COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C. v. TOBITS et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C.
Defendant: JENNIFER J. TOBITS, DAVID M. FARLEY and JOAN F. FARLEY
Case Number: 2:2011cv00045
Filed: January 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: C. DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2012 Filing 138 Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition re: 91 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Strike Documents Referenced by BLAG and the Farleys filed by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(BARTOLOMUCCI, HOWARD) Modified on 9/28/2012 (fh)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER THAT THIS MATTER IS PLACED ON THE SUSPENSE DOCKET OF THE COURT PENDING THE OUTCOME OF RELEVANT CASES & ADDITIONAL RESEARCH ON THE PENDING MOTIONS. THE CASE SHALL REMAIN IN SUSPENSE PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT.SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/25/12. 9/26/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 24, 2012 Filing 136 JENNIFER J. TOBITS'S Response to DAVID AND JOAN FARLEY'S 134 Notice of Supplemental Authority, Certificate of Service. (STOLL, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 9/25/2012 (fh)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER THAT MOTION OF INTERVENOR-DEFT BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFT JENNIFER TOBITS' MOTION TO STRIKE IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT INTERVENOR-DEFT THE BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES SHALL FILE ITS SUR-REPLY WITHIN TEN CALENDAR DAYS OF THE DATE THIS ORDER IS ENTERED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/18/12. 9/20/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 13, 2012 Filing 134 DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY'S Notice of Supplemental Authority, Certificate of Service. (WENGER, RANDALL) Modified on 9/14/2012 (fh)
September 7, 2012 Filing 133 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP.Memorandum & Certification of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(KIRCHER, KERRY)
August 7, 2012 Filing 132 CROSS-CLAIMANT JENNIFER TOBIT'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE DOCUMENTS REFERENCED BY BLAG AND THE FARLEYS (amas)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER THAT, TO ANY EXTENT IT IS NOT MOOT, THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCKETED AT NO. 100 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/6/2012.8/8/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
July 23, 2012 Filing 130 NOTICE by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY re 128 Notice (Other) Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority (WENGER, RANDALL)
July 18, 2012 Filing 129 Response re 128 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority by Jennifer Tobits' by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (BARTOLOMUCCI, HOWARD)
July 13, 2012 Filing 128 NOTICE by JENNIFER J. TOBITS "Notice of Supplemental Authority" (WHELAN, AMY)
June 13, 2012 Filing 127 Response re 125 Notice of Supplemental Authority by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY ). Certificate of Service.(WENGER, RANDALL) Modified on 6/14/2012 (ahf, ).
June 11, 2012 Filing 126 Response re 125 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP, Certificate of Service. (BARTOLOMUCCI, HOWARD) Modified on 6/12/2012 (nd, ).
June 4, 2012 Filing 125 NOTICE by JENNIFER J. TOBITS of Supplemental Authorities (WHELAN, AMY)
March 26, 2012 Filing 124 Response to Cozen & O'Connor Letter of March 21, 2012 by EQUALITY FORUM. (HOFFMAN, SUSAN)
March 21, 2012 Filing 123 NOTICE by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C. re 120 Statement Response to Human Rights Campaign and Equality Forum's Statement of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(CAUGHIE, JILL)
March 20, 2012 Filing 122 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service, re: 121 Transcript - PDF. 3/20/12 Entered and Copies E-mailed and Mailed. (kw, ) Modified on 4/26/2012 (afm, ). (TRANSCRIPT HELD ON 3/12/2012 IS RESTRICTED PER COURT DATED 4/20/2012)
March 20, 2012 Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 3/12/12, before Judge C. Darnell Jones, II. Court Reporter/Transcriber ESR. (kw, ) Modified on 4/26/2012 (afm, ).
March 14, 2012 Filing 120 Statement Supplemental Information by EQUALITY FORUM. (HOFFMAN, SUSAN)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF DALE SCHOWENGERDT, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II 3/7/12. 3/7/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF ROBERT P. GEORGE, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II 3/7/12. 3/7/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
March 7, 2012 Filing 117 APPLICATION/PETITION for those attorneys seeking to practice in this court pursuant to local rule of civil procedure 83.5.2(b) by FREDERICK DOUGLASS FOUNDATION. (PROCTOR, CHARLES) (filing fee paid on 3/21/12) Modified on 3/21/2012 (kw, ).
