KITE v. BILL VANN COMPANY, INC. et al
Plaintiff: VALERIE K. PRESLEY and CLEVELAND G. KITE
Defendant: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA INC, WARRIOR 1-STOP BUILDING SUPPLY COMPANY, BILL VANN COMPANY, INC., BUFFALO PUMPS INC., A.W. CHESTERTON CO., CRANE CO., CROWN HOLDINGS INC, WARREN PUMPS LLC, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORP., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, DANA COMPANIES LLC, MOTION INDUSTRIES INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., VIKING PUMP INC, JOHN CRANE INC., THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY, CATERPILLAR INC., SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES INC., EATON CORPORATION, DANA HOLDING CORPORATION, GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC, CUMMINS INC, CROWN CORK & SEAL CO. INC., GOULDS PUMPS INC., SEPCO CORPORATION, AURORA PUMP CO., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION and CBS CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2011cv67753
Filed: November 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER THAT THE SEVERED PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIMS IN THE CASES ON THE ATTACHED LIST ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/1/2018; 8/2/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (SEE PAPER # 9019 IN 01-MD-875). (tjd)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER THAT A RULE IS ISSUED FOR PLAINTIFFS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE SEVERED PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIMS IN REMANDED LAND-BASED MDL-875 CASES SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AS HAVING BEEN SETTLED OR OTHERWISE TERMINATED AFTER REMAND OF THE COMPENSATORY CLAIMS. NO LATER THAN 7/11/2018, ANY PLAINTIFF WHO CONTENDS THAT HE OR SHE HAS A VIABLE PUNITIVE DAMAGE CLAIM THAT WAS SEVERED UPON REMAND OF HIS OR HER COMPENSATORY CLAIMS AND IS PENDING IN THIS COURT SHALL FILE A WRITTEN REPORT OUTLINING THE NATURE AND STATUS OF THE CLAIM. IN ANY SUCH CASES, DEFENDANTS MAY RESPOND NO LATER THAN 8/8/2018. THE COURT WILL THEN ADDRESS THOSE CLAIMS, IF ANY. ALL OTHER PUNITIVE DAMAGE CLAIMS IN REMANDED LAND-BASED CASES, FOR WHICH THE PLAINTIFFS DO NOT FILE REPORTS, WILL BE DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/2/2018. 5/7/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (SEE PAPER # 9016 IN 01-MD-875) (ems)
February 4, 2015 Filing 242 SEPARATION OF CLAIMS AND REMAND ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS IN THE PRESLEY MATTER, EXCEPT THE SEVERED CLAIMS FOR PUNITIVE OR EXEMPLARY DAMAGES, ARE REMANDED TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA.(SEE PAPER NO. 8988 IN 01-MD-875) (ahf)
November 14, 2014 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by DANA COMPANIES LLC.**(FOR PDF SEE DOCUMENT # 241)**(tjd)
November 14, 2014 Filing 241 Statement Corporate Disclosure by DANA COMPANIES LLC. (DAVIS, EVELYN)
November 14, 2014 Filing 240 NOTICE of Appearance by EVELYN FLETCHER DAVIS on behalf of DANA COMPANIES LLC (DAVIS, EVELYN)
November 14, 2014 Filing 239 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY ALLEN CLARKE on behalf of CRANE CO. (CLARKE, TIMOTHY)
November 14, 2014 Filing 238 NOTICE of Appearance by GROVER PATTERSON KEAHEY, JR on behalf of CLEVELAND G. KITE, VALERIE K. PRESLEY with Certificate of Service(KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER THAT THE COURT SUGGESTS THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE SHOULD BE REMANDED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA FOR RESOLUTION OF ALL MATTERS PENDING WITHIN THIS CASE EXCEPT PUNITIVE DAMAGES. ALTERNATIVELY, PARTIES HAVE SEVEN DAYS WITHIN WHICH TO CONSENT TO A TRIAL BEFORE AN ARTICLE III OR MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. IN SUCH AN EVENT, IF CONSENT IS GRANTED, A TRIAL WILL BE SCHEDULED WITHIN 60 DAYS IN PHILADELPHIA PENNSYLVANIA, AND THE SUGGESTION OF REMAND WILL BE VACATED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/20/2014. 10/21/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jmg, )
October 14, 2014 Filing 236 AMENDED Response to Order to Show Cause by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (KEAHEY, GROVER) Modified on 10/15/2014 (tjd).
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES INC.'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (ECF NO. #233 ) IS DENIED. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/10/14. 10/14/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
September 29, 2014 Filing 234 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by VALERIE K. PRESLEY. (KEAHEY, GROVER)
September 19, 2014 Filing 233 MOTION for Reconsideration re #220 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES INC..Certificate of Service.(SPRAIN, ROBERT)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER THAT A RULE IS ISSUED FOR PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED OR REMANDED TO THE TRANSFEROR COURT AND FURTHER ORDERED THAT FAILURE TO PROVIDE A STATUS UPDATE MAY RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/15/14. 9/16/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 9/16/2014 (jaa, ).
