ELLIS et al v. RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: GLEN ELLIS and DELMAR ELLIS
Defendant: SQUARE D COMPANY, PNEUMO-ABEX, YARWAY CORPORATION, RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION, GRINNELL LLC, KENTILE FLOORS INC, DANA COMPANIES, LLC., INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, GARDNER DENVER INC, STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION, KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY, MAREMONT CORPORATION, BW/IP INC, C.P. HALL COMPANY, A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, VIACOM INC, AURORA PUMP COMPANY, DEERE & COMPANY, RILEY POWER, INC., CNH AMERICA LLC, DAP INC, KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC, MUELLER COMPANY, GRINNELL CORPORATION, CROWN, CORK & SEAL USA, INC., CATERPILLAR INC., CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, ANDERSON, GREENWOOD & CO., EATON CORPORATION, DANA HOLDING CORPORATION, JOY TECHNOLOGIES INC., JOHN CRANE, INC., HENRY PRATT COMPANY, H.B. FULLER COMPANY, MUELLER GROUP LLC, ITT INDUSTRIES INC, BORG-WARNER CORPORATION, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, CRANE COMPANY, FMC CORPORATION, UNIROYAL INC, HENRY VOGT MACHINE COMPANY, AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS INC., FEDERAL-MOGUL U.S. ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, CUMMINS INC and GOULDS PUMPS INC
Case Number: 2:2010cv84894
Filed: December 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2013 Filing 12 MOTION AND ORDER THAT ATTORNEY JOHN ANTHONY FONSTAD IS WITHDRAWN AS COUNSEL AND ATTORNEY JEFFREY MICHAEL SCHIEBER IS SUBSTITUTED FOR GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/12/13. 3/20/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mas, )
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND #4 , IS GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE BE REMANDED TO THE CIRCUIT COURT OF COOK COUNTY, ILLINOIS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/5/11.1/7/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
January 3, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand filed by DELMAR ELLIS, GLEN ELLIS.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BYRNE, KATHARINE)
December 23, 2010 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw #6 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by CRANE COMPANY.Notice of Withdrawal of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, with Certificate of Service.(ZUKOWSKI, MICHAEL)
December 20, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by LANCE E MUELLER on behalf of DANA COMPANIES, LLC., DANA HOLDING CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(MUELLER, LANCE)
December 16, 2010 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand Defendant General Electric Company's Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (FONSTAD, JOHN)
December 10, 2010 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand with Certificate of Service filed by CRANE COMPANY. (ZUKOWSKI, MICHAEL)
December 10, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI on behalf of CRANE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(ZUKOWSKI, MICHAEL)
December 10, 2010 Filing 4 COPY OF MOTION TO REMAND FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLEN ELLIS. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(tjd)
December 1, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL (lg, )
December 1, 2010 Filing 2 AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONS TO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES, DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (lg, )
December 1, 2010 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER NO. 865 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASES FROM THE U.S.D.C. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (lg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELLIS et al v. RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SQUARE D COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO-ABEX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YARWAY CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENTILE FLOORS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA COMPANIES, LLC.
Represented By: LANCE E MUELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY
Represented By: STEPHEN RICHARD AYRES
Represented By: SEAN MARK CONAGHAN
Represented By: PAUL B. O'FLAHERTY, JR.
Represented By: DANIEL J. CHEELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL W. DRUMKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY
Represented By: HEATHER MARIE IGNOFFO
Represented By: DAVID M. HOLMES
Represented By: ANTHONY M. GOLDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAREMONT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.P. HALL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: MAJA C. EATON
Represented By: JEFFREY MICHAEL SCHIEBER
Represented By: JOHN ANTHONY FONSTAD
Represented By: EDWARD P. KENNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM INC
Represented By: DEMETRA ARAPAKIS CHRISTOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEERE & COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RILEY POWER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH AMERICA LLC
Represented By: JEFFERY GEORGE CHRONES
Represented By: WILLIAM G. BEATTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUELLER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROWN, CORK & SEAL USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAINTEED CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDERSON, GREENWOOD & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA HOLDING CORPORATION
Represented By: LANCE E MUELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOY TECHNOLOGIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENRY PRATT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. FULLER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUELLER GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT INDUSTRIES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORG-WARNER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIROYAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENRY VOGT MACHINE COMPANY
Represented By: STEPHEN RICHARD AYRES
Represented By: SEAN MARK CONAGHAN
Represented By: PAUL B. O'FLAHERTY, JR.
Represented By: DANIEL J. CHEELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL-MOGUL U.S. ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMMINS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLEN ELLIS
Represented By: KATHARINE CRANE BYRNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELMAR ELLIS
Represented By: KATHARINE CRANE BYRNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?