March 6, 2012 Filing 116 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by ROBERT P. GEORGE.Applicant's Statement, Sponsor's Statement, Proposed Order and Certificate of Service.(AUTRY, JOSHUA)
March 6, 2012 Filing 115 Response re 113 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP. (BARTOLOMUCCI, HOWARD)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON 3/12/2012 SHALL COMMENCE AT 1:00 P.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 3/1/12. 3/2/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
February 23, 2012 Filing 113 NOTICE by JENNIFER J. TOBITS of Supplemental Authority (WHELAN, AMY)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF SHANNON PRICE MINTER, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 2/7/12. 2/8/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF CHRISTOPHER F. STOLL, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 2/7/12. 2/8/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
February 6, 2012 Filing 110 APPLICATION for admission of CHRISTOPHER F. STOLL, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT JENNIFER J. TOBITS.(filing fee paid on 2/6/12) (kw, )
February 6, 2012 Filing 109 APPLICATION for admission of SHANNON PRICE MINTER, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT JENNIFER J. TOBITS.(filing fee paid on 2/6/12) (kw, )
February 2, 2012 Filing 108 NOTICE by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 103 Response to Brief and Statement, 104 Notice (Other), 55 Order, Set Deadlines, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,, 102 Memorandum Regarding Reply Brief (LITTLETON, JUDSON)
January 20, 2012 Filing 107 NOTICE by JENNIFER J. TOBITS of Supplemental Legal Authority (WHELAN, AMY)
January 20, 2012 Filing 106 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by AMY WHELAN on behalf of JENNIFER J. TOBITS(WHELAN, AMY)
January 20, 2012 Filing 105 RESPONSE in Opposition re 100 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of "Motion to Strike" filed by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(KIRCHER, KERRY)
January 17, 2012 Filing 104 NOTICE by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP re 55 Order, Set Deadlines, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,, 97 Memorandum of DOJ re: Constitutionality of DOMA Section 3 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KIRCHER, KERRY)
January 17, 2012 Filing 103 Defendant's Response to Request for Review of Plaintiff re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss, 25 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims of Jennifer J. Tobits (The Farleys response to Brief of the United States) filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY. (WENGER, RANDALL)
January 13, 2012 Filing 102 Memorandum in Support re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss (Ms. Tobits's Response to Brief of the United States) filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (WHELAN, AMY)
January 11, 2012 Filing 101 Proposed Pretrial Order Granting Jennifer Tobits's Motion to Strike Documents Referenced by BLAG and the Farleys by JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (WHELAN, AMY)
January 11, 2012 Filing 100 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE DOCUMENTS REFERENCED BY BLAG AND THE FARLEYS filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS, Brief, Certicate of Service.(REPLY BRIEF ATTACHED)(WHELAN, AMY) Modified on 1/20/2012 (md).
January 4, 2012 Filing 99 RESPONSE in Opposition re 91 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Strike Documents Referenced by BLAG and the Farleys filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY. (BREEN, PETER)
January 4, 2012 Filing 98 RESPONSE in Opposition re 91 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Strike Documents Referenced by BLAG and the Farleys filed by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit B)(KIRCHER, KERRY) Modified on 1/5/2012 (lisad, ).
December 30, 2011 Filing 97 Memorandum of Law re 64 MOTION to Intervene As of Right -- Brief of the United States Regarding the Constitutionality of Section 3 of DOMA filed by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (LITTLETON, JUDSON)
December 27, 2011 Filing 96 NOTICE by FREDERICK DOUGLASS FOUNDATION Errata (Attachments: # 1 Errata Corrected Brief)(PROCTOR, CHARLES)
December 23, 2011 Filing 95 Letter to Attorney William A. Bonner re: L.R. 83.5 and 83.5.2. (pod, ) **(NOTICE SENT IN ERROR)** Modified on 12/23/2011 (lisad, ).
December 23, 2011 Filing 94 Letter to Attorney Nathan Daniel Fox re: L.R. 83.5 and 83.5.2. (pod, ) **(NOTICE SENT IN ERROR)** Modified on 12/23/2011 (lisad, ).