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES LLC'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (ECF NO. #226 ) IS DENIED. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/9/14. 9/11/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (va, )
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORP.'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (ECF NO. #225 ) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/9/14. 9/11/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(va, )
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT CRANE CO'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (ECF NO. #224 ) IS DENIED. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/9/14. 9/11/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(va, )
September 8, 2014 Filing 228 RESPONSE in Opposition re #225 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by VALERIE K. PRESLEY. (KEAHEY, GROVER)
September 8, 2014 Filing 227 RESPONSE in Opposition re #226 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by VALERIE K. PRESLEY. (KEAHEY, GROVER)
August 27, 2014 Filing 226 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by DANA COMPANIES LLC.DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT.(DAVIS, EVELYN)
August 27, 2014 Filing 225 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORP..Certificate of Service.(MCCLOUD, STEWART)
August 22, 2014 Filing 224 MOTION for Reconsideration re #221 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CRANE CO..Certificate of Service.(ZUKOWSKI, MICHAEL)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION IS GRANTED IN PART; DENIED IN PART; ITS MOTION TO STRIKE IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/13/2014.8/14/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND E-MAILED.(uh, )
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION (DOC. NO. 84) IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/13/2014. 8/14/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO. IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/12/14.8/13/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC. IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/12/14.8/13/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT SEPCO CORPORATION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/12/14.8/13/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES LLC IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/12/14.8/13/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANTS CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. AND CROWN HOLDINGS, INC. IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/12/14.8/13/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND EMAIELD TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON CO. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/12/14.8/13/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/11/14.8/13/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT VIKING PUMPS, INC. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/11/14.8/13/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/11/14.8/13/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS, INC. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/11/14.8/13/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (DOC. NO. 33) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/8/2014.8/13/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jmg, )
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS LLC (DOC. NO. 74) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/8/2014.8/13/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jmg, )
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT AURORA PUMPS LLC (DOC. NO. 72) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/8/2014.8/13/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jmg, )
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 56(C) MEMO, LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A," ATTACHED, ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/7/2014.8/12/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jmg, )
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT CUMMINS, INC. (DOC. NO. 31) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/8/2014.8/11/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jmg, )
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (ECF NO. #189 ) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/24/14.6/26/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, )
June 20, 2014 Filing 205 Joinder in Crane Co.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss filed by SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES INC., Certificate of Service.(SPRAIN, ROBERT) Modified on 6/23/2014 (md).
June 19, 2014 Filing 204 Joinder in Crane Co.'s Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss All Remaining Defendants filed by DANA COMPANIES LLC.(MCCORMACK, CATHERINE) Modified on 6/20/2014 (md).
June 18, 2014 Filing 203 JOINDER in Crane Co.'s, etc. Responses in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss All Remaining Defendants filed by BUFFALO PUMPS INC., Certificate of Service.(MCDONOUGH, EDWARD) Modified on 6/19/2014 (md).
June 18, 2014 Filing 202 JOINDER in Crane Co.'s, etc. Responses in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss All Remaining Defendants filed by A.W. CHESTERTON CO., Certificate of Service.(MCDONOUGH, EDWARD) Modified on 6/19/2014 (md).
June 18, 2014 Filing 201 JOINDER in Warren Pumps' Objection to Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal filed by CBS CORPORATION.(HARRIS, JAMES) Modified on 6/19/2014 (md).
June 18, 2014 Filing 200 RESPONSE in Opposition re #189 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CUMMINS INC. (MILLS, WILLIAM)
June 18, 2014 Filing 199 JOINDER in "Defendant Crane Co.'s Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss All Remaining Defendants" filed by CROWN CORK & SEAL CO. INC., CROWN HOLDINGS INC.(GILMER, WALTER) Modified on 6/19/2014 (md).
June 18, 2014 Filing 198 JOINDER in Crane Co. and Warren Pumps, LLC's Responses to Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss All Remaining Defendants filed by VIKING PUMP INC., Certificate of Service.(CRUMP, RICHARD) Modified on 6/19/2014 (md).
June 18, 2014 Filing 197 RESPONSE in Opposition re #189 MOTION to Dismiss filed by WARREN PUMPS LLC. (MILLS, WILLIAM)
June 18, 2014 Filing 196 JOINDER in Crane Co.'s Response To Plaintiff's Motion To Voluntarily Dismiss All Remaining Defendants filed by CBS CORPORATION.(HARRIS, JAMES) Modified on 6/19/2014 (md).
June 18, 2014 Filing 195 JOINDER in Defendant Crane Co.'s Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss all Remaining Defendants filed by AURORA PUMP CO., Certificate of Service.(WALTERS, JENNIFER) Modified on 6/19/2014 (md).
