ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. v. AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS et al
Plaintiff: ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.
Defendant: THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA and AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS
Petitioner: UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES
Special Master: GENE D. COHEN
Case Number: 2:2010cv06908
Filed: November 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2017 Filing 453 UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT MANDATE THAT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE JUDGMENT OF THIS COURT, ENTERED 8/10/2017, AND PURSUANT TO RULE 41(A) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF APPELLATE PROCEDURE, THE FORMAL MANDATE IS HEREBY ISSUED. COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $390.32 WERE DETERMINED AND TAXED AGAINST THE APPELLANT.(amas)
August 10, 2017 Filing 452 USCA FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER AS TO #442 NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. THAT THE DISTRICT COURT DID NOT ERR BY MAKING FACTUAL FINDINGS NOT FORECLOSED BY THE JURY'S VERDICT ON STANDING, AND AIA'S DUE PROCESS RIGHTS WERE NOT VIOLATED, THEREFORE THEY AFFIRM. (amas)
August 10, 2017 (FILED IN ERROR, RE-FILED IN CORRECT CASE 17-2278)DEFAULT BY AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (amas) Modified on 8/10/2017 (amas).
August 10, 2017 (FILED IN ERROR, RE-FILED IN CORRECT CASE 17-2278)Default Entered (amas) Modified on 8/10/2017 (amas).
January 4, 2017 Filing 451 TRANSCRIPT of HEARING held on 9/28/2016 before Judge TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. Court Reporter: SUZANNE R. WHITE. (amas)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF BRYAN CAVE LLP AND STRADLEY, RONAN, STEVENS & YOUNG, LLP TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF AIA AMERICA, INC. (DOC. NO. #443 ), IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/28/2016.9/28/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
September 28, 2016 Filing 449 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE Show Cause Hearing held on 9/28/2016. Court Reporter: SUZANNE WHITE. (amas)
September 27, 2016 Filing 448 Memorandum (Supplemental Memorandum re #443 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AIA correspondence to Judge Savage)(GADO, AMEER)
September 26, 2016 Filing 447 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. (GADO, AMEER)
September 16, 2016 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #442 Notice of Appeal filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. USCA Case Number 16-2647 (amas)
September 15, 2016 Filing 446 Statement of Non-Opposition to Motion of Bryan Cave LLP and Stradley, Ronon, Stevens & Young, LLP to Withdraw as Counsel by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (BURWELL, L.)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER THAT A HEARING TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW (RE: DOC. NO. #443 ), SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED AND THE MOVANTS BE PERMITTED TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL IS SCHEDULED FOR 9/28/2016, AT 8:30 AM, IN COURTROOM 9A, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/14/2016. 9/15/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
September 15, 2016 Filing 444 Clerk's Notice to USCA re #442 Notice of Appeal (amas)
September 14, 2016 Filing 443 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC..Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ameer Gado in Support of Bryan Cave's Motion to Withdraw)(GADO, AMEER)
September 14, 2016 Filing 442 NOTICE OF APPEAL by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and Appeal Record due by 10/14/2016. (GADO, AMEER) Modified on 9/14/2016 (lvj, ).
September 14, 2016 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 146870 re #442 Notice of Appeal filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. (amas)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS AND AGAINST ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC., IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,943,317.70. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/17/2016. 8/17/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
August 17, 2016 Filing 440 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT THE OBJECTIONS OF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC., AND AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS ARE OVERRULED. THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED. NO LATER THAN 8/31/2016, AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS SHALL COMPENSATE JUDGE GENE D. COHEN (RETIRED) IN THE AMOUNT OF $72,216.00 FOR HIS SERVICE AS SPECIAL MASTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/17/2016. 8/17/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
August 17, 2016 Filing 439 MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/17/2016. 8/17/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
August 17, 2016 Filing 438 LETTER TO JUDGE SAVAGE THAT AVID WITHDRAWS OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (amas)
March 23, 2016 Filing 437 MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER THAT AIA AMERICA, INC.'S MOTION FOR REVIEW OF CLERK'S TAXATION OF COSTS (DOC. NO. #411 ), IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' MOTION FOR REVIEW OF CLERK'S TAXATION OF COSTS (DOC. NO. #412 ), IS DENIED. COSTS ARE TAXED IN FAVOR OF AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS IN THE AMOUNT OF $53,533.76. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/23/2016. 3/23/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
March 23, 2016 Filing 436 MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/23/2016. 3/23/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
February 1, 2016 Filing 435 AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' REPLY TO AIA AMERICA'S RESPONSE TO AVID'S OBJECTIONS TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (amas)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO AIA AMERICA'S RESPONSE TO AVID'S OBJECTIONS TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE SPECIAL MASTER (DOC. NO. #433 ), IS GRANTED. THE REPLY ATTACHED TO THE MOTION IS DEEMED FILED AS OF THIS DATE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/1/2016.2/1/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
January 29, 2016 Filing 433 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to AIA America's Response to Avid's Objections to the Report and Recommendation of the Special Master filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.. (Attachments: #1 Avid Radiopharmaceuticals' Reply to AIA America's Response to Avid's Objections to the Report and Recommendation of the Special Master, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BURWELL, L.)
January 26, 2016 Filing 432 AIA AMERICA, INC.'S RESPONSE TO AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' OBJECTIONS TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER, BY ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (amas)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE TO AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' OBJECTIONS TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER (DOC. NO. #427 ), IS GRANTED. THE RESPONSE ATTACHED TO THE MOTION IS DEEMED FILED AS OF THIS DATE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/26/2016.1/26/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
January 26, 2016 Filing 430 AIA AMERICA, INC.'S RESPONSE TO AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, BY ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (amas )
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE TO AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (DOC. NO. #428 ), IS GRANTED. THE RESPONSE ATTACHED TO THE MOTION IS DEEMED FILED AS OF THIS DATE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/26/20161.1/26/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
January 22, 2016 Filing 428 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Avid's Response to Court's Order to Show Cause filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC... (Attachments: #1 AIA Resp to Avid's Resp to Ord to Show Cause, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GADO, AMEER)
January 22, 2016 Filing 427 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Avid's Objections to the Report and Recommendation of the Special Master filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC... (Attachments: #1 AIA Resp to Avid Obj to Report and Recomm of Spec Master, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GADO, AMEER)
January 20, 2016 Filing 426 AIA AMERICA, INC.'S RESPONSE TO AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' OBJECTION TO THE RECOMMENDATION OF ALLOCATION OF FEES OF THE SPECIAL MASTER, BY ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (amas)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE TO AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' OBJECTION TO THE RECOMMENDATION OF ALLOCATION OF FEES OF THE SPECIAL MASTER (DOC. NO. #423 ), IS GRANTED. THE RESPONSE ATTACHED TO THE MOTION IS DEEMED FILED AS OF THIS DATE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/20/2016.1/20/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
January 20, 2016 Filing 424 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (BURWELL, L.)
January 15, 2016 Filing 423 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Avid's Objections to Special Master's Recommendation re: Allocation of Fees filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC... (Attachments: #1 AIA Resp to Avid Obj to SM Allocation of Fees, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GADO, AMEER)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER THAT UNLESS AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS SHOWS GOOD CAUSE FOR SEALING BEFORE 1/20/2016, ALL MOTIONS AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTATION IN CONNECTION WITH THE MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER SEAL WILL BE UNSEALED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/13/2016. 1/13/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
January 12, 2016 Filing 421 Objections by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. To The Report And Recommendation Of The Special Master. (GADO, AMEER)
January 12, 2016 Filing 420 OBJECTIONS TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER AND SUPPORTING DECLARATION WITH EXHIBIT, BY AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (amas)
January 5, 2016 Filing 419 EXHIBIT TO AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' OBJECTION TO THE RECOMMENDATION OF ALLOCATION OF FEES OF THE SPECIAL MASTER. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(amas)
January 5, 2016 Filing 418 Objections by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS re #417 Report Of The Special Master. (MARION, CHARLES)
December 22, 2015 Filing 417 Report Of Special Master by GENE D. COHEN. (COHEN, GENE)
June 30, 2015 Filing 416 REPLY to Response to Motion re #411 MOTION for Taxation of Costs Motion For Review Of Clerk's Taxation of Costs filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (GADO, AMEER)
June 30, 2015 Filing 415 REPLY to Response to Motion re #412 MOTION for Bill of Costs (Motion for Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs) filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (BURWELL, L.)
June 23, 2015 Filing 414 RESPONSE in Opposition re #412 MOTION for Bill of Costs (Motion for Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs) filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (GADO, AMEER)
June 23, 2015 Filing 413 RESPONSE in Opposition re #411 MOTION for Taxation of Costs Motion For Review Of Clerk's Taxation of Costs filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (BURWELL, L.)
June 22, 2015 Copy of Order dated 6/2/2015 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to NATHANIEL EDWARDS for the following reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD. (amas)
June 9, 2015 Filing 412 MOTION for Bill of Costs (Motion for Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs) filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BURWELL, L.)
June 9, 2015 Filing 411 MOTION for Taxation of Costs Motion For Review Of Clerk's Taxation of Costs filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC..Certificate of Service.(GADO, AMEER)
June 8, 2015 Filing 410 NOTICE by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. Change of Name and Corporate Status (GADO, AMEER)
June 2, 2015 Filing 409 JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED IN FAVOR OF AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS AND AGAINST ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC., IN THE AMOUNT OF $139,033.76. SIGNED BY MICHAEL E. KUNZ, CLERK OF COURT ON 6/2/15. 6/2/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED TO LEONARD AND EDWARDS. (sr)
June 2, 2015 Filing 408 JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED IN FAVOR OF THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, AND AGAINST ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC., IN THE AMOUNT OF $24,225.67. SIGNED BY MICHAEL E. KUNZ, CLERK OF COURT ON 6/2/15. 6/2/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED TO LEONARD AND EDWARDS. (sr)
June 2, 2015 Filing 407 Clerk's Taxation of Costs. 6/2/15 Entered and Copies E-Mailed to Counsel and Mailed to Leonard & Edwards. (sr) Modified on 6/2/2015 (sr, ).