December 21, 2011 Filing 93 RESPONSE to Motion re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss, 25 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims of Jennifer J. Tobits, 33 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss Response Br. pursuant to 10/27/11 Order filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY. (WENGER, RANDALL)
December 21, 2011 Filing 92 RESPONSE in Support re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss (Response to Cozen's, the Farleys' and BLAG's Briefs in Response to 10/27/11 Order) filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (WHELAN, AMY)
December 21, 2011 Filing 91 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Strike Documents Referenced by BLAG and the Farleys 72 Memorandum, 71 Notice (Other) filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (WHELAN, AMY) Modified on 12/22/2011 (nd).
December 21, 2011 Filing 90 NOTICE by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C. re 88 Memorandum, 73 Memorandum, 55 Order, Set Deadlines, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,, Cozen O'Connor's Response Brief in Opposition to Jennifer Tobits's Supplemental Brief Pursuant to the Court's October 27, 2011 Order and the Amici Curiae Brief of the Human Rights Campaign and the Equality Forum (CAUGHIE, JILL)
December 21, 2011 Filing 89 NOTICE by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP re 55 Order, Set Deadlines, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,, Response Memorandum of Intervenor the Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives Regarding the Constitutionality of DOMA Section 3 (KIRCHER, KERRY)
December 16, 2011 Filing 88 Amicus Curiae Brief of HUMAN RIGHTS CAMPAIGN AND EQUALITY FORUM. (kw, )
December 16, 2011 Filing 87 Brief of amicus curiae, Certificate of Compliance, Certificate of Service, filed by PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF EX-GAYS & GAYS (PFOX). (kw, )
December 16, 2011 Filing 86 Amicus Curiae Brief, Certificate of Compliance, Certificate of Service, filed by FREDERICK DOUGLASS FOUNDATION. (kw, )
December 16, 2011 Filing 85 Amicus curiae Brief, Certificate of Compliance, Certificate of Service, filed by CONCERNED WOMEN FOR AMERICA. (kw, )
December 16, 2011 Filing 84 Amicus Brief of amicus curiae, Certificate of Compliance, Certificate of Service, filed by GAGE RALEY. (kw, )
December 16, 2011 Filing 83 Brief of amici curiae, Certificate of Compliance, Certificate of Service, filed by RYAN T. ANDERSON, ROBERT P. GEORGE, SHERIF GIRGIS. (kw, )
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER THAT MOTION TO INTERVENE (DOC. #58) IS GRANTED. MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF (DOC. NOS. 75, 76, 77, 78, 79 & 80) ARE GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL APPROPRIATELY DOCKET THE PROPOSED AMICUS BRIEFS. MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IS GRANTED & THE MOTION TO STRIKE IS DENIED, ETC. ORAL ARGUMENT ON MOTION TO INTERVENE SCHEDULED FOR 1/10/2012 IS CANCELED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/15/11.12/16/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
December 15, 2011 Filing 81 BRIEF in Opposition re 80 MOTION for Leave to File, 76 MOTION for Leave to File, 78 MOTION for Leave to File, 77 MOTION for Leave to File, 79 MOTION for Leave to Appear As Amici, 75 MOTION for Leave to File Cozen O'Connor's Omnibus Opposition to Motions for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief filed by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C., Certificate of service. (CAUGHIE, JILL) Modified on 12/16/2011 (nd, ).