June 17, 2014 Filing 194 RESPONSE in Opposition re #189 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily filed by FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(CLARKE, TIMOTHY)
June 17, 2014 Filing 193 RESPONSE in Opposition re #189 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily filed by GOULDS PUMPS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(CLARKE, TIMOTHY)
June 17, 2014 Filing 192 NOTICE by CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORP. of Joinder in Crane Co's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss All Remaining Defendants (MCCLOUD, STEWART)
June 17, 2014 Filing 191 NOTICE by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Of Joinder in Crane Co. Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss All Remaining Defendants (MCCLOUD, STEWART)
June 17, 2014 Filing 190 RESPONSE in Opposition re #189 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CRANE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(ZUKOWSKI, MICHAEL)
June 16, 2014 Filing 189 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE, VALERIE K. PRESLEY.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(KEAHEY, GROVER)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF MOVANT VALERIE K. PRESLEY FOR SUBSTITUTION OF LIVING PARTY (DOC. NO. 187) IS GRANTED, AND VALERIE K. PRESLEY, THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF CLEVELAND KITE, DECEASED, IS SUBSTITUTED AS PLAINTIFF IN THIS ACTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/30/2014. 5/1/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (aeg, )
April 3, 2014 Filing 187 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letters Testamentary, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(KEAHEY, GROVER)
April 3, 2014 Filing 186 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Cleveland Kite by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (KEAHEY, GROVER)
December 12, 2013 Filing 185 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief and Evidentiary Material in Support of Summary Judgment filed by VIKING PUMP INC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(PARTRIDGE, DONALD)
November 19, 2013 Filing 184 REPLY to Response to Motion re #178 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Rule 56(c) Memo of Law in Support of MSJ filed by BUFFALO PUMPS INC.. (MCDONOUGH, EDWARD)
November 19, 2013 Filing 183 REPLY to Response to Motion re #177 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Rule 56(c) Memo of Law in Support of MSJ filed by A.W. CHESTERTON CO.. (MCDONOUGH, EDWARD)
November 15, 2013 Filing 182 REPLY to Response to Motion re #178 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Rule 56(c) Memo of Law in Support of MSJ, #177 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Rule 56(c) Memo of Law in Support of MSJ, #179 MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Summary Judgment Defendant Crane Co.'s Reply to Plaintiff's Omnibus Response to Defendants' Motions for Leave (ECF #180), with Certificate of Service filed by CRANE CO.. (ZUKOWSKI, MICHAEL)
November 11, 2013 Filing 181 REPLY to Response to Motion re #179 MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Summary Judgment filed by CBS CORPORATION. (HARRIS, JAMES)
November 1, 2013 Filing 180 RESPONSE in Opposition re #178 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Rule 56(c) Memo of Law in Support of MSJ, #177 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Rule 56(c) Memo of Law in Support of MSJ, #179 MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Summary Judgment filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit H, #6 Exhibit I, #7 Exhibit J, #8 Exhibit K, #9 Exhibit L, #10 Exhibit M & N, #11 Exhibit O, #12 Exhibit P, #13 Exhibit Q, #14 Exhibit R, #15 Exhibit S, #16 Exhibit T)(KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 31, 2013 Filing 179 MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Summary Judgment filed by CBS CORPORATION.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(HARRIS, JAMES)
October 18, 2013 Filing 178 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Rule 56(c) Memo of Law in Support of MSJ filed by BUFFALO PUMPS INC..Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order, #2 Exhibit Order)(MCDONOUGH, EDWARD)
October 18, 2013 Filing 177 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Rule 56(c) Memo of Law in Support of MSJ filed by A.W. CHESTERTON CO..Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order)(MCDONOUGH, EDWARD)
October 1, 2013 Filing 176 Supplement to MOTION for Summary Judgment #74 /i> filed by WARREN PUMPS LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MILLS, WILLIAM) Modified on 10/2/2013 (uh, ).
September 6, 2013 Filing 175 NOTICE by CLEVELAND G. KITE Of Filing the Expert Report of George H. Pineda, CIH, CHMM (KEAHEY, GROVER)
August 14, 2013 Filing 174 Objections by CLEVELAND G. KITE re #171 Notice (Other) . (KEAHEY, GROVER)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER CLARIFYING THE COURT'S 4/19/2013 ORDER GRANTING HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/8/2013.8/9/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO OBTAIN A DIFFERENT EXPERT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/8/2013.8/9/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 26, 2013 Filing 171 NOTICE by FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION Notice of Deposition of Captain William Lowell (REDDITT, FRANK)
July 22, 2013 Filing 170 STATUS REPORT by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (KEAHEY, GROVER)
July 17, 2013 Filing 169 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO OBTAIN A DIFFERENT EXPERT filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE..(KEAHEY, GROVER)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER THAT THE FINAL PRE-REMAND HEARING, INCLUDING ORAL ARGUMENT ON ALL OPPOSED SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS IN EACH OF THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, IS CANCELED. THE PENDING MOTIONS WILL BE DECIDED ON PAPERS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/2/2013. 7/3/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
May 9, 2013 Filing 167 Joint MOTION for Clarification of COURTS ORDER GRANTING HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(EVANS, JENELLE)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A," ATTACHED, ARE GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/17/13. 4/19/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MOTION INDUSTRIES IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/11/2013. 2/12/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
February 8, 2013 Filing 164 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Motion Industries by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(KEAHEY, GROVER) (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 2/11/2013 (uh, ).