May 19, 2015 Copy of LETTER dated 5/4/2015 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to NATHANIEL EDWARDS for the following reason: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED. (amas)
May 1, 2015 Filing 406 RESPONSE TO AIA'S OPPOSITION TO AVID'S SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, BY AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (amas)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER THAT AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' RENEWED MOTION FOR SECURITY FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES (DOC. NO. 402 ), IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/30/2015.4/30/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
April 24, 2015 Filing 404 REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' RENEWED MOTION FOR SECURITY FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES (RE: DOC. NO. 402 ), FILED BY AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (amas)
April 17, 2015 Filing 403 AIA'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO AVID'S AND PENN'S SUBMISSIONS IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, BY ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. MEMORANDUM, DECLARATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (amas)
April 3, 2015 Filing 402 RENEWED MOTION FOR SECURITY FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(ti, )
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER THAT GENE D. COHEN, ESQUIRE, IS APPOINTED SPECIAL MASTER FOR THE PURPOSE OF PREPARING A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING THE AMOUNT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEY FEES INCURRED BY THE DEFENDANTS IN LITIGATING THIS ACTION, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)3/30/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
March 30, 2015 Filing 400 MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES (DOC. NO. #302 ), IS GRANTED. THE AMOUNT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES INCURRED BY THE DEFENDANT IN LITIGATING THIS ACTION SHALL BE DETERMINED AFTER SUBMISSION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/30/2015. 3/30/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
March 30, 2015 Filing 399 MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER THAT THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA'S MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES (DOC. NO. #299 ), IS GRANTED. THE AMOUNT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES INCURRED BY THE DEFENDANT IN LITIGATING THIS ACTION SHALL BE DETERMINED AFTER SUBMISSION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/30/2015. 3/30/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
March 30, 2015 Filing 398 MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/30/2015. 3/30/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
March 19, 2015 Filing 397 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE Status Conference held on 3/19/15. (jaa, )
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER THAT THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL IMMEDIATELY SERVE UPON THE PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL COPIES OF ALL DOCUMENTS AND SUBMISSIONS, EXCEPT THE FEE AGREEMENTS, FILED PURSUANT TO THE ORDER OF 2/25/2015. THE PLAINTIFFS SHALL RESPOND TO THE DEFENDANT'S SUBMISSIONS NO LATER THAN 4/17/2015. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/12/2015. 3/13/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
March 12, 2015 Filing 395 NOTICE by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS re #394 Notice (Other) re: Response Letter to Judge Timothy J. Savage (MARION, CHARLES)
March 12, 2015 Filing 394 NOTICE by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. LETTER TO HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE (GADO, AMEER)
March 3, 2015 Filing 393 EXHIBIT C TO THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA'S SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTONREY'S. (FILED UNDER SEAL.)(sg, )
March 3, 2015 Filing 392 EXHIBIT B TO THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA'S SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTONREY'S. (FILED UNDER SEAL.)(sg, )
March 3, 2015 Filing 391 EXHIBIT A TO THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA'S SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTONREY'S. (FILED UNDER SEAL.)(sg, )
March 3, 2015 Filing 390 AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES (FILED UNDER SEAL). (jl, )
March 3, 2015 Filing 389 NOTICE by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA re #388 Order, Submission in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (under seal), #2 Exhibit B (under seal), #3 Exhibit C (under seal))(LUCCI, JOSEPH)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS HAVING FAILED TO SUBMIT A DETAILED BILL FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEY FEES, NO LATER THAN 3/3/2015 THEY SHALL FILE THE FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/25/2015. 2/26/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER THAT THE SETTLEMENT SCHEDULED FOR 1/23/2015, IS CANCELLED AND THIS MATTER WILL BE RETURNED TO THE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 1/21/2015. 1/22/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 1/23/2015, AT 11:00 AM, IN COURTROOM 7, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 1/7/2015. 1/8/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
January 8, 2015 Filing 385 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL Settlement Conference held on 1/7/2015. (amas)
December 19, 2014 Filing 384 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL Settlement Conference held on 12/18/2014. (amas)
December 15, 2014 Copy of Order dated 12/2/2014 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to NATHANIEL S. EDWARDS for the following reason: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED. (amas)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER THAT THE 12/2/2014 ORDER GRANTING THE REQUEST TO RESCHEDULE THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS RESCINDED. THE SECOND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL TAKE PLACE AS ORIGINALLY SCHEDULED ON 12/18/2014, AT 10:30 AM, IN COURTROOM 7, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 12/3/2014. 12/3/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER THAT THE REQUEST TO RESCHEDULE THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS GRANTED. THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, WHICH HAD BEEN SCHEDULED TO OCCUR ON 12/18/2014, IS CHANGED TO 2/27/2015, AT 11:00 AM, IN COURTROOM 7, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 12/2/2014. 12/3/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
December 3, 2014 Filing 381 REPORT on determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 5,455,169 AND 7,538,258 B2. (amas)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER THAT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR 12/2/2014, IS CHANGED TO 12/18/2014, AT 10:30 AM, IN COURTROOM 7, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 9/29/2014. 9/30/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
September 29, 2014 Copy of Order dated 9/18/2014 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to NATHANIEL S. EDWARDS for the following reason: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED. (amas)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER THAT BY 10/20/2014 PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IS TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL INFORMATION FOR THE PERIOD FROM SEPTEMBER 2010 TO THE PRESENT WHICH WILL PERMIT THE DEFENDANTS TO EXPLORE PLAINTIFF'S FINANCIAL STATUS. A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 12/2/2014, AT 2:00 PM, IN COURTROOM 7, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 9/18/2014. 9/19/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
September 18, 2014 Filing 378 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL: Settlement Conference held on 9/17/2014. (amas)
July 31, 2014 Filing 377 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE BY DAVID SCOTT TAYLOR, ON BEHALF OF UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (amas)
July 31, 2014 Filing 376 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE BY KYLE G. HEPNER, ON BEHALF OF UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (amas)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL (DOC. NO. #369 ), IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 7/24/2014.7/24/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
July 24, 2014 Filing 374 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by RONALD P. SCHILLER on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES, certificate of service. (SCHILLER, RONALD) Modified on 7/28/2014 (fb).
July 24, 2014 Filing 373 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by DYLAN J. STEINBERG on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES, certificate of service. (STEINBERG, DYLAN) Modified on 7/28/2014 (fb).
July 24, 2014 Filing 372 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BONNIE M. HOFFMAN on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES, certificate of service. (HOFFMAN, BONNIE) Modified on 7/28/2014 (fb).
July 24, 2014 Filing 371 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ROBERT L. EBBY on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES, certificate of service.(EBBY, ROBERT) Modified on 7/28/2014 (fb).
July 24, 2014 Filing 370 Withdrawal of Appearance filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES., certificate of service.(EBBY, ROBERT) Modified on 7/28/2014 (fb).
July 23, 2014 Filing 369 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SIMMONS, JOHN)
July 23, 2014 Filing 368 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT M. GOLDICH on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES with Certificate of Service(GOLDICH, ROBERT)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER THAT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 8/21/2014 IS RESCHEDULED TO 9/17/2014, AT 2:00 PM, IN COURTROOM 7, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 7/10/2014. 7/11/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
July 9, 2014 Filing 366 USCA MANDATE FROM THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT THAT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE JUDGMENT OF THIS COURT, ENTERED 5/16/2014, AND PURSUANT TO RULE 41(A) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF APPELLATE PROCEDURE, THE FORMAL MANDATE IS HEREBY ISSUED, ETC. (amas) Modified on 7/9/2014 (fb).
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 8/21/2014, AT 10:30 AM, IN COURTROOM 7, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL, TO DISCUSS THE TWO MOTIONS FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 7/7/2014. 7/8/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
July 2, 2014 Filing 364 BILL OF COSTS (Avid Radiopharmaceuticals' Response to Alzheimer's Institute of America's Supplemental Objections to Bill of Costs) by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(BURWELL, L.)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS (DOC. NOS. 299 AND 302) ARE REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/25/2014. 6/26/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems)
June 24, 2014 Filing 362 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JORDAN JONAS OLIVER on behalf of THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, Certificate of Service.(OLIVER, JORDAN) Modified on 6/25/2014 (md).
June 18, 2014 Filing 361 ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTCIONS TO AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' BILL OF COSTS by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC., Certificate of Service. (MARSHALL, LEE) Modified on 6/19/2014 (nd).
June 13, 2014 Filing 360 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by STEPHEN G. HARVEY on behalf of AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, Certificate of Service.(HARVEY, STEPHEN) Modified on 6/16/2014 (md).
May 16, 2014 Filing 359 USCA ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT THAT PER CURIAM (NEWMAN, PLAGER, AND MOORE, CIRCUIT JUDGES, AFFIRMED. SEE FED. CIR. R. 36. (amas) Modified on 5/19/2014 (afm, ).
May 14, 2014 Filing 358 NOTICE by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS (Notice of Supplemental Authority Concerning Avid Radiopharmaceuticals' Motion for Attorney's Fees Under 35 U.S.C. 285) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Octane Fitness, LLC v. Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.), #2 Exhibit 2 (Highmark, Inc. v. Allcare Health Management System, Inc.))(BURWELL, L.)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER THAT JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN ENTERED ON THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC., IN FAVOR OF THE DEFENDANTS AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS AND THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA AGAINST PLAINTIFF, THERE BEING NO JUST REASON FOR DELAY, THE COURT ENTERS FINAL JUDGMENT ON THOSE CLAIMS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/9/2013. 9/9/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
September 4, 2013 Filing 356 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: CONFERENCE (RE: STATUS AND DISCOVERY ISSUES) held on 9/4/2013. (amas)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RULE 54(B) JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS AS MOOT OR WITHOUT JURISDICTION (DOC. NO. #353 ), IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/21/2013.8/23/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
August 13, 2013 Filing 354 RESPONSE to Motion re #353 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) PLAINTIFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S MOTION FOR RULE 54(b) JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS AS MOOT OR WITHOUT JURISDICTION filed by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HARVEY, STEPHEN) Modified on 8/14/2013 (md).
August 13, 2013 Filing 353 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) PLAINTIFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S MOTION FOR RULE 54(b) JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS AS MOOT OR WITHOUT JURISDICTION filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC..MOTION, PROPOSED ORDER, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARSHALL, LEE)
August 1, 2013 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from Federal Circuit re #351 Notice of Appeal, filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. Federal Circuit Case Number 13-1544 (ems)
July 31, 2013 Filing 352 Clerk's Notice to the Federal Circuit, re #351 Notice of Appeal. (amas)
July 31, 2013 Federal Circuit Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 086020 re #351 Notice of Appeal, filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. (amas)
July 30, 2013 Filing 351 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to #89 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), #346 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), #294 Judgment, by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk, Certificate of Service. (MARSHALL, LEE) Modified on 7/31/2013 (nd).
