CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C. v. MERCK & CO., INC.
Plaintiff: CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., DR. ANDREW KLEIN and JOHN I. SUTTER, M.D.
Defendant: MERCK & CO., INC.
Petitioner: BELLAFLOR A. TROMPETA and GEORGE E. NAKASHIMA, M.D.
Respondent: GLAXOSMITHKLINE (GSK)
Case Number: 2:2012cv03555
Filed: June 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Referring Judge: LYNNE A SITARSKI
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 COPY OF ORDER FORWARDED TO NEW ATTORNEY'S ADDRESS ON THE DOCKET. (jaa, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 254 Copy of Order/Notice dated 5/10/19 (Document #252 ) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to ELIZABETH L. FRIEDMAN for the following reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD. (jaa, ) Modified on 5/23/2019 (jaa, ).
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER. (FILED UNDER SEAL) SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 5/16/19.5/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(kw, ) (tjd, ).
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER THAT A HEARING SHALL BE HELD ON THE MATTER OF THE DEPOSITION OF FORMER FDA EMPLOYEES DRS. BAYLOR & PATRIARCA AT 10:00 A.M. ON 6/17/2019 IN COURTROOM 15B OF THE JAMES A. BYRNE FEDERAL COURTHOUSE AT 601 MARKET STREET, PHILA., PA 19106.SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 5/10/19. 5/10/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 251 NOTICE by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD Letter to the Hon. C. Darnell Jones II re proposed dates for oral argument on pending cross-motions (MACORETTA, JOHN)
May 9, 2019 Copy of Order/Notice dated 4/29/19 (Document # 250) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Elizabeth L. Friedman for the following reason: Return to Sender. Not Deliverable as Addressed. Unable to Forward. (kw, )
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER THAT PLFFS MAY ORDER AND OBTAIN A COPY OF THE UNDER SEAL TRANSCRIPT OF THE ORAL ARGUMENT BEFORE ME ON 4/22/2019. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 4/29/19. 4/29/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MERCK MAY ORDER AND OBTAIN A COPY OF THE UNDER SEAL TRANSCRIPT OF THE ORAL ARGUMENT BEFORE ME ON 4/22/19. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 4/24/19. 4/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 248 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Lisa Furnald and Elizabeth Friedman filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to LYNNE A. SITARSKI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LERNER, KELLIE)
April 23, 2019 Filing 247 Minute Entry for ORAL ARGUMENT held on 4/22/19, before Judge SITARSKI. Court Reporter/Transcriber ESR. (jl, )
April 17, 2019 Copy of Order/Notice dated 4/4/19 (Document #246) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Elizabeth L. Friedman for the following reason: Return to Sender. Unclaimed. Unable to Forward. (kw, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 246 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DISPOSITIVE MOTION FILING DATE OF 4/12/2019 & THE DATES FOR RESPONSES AND REPLIES TO DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, ARE SUSPENDED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 4/4/19. 4/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON PLFFS' AND RELATORS' MOTION TO DE-DESIGNATE AND UNSEAL PORTIONS OF THE DEPOSITION OF DR. DAVID KESSLER (ECF NO. 205) IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON 4/22/2019 AT 2:00 P.M., BEFORE THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI, U.S. MAGISTRATE, IN COURTROOM 3-E, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILA., PA 19106. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 4/4/19. 4/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE MOTION OF DEFENDANT MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. (ECF NO. #220 ) IS GRANTED; PLAITNIFFS' AND RELATORS' MOTION REQUESTING PERMISSION TO FILE UNDER SEAL THEIR REPLY MEMORANDUM (ECF NO. #227 ) IS GRANTED; PLAITNIFFS' AND RELATORS' LETTER MOTION REQUESTING PERMISSION TO FILE UNDER SEAL THEIR LETTER IN FRUTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO UNSEAL (ECF NO. #237 ) IS GRANTED; DEFENDANT MERCK'S LETTER MOTION REQUESTING PERMISSION TO FILE UNDER SEAL ITS LETTER IN REPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' AND RELATORS' THIRD LETTER IN FRUTHER SUPPORT (ECF NO. #241 ) IS GRANTED; THE PARTIES IN THIS MATTER SHALL REFRAIN FROM SUBMITTING FURTHER LETTERS TO THE COURT IN SUPPORT OF THEIR RESPECTIVE POSITION ON THE PENDING MOTION TO DE-DESIGNATE AND UNSEAL (ECF NO. #205 ) WITHOUT FIRST SEEKING PERMISSION FROM THE COURT. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 03/19/2019.03/19/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nd, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 243 Letter in Response to Plaintiffs' Third Letter in Further Support of the Pending MOTION to De-Designate and Unseal Portions of the Deposition of Dr. David Kessler by MERCK & CO., INC. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ti, ) (lisad, ). *DUPLICATE FILING OF DOC. #239 * Modified on 3/19/2019 (lisad, ).