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER THAT A FINAL PRE-REMAND HEARING, INCLUDING ORAL ARGUMENT ON ALL OPPOSED SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS, WILL BE HELD ON 7/22/2013 AT 10:00 A.M., IN COURTROOM 15A, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/23/2013. 1/25/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
January 3, 2013 Filing 162 PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY TO ALL DEFENDANTS' REPLIES. Certificate of Service. (ems)
January 3, 2013 Filing 161 NOTICE by DANA COMPANIES LLC of Filing Expert Report (DAVIS, EVELYN)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, ARE GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/2/2013. 1/3/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
December 21, 2012 Filing 159 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by CLEVELAND G. KITE.(KEAHEY, GROVER)
December 21, 2012 Filing 158 NOTICE by CLEVELAND G. KITE Additional Expert Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KEAHEY, GROVER)
December 21, 2012 Filing 157 MOTION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO OBTAIN A DIFFERENT MEDICAL EXPERT UNDER THE CONDITIONS STATED IN THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/20/2012.12/21/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
December 13, 2012 Filing 156 NOTICE by GOULDS PUMPS INC. OF NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF GERALD MARKOWITZ, Ph.D (REDDITT, FRANK)
December 10, 2012 Filing 155 Amended ANSWER to Complaint As Last Amended by CBS CORPORATION.(HARRIS, JAMES)
November 30, 2012 Filing 154 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by DANA COMPANIES LLC.(DAVIS, EVELYN)
November 30, 2012 Filing 153 ANSWER to Complaint by DANA COMPANIES LLC.(DAVIS, EVELYN)
November 29, 2012 Filing 152 Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., f/k/a/ Norton Company's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint together with to 1st Amended Complaint by SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES INC..(SPRAIN, ROBERT)
November 26, 2012 Filing 151 ANSWER to Complaint as last amended by VIKING PUMP INC.(PARTRIDGE, DONALD)
November 21, 2012 Filing 150 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint as Last Amended by CUMMINS INC.(MILLS, WILLIAM)
November 21, 2012 Filing 149 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint as Last Amended by WARREN PUMPS LLC.(MILLS, WILLIAM)
November 21, 2012 Filing 148 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KEAHEY, GROVER)
November 21, 2012 Filing 147 RESPONSE in Opposition re #137 MOTION to Strike #117 Notice (Other),,,, filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (KEAHEY, GROVER)
November 20, 2012 Filing 146 ANSWER to Complaint as last amended by CBS CORPORATION.(HARRIS, JAMES)
November 20, 2012 Filing 145 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by AURORA PUMP CO..(WALTERS, JENNIFER)
November 20, 2012 Filing 144 NOTICE by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY of Withdrawal of #85 Motion for Summary Judgment, Certificate of Service. (VERCHER, MICHAEL) Modified on 11/21/2012 (md).
November 20, 2012 Filing 143 ANSWER to Complaint -Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by CROWN CORK & SEAL CO. INC., CROWN HOLDINGS INC.(GILMER, WALTER)
November 14, 2012 Filing 142 NOTICE by FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION re #126 Notice (Other) Cancellation of Deposition (REDDITT, FRANK)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDERED THAT A FINAL PRE-REMAND HEARING, INCLUDING ORAL ARGUMENT ON ALL OPPOSED SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS, WILL BE HELD ON FEBRUARY 12, 2013 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 15A. THIS ORDER SUPERCEDES ANY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED ORDER CONCERNING THE DATE ON WHICH THE HERAING WILL BE HELD AND PROVIDES A PROTOCOL TO BE FOLLOWED BY PLAINTIFFS'S COUNSEL PRIOR TO THIS HEARING. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/8/12. 11/9/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jaa, )
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A" ATTACHED ARE GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/7/12. 11/14/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED (dp, )
November 7, 2012 Filing 139 REPLY to Response to Motion re #75 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CBS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Brief)(HARRIS, JAMES)
November 7, 2012 Filing 138 REPLY to Response to Motion re #93 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by VIKING PUMP INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(PARTRIDGE, DONALD)
November 7, 2012 Filing 137 MOTION to Strike #117 Notice (Other),,,, filed by CBS CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(HARRIS, JAMES)
November 7, 2012 Filing 136 REPLY to Response to Motion re #90 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BUFFALO PUMPS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(MCDONOUGH, EDWARD)
November 7, 2012 Filing 135 REPLY to Response to Motion re #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by A.W. CHESTERTON CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(MCDONOUGH, EDWARD)
November 7, 2012 Filing 134 RESPONSE in Support re #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CROWN CORK & SEAL CO. INC., CROWN HOLDINGS INC. (MCCLURKIN, ANNE)
November 7, 2012 Filing 133 REPLY to Response to Motion re #76 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Kite Depo Vol. 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Kite Depo Vol. 2)(SPRAIN, ROBERT)
November 7, 2012 Filing 132 REPLY to Response to Motion re #78 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SEPCO CORPORATION. (MCCLOUD, STEWART)
November 7, 2012 Filing 131 REPLY to Response to Motion re #33 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORP.. (MCCLOUD, STEWART)
November 7, 2012 Filing 130 REPLY to Response to Motion re #77 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY. (MCCLOUD, STEWART)
November 7, 2012 Filing 129 REPLY to Response to Motion re #92 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service filed by CRANE CO.. (ZUKOWSKI, MICHAEL)
November 7, 2012 Filing 128 REPLY to Response to Motion re #85 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (VERCHER, MICHAEL)
November 7, 2012 Filing 127 REPLY to Response to Motion re #74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by WARREN PUMPS LLC. (MILLS, WILLIAM)
November 7, 2012 Filing 126 NOTICE by FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION Notice of Filing Notice of Deposition (REDDITT, FRANK)
November 7, 2012 Filing 125 REPLY to Response to Motion re #81 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DANA COMPANIES LLC. (DAVIS, EVELYN)
November 7, 2012 Filing 124 REPLY to Response to Motion re #89 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GOULDS PUMPS INC.. (CLARKE, TIMOTHY)
November 7, 2012 Filing 123 REPLY to Response to Motion re #84 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION. (REDDITT, FRANK)
November 7, 2012 Filing 122 REPLY to Response to Motion re #72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AURORA PUMP CO.. (WALTERS, JENNIFER)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A" ATTACHED, ARE GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS LISTED IN EXHIBIT "B" ATTACHED, ARE GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/5/2012.11/07/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jmf, ) Modified on 11/7/2012 (lisad, ).