July 23, 2013 Filing 350 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/16/2013 before Judge TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. (amas)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER THAT AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' MOTION FOR SECURITY FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEY'S FEES (DOC. NO. 312), IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 7/1/2013. 7/1/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER THAT THE UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES' MOTIN TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS (DOC. NO. 276), IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 7/1/2013. 7/1/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
July 1, 2013 Filing 347 MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 7/1/2013. 7/1/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER THAT ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, A NEW TRIAL, (DOC. NO. 315), IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 7/1/2013. 7/1/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
July 1, 2013 Filing 345 MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 7/1/2013. 7/1/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT TRANSFER SAID CASES FROM THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE TO THE CURRENT DOCKET FOR FINAL DISPOSITION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/8/2013. 5/8/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER THAT THE ORDER DATED 11/7/2011 GRANTING THE MOTION TO APPROVE A REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE IS HEREBY VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE IS WITHDRAWN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/8/2013. 5/8/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
May 7, 2013 Filing 342 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Status Conference held on 5/7/2013. (kp, )
April 17, 2013 Filing 341 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Show Cause Hearing held on 4/16/13. Court Reporter: LYNN MCCLOSKEY. (jl, )
April 16, 2013 Filing 340 NOTICE of Change of Address by BERRIE R. GOLDMAN(GOLDMAN, BERRIE)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT REOPEN THIS CASE, AND MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACE THE MATTER IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE PENDING DISPOSITION OF THE POST TRIAL MOTIONS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE MOTION HEARING IS RESCHEDULED FOR 4/16/2013 AT 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 9A BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/19/2013. 3/19/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE OUTSTANDING POST TRIAL MOTIONS, AN ORAL ARGUMENT IS HEREBY SCHEDULED FOR 3/21/2013 AT 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM 9-A BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/13/2013. 3/13/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
June 28, 2012 Filing 337 REPLY to Response to Motion re #315 MOTION for New Trial MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, A NEW TRIAL ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, A NEW TRIAL filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (MARSHALL, LEE)
June 28, 2012 Filing 336 REPLY to Response to Motion re #330 MOTION to Strike #329 Response in Support of Motion, Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant Avid Radiopharmaceuticals Motion to Strike filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (BURWELL, L.)
June 27, 2012 Filing 335 REPLY to Response to Motion re #299 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA. (LUCCI, JOSEPH)
June 27, 2012 Filing 334 BILL OF COSTS Reply in Support of its Bill of Costs #300 by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of L. Scott Burwell, #2 Exhibit 11)(BURWELL, L.)
June 27, 2012 Filing 333 REPLY to Response to Motion re #311 MOTION for Attorney Fees UNDER 35 U.S.C. 285 filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (BURWELL, L.)
June 25, 2012 Filing 332 BRIEF in Opposition re #330 MOTION to Strike #329 Response in Support of Motion, filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES, Certificate of Service. (SCHILLER, RONALD) Modified on 6/26/2012 (nd, ).
June 21, 2012 Filing 331 NOTICE by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA re #330 MOTION to Strike #329 Response in Support of Motion, of Joinder in Avid's Motion to Strike (LUCCI, JOSEPH)
June 20, 2012 Filing 330 MOTION to Strike #329 Response in Support of Motion, filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Avid's Motion to Strike, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BURWELL, L.)
June 18, 2012 Filing 329 RESPONSE in Support re #315 MOTION for New Trial MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, A NEW TRIAL filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES. (SCHILLER, RONALD)
June 18, 2012 Filing 328 RESPONSE in Opposition re #315 MOTION for New Trial MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, A NEW TRIAL filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(SCHILLER, RONALD)
June 18, 2012 Filing 327 RESPONSE in Opposition re #315 MOTION for New Trial MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, A NEW TRIAL filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BURWELL, L.)
June 13, 2012 Filing 326 Declaration re #325 Response in Opposition to Motion Declaration of K. Lee Marshall In Support of Alzheimer's Institute of America, Inc.'s Opposition to Avid Radiopharmaceuticals' and the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania's Motions for Attorney's Fees Under 35 U.S.C. Section 285 by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. Certificate of Service.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(MARSHALL, LEE) Modified on 6/14/2012 (ahf, ).
June 13, 2012 Filing 325 RESPONSE in Opposition re #299 MOTION for Attorney Fees, #302 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARSHALL, LEE) Modified on 6/14/2012 (ahf, ).
June 13, 2012 Filing 324 Declaration re #323 Objections Declaration of K. Lee Marshall In Support of Alzheimer's Institute of America, Inc.'s Objections to Avid Radiopharmaceuticals' Bill of Costs by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(MARSHALL, LEE) Modified on 6/14/2012 (ahf, ).
June 13, 2012 Filing 323 Objections by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. re #300 Bill of Costs . (MARSHALL, LEE)
June 7, 2012 Filing 322 Declaration re #321 Objections Declaration of K. Lee Marshall In Support of Alzheimer's Institute of America, Inc.'s Objections to Motion of the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania to Tax Costs by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MARSHALL, LEE)
June 7, 2012 Filing 321 Objections by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. re #306 MOTION for Bill of Costs and Taxation and Supporting Documents . (MARSHALL, LEE)
June 6, 2012 Filing 320 NOTICE by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS re #319 Reply to Response to Motion, (Corrected Filing of Avid's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Security for Costs and Attorney's Fees) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (May 20, 2012, E-mail from L.S. Burwell to B. Goldman))(BURWELL, L.)
June 6, 2012 Filing 319 REPLY to Response to Motion re #312 MOTION for Bond / Motion for Security for Costs and Attorney's Fees filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (May 20, 2012, E-mail from L.S Burwell to B. Goldman))(BURWELL, L.)
June 1, 2012 Filing 318 NOTICE by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS of Filing Corrected, Public Version of Bill of Costs (Attachments: #1 Bill of Costs and Incorporated Supporting Memorandum, #2 Notice of Motion to Tax Costs, #3 Declaration of L. Scott Burwell Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1924, #4 Form AO133, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Supplement to Bill of Costs)(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
June 1, 2012 Filing 317 NOTICE by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS of Filing Corrected, Public Version of Motion for Attorney's Fees (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Motion for Attorneys Fees Under 35 U.S.C. 285, #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Attorneys Fees Under 35 U.S.C. 285, #4 Declaration of L. Scott Burwell in Support of Motion for Attorneys Fees Under 35 U.S.C. 285, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Supplement 12)(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER THAT THE CLERK SHALL UNSEAL THE MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES (DOC #299), THE MOTION FOR SECURITY FOR COSTS AND FEES (DOC #301), AND THE MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES (DOC #302). ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/30/12. ) 5/31/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2012: #1 ORDER) (gn, ). Modified on 6/5/2012 (gn, ).
May 30, 2012 Filing 315 MOTION for New Trial , MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, A NEW TRIAL filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC..RENEWED MOTION, BRIEF, PROPOSED ORDER, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(MARSHALL, LEE)
May 30, 2012 Filing 314 RESPONSE in Opposition re #312 MOTION for Bond / Motion for Security for Costs and Attorney's Fees, #301 MOTION FOR SECURITY FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEY'S FEES ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' MOTION FOR SECURITY FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEY'S FEES filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARSHALL, LEE)
May 30, 2012 Filing 313 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Conference held on 5/29/12. (gn, )
May 30, 2012 Filing 312 MOTION for Bond / Motion for Security for Costs and Attorney's Fees filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.Memorandum in Support and Certificate of Service.(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
May 29, 2012 Filing 311 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.Declaration.(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
May 29, 2012 Filing 310 BILL OF COSTS by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (Attachments: #1 Bill of Costs, #2 Supplement To Bill of Costs, #3 Form AO 133)(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
May 25, 2012 Filing 309 SUPPLEMENT to its Bill of Costs withdrawing request for translation fees, filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
May 25, 2012 Filing 308 Statement Avid Radiopharmaceuticals' Statement Regarding Filing Document Nos. 300-302 Under Seal by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (BURWELL, L.)
May 25, 2012 Filing 307 Statement in Support of Filing Motion for Attorney's Fees Under Seal by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA. (LUCCI, JOSEPH)
May 24, 2012 Filing 306 MOTION for Bill of Costs and Taxation and Supporting Documents filed by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.. (Attachments: #1 Bill of Costs Form, #2 Memorandum, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(LUCCI, JOSEPH)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER THAT THE JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR RESPONSES AND REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS (DOC. NO. 304) IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ITS RESPONSES TO THE MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS NO LATER THAN 6/13/2012. REPLIES, IF ANY, TO THE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 6/27/2012. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/24/2012. 5/24/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems)
May 24, 2012 Filing 304 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #299 MOTION for Attorney Fees, #302 MOTION for Attorney Fees, #301 MOTION FOR SECURITY FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEY'S FEES JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR RESPONSES TO AND REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC..Joint Motion, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(GOLDMAN, BERRIE)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER THAT NO LATER THAN 5/25/12, EACH MOVING PARTY SHALL FILE A STATEMENT EXPLAINING WHY THE MOTIONS SHOULD BE FILED UNDER SEAL. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/21/12. ) 5/22/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
May 16, 2012 Filing 302 MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES UNDER 35 U.S.C. SECTION 285, FILED BY AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, MEMORANDUM, DECLARATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gn, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2012: #1 motion, #2 exhibits 1-6, #3 exhibits 8-10, #4 exhibit 11, #5 exhibit 12) (gn, ). Modified on 5/31/2012 (gn, ). (DOCUMENT UNSEALED PURSUANT TO ORDER DATED 5/30/12 DOC #316) (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/31/2012) (EXHIBIT 7 REMAINS SEALED) (td, ). Modified on 5/31/2012 (td, ).
May 16, 2012 Filing 301 MOTION FOR SECURITY FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEY'S FEES, FILED BY AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gn, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2012: #1 motion for security) (gn, ). Modified on 5/31/2012 (gn, ). ( DOCUMENT UNSEALED PURSUANT TO ORDER DATED 5/30/12 DOC #316)
May 16, 2012 Filing 300 BILL OF COSTS and Incorporared supporting memorandum by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. ( FILED UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
May 16, 2012 Filing 299 MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES UNDER 35 U.S.C. SECTION 285, FILED BY THE DEFT THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gn, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2012: #1 motion) (gn, ). Modified on 5/31/2012 (gn, ). ( DOCUMENT UNSEALED PURSUANT TO ORDER DATED 5/30/12 DOC #316)
May 9, 2012 Filing 298 REPLY to Response to Motion re #276 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Pleadings Reply to Defendants filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES with Certificate of Service. (SCHILLER, RONALD) Modified on 5/10/2012 (lbc, ).
May 9, 2012 Filing 297 REPLY to Response to Motion re #276 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Pleadings Reply to AIA filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES with Certificate of Service. (SCHILLER, RONALD) Modified on 5/10/2012 (lbc, ).
May 3, 2012 Filing 296 RESPONSE in Opposition re #276 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Pleadings filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Excerpt from DTX-86), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BURWELL, L.)