March 18, 2019 Filing 242 Redacted Version of Merck's Letter in Response to Plaintiffs' Third Letter in Further Support of the Pending Motion to De-Designate and Unseal Portions of the Deposition of Dr. David Kessler (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DYKSTRA, LISA) Modified on 3/19/2019 (tjd).
March 18, 2019 Filing 241 MOTION to Seal Document #239 Notice (Other), filed by MERCK & CO., INC...Motions referred to LYNNE A. SITARSKI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(DYKSTRA, LISA)
March 18, 2019 Filing 239 NOTICE by MERCK & CO., INC. re #238 Notice (Other), Merck's Letter in Response to Plaintiffs' Third Letter in Further Support of the Pending Motion to De-Designate and Unseal Portions of the Deposition of Dr. David Kessler (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DYKSTRA, LISA) Modified on 3/18/2019 (ti, ). (FILED UNDER SEAL)
March 15, 2019 Filing 240 (Unredacted) Letter Reply in further support of plffs' and relators' motion to de-designate and unseal portions of the deposition of Dr. David Kessler based on public health concerns, filed by PLFFS CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kw, ) (ti, ).
March 14, 2019 Filing 238 Letter to Judge Sitarski dated 3/14/19 by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD Plaintiffs letter in further support of the pending Motion to De-Designate and Unseal Portions of the Deposition of Dr. David Kessler Based on Public Health Concerns [REDACTED] (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(LERNER, KELLIE) Modified on 3/15/2019 (tjd).
March 14, 2019 Filing 237 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs letter in further support of the pending Motion to De-Designate and Unseal Portions of the Deposition of Dr. David Kessler Based on Public Health Concerns filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to LYNNE A. SITARSKI. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(LERNER, KELLIE)
February 28, 2019 Filing 236 Letter to Judge Sitarski dated 2/28/2019 re #205 MOTION to Unseal Document, #234 MOTION re #205 MOTION to Unseal Document Letter in Further Support of the Plaintiffs pending Motion to De-Designate and Unseal Portions of the Deposition of Dr. David Kessler Based on Public Health Concerns LETTER to the Hon. Lynne A. Sitarski filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(MACORETTA, JOHN) Modified on 3/1/2019 (tjd).
February 14, 2019 Filing 235 Letter in Further Support of the Plaintiffs pending Motion to De-Designate and Unseal Portions of the Deposition of Dr. David Kessler Based on Public Health Concerns re #234 MOTION re #205 MOTION to Unseal Document , Letter Response by Merck filed by MERCK & CO., INC. (DYKSTRA, LISA) Modified on 2/19/2019 (tjd).
February 11, 2019 Filing 234 Letter to Judge Sitarski dated 2/11/2019 re #205 MOTION to Unseal Document Letter in Further Support of the Plaintiffs pending Motion to De-Designate and Unseal Portions of the Deposition of Dr. David Kessler Based on Public Health Concerns filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD..Motions referred to LYNNE A. SITARSKI. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2)(MACORETTA, JOHN) Modified on 2/12/2019 (tjd).
February 8, 2019 Filing 233 EXHIBIT Revised Ex. L to Dkt. Nos. 222/223 - Plaintiffs and Relators Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Plaintiffs and Relators Motion to De-Designate and Unseal Portions of the Deposition of Dr. David Kessler based on Public Health Concerns by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.. (MACORETTA, JOHN)
February 4, 2019 Filing 232 (UNREDACTED) JOINT STATUS REPORT by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kw, ) (lisad, ).
February 1, 2019 Filing 231 STATUS REPORT (JOINT STATUS REPORT with Redactions) by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (MACORETTA, JOHN)
January 24, 2019 Filing 230 Letter by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD re #226 Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Merck's Request for Limited Stay of Any Order Granting Motion to Unseal (LERNER, KELLIE) Modified on 1/25/2019 (fb).
January 22, 2019 Filing 229 Declaration of John Macoretta in Support of #228 Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Plaintiffs' and Relators' MOTION to De-Designate and Unseal Portions of the Deposition of Dr. David Kessler Based on Public Health Concerns by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ti, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2019: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Sealed Document) (lisad, ).