December 12, 2011 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to Appear As Amici filed by EQUALITY FORUM, THE HUMAN RIGHTS CAMPAIGN.Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CV of Susan Katz Hoffman, # 2 Exhibit Proposed brief of amici, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(ROPER, MARY)
December 9, 2011 Filing 80 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY ROBERT P. GEORGE, SHERIF GIRGIS, RYAN T. ANDERSON.(AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF ATTACHED)(kw, )
December 9, 2011 Filing 78 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF EX-GAYS & GAYS (PFOX).(AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF ATTACHED)(kw, )
December 9, 2011 Filing 77 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY FREDERICK DOUGLASS FOUNDATION. (AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF ATTACHED)(kw, )
December 9, 2011 Filing 76 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY CONCERNED WOMEN OF AMERICA. (AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF ATTACHED)(kw, )
December 9, 2011 Filing 75 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF OF GAGE RALEY AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY GAGE RALEY. (AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF ATTACHED)(kw, )
December 6, 2011 Filing 74 NOTICE by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP (KIRCHER, KERRY)
December 2, 2011 Filing 73 Memorandum In Support re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss (Jennifer Tobits's Supplemental Brief Pursuant to the Court's October 27, 2011 Order) filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (WHELAN, AMY)
December 2, 2011 Filing 72 Memorandum of Law in Support of Farleys' Motion to Dismiss and in Opposition to Tobits' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss, 25 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims of Jennifer J. Tobits Supplemental brief filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY. (WENGER, RANDALL)
December 2, 2011 Filing 71 NOTICE by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP re 55 Order, Set Deadlines, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,, Memorandum Regarding Constitutionality of DOMA Section 3 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KIRCHER, KERRY)
December 2, 2011 Filing 70 NOTICE by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C. re 55 Order, Set Deadlines, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,, Cozen O'Connor, P.C.'s Supplemental Brief pursuant to Court's October 27, 2011 Order (CAUGHIE, JILL)
December 1, 2011 Filing 69 REPLY filed by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP in Support of its 58 Motion to Intervene for a Limited Purpose, Certificate of Service. (md)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER THAT THE UNCONTESTED MOTION OF PROPOSED INTERVENOR FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IS GRANTED; THE PROPOSED REPLY BRIEF ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT C TO THE MOTION IS DEEMED FILED AS OF THIS DATE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/30/2011. 12/1/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(md)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER THAT MOTION OF UNITED STATES TO INTERVENE AS OF RIGHT IS GRANTED. THE UNITED STATES MAY FILE A RESPONSE TO MOTION TO INTERVENE FILED BY THE BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES NO LATER THAN 12/23/2011. FOR PLANNING PURPOSES, ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE BLAG'S MOTION TO INTERVENE IS SCHEDULED FOR 1/10/2012 AT 3:30 P.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/28/11. 11/30/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
November 28, 2011 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene filed by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP.Memorandum; Certificate of Counsel; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(KIRCHER, KERRY)
November 21, 2011 Filing 65 RESPONSE to Motion re 58 MOTION to Intervene filed by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Certificate of Service.(LITTLETON, JUDSON) Modified on 11/22/2011 (ahf, ).
November 21, 2011 Filing 64 MOTION to Intervene As of Right filed by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LITTLETON, JUDSON)
November 20, 2011 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re 58 MOTION to Intervene filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS, Certificate of Service. (WHELAN, AMY) Modified on 11/21/2011 (nd, ).
November 20, 2011 Filing 62 NOTICE by JENNIFER J. TOBITS Second Request for Judicial Notice, Certificate of Service. (WHELAN, AMY) Modified on 11/21/2011 (nd, ).
November 14, 2011 Filing 61 NOTICE by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY re 57 Notice (Other) in Opposition (BREEN, PETER)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER THAT CROSS CLAIMANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IS HEREBY GRANTED; CROSS CLAIMANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE IS HEREBY DENIED...ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/14/2011.11/14/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
November 4, 2011 Filing 59 Memorandum in Support re 58 MOTION to Intervene filed by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(KIRCHER, KERRY) Modified on 11/7/2011 (nd, ).
November 4, 2011 Filing 58 MOTION to Intervene filed by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Answer to Cozen O'Connor's First Amended Complaint for Interpleader, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(KIRCHER, KERRY)
October 28, 2011 Filing 57 NOTICE by JENNIFER J. TOBITS "Request for Judicial Notice", Certificate of Service. (WHELAN, AMY) Modified on 10/31/2011 (nd, ).
October 28, 2011 Filing 56 MOTION to Strike 54 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS., Certificate of Service.(WHELAN, AMY) Modified on 10/31/2011 (nd, ).
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER THAT PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON SUBJECTS AS DESCRIBED HEREIN, ETC. THE UNITED STATES MAY MOVE TO INTERVENE BY 12/30/2011, ETC. ORAL ARGUMENT ON PENDING MOTIONS IS RESCHEDULED FOR 3/12/2012 AT 2:30 P.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 10/27/11. 10/28/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 25, 2011 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re 51 MOTION for Leave to File filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY, Certificate of service. (BREEN, PETER) Modified on 10/26/2011 (nd, ).
October 24, 2011 Filing 53 NOTICE by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 27 Notice (Other) Acknowledgement of Constitutional Challenge (LITTLETON, JUDSON)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF NINA WASOW, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 10/12/11. 10/13/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 11, 2011 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to File REPLY to Response to Motion re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum / Motion for Permission to File Same filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (WHELAN, AMY) Modified on 10/12/2011 (nd).