May 2, 2012 Filing 295 RESPONSE in Opposition re #276 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Pleadings ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO INTERVENOR UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES' MOTION TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARSHALL, LEE)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P.58(b)(2), JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF THE DEFENDANTS AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS AND THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA AGAINST THE PLAINTIFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/2/2012. 5/2/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(lbs, )
May 2, 2012 Filing 293 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day 9 Hearing held on 4/20/2012 before Judge TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. Court Reporter: SUZANNE R. WHITE. (ems)
May 2, 2012 Filing 292 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day 8 Hearing held on 4/19/2012 before Judge TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. Court Reporter: SUZANNE R. WHITE. (ems)
May 2, 2012 Filing 291 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day 7 Hearing held on 4/18/2012 before Judge TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. Court Reporter: SUZANNE R. WHITE. (ems)
May 2, 2012 Filing 290 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day 6 Hearing held on 4/17/2012 before Judge TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. Court Reporter: SUZANNE R. WHITE. (ems)
May 2, 2012 Filing 289 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day 5 Hearing held on 4/16/2012 before Judge TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. Court Reporter: SUZANNE R. WHITE. (ems)
May 2, 2012 Filing 288 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day 4 Hearing held on 4/13/2012 before Judge TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. Court Reporter: SUZANNE R. WHITE. (ems)
May 2, 2012 Filing 287 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day 3 Hearing held on 4/12/2012 before Judge TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. Court Reporter: SUZANNE R. WHITE. (ems)
May 2, 2012 Filing 286 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day 2 Hearing held on 4/11/2012 before Judge TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. Court Reporter: SUZANNE R. WHITE. (ems)
May 2, 2012 Filing 285 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day 1 Hearing held on 4/10/2012 before Judge TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. Court Reporter: SUZANNE R. WHITE. (ems)
May 2, 2012 Filing 284 TRANSCRIPT of Final Pretrial Hearing held on 4/4/2012 before Judge TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. Court Reporter: SUZANNE R. WHITE. (ems)
May 2, 2012 Filing 283 TRANSCRIPT of Final Pretrial Hearing held on 4/3/2012 before Judge TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. Court Reporter: SUZANNE R. WHITE. (ems)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER THAT, IT APPEARING THAT THE ORDER OF APRIL 23, 2012, DENYING THE UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW INCORRECTLY IDENTIFIED THE MOTION AS DOCUMENT NO. 264, IT IS ORDERED THAT THE CLERK SHALL CORRECT THE DOCKET TEXT TO REFLECT THAT THE ORDER DENYING THE MOTION RELATED TO DOCUMENT 263. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/1/12. 5/2/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, )
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER THAT UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEE'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (DOC #263) IS DENIED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/19/12. ) 4/23/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, ) Modified on 5/2/2012 (ky, ).
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER THAT ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (DOC #273) IS DENIED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/19/12. ) 4/23/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (DOC #272) IS DENIED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/19/12. ) 4/23/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 278 Questions to Jurors with answers thereof. (gn, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 277 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Jury Trial (Day 10) held on 4/20/12. Court Reporter: Suzanne White. (gn, )
April 20, 2012 Filing 276 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Pleadings filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Counterclaim)(SCHILLER, RONALD)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PA BE AND HE IS HEREBY DIRECTED TO FURNISH LUNCH FOR (9) JURORS ENGAGED IN THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/20/12. ) 4/20/12 ENTERED(gn, )
April 20, 2012 Filing 274 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Jury Trial (Day 9) held on 4/19/12. Court Reporter: Suzanne White. (gn, )
April 20, 2012 Filing 273 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC..Memorandum.(MARSHALL, LEE)
April 19, 2012 Filing 272 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants Avid Radiopharmaceuticals' and The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Inventorship, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BURWELL, L.)
April 19, 2012 Filing 271 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Jury Trial (Day 8) held on 4/18/12. Court Reporter: Suzanne White. (gn, )
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER THAT, FOR THE REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD, THE #205 MOTION IN LIMINE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/19/12. 4/19/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mas, )
April 18, 2012 Filing 269 Proposed Jury Instructions by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (BURWELL, L.)
April 18, 2012 Filing 268 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Jury Trial (Day 7) held on 4/17/12. Court Reporter: Suzanne White. (gn, )
April 18, 2012 Filing 267 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Jury Trial (Day 6) held on 4/16/12. Court Reporter: Suzanne White. (gn, )
April 18, 2012 Filing 266 Proposed Jury Instructions by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES. Certificate of Service (SCHILLER, RONALD)
April 16, 2012 Filing 265 RESPONSE in Opposition re #264 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Standing, #263 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (MARSHALL, LEE)
April 16, 2012 Filing 264 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Standing filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants Avid Radiopharmaceuticals' and The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BURWELL, L.)
April 16, 2012 Filing 263 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(SCHILLER, RONALD)
April 16, 2012 Filing 262 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Jury Trial (Day 5) held on 4/13/12. Court Reporter: Suzanne White. (gn, )
April 13, 2012 Filing 261 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Jury Trial (Day 4 ) held on 4/12/12. Court Reporter: Suzanne White. (gn, )
April 12, 2012 Filing 260 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Jury Trial (Day 3) held on 4/11/12. Court Reporter: Suzanne White. (gn, )
April 11, 2012 Filing 259 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Jury Trial (Day 2) held on 4/10/12. Court Reporter: Suzanne White. (gn, )
April 10, 2012 Filing 258 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Jury Trial (Day 1) held on 4/4/12 Court Reporter: Suzanne White. (gn, )
April 9, 2012 Filing 257 LETTER Response re #256 Memorandum Letter to Judge Savage regarding AIA Bench Memorandum on Equitable Estoppel by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (SCHILLER, RONALD) Modified on 4/10/2012 (afm, ).
April 9, 2012 Filing 256 Memorandum ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S BENCH MEMORANDUM ON EQUITABLE ESTOPPEL by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (MARSHALL, LEE)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER THAT THE OBJECTIONS ARE SUSTAINED OR OVERRULED AS SET FORTH IN THE MARGINS OF THE RESPECTIVE LIST OF OBJECTIONS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL EDIT THE VIDEOTAPE DEPOSTIONS IN LIGHT OF THESE RULINGS AND TO ELIMINATE ALL UNNECESSAY COMMENTS AND DISCUSSIONS OF THE ATTORNEYS. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/9/12. ) 4/9/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER THAT AIA'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY AT TRIAL (DOC #213) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/5/12. ) 4/5/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
April 5, 2012 Filing 253 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Final Pretrial Conference held on 4/3/12 Court Reporter: Suzanne white. (gn, )
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS IN LIMINE (DOC NOS. 208 AND 210) ARE GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/4/12. ) 4/5/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC #206) IS DENIED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/4/12. ) 4/5/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER THAT THE MOTION IN LIMINE (DOC #214) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/4/12. ) 4/5/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER THAT AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS AND THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PA.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. FROM PRESENTING OR RELYING ON THE INVENTORSHIP OPINIONS OF DAVID PERRYMAN, GWENDOLYN SPRATT, OR BRUCE BECKER (DOC #215) IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DAVID PERRYMAN, GWENDOLYN SPRATT AND BRUCE BECKER ARE PRECLUDED FROM OFFERING ANY INVENTORSHIP OPINIONS, AND PLFF IS PRECLUDED FROM RELYING ON SUCH OPINIONS. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/3/13. ) 4/4/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER THAT THE DEFT AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS AND THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PA.'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE AIA'S RELIANCE ON THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. MICHAEL MULLAN (DOC #215) IS DENIED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/3/12. ) 4/4/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER THAT DEFT RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS AND THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PA.'S MOTION IN LIMINE (DOC #215) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. (. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/3/12. ) 4/4/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER THAT THE MOTION IN LIMINE (DOC #207) IS DENIED AS MOOT. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/3/12. ) 4/4/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, ) Modified on 4/4/2012 (gn, ).
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER THAT THE MOTION IN LIMINE (DOC #209) IS DENIED AS MOOT. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/3/12. ) 4/4/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, ) Modified on 4/4/2012 (gn, ).
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER THAT THE UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES MOTION IN LIMINE (DOC #204) IS DENIED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/3/12. ) 4/4/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, ) Modified on 4/4/2012 (gn, ).
March 29, 2012 Filing 243 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Conference held on 3/29/12. (gn, )
March 28, 2012 Filing 242 STIPULATION of the Parties by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (MASUROVSKY, LAURA)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT (DOC #237) IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL FILE DESIGNATED DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS NO LATER THAN 3/30/12. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/28/12. ) 3/28/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
March 28, 2012 Filing 240 NOTICE by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS re #207 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Settlement Negotiations, #209 MOTION in Limine of Avid Radiopharmaceuticals and The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to AIA's Sponsorship of Alzheimer's Disease Research, Licensing of the Patents in Suit, and AIA (Avid Radiopharmaceuticals and The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania's Withdrawal of Motions in Limine) (MASUROVSKY, LAURA)
March 26, 2012 Filing 239 Reply in support of its motion in limine to preclude evidence relating to funding from third parties, filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. ( FILED UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
March 26, 2012 Filing 238 Proposed Jury Instructions by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MARSHALL, LEE)
March 26, 2012 Filing 237 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC..JOINT MOTION; PROPOSED ORDER; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(GOLDMAN, BERRIE)
March 21, 2012 Filing 236 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES VAUGHN SPENCER on behalf of THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA with Certificate of Service(SPENCER, JAMES)
March 20, 2012 Filing 230 Objections by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. Plaintiff Alzheimer's Institute of America, Inc.'s Objections to Deposition Counter-Designations of Defendants and Intervenor. (MARSHALL, LEE)
March 19, 2012 Filing 235 Memorandum in opposition to the University of South florida Board of Trustees' motion in limine to preclude Alzheimer's Institute of America, Inc. from introducing at trial argument or evidence regarding anay alleged disclosure of the Swedish Mutations Invention to USF prior to 5/4/92 (D.N. 216), filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC., Declaration, Certificate of Service. ( FILED UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
March 19, 2012 Filing 234 Memorandum in opposition to Avid Radiopharmaceuticals and the Trustees of the University of PA.'s motion in limine to preclude evidence relating to funding from third parties (D.N. 214), filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC., Declarations, Certificate of Service. ( FILED UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
March 19, 2012 Filing 233 Memorandum in opposition to Avid Radiopharmaceutcals and The Trustees of the University of PA's motion to preclude AIA'S Reliance on the expert testimony of Dr. Michael Mullan (D.N> 215), filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC., Declarations, Certificate of Service. ( FILED UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
March 19, 2012 Filing 232 Objections by defts' AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA to the Alzheimer's Institute of America, Inc.'s designations and cousnter-designations. ( FILED UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
March 19, 2012 Filing 231 Memorandum in opposition to Alzheimer's Institute of America, Inc.'s motions in limine, filed by defts' AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA. ( FILED UNER SEAL ) (gn, )
March 19, 2012 Filing 229 RESPONSE in Opposition re #206 MOTION in Limine to Stage the Trial in Two Parts (of Avid Radiopharmaceuticals and The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania) filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MASUROVSKY, LAURA)
March 19, 2012 Filing 228 Objections by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES to AIA's Deposition Designations and Counter Designations. (SCHILLER, RONALD)
March 19, 2012 Filing 227 Objections by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. PLAINTIFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S OBJECTIONS TO DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS OF DEFENDANTS AND INTERVENOR. (MARSHALL, LEE)
March 19, 2012 Filing 226 RESPONSE to Motion re #215 MOTION in Limine ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' AND THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE AIA FROM PRESENTING OR RELYING ON THE INVENTORSHIP OPINIONS OF DAVID PERRYMAN, GWENDOLYN SPRATT, OR BRUCE BECKER (D.N. 215) filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (MARSHALL, LEE)
March 19, 2012 Filing 225 RESPONSE in Opposition re #208 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Conclusions of Law Previously Determined by This Court in Its August 31, 2011 Memorandum Opinion, #210 MOTION in Limine of Avid Radiopharmaceuticals and The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania to Preclude Plaintiff from Contesting that Ownership of the Swedish Mutation Inventions and Patents in Suit Vested in USF by Operation of Florida Law filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARSHALL, LEE)
March 19, 2012 Filing 224 RESPONSE in Opposition re #205 MOTION in Limine To Preclude AIA From Introducing at Trial Argument or Evidence to Assert the Affirmative Defense of Equitable Estoppel ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO THE UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES' MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE AIA FROM INTRODUCING A TRIAL ANY ARGUMENT OR EVIDENCE TO ASSERT THE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE OF EQUITABLE ESTOPPEL (D.N. 205) filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARSHALL, LEE)
March 19, 2012 Filing 223 RESPONSE in Opposition re #207 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Settlement Negotiations ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDNECE AND ARGUMENT RELATING TO SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS (D.N. 207) filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARSHALL, LEE)
March 19, 2012 Filing 222 RESPONSE in Opposition re #209 MOTION in Limine of Avid Radiopharmaceuticals and The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to AIA's Sponsorship of Alzheimer's Disease Research, Licensing of the Patents in Suit, and AIA ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' AND THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE AIA FROM PRESENTING AND RELYING ON EVIDENCE OF AIA'S SPONSORSHIP OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE RESEARCH, LICENSING OF THE PATENTS IN SUIT, AND AIA'S REASONS FOR BRINGING THIS LAWSUIT (D.N. 209) filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARSHALL, LEE)
March 19, 2012 Filing 221 RESPONSE in Opposition re #215 MOTION in Limine ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' AND THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE POST-DATING THE MAY 4, 1992, LETTER (D.N. 215) filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARSHALL, LEE)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER THAT THE JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE JURY INSTRUCTIONS (DOC #218) IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT NO LATER THAN 3/26/12, THE PARTIES SHALL FILE THEIR JOINT PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS, PROPOSED VERDICT FORMS AND/OR PROPOSED SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/14/12. ) 3/14/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER THAT DEFTS THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PA. & AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC #203) IS DENIED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/13/12. ) 3/14/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
March 13, 2012 Filing 218 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Jury Instructions filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MASUROVSKY, LAURA)
March 13, 2012 Filing 217 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Conference held on 3/12/12. (gn, )
March 9, 2012 Filing 216 MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. FROM INTRODUCING AT TRIAL ARGUMENT OR EVIDENCE REGARDING ANY ALLEGED DISCLOSURE OF THE SWEDISH MUTATION INVENTION TO USF PRIOR TO 5/4/92, FILED BY UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES. ( FILED UNDER SEAL )(gn, )
March 9, 2012 Filing 215 MOTION IN LIMINE FILED BY DEFTS' AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, AND THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA. ( FILED UNDER SEAL )(gn, )
March 9, 2012 Filing 214 MOTION IN LIMINE BY DEFT AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. ( FILED UNDER SEAL )(gn, )
March 9, 2012 Filing 213 OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY AT TRIAL, FILED BY PLFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. ( FILED UNDER SEAL )(gn, )
March 9, 2012 Filing 212 PROPOSED ORDER as to AIA's Omnibus Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Testimony at Trial filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.(GADO, AMEER) Modified on 3/12/2012 (md).