November 6, 2012 Filing 120 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CUMMINS INC. (MILLS, WILLIAM)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A" ATTACHED ARE GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE MOTIONS LISTED IN EXHIBIT "B," ATTACHED, ARE GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/05/2012.11/6/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jmf, )
October 26, 2012 Filing 118 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Expert Report filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE.Certificate of Service and Certificate of Conference.(KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 25, 2012 Filing 117 NOTICE by CLEVELAND G. KITE re #103 Response in Opposition to Motion, #112 Response in Opposition to Motion, #101 Response in Opposition to Motion, #114 Response in Opposition to Motion, #111 Response in Opposition to Motion, #113 Response in Opposition to Motion, #102 Response in Opposition to Motion, #107 Response in Opposition to Motion, #110 Response in Opposition to Motion, #116 Response in Opposition to Motion, #108 Response in Opposition to Motion, #105 Response in Opposition to Motion, #104 Response in Opposition to Motion, #100 Response in Opposition to Motion, #109 Response in Opposition to Motion, #115 Response in Opposition to Motion, #106 Response in Opposition to Motion Master Appendix Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 8A, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 10A)(KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 24, 2012 Filing 116 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 24, 2012 Filing 115 RESPONSE in Opposition re #93 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 24, 2012 Filing 114 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 24, 2012 Filing 113 RESPONSE in Opposition re #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 24, 2012 Filing 112 RESPONSE in Opposition re #84 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 24, 2012 Filing 111 RESPONSE in Opposition re #92 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit D-1, #6 Exhibit D-2, #7 Exhibit D-3)(KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 24, 2012 Filing 110 RESPONSE in Opposition re #90 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 24, 2012 Filing 109 RESPONSE in Opposition re #81 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 24, 2012 Filing 108 RESPONSE in Opposition re #85 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 24, 2012 Filing 107 RESPONSE in Opposition re #78 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 24, 2012 Filing 106 RESPONSE in Opposition re #77 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 24, 2012 Filing 105 RESPONSE in Opposition re #76 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 24, 2012 Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition re #75 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 24, 2012 Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition re #74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 24, 2012 Filing 102 RESPONSE in Opposition re #72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 24, 2012 Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 24, 2012 Filing 100 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 23, 2012 Filing 99 Disclosure by All Plaintiffs.(KEAHEY, GROVER)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER THAT THE REQUESTS ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/17/2012. 10/17/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
October 16, 2012 Filing 97 NOTICE by VIKING PUMP INC re #93 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Roger B. Horne, Jr.)(PARTRIDGE, DONALD)
October 12, 2012 Filing 96 NOTICE by FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION re #84 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #95 Notice (Other) (PROPOSED ORDER) (CLARKE, TIMOTHY)
October 12, 2012 Filing 95 NOTICE by FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION re #84 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas F. McCaffery)(CLARKE, TIMOTHY)
October 12, 2012 Filing 94 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Support of #89 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by GOULDS PUMPS INC., Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas F. McCaffery, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CLARKE, TIMOTHY) Modified on 10/15/2012 (md).