October 11, 2011 Filing 50 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF NINA WASOW ON BEHALF OF JENNIFER D. TOBITS. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, SPONSORS STATEMENT, PROPOSED ORDER. (FILING FEE PAID, $40, 051045) (kp, )
October 4, 2011 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss, 33 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY. (BREEN, PETER)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER THAT THE COURT'S ORDER DATED SEPTEMBER 13, 2011, IS AMENDED TO REFLECT THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE PENDING MOTIONS WILL BE HELD ON 12/12/2011 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES II, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/28/2011. 9/29/2011 ENTERED MAILED TO COUNSEL AND COPIES E-MAILED.(lbs, )
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER THAT DAVID & JOAN FARLEY'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR A BRIEF EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO JENNIFER TOBITS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, ETC. IS GRANTED. THE FARLEYS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 10/3/2011 TO RESPOND TO JENNIFER TOBITS' "MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS REGARDING THE FARLEYS' CROSS-CLAIM AND COUNTERCLAIM FOR RELIEF AND HER OPPOSITION TO THE FARLEYS' MOTION TO DISMISS." SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/27/11. 9/28/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 26, 2011 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY.Certificate of Service.(BREEN, PETER)
September 23, 2011 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY, Certificate of Service. (BREEN, PETER) Modified on 9/26/2011 (nd, ).
September 22, 2011 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (WHELAN, AMY)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER THAT THE F.R.C.P. 16 CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/4/2011 IS POSTPONED PENDING RESOLUTION OF OUTSTANDING MOTIONS. THE COURT WILL HOLD ORAL ARGUMENT ON PENDING MOTIONS ON 11/8/2011 AT 3:30 P.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/13/11.9/14/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF TERESA S. RENAKER, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/13/11.9/14/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF JULIE H. WILENSKY, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/13/11.9/14/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF AARON H. STANTON, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/13/11.9/14/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF JONATHAN W. MICHAEL, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/13/11.9/14/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF THOMAS BREJCHA, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/13/11.9/14/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF PETER C. BREEN, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/13/11.9/14/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 13, 2011 Filing 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS.CORRECTED FILING. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A-Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B)(WHELAN, AMY)
September 12, 2011 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Regarding Service of Jennifer Tobits's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss by AMY WHELAN on behalf of JENNIFER J. TOBITS(WHELAN, AMY)
September 12, 2011 Filing 34 Proposed Pretrial Order Granting Jennifer Tobits's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Denying the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss by JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (WHELAN, AMY)
September 12, 2011 Filing 33 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS.Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A-Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B)(WHELAN, AMY) Modified on 9/13/2011 (afm, ).(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY, REFILING CORRECT DOCUMENT)
September 8, 2011 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C. re 31 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (CAUGHIE, JILL)
September 8, 2011 Filing 31 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C..Memorandum, Certificate of Service..(CAUGHIE, JILL)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT A FED. R. CIV. P. 16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD BY TELEPHONE ON 10/4/2011 AT 11:00 A.M. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PARTIES SHALL MAKE THE REQUIRED INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 26(a) WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/23/11. 8/24/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
August 23, 2011 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JENNIFER J. TOBITS re 15 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim Pursuant to ERISA Section 502(h) (WHELAN, AMY)
August 23, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE by JENNIFER J. TOBITS of State Constitutional Question (WHELAN, AMY)
August 23, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE by JENNIFER J. TOBITS of Federal Constitutional Question (WHELAN, AMY)
August 22, 2011 Filing 26 Memorandum of Law in Support re 25 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims of Jennifer J. Tobits filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY, Certificate of Service. (WENGER, RANDALL) Modified on 8/23/2011 (nd, ).
August 22, 2011 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims of Jennifer J. Tobits filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY., Certificate of Service. (WENGER, RANDALL) Modified on 8/23/2011 (nd, ).
August 22, 2011 Filing 24 Defendant Jennifer J. Tobits's ANSWER to 14 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,, "Answer to Cross-Claim by Defendants David M. Farley and Joan F. Farley" by JENNIFER J. TOBITS, Certificate of Service. (WHELAN, AMY) Modified on 8/23/2011 (nd, ).