January 22, 2019 Filing 228 Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of #227 MOTION Plaintiffs' and Relators Motion to De-Designate and Unseal Portions of the Deposition of Dr. David Kessler based on Public Health Concerns, together with Certificate of Service filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ti, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2019: # 1 Sealed Document) (lisad, ).
January 22, 2019 Filing 227 MOTION Plaintiffs and Relators Motion Re Sealing their Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Plaintiffs and Relators Motion to De-Designate and Unseal Portions of the Deposition of Dr. David Kessler based on Public Health Concerns re #205 MOTION to Unseal Document filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to LYNNE A. SITARSKI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(MACORETTA, JOHN)
January 22, 2019 Filing 226 NOTICE by MERCK & CO., INC. re #205 MOTION to Unseal Document and Defendant Merck's Request for Limited Stay of Any Order Granting Motion to Unseal (DYKSTRA, LISA)
January 18, 2019 Filing 225 NOTICE of Change of Address by JEFFREY L. KODROFF(KODROFF, JEFFREY)
January 18, 2019 Filing 224 Letter to Judge Sitarski dated 1/18/2019 by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD re #205 MOTION to Unseal Document, #204 MOTION to Strike, #212 Cross MOTION for Order Under 18 U.S.C. 207(j)(6)(A) to Authorize Merck Expert Witnesses Dr. Norman Baylor and Dr. Peter Patriarca (MACORETTA, JOHN) Modified on 1/22/2019 (tjd).
January 14, 2019 Filing 223 REPLY in Support of #212 CROSS-MOTION for Order Under 18 U.S.C. 207(j)(6)(A) to Authorize Merck Expert Witnesses Dr. Norman Baylor and Dr. Peter Patriarca filed by MERCK & CO., INC. Certificate of Service. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ti, ) (lisad, ). Modified on 1/15/2019 (lisad, ).
January 14, 2019 Filing 222 MOTION to Seal Document (Merck's Reply in Support of Its Cross-Motion for an Order Under 18 U.S.C. 207(j)(6)(A) to Authorize Merck Expert Witnesses Norman Baylor and Patriarca, and the exhibits thereto) filed by MERCK & CO., INC..Certificate of Service.Motions referred to LYNNE A. SITARSKI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(DYKSTRA, LISA)
January 10, 2019 Filing 221 Opposition to plffs' and relators' motion to de-designate and unseal portions of the deposition of Dr. David Kessler, filed by DEFT MERCK & CO., INC.. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2019: #1 sealed document, #2 sealed document, #3 sealed document, #4 sealed document, #5 sealed document, #6 sealed document, #7 sealed document, #8 sealed document, #9 sealed document, #10 sealed document, #11 sealed document, #12 sealed document, #13 sealed document, #14 sealed document, #15 sealed document, #16 sealed document, #17 sealed document, #18 sealed document, #19 sealed document) (tjd, ).
January 10, 2019 Filing 220 MOTION to Seal Document (Merck's Opposition to Plaintiffs' and Relators' Motion to De-Designate and Unseal Portions of the Deposition of Dr. David Kessler) filed by MERCK & CO., INC..Certificate of Service.Motions referred to LYNNE A. SITARSKI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(DYKSTRA, LISA)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE PARTIES HEREBY STIPULATE AND AGREE, THAT BRIEFING ON THE CROSS MOTION SHALL PROCEED AS FOLLOWS: MERCK'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE CROSS MOTION SHALL BE FILED BY 1/14/2019, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 1/10/19. 1/10/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ti, )
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER THAT PLFFS CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, KLEIN, & SUTTER'S MOTION TO DE-DESIGNATE AND UNSEAL PORTIONS OF THE DEPOSITION OF DR. KESSLER (ECF NO. 205) IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI, U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR DISPOSITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 636(b)(1)(A). SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 1/8/19. 1/10/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 217 Reply in support of their motion to strike Merck expert witnesses Norman Baylor and Peter Patriarca and opposition to cross-motion for an order under 18 U.S.C. Sec. 207(J)(6)(A), Declaration, Certificate of Service, filed by PLFFS CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2019: #1 sealed document, #2 sealed document, #3 sealed document, #4 sealed document, #5 sealed document, #6 sealed document, #7 sealed document, #8 sealed document) (tjd, ).
January 4, 2019 Filing 216 Plaintiffs' Motion Requesting Permission to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion to Strike Merck Expert Witnesses Norman Baylor and Peter Patriarca and Opposition to Cross-Motion for an Order Under 18 U.S.C. 207 (j)(6)(A) filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to LYNNE A. SITARSKI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(MACORETTA, JOHN) Modified on 1/7/2019 (tjd).
