphia Office |
County: |
Montgomery |
Presiding Judge: |
JOHN R. PADOVA |
Nature of Suit: |
Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 14, 2014 |
Filing
170
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES (DOC. NO.163) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/14/2014. 4/14/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (kk, )
|
February 18, 2014 |
Filing
160
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO. 140 ), IS GRANTED. THE MOTION IN LIMINE (DOC. NO. 142 ), IS DENIED AS MOOT. THE MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENT (DOC. NO. 151 ), IS DENIED. THE MOTION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 156 ), IS DENIED. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY, JASON GUZEK, RAYMOND G. PERELMAN, AND RELIANCE TRUST COMPANY AND AGAINST JEFFREY E. PERELMAN. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 2/18/2014. 2/18/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
|
January 24, 2013 |
Filing
125
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO.109) IS DENIED. RELIANCE TRUST COMPANY IS JOINED AS AN ADDITIONAL DEFENDANT, PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO ADD RELIANCE TRUST COMPANY AS A PARTY DEF ENDANT TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MAKE SERVICE OF PROCESS UNDER RULE 4. THE MOTION OF DEFENDANT GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (DOC. NO.106) IS GRANTED AND DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE MOTION OF DEFENDANTS RAYMOND PERELMAN AND JASON GUZEK FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (DOC. NO.107) IS GRANTED AND DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN, ETCSIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 1/24/2013. 1/24/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, EMAILED (kk, )
|
August 28, 2012 |
Filing
101
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE DEFEDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF STANDING; DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (DOC. NO. 56) IS GRANTED I NSOFAR AS THEY SEEK DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS IN THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AGAINST DEFENDANT RONAL PERELMAN (COUNTS 9, 10, AND 11) AND DEFENDANT RONALD PERELMAN IS DISMISSED AS A DEFENDANT IN THIS ACTION. THE MOTIONS ARE GRANTED INSOFAR AS THEY SEEK TO PRAYER FOR RELIEF CLAUSES 1-7 AND 10-12. THE MOTIONS ARE DENIED IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 8/27/2012. 8/28/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (kk, )
|
August 3, 2011 |
Filing
42
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY (DOC. NO. 35) IS GRANTED. DISCOVERY MAY CONTINUE ONLY AS IT PERTAINS TO THE FACTUAL ISSUE OF WHETHER THERE IS A GENUINE ISSUE OF MATERIAL FACT WITH RESPECT TO THE PLAN'S ABILITY TO PAY PLAINIFF'S MONTHLY PENSION BENEFIT AS IT COMES DUE. ALL OTHER DISCOVERY IS STAYED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 8/3/2011. 8/3/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?