October 10, 2012 Filing 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by VIKING PUMP INC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(PARTRIDGE, DONALD)
October 10, 2012 Filing 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CRANE CO..Memorandum in Support of Motion, with Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit F-1, #8 Exhibit F-2, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(ZUKOWSKI, MICHAEL)
October 10, 2012 Filing 91 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA INC. Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(MCDONOUGH, EDWARD)
October 10, 2012 Filing 90 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BUFFALO PUMPS INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(MCDONOUGH, EDWARD)
October 10, 2012 Filing 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GOULDS PUMPS INC..Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(CLARKE, TIMOTHY)
October 10, 2012 Filing 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by A.W. CHESTERTON CO..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(MCDONOUGH, EDWARD)
October 10, 2012 Filing 87 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CROWN CORK & SEAL CO. INC., CROWN HOLDINGS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Facts and Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5, #7 Proposed Order of Dismissal)(MCCLURKIN, ANNE)
October 10, 2012 Filing 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.Brief and Evidentiary Submission. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Supplement Evidentiary Submission in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Evidentiary Submission, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Evidentiary Submission, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Evidentiary Submission, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Evidentiary Submission, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E to Evidentiary Submission, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F to Evidentiary Submission, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G to Evidentiary Submission, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H to Evidentiary Submiss)(EVANS, JENELLE)
October 10, 2012 Filing 85 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13)(VERCHER, MICHAEL)
October 10, 2012 Filing 84 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(REDDITT, FRANK)
October 10, 2012 Filing 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FLOWSERVE CORPORATION.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(MCDONOUGH, EDWARD)
October 10, 2012 Filing 82 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by EATON CORPORATION.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Eaton Corporation's Brief in Support Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(SMYTH, JOHN)
October 10, 2012 Filing 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DANA COMPANIES LLC.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(DAVIS, EVELYN)
October 10, 2012 Filing 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC..Brief and Evidentiary Submission. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Supplement Evidentiary Submission in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(EVANS, JENELLE)
October 10, 2012 Filing 79 NOTICE by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY of Filing of Motion for Summary Judgment (VERCHER, MICHAEL)
October 10, 2012 Filing 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SEPCO CORPORATION.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit "B", #4 Exhibit "C", #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Judgment)(MCCLOUD, STEWART)
October 10, 2012 Filing 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY.Memorandum of Law, Certifice of Service. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit "B", #4 Exhibit "C", #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Judgment)(MCCLOUD, STEWART)
October 10, 2012 Filing 76 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES INC... (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgement, #2 Exhibit SGA MSJ Exhibit A Kite Trial Deposition Vol. I, #3 Exhibit SGA MSJ Exhibit B Kite Trial Deposition Vol. II, #4 Exhibit SGA MSJ Exhibit C Kite Trial Deposition Vol. III, #5 Exhibit SGA MSJ Exhibit D Affidavit of Thomas Service, PhD, PE)(SPRAIN, ROBERT)
October 10, 2012 Filing 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CBS CORPORATION.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(HARRIS, JAMES)
October 10, 2012 Filing 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by WARREN PUMPS LLC.Memorandum, Brief, Affidavit, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Judgment)(MILLS, WILLIAM)
October 10, 2012 Filing 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BILL VANN COMPANY, INC..Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(REDDITT, FRANK)
October 9, 2012 Filing 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AURORA PUMP CO..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(WALTERS, JENNIFER)
September 11, 2012 Filing 71 MOTION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/11/2012. 9/12/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
September 7, 2012 Filing 70 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Defendant Georgia-Pacific LLC filed by GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WHEELER, ALLAN)
August 31, 2012 Filing 69 NOTICE by CROWN CORK & SEAL CO. INC., CROWN HOLDINGS INC - Notice of Service of Expert Reports (GILMER, WALTER)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER THAT ALL OF THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST JOHN CRANE, INC., ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/28/2012; 8/29/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
August 28, 2012 Filing 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support of Motion for Final Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Brief in Support of Motion for Final Summary Judgment)(WHEELER, ALLAN)
August 27, 2012 Filing 66 NOTICE by WARREN PUMPS LLC re #48 Notice (Other) of Filing of Supplement Expert Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(MILLS, WILLIAM)
August 27, 2012 Filing 65 NOTICE by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. of Filing Expert Reports/Disclosures (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 2)(LANKFORD, FRANK)
August 27, 2012 Filing 64 NOTICE by SEPCO CORPORATION Of Filing Expert Reports (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 2)(LANKFORD, FRANK)
August 27, 2012 Filing 63 NOTICE by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY of Service of Expert Reports (EVANS, JENELLE)
August 27, 2012 Filing 62 NOTICE by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY of Expert Disclosure & Witness List (VERCHER, MICHAEL)
August 27, 2012 Filing 61 NOTICE by CBS CORPORATION of Service of Expert Report (HARRIS, JAMES)
August 27, 2012 Filing 60 NOTICE by DANA COMPANIES LLC Expert Reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Mary Finn, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Tom McCaffery)(DAVIS, EVELYN)
August 27, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE by GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY of Filing Expert Disclosures (LANKFORD, FRANK)
August 27, 2012 Filing 58 NOTICE by SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES INC. of Expert Disclosures (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(SPRAIN, ROBERT)