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANT MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP., FORMERLY KNOWN AS MERCK & CO., INC.'S REQUEST, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT MERCK MAY ORDER AND OBTAIN A COPY OF THE UNDER SEAL TRANSCRIPT OF THE STATUS CONFERENCE HELD BEFORE ME ON 12/11/2018. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 1/3/19. 1/4/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ti, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 214 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BERNARD PERSKY on behalf of CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD(PERSKY, BERNARD)
December 19, 2018 Filing 213 Opposition to #204 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum in Support of MERCK's Cross-Motion for an Order Under 18 U.S.C. 207(j)(6)(A) to Authorize MERCK Expert Witnesses Dr. Norman Baylor and Dr. Peter Patriarca filed by MERCK & CO., INC. Certificate of Service. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ti, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2018: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Sealed Document, #3 Sealed Document, #4 Sealed Document, #5 Sealed Document, #6 Sealed Document) (lisad, ). Modified on 12/21/2018 (ti, ). Modified on 12/21/2018 (lisad, ).
December 19, 2018 Filing 212 Cross MOTION for Order Under 18 U.S.C. 207(j)(6)(A) to Authorize Merck Expert Witnesses Dr. Norman Baylor and Dr. Peter Patriarca filed by MERCK & CO., INC...Motions referred to LYNNE A. SITARSKI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(DYKSTRA, LISA)
December 19, 2018 Filing 211 MOTION to Seal Defendant Merck's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike and Memorandum In Support of Merck's Cross-Motion for an Order Under 18 U.S.C. 207(j)(6)(A) to Authorize Merck Expert Witnesses Dr. Norman Baylor and Dr. Peter Patriarca filed by MERCK & CO., INC...Motions referred to LYNNE A. SITARSKI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(DYKSTRA, LISA)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS MAY ORDER AND OBTAIN A COPY OF THE TRANSCRIPT OF THE STATUS CONFERENCE HELD BEFORE ME ON TUESDAY, DECEMBER 11, 2018. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 12/18/18. 12/19/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT MERCK'S OPPOSITION BRIEF TO THE MOTION SHALL BE FILED BY 12/19/2018, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 12/14/18. 12/17/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ti, )
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT MERCK'S OPPOSITION BRIEF TO THE MOTION SHALL BE FILED BY 1/10/2019, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 12/11/18. 12/12/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ti, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 207 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI Pretrial Conference was held on the Record [SEALED] on 12/11/18 (ti, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 206 Declaration of Jeffrey L. Kodroff by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ti, ) (lisad, ).
December 6, 2018 Filing 205 MOTION TO DE-DESIGNATE AND UNSEAL PORTIONS OF THE DEPOSITION OF DR. DAVID KESSLER BASED ON PUBLIC HEALTH CONCERNS together with Certificate of Service filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(ti, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2018: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Sealed Document, #3 Sealed Document) (lisad, ).
November 30, 2018 Filing 204 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE MERCK EXPERT WITNESSES NORMAN BAYLOR AND PETER PATRIARCA WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AND DECLARATION OF JOHN MACORETTA IN SUPPORT OF filed by ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. *FILED UNDER SEAL. Motions referred to LYNNE A. SITARSKI.(jaa, ) Modified on 12/3/2018 (jaa, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2018: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Sealed Document, #3 Sealed Document, #4 Sealed Document, #5 Sealed Document) (lisad, ).
November 30, 2018 Filing 203 Plaintiffs Motion Requesting Permission to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Merck Expert Witnesses Norman Baylor and Peter Patriarca filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to LYNNE A. SITARSKI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(MACORETTA, JOHN) Modified on 12/3/2018 (tjd).