March 9, 2012 Filing 211 RESPONSE to Motion re #203 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Standing filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES. (SCHILLER, RONALD)
March 9, 2012 Filing 210 MOTION in Limine of Avid Radiopharmaceuticals and The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania to Preclude Plaintiff from Contesting that Ownership of the Swedish Mutation Inventions and Patents in Suit Vested in USF by Operation of Florida Law filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Avid Radiopharmaceuticals and The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania's Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Contesting that Ownership of the Swedish Mutation Inventions and Patents in Suit Vested in USF by Operation of Florida Law, #2 Declaration of Laura P. Masurovsky in Support of Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Contesting that Ownership of the Swedish Mutation Inventions and Patents in Suit Vested in USF by Operation of Florida Law, #3 Exhibit 1 (AIA's Statement Concerning AIA v. Avid in Mayo v. AIA), #4 Text of Proposed Order)(MASUROVSKY, LAURA)
March 9, 2012 Filing 209 MOTION in Limine of Avid Radiopharmaceuticals and The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to AIA's Sponsorship of Alzheimer's Disease Research, Licensing of the Patents in Suit, and AIA's Reasons for Bringing this Lawsuit filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Avid Radiopharmaceuticals and The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania's Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to AIA's Sponsorship of Alzheimer's Disease Research, Licensing of the Patents-in-Suit, and AIA's Reasons for Bringing this Lawsuit, #2 Declaration of Laura P. Masurovsky in Support of Avid Radiopharmaceuticals and The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania's Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to AIA's Sponsorship of Alzheimer's Disease Research, Licensing of the Patents-in-Suit, and AIA's Reasons for Bringing this Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit 1 (Excerpts from K. Duff Deposition), #4 Exhibit 2-1 (K. Duff Passport), #5 Exhibit 2-2 (K. Duff Passport), #6 Exhibit 3 (Excerpts from J. Hardy Deposition), #7 Exhibit 4 (AIA Articles of Incorporation), #8 Text of Proposed Order)(MASUROVSKY, LAURA)
March 9, 2012 Filing 208 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Conclusions of Law Previously Determined by This Court in Its August 31, 2011 Memorandum Opinion filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(SCHILLER, RONALD)
March 9, 2012 Filing 207 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Settlement Negotiations filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Avid Radiopharmaceuticals' Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Settlement Negotiations, #2 Declaration of Laura P. Masurovsky in Support of Avid Radiopharmaceuticals' Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Settlement Negotiations, #3 Exhibit 1 (Excerpts from V. McDevitt Deposition), #4 Exhibit 2 (AIA's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoenas in Elan Matter), #5 Text of Proposed Order)(MASUROVSKY, LAURA)
March 9, 2012 Filing 206 MOTION in Limine to Stage the Trial in Two Parts filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(SCHILLER, RONALD)
March 9, 2012 Filing 205 MOTION in Limine To Preclude AIA From Introducing at Trial Argument or Evidence to Assert the Affirmative Defense of Equitable Estoppel filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service.(SCHILLER, RONALD)
March 9, 2012 Filing 204 MOTION in Limine to Preclude AIA From Introducing at Trial Argument or Evidence Regarding Any Alleged Disclosure of The Swedish Mutation Invention to USF Prior to May 4, 1992 filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(SCHILLER, RONALD)
March 7, 2012 Filing 203 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STANDING, FILED BY DEFT AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (FILED UNDER SEAL )(gn, )
March 2, 2012 Filing 202 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Curriculum Vitae of Peter Henry St. George-Hyslop), #2 Exhibit 2 (Avid's Deposition Designations), #3 Exhibit 3 (Stipulation Regarding Case Schedule), #4 Exhibit 4 (Stipulation Concerning Defendants), #5 Exhibit 5 (Defendants' Objections to AIA's Trial Exhibits))(MASUROVSKY, LAURA)
March 2, 2012 Filing 201 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(MARSHALL, LEE)
March 2, 2012 Filing 200 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES Certificate of Service. (SCHILLER, RONALD)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF KYLE G. HEPNER, ESQ. (DOC #197) IS GRANTED AND IS ADMITTED TO THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THE UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY, ETC. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/1/12. ) 3/1/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF J. BENNETT CLARk, ESQ. (DOC #196) IS GRANTED AND IS ADMITTED TO THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THE PLFF FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY., ETC. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/29/12. )3/1/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
February 29, 2012 Filing 197 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Kyle G. Hepner filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Certificate of Service)(SCHILLER, RONALD) Modified on 3/2/2012 (gn, ). ($40.00 Filing Fee Paid on 3/2/12, Receipt #058902)
February 29, 2012 Filing 196 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of J. Bennett Clark filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC..Affidavit/Certificate of Service.(ORLOSKI, MICHELLE) Modified on 3/1/2012 (gn, ). ($40.00 Filing Fee Paid on 3/1/12, Receipt #058800)
February 28, 2012 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE ORLOSKI on behalf of ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. with Certificate of Service(ORLOSKI, MICHELLE)
February 27, 2012 Filing 194 NOTICE by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. (Feb. 27, 2012 Letter to Judge Savage re: E.D. Mo. Order on Motion to Compel) (GADO, AMEER)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED AND DANIELLE A. DUSZCZYSZYN, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THE DEFENDANT AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/22/2012.2/23/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(lbs, )
February 22, 2012 Filing 192 NOTICE of Change of Address by BERRIE R. GOLDMAN. Certificate of Service.(GOLDMAN, BERRIE) Modified on 2/23/2012 (ahf, ).
February 21, 2012 Filing 191 NOTICE by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. (Letter to Judge Savage dated February 21, 2012, regarding AIA's Motion to Compel in the Northern District of California) (GADO, AMEER)
February 21, 2012 Filing 190 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission Of Danielle A. Duszczyszyn filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.Certificate of Service.(HARVEY, STEPHEN) Modified on 3/14/2012 (gn, ). ($40.00 Filing Fee Paid on 3/14/12, Receipt #059505)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER THAT AIA's MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC #187) IS DENIED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/14/12. ) 2/14/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
February 13, 2012 Filing 188 NOTICE by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. re #187 MOTION to Compel (re: Agreements With And Payments to Witnesses) (Text of Proposed Order) (GADO, AMEER)
February 13, 2012 Filing 187 MOTION to Compel (re: Agreements With And Payments to Witnesses) filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Excerpts of Goate Depo., #2 Exhibit B -- Excerpts of Houlden Depo., #3 Exhibit C -- Excerpts of Hardy Depo., #4 Exhibit D -- AIA's First Req. for Prod. to Avid, #5 Exhibit E -- AIA's Second Req. for Prod. to Avid, #6 Exhibit F -- Avid's Resp. to AIA's First Req. for Prod., #7 Exhibit G -- Avid's Resp. to AIA's Second Req. for Prod.)(GADO, AMEER)
February 8, 2012 Filing 186 NOTICE by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. (Letter to Judge Savage dated February 8, 2012, regarding AIA's Motion to Compel in the Eastern District of Missouri) (GADO, AMEER)
February 1, 2012 Filing 185 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/3/2012 09:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. JURY SELECTION SET FOR 4/4/2012 09:00AM BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 4/10/2012 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM 9-A BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/1/2012. 2/1/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
February 1, 2012 Filing 184 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY SAVAGE: CONFERENCE held on 1/31/12. (jl, ) Modified on 2/2/2012 (jl, ).
January 25, 2012 Filing 183 Response To The Court's January 19, 2012 Order by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. with Certificate of Service. (GADO, AMEER) Modified on 1/26/2012 (lbc, ).
January 19, 2012 Filing 182 NOTICE by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. re #181 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions (Request for Clarification of Order) (GADO, AMEER)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER THAT MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC #179) IS GRANTED. THE MOTION FOR SANCTIONS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/19/12. ) 1/19/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
January 19, 2012 Filing 180 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Status Conference held on 1/18/12. (jl, )
January 18, 2012 Filing 179 SECOND MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE SANCTION, FILED BY DEFT AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. ( FILED UNDER SEAL )(gn, ) Modified on 1/18/2012 (gn, ).