August 27, 2012 Filing 57 NOTICE by AURORA PUMP CO. OF FILING EXPERT REPORTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B_Part 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B_Part 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B_Part 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B_Part 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B_Part 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B_Part 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit C_Part 1, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C_Part 2, #10 Exhibit Exhibit C_Part 3, #11 Exhibit Exhibit C_Part 4, #12 Exhibit Exhibit D)(WALTERS, JENNIFER)
August 27, 2012 Filing 56 NOTICE by CUMMINS INC re #50 Notice (Other) Of Filing Second Supplemental Expert Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(MILLS, WILLIAM)
August 27, 2012 Filing 55 NOTICE by FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION of Filing of Expert Report of Thomas F. McCaffery (REDDITT, FRANK)
August 27, 2012 Filing 54 NOTICE by GOULDS PUMPS INC. of Filing of Expert Report of Thomas F. McCaffery (REDDITT, FRANK)
August 25, 2012 Filing 53 NOTICE by CUMMINS INC re #50 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Expert Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MILLS, WILLIAM)
August 24, 2012 Filing 52 NOTICE by EATON CORPORATION of filing Expert Reports (SMYTH, JOHN)
August 24, 2012 Filing 51 NOTICE by VIKING PUMP INC of Service of Expert Disclosures with Exhibits (CRUMP, RICHARD)
August 24, 2012 Filing 50 NOTICE by CUMMINS INC of its Expert Reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MILLS, WILLIAM)
August 24, 2012 Filing 49 NOTICE by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA INC of Filing its Expert Reports (MCDONOUGH, EDWARD)
August 24, 2012 Filing 48 NOTICE by WARREN PUMPS LLC of its Expert Reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MILLS, WILLIAM)
August 24, 2012 Filing 47 NOTICE by CBS CORPORATION of Service of Expert Disclosures (HARRIS, JAMES)
August 24, 2012 Filing 46 NOTICE by BUFFALO PUMPS INC. of its Expert Reports (MCDONOUGH, EDWARD)
August 24, 2012 Filing 45 NOTICE by DANA COMPANIES LLC of Filing Expert Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit James D. Crapo, M.D. Expert Report)(DAVIS, EVELYN)
August 24, 2012 Filing 44 NOTICE by GOULDS PUMPS INC. of Filing of Expert Reports (REDDITT, FRANK)
August 24, 2012 Filing 43 NOTICE by BILL VANN COMPANY, INC. of Filing of Expert Reports (REDDITT, FRANK)
August 24, 2012 Filing 42 NOTICE by FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION of Filing of Expert Reports (REDDITT, FRANK)
August 21, 2012 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint by WARREN PUMPS LLC.(MILLS, WILLIAM)
August 21, 2012 Filing 40 STIPULATION of Dismissal by JOHN CRANE INC., CLEVELAND G. KITE. (LANKFORD, FRANK)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/25/2012; 7/26/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 25, 2012 Filing 38 NOTICE by CLEVELAND G. KITE re #37 Notice (Other) Filing Complete Report of Dr. S. Dikman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dr. S. Dikman's Report)(KEAHEY, GROVER)
July 25, 2012 Filing 37 NOTICE by CLEVELAND G. KITE Of Filing Expert Reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(KEAHEY, GROVER)
July 17, 2012 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KEAHEY, GROVER)
July 17, 2012 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KEAHEY, GROVER)
July 11, 2012 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KEAHEY, GROVER)
July 3, 2012 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORP..Memorandum of Law. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - deposition excerpts, #3 Exhibit B - deposition excerpts, #4 Exhibit C - deposition excerpts)(MCCLOUD, STEWART)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER THAT A FINAL PRE-REMAND HEARING, INCLUDING ORAL ARGUMENT ON ALL OPPOSED SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS, WILL BE HELD ON 11/26/2012 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 15A, JAMES A. BYRNE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA 19106; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/29/2012. 7/3/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (sg)
July 2, 2012 Filing 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CUMMINS INC.Memorandum Brief. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Brief, #2 Exhibit Evidentiary Submission, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(MILLS, WILLIAM)
June 21, 2012 Filing 30 NOTICE by CLEVELAND G. KITE of Withdrawal of #28 Motion to Compel, Certificate of Service. (KEAHEY, GROVER) Modified on 6/22/2012 (md).
June 11, 2012 Filing 29 MOTION to Strike #28 MOTION to Compel filed by FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(REDDITT, FRANK)
June 7, 2012 Filing 28 MOTION to Compel filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(KEAHEY, GROVER)
June 4, 2012 Filing 27 JOINT MOTION AND ORDER THAT THE SCHEDULING DEADLINES ARE EXTENDING AS OUTLINED HEREIN. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/1/2012;6/4/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER THAT EACH AND EVERY CLAIM AGAINST UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION IS HEREBY DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/30/2012; 5/30/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
May 29, 2012 Filing 25 STIPULATION of Dismissal by THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(WAUDBY, WILLIAM)
May 24, 2012 Filing 24 NOTICE by CLEVELAND G. KITE Supplemental Discovery Responses to Defendants' Master Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production (KEAHEY, GROVER)
May 24, 2012 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE..(KEAHEY, GROVER)
May 23, 2012 Filing 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION. (EARNHARDT, JOHN)
April 24, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION of Service of Discovery (EARNHARDT, JOHN)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT CATERPILLAR INC. IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/16/2012. 2/21/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
February 15, 2012 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by CATERPILLAR INC.. (BEST, KRISTINE)
February 7, 2012 Filing 18 NOTICE by FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA ON A NON-PARTY (REDDITT, FRANK)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT SCHEDULING DEADLINES ARE SET AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/25/2012; 1/26/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT DEFT, WARRIOR 1-STOP BUILDING SUPPLY, INC., IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/20/2012. 1/23/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
January 20, 2012 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by DANA COMPANIES LLC.(DAVIS, EVELYN)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/19/2012.1/20/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
January 10, 2012 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel filed by CATERPILLAR INC..Certificate of Service.(WAUDBY, WILLIAM)
January 9, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTINE M. BEST on behalf of CATERPILLAR INC. (BEST, KRISTINE)
December 29, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Warrior 1-Stop with prejudice filed by CLEVELAND G. KITE, Certificate of Service.(KEAHEY, GROVER) (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 12/30/2011 (lisad, ).