August 22, 2011 Filing 23 ANSWER to 15 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C., Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6 to Tobits' Counterclaim)(CAUGHIE, JILL) Modified on 8/23/2011 (nd, ).
August 22, 2011 Filing 22 ANSWER to 14 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,, and Affirmative Defenses by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C., Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3 to Answer to Farleys' Counterclaim)(CAUGHIE, JILL) Modified on 8/23/2011 (nd, ).
August 8, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Aaron H. Stanton filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY.Application, Statement, Certificate of Service.(WENGER, RANDALL) (filing fee paid on 8/11/11) Modified on 8/11/2011 (kw, ).
August 8, 2011 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan W. Michael filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY.Application, Statement, Certificate of Service.(WENGER, RANDALL) (filing fee paid on 8/11/11) Modified on 8/11/2011 (kw, ).
August 8, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Thomas Brejcha filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY.Application, Statement, Certificate of Service.(WENGER, RANDALL) (filing fee paid on 8/11/11) Modified on 8/11/2011 (kw, ).
August 8, 2011 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Peter C. Breen filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY.Application, Statement, Certificate of Service.(WENGER, RANDALL) (filing fee paid on 8/11/11) Modified on 8/11/2011 (kw, ).
August 1, 2011 Filing 17 APPLICATION for admission of TERESA S. RENAKER, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Servce, filed by DEFT JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (filing fee paid on 8/1/11) (kw, )
August 1, 2011 Filing 16 APPLICATION for admission of JULIE H. WILENSKY, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Servce, filed by DEFT JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (filing fee paid on 8/1/11) (kw, )
August 1, 2011 Filing 15 ANSWER to 3 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY, COUNTERCLAIM against COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C. by JENNIFER J. TOBITS.(ROWEN, MELANIE)
August 1, 2011 Filing 14 Defendant Farley's ANSWER to 3 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against JENNIFER J. TOBITS, COUNTERCLAIM against COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C. by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(WENGER, RANDALL)
July 25, 2011 Letter to Attorney Jonathan W. Michael re: L.R. 83.5 and 83.5.2. (pod)
June 27, 2011 Letter to Attorney Jonathan W. Michael re: L.R. 83.5 and 83.5.2. (pod)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF AMY WHELAN, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/22/11. 6/23/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF MELANIE S. ROWEN, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/22/11. 6/23/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE UP TO AND INCLUDING 8/1/11 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/16/11. 6/20/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
June 17, 2011 Filing 10 APPLICATION for admission of AMY WHELAN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Servce, filed by DEFT JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (filing fee paid on 6/17/11) (kw, )
June 17, 2011 Filing 9 APPLICATION for admission of MELANIE S. ROWEN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Servce, filed by DEFT JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (filing fee paid on 6/17/11) (kw, )
June 17, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN L. JERNER, ESQ. on behalf of DEFT JENNIFER J. TOBITS, Certificate of Service. (kw, )
June 16, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C. re 6 Stipulation Certificate of Service (CAUGHIE, JILL) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO CLERK/JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 6/20/2011 (nd, ).
June 16, 2011 Filing 6 STIPULATION (SECOND) TO EXTEND TIME by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C.. (CAUGHIE, JILL) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 6/20/2011 (nd, ).
May 19, 2011 Filing 5 Praecipe to Grant Joint Stipulation to Extend Time by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C.. (CAUGHIE, JILL)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING AS TO WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION BY 5/20/2011. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 5/10/2011. 5/13/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(kp, )
January 24, 2011 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY, JENNIFER J. TOBITS, filed by PLFF COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C.(kw, )
January 24, 2011 Summons on Amended Complaint Issued as to DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY, JENNIFER J. TOBITS. Forwarded To: counsel on 1/25/11. (kw, )
January 4, 2011 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C..(jwl, )
January 4, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY, JENNIFER J. TOBITS ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 035355.), filed by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Case Management Track Form, # 3 Designation Form, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(jwl, )
January 4, 2011 Summons Issued as to DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY, JENNIFER J. TOBITS. Three Forwarded To: Counsel on 1/5/11 (jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C. v. TOBITS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C.
Represented By: H. ROBERT FIEBACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER J. TOBITS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID M. FARLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOAN F. FARLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?