January 17, 2012 Filing 178 Certified Copy of Order from United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit that the petition for writ of mandamus is denied. (gn, )
January 12, 2012 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by BONNIE M. HOFFMAN on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES with Certificate of Service(HOFFMAN, BONNIE)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF L. SCOTT BURWELL, ESQ. (DOC #174) IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT COUNSEL SHALL FILE ALL PLEADINGS ELECTRONICALLY USING THE ELECTRONIC CASE FILING, ETC. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/5/12. ) 1/6/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF CHARLES E. LIPSEY, ESQ., (DOC #173) IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THATR COUNSEL SHALL FILE ALL PLEADNGS ELECTRONICALLY USING THE ELECTRONIC CASE FILING SYSTEM, ETC. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/5/12. ) 1/9/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
January 5, 2012 Filing 174 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for L. Scott Burwell filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.Verified Application and Certificate of Service.(HARVEY, STEPHEN) Modified on 1/11/2012 (gn, ). (FILING FEE PAID ON 1/6/12, RECEIPT #055744)
January 5, 2012 Filing 173 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Charles E. Lipsey filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.Verified Application and Certificate of Service.(HARVEY, STEPHEN) Modified on 1/6/2012 (gn, ). (fILING FEE $40.00 PAID ON 1/6/12, RECEIPT #055744) Modified on 1/11/2012 (gn, ).
December 22, 2011 Filing 172 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Report of Conference held on 12/22/11. Court Reporter: ESR. (ti, )
December 19, 2011 Filing 171 DOCUMENTS RECEIVED FROM THE SENIOR MASTER OF THE SENIOR COURTS OF ENGLAND AND WHALED, QUEEN'S BENCH. (kk, )
December 15, 2011 Filing 170 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Conference held on 12/15/11. (gn, )
December 15, 2011 Filing 169 NOTICE by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. (Letter to Judge Savage dated December 15, 2011, re AIA's Opposition to Alison Goate's Motion to Quash) (GADO, AMEER)
December 12, 2011 Filing 168 CERTIFIED COPY OF AN ORDER FROM THE UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT THAT MOTION OF TIME FOR ALZHEIMERS INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. FOR AN EXTENSION UNTIL 12/12/11 IS GRANTED(rf, )
December 8, 2011 Filing 167 Receipt for return of sealed document no. 157 returned to Kathleen Collins on behalf of Stephen G. Harvey, Esquire pursuant to Order filed on 12/06/2011.
December 7, 2011 Filing 166 MEMORANDUM OPINION. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/7/11. ) 12/7/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER THAT THE CLERK SHALL REMOVE DOCUMENT NO. 157 FROM THE FILE. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/6/11. ) 12/7/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, ) Modified on 12/8/2011 (gn, ).
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC # 162) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: THE GENERAL OBJECTINS OF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. ("AIA") ARE STRICKEN, ETC. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/6/11. ) 12/7/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
December 6, 2011 Filing 163 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Conference was held on 12/5/11. (gn, )
December 6, 2011 Filing 162 REDACTED MOTION to Compel Production of Alzheimer's Institute of America, Inc.'s Financial Documents and Records Showing Ownership of the Corporation; Declaration; and Exhibits) by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS re #157 MOTION to Compel (FELDSTEIN, MARK) Modified on 12/7/2011 (nd, ).
December 5, 2011 Filing 161 NOTICE by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. (Letter to Judge Savage dated December 5, 2011) (GADO, AMEER)
December 5, 2011 Filing 160 Copy of Order from UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT UNDER MISCELLANEOUS DOCKET NO. 111 dated 12/3/2011 THAT THE ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. IS DIRECTED TO RESPOND TO THE PETITION NO LATER THAN 12/7/2011. (tomg, )
December 2, 2011 Filing 159 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Status Conference held on 12/2/2011. (kk, )
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/2/11.12/2/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(fdc)
December 1, 2011 Filing 157 DEFENDANT AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS MOTION TO COMPEL. (rf, ) Modified on 12/7/2011 (gn, ). (Returned to counsel pursuant to order dated 12/6/11, Doc. #165)
December 1, 2011 Filing 156 RESPONSE in Opposition re #153 MOTION for Reconsideration ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM INTERVENOR UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRU filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHILLER, RONALD)
December 1, 2011 Filing 155 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/31/11 before Judge Timothy J. Savage. Court Reporter: Suzanne White. (gn, )
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER THAT THE UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEESSHALL RESPOND TO THE PLFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOC #153) NO LATER THAN THE CLOSE OF BUSINESS THIS DATE. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/1/11. ) 12/1/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, ) Modified on 12/1/2011 (gn, ).
November 30, 2011 Filing 153 MOTION for Reconsideration ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM INTERVENOR UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC..Motion, Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Proposed Order and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(MARSHALL, LEE)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER THAT MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM INTERVENOR UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES (DOCUMENT NO. 149), THE RESPONSE, AND AFTERA CONFERENCE WITH COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES, IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/29/11.11/30/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(er, )
November 29, 2011 Filing 151 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Conference held on 11/28/11. (gn, )
November 28, 2011 Filing 150 RESPONSE to Motion re #149 MOTION to Compel ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM INTERVENOR UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Steven B. Kelber)(SCHILLER, RONALD)
November 23, 2011 Filing 149 MOTION to Compel ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM INTERVENOR UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM INTERVENOR UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC..Motion; Memorandum; Proposed Order and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(GOLDMAN, BERRIE)
November 21, 2011 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH R. DUTILL and JOSEPH MCHALE on behalf of ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC., with Certificate of Service. Withdrawal of ABRAHAM C. REICH and PETER C. BUCKLEY.(DUTILL, KEITH) Modified on 11/22/2011 (md).
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF DAVID S. TAYLOR, ESQUIRE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE (DOC. NO. 144) TO REPRESENT DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES, IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT COUNSEL SHALL FILE ALL PLEADINGS ELECTRONICALLY USING THE ELECTRONIC CASE FILING (ECF) SYSTEM, AND FOLLOW JDGE SAVAGE'S POLICIES AND PROCEDURES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/17/2011.11/18/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER THAT MOTION TO CERTIFY (DOC #137) IS DENIED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/17/11. ) 11/17/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
November 15, 2011 Filing 145 RESPONSE in Support re #137 MOTION to Certify PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1292(b) filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Steven B. Kelber)(SCHILLER, RONALD)
November 15, 2011 Filing 144 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for David S. Taylor filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SCHILLER, RONALD) Modified on 11/16/2011 (gn, ). ($40.OO FILING FEE PAID ON 11/16/11, RECEIPT #053254)
November 14, 2011 Filing 143 REPLY to Response to Motion re #137 MOTION to Certify PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1292(b) filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES. (SCHILLER, RONALD)
November 10, 2011 Filing 142 RESPONSE to Motion re #137 MOTION to Certify PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1292(b) BRYAN CAVE LLPS RESPONSE TO UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC., Certificate of Service. (MARSHALL, LEE) Modified on 11/14/2011 (nd, ).
November 10, 2011 Filing 141 RESPONSE to Motion re #137 MOTION to Certify PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1292(b) filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, Certificate of service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LUCCI, JOSEPH) Modified on 11/14/2011 (nd, ).
November 10, 2011 Filing 140 RESPONSE in Opposition re #137 MOTION to Certify PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1292(b) with Certificate of Service filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BUCKLEY, PETER)
November 7, 2011 Filing 139 VACATED PER ORDER NO. #343 (ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC #136) IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE ORIGINAL EXECUTED COPIES OF THE LETTERS OF REQUEST SHALL BE PROVIDED TO COUNSEL FOR AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS TO SERVE AND EXECUTE IN CONFORMITYWITH THE HAGUE CONVENTION. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/7/11. )11/7/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, ) Modified on 5/8/2013 (kp, ).
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER THAT THE PLFF AND THE DEFTS SHALL RESPOND TO THE MOTION (DOC #137) NO LATER THAN 11/10/11. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/7/11. ) 11/7/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
November 7, 2011 Filing 137 MOTION to Certify PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1292(b) filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHILLER, RONALD)
November 7, 2011 Filing 136 MOTION for Approval / Motion to Approve Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to The Hague Convention of 18 March 1970 on Taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.Certification of Motion as Uncontested and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
November 7, 2011 Filing 135 Letter of Rogatory. ( Picked up by counsel) (gn, )
November 7, 2011 Filing 134 Letter of Rogatory. (Picked up by counsel) (gn, )
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW (DOC #132) IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE APPEARANCE OF BENJAMIN J. SODEY, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR THE PLFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. IS WITHDRAWN. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/2/11. ) 11/2/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
November 1, 2011 Filing 132 MOTION to Withdraw MOTION OF BENJAMIN J. SODEY TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC..Motion, Proposed Order and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(MARSHALL, LEE)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC #111) TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY IS DENIED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/1/11. ) 11/1/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
November 1, 2011 Filing 130 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Oral Argument Hearing held on 10/31/11. Court Reporter: Suzanne White. (gn, )
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS ROGATORY (DOC #99) IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE ORIGINAL EXECUTED COPIES OF THE LETTERS OF REQUEST SHALL BE PROVIDED TO PLFF'S COUNSEL TO SERVE AND EXECUTE IN CONFORMITY WITH THE HAGUE CONVENTION. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/24/11. ) 10/25/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER THAT A HEARING TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE MOTION SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED WILL BE HELD ON 10/31/11 AT 9:30AM IN COURTROOM 9A. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/25/11. ) 10/25/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
October 24, 2011 Filing 127 NOTICE by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. re #111 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION OF BRYAN CAVE LLP TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. (BUCKLEY, PETER)
October 24, 2011 Filing 126 RESPONSE to Motion re #111 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION OF BRYAN CAVE LLP TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES. (SCHILLER, RONALD)
October 21, 2011 Filing 125 RESPONSE in Opposition re #111 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION OF BRYAN CAVE LLP TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (BUCKLEY, PETER)
October 20, 2011 Filing 124 Surreply in opposition to motion to intervene of University of South Florida Board of Trustees, filed by deft AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (gn, )
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER THAT DEFT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR REPLY (DOC #119) IS GRANTED AND THE DEFT'S SUR REPLY IS DEEMED FILED AS OF THIS DATE. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/19/11. ) 10/21/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER THAT THE #92 MOTION TO INTERVENE IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/19/11. ) 10/21/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
October 20, 2011 Filing 121 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Conference held on 10/19/11. (gn, )
October 20, 2011 Filing 120 NOTICE by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES LETTER TO HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE (SCHILLER, RONALD)
October 19, 2011 Filing 119 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply In Opposition to Motion to Intervene of University of South Florida Board of Trustees filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.Certificate of Service.(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
October 17, 2011 Filing 118 RESPONSE in Support re #92 MOTION to Intervene filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Valerie McDevitt, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Gerard Solis, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Gerard Solis)(SCHILLER, RONALD)
October 14, 2011 Filing 117 RESPONSE to Motion re #111 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION OF BRYAN CAVE LLP TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA. (MARION, CHARLES)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER THAT NO LATER THAN 10/17/11, THE UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES SHALL FILE ITS REPLY TO TE DEFTS' RESPONSES TO THE MOTION TO INTERVENE. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/13/11. ) 10/13/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
October 12, 2011 Filing 115 Notice of Filing Redacted Version of Defendant Avid Radiopharmaceuticals' Opposition to Motion to Intervene of University of South Florida Board of Trustees by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, Certificate of Service. (HARVEY, STEPHEN) Modified on 10/13/2011 (lisad, ).