December 19, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI on behalf of CRANE CO. with Certificate of Service(ZUKOWSKI, MICHAEL)
December 6, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN AARON EARNHARDT on behalf of UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(tomg, )
December 6, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGG MITCHEL MCCORMICK on behalf of UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(tomg, )
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 1/24/2012 AT 2:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 11A, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/6/2011. 12/6/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
December 6, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE by CLEVELAND G. KITE re #5 Notice (Other) (KEAHEY, GROVER)
December 2, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE by CLEVELAND G. KITE of the Continuation of Plaintiff's Trial Preservation Video Deposition (KEAHEY, GROVER)
December 2, 2011 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT by CLEVELAND G. KITE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KEAHEY, GROVER)
November 3, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL (dp, )
November 3, 2011 Filing 2 AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONS TO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES, DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (dp, )
November 3, 2011 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER NO. 1113 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASES FROM THE U.S.D.C. SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (dp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KITE v. BILL VANN COMPANY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA INC
Represented By: EDWARD BAILEY MCDONOUGH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARRIOR 1-STOP BUILDING SUPPLY COMPANY
Represented By: G. STEPHEN WIGGINS
Represented By: RALEY LIVINGSTON WIGGINS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. MCILWAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILL VANN COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: ROY W. HARRELL, III
Represented By: FRANK GREY REDDITT, JR.
Represented By: TIMOTHY ALLEN CLARKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUFFALO PUMPS INC.
Represented By: EDWARD BAILEY MCDONOUGH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON CO.
Represented By: EDWARD BAILEY MCDONOUGH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: ROY W. HARRELL, III
Represented By: FRANK GREY REDDITT, JR.
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI
Represented By: TIMOTHY ALLEN CLARKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROWN HOLDINGS INC
Represented By: ANNE LAURIE MCCLURKIN
Represented By: WALTER T. GILMER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM T. MILLS, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOI C. SCOTT
Represented By: MICHAEL A. VERCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION
Represented By: ROY W. HARRELL, III
Represented By: FRANK GREY REDDITT, JR.
Represented By: TIMOTHY ALLEN CLARKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE CORPORATION
Represented By: EDWARD BAILEY MCDONOUGH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORP.
Represented By: STEWART W. MCCLOUD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. RODGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: S. ALLEN BAKER, JR.
Represented By: JENELLE R. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA COMPANIES LLC
Represented By: EVELYN FLETCHER DAVIS
Represented By: CATHERINE A. MCCORMACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOTION INDUSTRIES INC.
Represented By: ROBERT F. NORTHCUTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.
Represented By: FRANK E. LANKFORD, JR.
Represented By: STEWART W. MCCLOUD
Represented By: JENELLE R. EVANS
Represented By: W. W. DINNING, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIKING PUMP INC
Represented By: DONALD C. PARTRIDGE
Represented By: RICHARD MUNCIE CRUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE INC.
Represented By: FRANK E. LANKFORD, JR.
Represented By: STEWART W. MCCLOUD
Represented By: W. W. DINNING, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
Represented By: WILLIAM L. WAUDBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY
Represented By: FRANK E. LANKFORD, JR.
Represented By: STEWART W. MCCLOUD
Represented By: W. W. DINNING, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM L. WAUDBY
Represented By: KRISTINE M. BEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES INC.
Represented By: ROBERT H. SPRAIN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Represented By: KATHERINE B. COLLIER
Represented By: JOHN ALBERT SMYTH, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA HOLDING CORPORATION
Represented By: EVELYN FLETCHER DAVIS
Represented By: CATHERINE A. MCCORMACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC
Represented By: ALLAN R. WHEELER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMMINS INC
Represented By: WILLIAM T. MILLS, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROWN CORK & SEAL CO. INC.
Represented By: ANNE LAURIE MCCLURKIN
Represented By: WALTER T. GILMER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS INC.
Represented By: ROY W. HARRELL, III
Represented By: FRANK GREY REDDITT, JR.
Represented By: TIMOTHY ALLEN CLARKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEPCO CORPORATION
Represented By: FRANK E. LANKFORD, JR.
Represented By: STEWART W. MCCLOUD
Represented By: W. W. DINNING, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP CO.
Represented By: JENNIFER THOMPSON WALTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Represented By: GREGG MITCHEL MCCORMICK
Represented By: JOHN AARON EARNHARDT
Represented By: EVELYN FLETCHER DAVIS
Represented By: CATHERINE A. MCCORMACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: JAMES A. HARRIS, III
Represented By: NICHOLE MAPP HARDEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIE K. PRESLEY
Represented By: GEORGE M. KEAHEY
Represented By: GROVER PATTERSON KEAHEY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLEVELAND G. KITE
Represented By: GEORGE M. KEAHEY
Represented By: GROVER PATTERSON KEAHEY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?