FOSTER v. PITNEY BOWES CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: FREDERICK D. FOSTER
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, JOHN DOES 1-10 and PITNEY BOWES CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2011cv07303
Filed: November 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: JOEL H. SLOMSKY
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ADDENDUM TO ORDER DATED FEBRUARY 12, 2013: ORDER THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PITNEY BOWES AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF ON COUNT I OF PITNEY BOWES' COUNTERCLAIM (NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,707,119). COUNT II OF PITNEY BOWES' COU NTERCLAIM (INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,707,119) IS DISMISSED PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(2). THIS CASE SHALL REMAIN CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 4/12/2013. 4/12/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT PITNEY BOWES' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (DOC. NO. 35) IS GRANTED. JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT PITNEY BOWES AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF FREDERICK FOSTER ON ALL COUNTS. ALL REMAINING JOHN DOES ARE DISM ISSED AS DEFENDANTS. ANY OUTSTANDING MOTIONS ARE DENIED AS MOOT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 2/7/2013. 2/8/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (aeg, ) Modified on 2/8/2013 (afm, ).
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT DEFT USPS'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. #14) IS GRANTED AND THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AGAINST DEFT USPS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/23/2012; 7/23/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOSTER v. PITNEY BOWES CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Represented By: JANINE CASTORINA
Represented By: ANNETTA FOSTER GIVHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PITNEY BOWES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDERICK D. FOSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?