October 11, 2011 Filing 114 RESPONSE in Opposition to motion to intervene of University of South Florida Board of Trustees with supporting declaration of Laura P. Masurovskydeft AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, filed by deft AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS'. ( FILED UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
October 11, 2011 Filing 113 RESPONSE in Opposition re #92 MOTION to Intervene filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (BUCKLEY, PETER)
October 11, 2011 Filing 112 Memorandum IN SUPPORT re #111 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION OF BRYAN CAVE LLP TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(MARSHALL, LEE)
October 11, 2011 Filing 111 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION OF BRYAN CAVE LLP TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC..MEMORANDUM, MOTION, PROPOSED ORDER AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(MARSHALL, LEE)
October 11, 2011 Filing 110 RESPONSE to Motion re #92 MOTION to Intervene by The University of South Florida Board of Trustees filed by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(LUCCI, JOSEPH)
October 4, 2011 Filing 109 Praecipe to Correct Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCHILLER, RONALD)
October 4, 2011 Filing 108 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 12/16/11. ALL DAUBERT MOTIONS, IF ANY, SHALL BE FILED BY 1/27/12. PLFF'S PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM DUE 3/2/12. DEFT'S PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM DUE 3/2/12. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED BY 3/9/12. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 4/10/2012 AT 10:00 AM IN CHAMBERS. THIS CASE WILL BE LISTED FOR TRIAL ON 4/12/2012 AT 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM 9A. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/4/11. ) 10/4/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION TO STAY, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER (DOC #106) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: TO THE EXTENT THE MOTION SEEKS A STAY, IT IS DENIED. TO THE EXTENT THE MOTION SEEKS TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER, IT IS GRANTED; AND AN AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER WILL ISSUE. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/4/11. ) 10/4/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
October 3, 2011 Filing 106 MOTION to Stay PLAINTIFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY STAY, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC..Motion, Memorandum, Proposed Order and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(MARSHALL, LEE)
September 29, 2011 Filing 105 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Status Conference held on 9/28/11. (gn, )
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF STEVEN B. KELBER, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/27/11. 9/29/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED.(ky, )
September 28, 2011 Filing 103 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Status Conference held on 9/27/11. (gn, )
September 28, 2011 Filing 102 NOTICE by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES re #97 Notice (Other) LETTER TO HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE (SCHILLER, RONALD)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DEFT UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES TO ADMIT STEVEN B. KELBER, ESQ. (DOC #98) IS DENIED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/27/11.) 9/28/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, ) Modified on 9/28/2011 (gn, ).
September 27, 2011 Filing 100 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Steven B. Kelber filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(SCHILLER, RONALD)
September 26, 2011 Filing 99 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory MOTION TO APPROVE REQUESTS FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE PURSUANT TO THE HAGUE CONVENTION OF 18 MARCH 1970 ON TAKING OF EVIDENCE ABROAD IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC..MOTION, ORDER AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(GOLDMAN, BERRIE)
September 26, 2011 Filing 98 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Steven B. Kelber filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(SCHILLER, RONALD) Modified on 9/27/2011 (gn, ). ($40.00 Filing Fee Paid on 9/27/11, Receipt 050293)
September 26, 2011 Filing 97 NOTICE by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. LETTER TO THE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE (MARSHALL, LEE)
September 23, 2011 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT L. EBBY on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES with Certificate of Service(EBBY, ROBERT)
September 23, 2011 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by DYLAN J. STEINBERG on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES with Certificate of Service(STEINBERG, DYLAN)
September 22, 2011 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD P. SCHILLER on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES with Certificate of Demand(SCHILLER, RONALD)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER THAT THE PLFF AND THE DEFTS SHALL RESPOND TO THE MOTION (DOC #92) NO LATER THAN 10/4/11. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/22/11. ) 9/22/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, ) Modified on 9/23/2011 (gn, ). Modified on 9/23/2011 (gn, ). (Certified copy mailed to CCP Phila.)
September 22, 2011 Filing 92 MOTION to Intervene filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES.Certifcate of Service.(SCHILLER, RONALD)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 10/31/11. ALL DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 1/3/12. THE PARTIES SHALL FILE THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA BY 2/6/12. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED BY 2/17/12. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/10/2012 AT 10:00 AM IN CHAMBERS. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 4/12/2012 AT 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM 9A. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/12/11. ) 9/13/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
September 6, 2011 Filing 90 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Telephone Conference held on 9/6/11 (gn, )
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER THAT RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT AIA LACKS STANDING TO BRING ITS PATENT INFRINGEMENT SUITE (DOC #57) AND ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STANDING (DOC #59) ARE DENIED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/31/11. ) 8/31/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
August 31, 2011 Filing 88 MEMORANDUM. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/31/11. ) 8/31/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
August 23, 2011 Filing 87 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/10/11 before Judge Timothy J. Savage. (gn, )
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WILL BE HEARD ON 8/10/11 AT 2:00PM IN COURTROOM 9A. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/1/11. ) 8/3/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
June 16, 2011 Filing 85 Avid Radiopharmaceuticals' Reply Memorandum In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment That AIA Lacks Standing To Bring Its Patent ( Redacted Version ) by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (HARVEY, STEPHEN)
June 16, 2011 Filing 84 Declaration re #82 Response, #81 Response in Opposition to Motion, /Declaration of Laura P. Masurovsky In Support Of Avid Radiopharmaceuticals Memorandum In Opposition To AIA's Motion For Summary Judgment On Standing ( Redacted Version ) by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibits 11 thru 17, #3 Exhibits 19 thru 26, #4 Exhibits 29 thru 32, #5 Exhibits 34 35 and 37)(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
June 16, 2011 Filing 83 Declaration re #81 Response in Opposition to Motion, #82 Response / Declaration of Dr. Henry Houlden In Support of Defendant Avid Radiopharmaceuticals' Motion for Summary Judgment by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (HARVEY, STEPHEN)
June 16, 2011 Filing 82 Response To AIA's Statement of Undisputed Facts In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment On Standing ( Redacted Version ) by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (HARVEY, STEPHEN)
June 16, 2011 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition re #60 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STANDING RE: MOTION for Summary Judgment ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STANDING [REDACTED], #59 MOTION for Summary Judgment ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STANDING ( Redacted Version ) filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (HARVEY, STEPHEN)
June 9, 2011 Filing 80 Letter To The Honorable Timothy J. Savage by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (HARVEY, STEPHEN)
May 27, 2011 Filing 79 Reply in support of its motion (Doc #65) for summary judgment on standing, filed by plff ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC., Certificate of Service. ( FILED UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
May 27, 2011 Filing 78 Reply Brief in support of its motion (Doc #63) for summary judgment, filed by deft AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. ( FILED UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
May 27, 2011 Filing 77 REPLY to Response to Motion re 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STANDING [REDACTED] filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (MARSHALL, LEE)
May 20, 2011 Filing 76 Declaration of K. Lee Marshall in support of ALA'S opposition to AVID'S motion for summary judgment on standing, Certificate of Service. ( FILED UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
May 20, 2011 Filing 75 Statement of Disputed Facts in response to deft AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' statement of undisputed facts in support of its motion for summary judgment on standing, filed by plff ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC., Certificate of Service. ( FILED UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
May 20, 2011 Filing 74 Memorandum in opposition to deft AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC.'S (Doc #59) motion for summary judgment on standing, filed by plff ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC., Certificate of Service ( FILED UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
May 20, 2011 Filing 73 Memorandum in opposition to ALA'S (Doc #65) motion for summary judgment on standing, filed by deft AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. ( FILED UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
May 20, 2011 Filing 72 NOTICE by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA re 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Joinder in Avid's Opposition to AIA's Motion for Summary Judgment on Standing (LUCCI, JOSEPH)
May 20, 2011 Filing 71 Declaration re #69 Response in Opposition to Motion, DECLARATION OF K. LEE MARSHALL IN SUPPORT OF AIA'S OPPOSITION TO AVID'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STANDING [REDACTED] by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6 (Redacted))(GOLDMAN, BERRIE)
May 20, 2011 Filing 70 Statement ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS' STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STANDING (D.N. 63) by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (GOLDMAN, BERRIE)
May 20, 2011 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #57 MOTION for Summary Judgment ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STANDING filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GOLDMAN, BERRIE)
May 13, 2011 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE: Confernce held on 5/13/11. (gn, )
May 9, 2011 Filing 67 Notice of Filing Substituted Version of Exhibit 6 to Avid Radiopharmaceuticals' Motion for Summary Judgment That AIA Lacks Standing to Brimg Its Patent Infringement Suit by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. (HARVEY, STEPHEN)
May 6, 2011 Filing 66 NOTICE by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment (NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED VERSION OF AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT AIA LACKS STANDING TO BRING ITS PATENT INFRINGEMENT SUIT) (Attachments: #1 Motion For Summary Judgment (Redacted) Part 1, #2 Motion For Summary Judgment (Redacted) Part 2, #3 Motion For Summary Judgment (Redacted) Part 3, #4 Motion For Summary Judgment (Redacted) Part 4)(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
May 2, 2011 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM, STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC #59), DECLARATION OF K. LEE MARSHALL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION, FILED BY PLFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, CERTIFICATES OF SERVICE.(gn, ) ( FILED UNDER SEAL ) Modified on 5/3/2011 (gn, ). Modified on 6/1/2011 (gn, ).
May 2, 2011 Filing 64 Certificate Under the Evidence of the Queen's Bench Division of Her Majesty's High Court of Justice and by Imperial College of Science, Technology and Medicine. ( FILED IN HARD COPY ) (gn, )
April 29, 2011 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF AVID'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC #63), STATEMENT, DECLARATIONS, EXHIBITS, FILED BY DEFT AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS', CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. ( FILED UNDER SEAL )(gn, ) Modified on 6/1/2011 (gn, ).
April 29, 2011 Filing 62 ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.'S STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STANDING filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC...(GOLDMAN, BERRIE) Modified on 5/3/2011 (nd, ).
April 29, 2011 Filing 61 DECLARATION OF K. LEE MARSHALL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STANDING [REDACTED] filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC..Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9.0, #10 Exhibit 9.1.1, #11 Exhibit 9.1.2, #12 Exhibit 9.2.1, #13 Exhibit 9.2.2, #14 Exhibit 9.3, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 16, #22 Exhibit 17, #23 Exhibit 18, #24 Exhibit 19, #25 Exhibit 20, #26 Exhibit 21, #27 Exhibit 22, #28 Exhibit 23, #29 Exhibit 24, #30 Exhibit 25, #31 Exhibit 26, #32 Exhibit 27, #33 Exhibit 28, #34 Exhibit 29, #35 Exhibit 30, #36 Exhibit 31, #37 Exhibit 32, #38 Exhibit 33, #39 Exhibit 34, #40 Exhibit 35)(GOLDMAN, BERRIE) Modified on 5/3/2011 (nd, ).
April 29, 2011 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STANDING RE: MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. (GOLDMAN, BERRIE) Modified on 5/3/2011 (nd, ).
April 29, 2011 Filing 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STANDING filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(GOLDMAN, BERRIE)
April 29, 2011 Filing 58 NOTICE by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA re #57 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Joinder That AIA Lacks Standing to Bring its Patent Infringement Suit (LUCCI, JOSEPH)
April 29, 2011 Filing 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS..(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE DISCOVERY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/18/2011. 3/18/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(stwe, )
March 17, 2011 Filing 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and for Filing Summary Judgement Motions on Standing filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Errata 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER THAT THE #50 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF NATHANIEL S. EDWARDS, ESQ. IS ADMITTED TO THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THE DEFT AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICASL FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/25/11.) 2/28/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THAT #51 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF ROBERT D. BAJEFSY, ESQ. IS ADMITTED TO THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THE DEFT AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/25/11.) 2/28/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER THAT THE #49 MOTION TO APPROVE A REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/24/11. )2/25/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
February 24, 2011 Filing 51 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice /MOTION OF DEFENDANT AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS TO PERMIT ATTORNEY ROBERT D. BAJEFSKY TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE, WITH EXHIBIT A filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.Certificate of Service.(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
February 24, 2011 Filing 50 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice /MOTION OF DEFENDANT AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS TO PERMIT ATTORNEY NATHANIEL S. EDWARDS TO PRATICE PRO HAC VICE, WITH EXHIBIT A filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.Certificate of Service.(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
February 23, 2011 Filing 49 MOTION TO APPROVE A REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE PURSUANT TO THE HAGUE CONVENTION OF 18 MARCH 1970 ON TAKING OF EVIDENCE ABROAD IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.Certificate of Counsel,Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
February 18, 2011 Filing 48 ANSWER to #43 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, PLAINTIFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC'S ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIMS OF DEFENDANT AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC..(GOLDMAN, BERRIE)
February 18, 2011 Filing 47 ANSWER to #42 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim PLAINTIFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC'S ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIMS OF DEFENDANT THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC..(GOLDMAN, BERRIE)
February 15, 2011 Filing 46 PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH COURT APPROVAL. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/15/11. ) 2/16/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER THAT THE #44 JOINT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER IS GRANED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/15/11. ) 2/16/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
February 14, 2011 Filing 44 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Entry of) filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Protective Order))(FELDSTEIN, MARK)
January 25, 2011 Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with /DEFENDANT AVID'S ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, COUNTERCLAIM against ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
January 25, 2011 Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.(LUCCI, JOSEPH)
January 21, 2011 Filing 41 Copy of Letter of Rogatory or Letters of Request the High Court of Justice in England. 1/21/11 Entered and Original given to counsel (gn, )
January 21, 2011 Filing 40 Copy of Letter of Rogatory or Letters of Request to the High Court of Justice in England. 1/21/11 Entered and Original given to counsel. (gn, )
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER THAT #36 MOTION TO APPROVE REQUESTS FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/19/11. )1/20/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, ) Modified on 1/20/2011 (gn, ).
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER THAT THE MOTION #37 FOR PRO HAC VICE OF MANISHA A. DESAI, ESQ. IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THIS COURT, ETC. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/18/11. ) 1/19/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
January 14, 2011 Filing 37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Manisha A. Desai filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS. Application and Certificate of Service.(HARVEY, STEPHEN) (FILING FEE RECEIVED, RECEIPT # 035938) Modified on 1/19/2011 (jcab).
January 14, 2011 Filing 36 MOTION TO APPROVE REQUESTS FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE PURSUANT TO THE HAGUE CONVENTION OF 18 MARCH 1970 ON TAKING OF EVIDENCE ABROAD IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.Certification Of Motion As Uncontested,Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
January 4, 2011 ***Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 4/29/2011. (gn, )
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING ORDER: THE DEFTS SHALL FILE THEIR RESPONSES TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 1/25/11. ALL FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 4/1/2011. CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 4/29/11. ALL DEADLINES IN THIS ORDER SHALL SUPERCEDE ANY PREVIOUS DEADLINES ORDERED BY THE COURT. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/4/11. ) 1/5/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER THAT #26 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF LAURA P. MASUROVSKY, ESQ. IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/3/11. ) 1/5/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER THAT #25 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF MARK J. FELDSTEIN, ESQ IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/3/11.) 1/5/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER THAT #24 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF AMEER GADO, ESQ. IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/3/11. )1/5/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT #23 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF BENJAMIN A. SODEY, ESQ. IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/3/11. )1/5/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
January 4, 2011 Filing 30 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.(LUCCI, JOSEPH)
January 3, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES S. MARION on behalf of AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS with Certificate of Service(MARION, CHARLES)
December 30, 2010 Filing 28 Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC..(BUCKLEY, PETER) Modified on 1/3/2011 (nd, ).
December 30, 2010 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS re #25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (HARVEY, STEPHEN) Modified on 12/30/2010 (sg, ).
December 30, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.Certificate of Service.(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
December 30, 2010 Filing 25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS..(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
December 29, 2010 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice FOR AMEER GADO, filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. EXHIBITS, PROPOSED ORDER, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. $40.00 FEE PAID, RECEIPT No.: 34942.(sg, )
December 29, 2010 Filing 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice FOR BENJAMIN J. SODEY, filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. EXHIBITS, PROPOSED ORDER, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. $40.00 FEE PAID, RECEIPT No.: 34941.(sg, )
December 27, 2010 Filing 22 Disclosure with Rule 26 Initial Disclosures and Certificate of Service by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
December 27, 2010 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Eli Lilly and Company with Certificate of Service by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS.(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
December 27, 2010 Filing 20 NOTICE by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS /NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (HARVEY, STEPHEN)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. ATTORNEY LEE MARSHALL ADDED TO REPRESENT ALZEHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT COUNSEL SHALL FILE ALL PLEADINGS ELECTRONICALLY USING THE ELECTRONIC CASE FILING (ECF) SYSTEM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/23/2010.12/23/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(stwe, ) Modified on 12/28/2010 (stwe, ).
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED AND BERRIE R. GOLDMAN ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THE PLAINTIFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT COUNSEL SHALL FILE ALL PLEADINGS ELECTRONICALLY USING THE ELECTRONIC CASE FILING (ECF) SYSTEM, AND FOLLOW JUDGE SAVAGE'S POLICIES AND PROCEDURES.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/22/2010. 12/23/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jmf, )
December 21, 2010 Filing 17 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF LEE MARSHALL, ESQ., ON BEHALF OF PLFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC., STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. ($40.00 PAID RECEIPT #034757)(tomg, )
December 21, 2010 Filing 16 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF BERRIE GOLDMAN, ESQ., ON BEHALF OF PLFF ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC., STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. ($40.00 PAID RECEIPT #034757)(gn, )
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER IS DENIED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/20/2010.12/20/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(stwe, )
December 18, 2010 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Modify the SCHEDULING ORDER filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (BUCKLEY, PETER)
December 17, 2010 Filing 13 MOTION to Modify the SCHEDULING ORDER filed by AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.Memorandum, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(SIMMONS, JOHN)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (DOCUMENT NO. 9) AND THE DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 2/15/2011. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/13/2010. 12/14/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jmf, )
December 13, 2010 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. LEONARD on behalf of AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS with Certificate of Service(stwe, )
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT A Rule 26 Meeting Report is due by 12/30/2010, DISCOVERY SHALL COMMENCE IMMEDIATELY, THE INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER FRCP 26(a) SHALL BE MADE WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THIS ORDER, AND A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 1/4/2011 AT 10:00 AM IN ROOM 9614 BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/13/2010. 12/13/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
December 10, 2010 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA..(LUCCI, JOSEPH) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO CLERK/JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 12/14/2010 (nd, ).
December 10, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JORDAN JONAS OLIVER on behalf of THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA with Certificate of Service(OLIVER, JORDAN)
December 10, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH LUCCI on behalf of THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA with Certificate of Service(LUCCI, JOSEPH)
December 10, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN D. SIMMONS on behalf of AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS with Certificate of Service(SIMMONS, JOHN)
December 3, 2010 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by George Phillips re: served Complaint and Summons upon Daniel M. Skovronsky (Avid Radiopharmaceuticals) by personal service on 11/24/2010 (BUCKLEY, PETER)
November 24, 2010 Filing 4 Certification of Damages in Excess of Arbitration Limits, re #1 Complaint seeking damages in excess of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs by PETER C. BUCKLEY on behalf of ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. (BUCKLEY, PETER) Modified on 11/30/2010 (fh)
November 24, 2010 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 5,455,169 & 7,538,258 B2. (mima, )
November 24, 2010 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC..(mima, )
November 24, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 033460.), filed by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(mima, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2012: #3 designation form) (tl, ).
November 24, 2010 Summons Issued as to AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA. Given To: Counsel on November 24, 2010 (mima, )
November 24, 2010 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.. (mima, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC. v. AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALZHEIMER'S INSTITUTE OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: KEITH R. DUTILL
Represented By: J. BENNETT CLARK
Represented By: PETER C. BUCKLEY
Represented By: BENJAMIN J. SODEY
Represented By: MICHELLE ORLOSKI
Represented By: JOSEPH J. MCHALE
Represented By: AMEER GADO
Represented By: LEE MARSHALL
Represented By: BERRIE R. GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: CHARLES S. MARION
Represented By: JOSEPH LUCCI
Represented By: JORDAN JONAS OLIVER
Represented By: JAMES VAUGHN SPENCER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVID RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS
Represented By: STEPHEN G. HARVEY
Represented By: MICHAEL J. LEONARD
Represented By: L. SCOTT BURWELL
Represented By: NATHANIEL S. EDWARDS
Represented By: DANIELLE A. DUSZCZYSZYN
Represented By: JOHN D. SIMMONS
Represented By: ROBERT D. BAJEFSKY
Represented By: MARK J. FELDSTEIN
Represented By: CHARLES S. MARION
Represented By: CHARLES E. LIPSEY
Represented By: MANISHA A. DESAI
Represented By: LAURA P. MASUROVSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES
Represented By: ROBERT L. EBBY
Represented By: DYLAN J. STEINBERG
Represented By: BONNIE M. HOFFMAN
Represented By: ROBERT M. GOLDICH
Represented By: KYLE G. HEPNER
Represented By: DAVID SCOTT TAYLOR
Represented By: RONALD P. SCHILLER
Represented By: STEVEN B. KELBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: GENE D. COHEN
Represented By: GENE D. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?