November 28, 2018 Filing 202 NOTICE by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD Realtor Plaintiffs and Private Plaintiffs Letter Response to Defense Counsel's 11/27/18 Letter (MACORETTA, JOHN)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY BY 2/1/19.PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AND SERVE THEIR MOTION BY 7/12/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 11/21/18. 11/21/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF JENNIFER C. JONES, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 10/9/18. 10/9/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (ECF FORM MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 10/9/18)
October 8, 2018 Filing 199 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer C. Jones by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13094340.). (MACORETTA, JOHN)
September 24, 2018 MOTIONS DUE BY 4/29/2019. (tjd)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 11/21/2018. PARTIES SHALL FILE A STATUS REPORT TO THE COURT BY 11/21/2018, ADVISING THE COURT WHETHER THE PARTIES WOULD CONSENT TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION. ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 2/1/2019, ETC. PLFFS SHALL FILE & SERVE THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BY 4/29/2018, ETC.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 9/24/18. 9/25/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 197 STIPULATION re #178 Stipulation and Order,, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Amend the Scheduling Order by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (MACORETTA, JOHN)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER THAT THIS IS A DUPLICATE MOTION (ECF NO.186, MASTER FILE NO.12-3555) THAT HAS ALREADY BEEN RULED UPON (ECF NO.188, MASTER FILE NO.12-3555). THE CLERK'S OFFICE IS INSTRUCTED TO DOCKET THIS COURT'S 5/10/18 (ECF NO.188, MASTER FILE 12-3555) ON CIVIL ACTION NO.10-4374; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 8/16/18. 8/16/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER GRANTING #193 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF CRAIG A. THOMPSON. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/15/18. 8/16/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (va, )
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER GRANTING #192 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF CHRISTINA GAARDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/15/18. 8/16/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED (WITH ECF FORMS) AND E-MAILED. (va, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 193 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Craig A. Thompson ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12984665.) filed by MERCK & CO., INC...Motions referred to LYNNE A. SITARSKI.(JOHNS, ZACHARY)
August 14, 2018 Filing 192 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Christina Gaarder ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12984620.) filed by MERCK & CO., INC...Motions referred to LYNNE A. SITARSKI.(JOHNS, ZACHARY)
August 14, 2018 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance by ZACHARY M. JOHNS on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(JOHNS, ZACHARY)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PARTIES JOINTLY FILED LETTER TO THIS COURT, REQUESTING RESOLUTION OF CERTAIN DISCOVERY DISPUTES, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT SAID REQUEST IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI, U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR DISPOSITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/6/18. 8/6/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ti, )
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION TO SEAL PLFF'S OBJECTIONS (ECF NO. 162) & DEFT'S MOTION TO SEAL MERCK'S PRE-ARGUMENT MEMORANDUM (ECF NO. 175) ARE GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 5/10/18. 5/11/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PARTIES' JOINT LETTER MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE TIMING OF EXPERT DISCLOSURES (ECF NO. 186), PARAGRAPH 3 OF THE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER ENTERED BY THE COURT ON 2/21/2018 (ECF NO. 178) IS AMENDED AS FOLLOWS: ALL EXPERT DEPOSITIONS SHALL TAKE PLACE BETWEEN 6/13/2018 & 9/21/2018, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 5/10/18. 5/10/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER THAT JOINT MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE TIMING OF EXPERT DISCLOSURES (ECF NO. 186) IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI, U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR DISPOSITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 636(b)(1)(A). SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 5/7/18. 5/8/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
April 24, 2018 Filing 186 Joint MOTION for Clarification of the Timing of Expert Depositions filed by MERCK & CO., INC... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DYKSTRA, LISA)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER THAT PLFFS' OBJECTIONS ARE OVERRULED; & JUDGE SITARSKI'S 10/30/2017 ORDER IS AFFIRMED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 4/17/18. 4/18/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
April 6, 2018 Filing 184 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. RE: DOC. #160 . SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 4/6/2018. 4/6/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 STIPULATION AND ORDER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 4/6/2018. 4/6/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF DAN DRACHLER, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 3/26/18.3/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
March 23, 2018 Filing 181 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Dan Drachler ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12702969.) filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.Certificate of Service.(ZINSER, DIANA)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER THAT THIS MATTER IS REMANDED TO JUDGE SITARSKI FOR SUPPLEMENTATION OF THE OCTOBER 30, 2017 ORDER (ECF NO. #160 ). SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 3/13/18. 3/14/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (va, )
March 12, 2018 Filing 179 TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument held on 2/21/2018 before Judge C. Darnell Jones, II. Court Reporter: ESR (Valori Weber, Weber Reporting Corporation). (kw, )
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLFFS' & RELATORS' EXPERT DISCLOSURES AND EXPERT REPORTS SHALL BE SUBMITTED BY 3/13/2018. ALLL EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 9/21/2018, ETC. ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED ON 11/13/2018. PLFFS SHALL FILE AND SERVE THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BY 3/1/2019, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 2/21/18. 2/22/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (kw, )
February 14, 2018 Filing 177 Pre-Argument Memorandum in opposition to plffs' objections to Magistrate Judge Sitarski's 10/30/2017 Order, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT MERCK & CO., INC.. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kw, ) Modified on 2/15/2018 (kw, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2018: #1 Sealed Document) (md, ).
February 14, 2018 Filing 176 Memorandum in Support re #162 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Objections to The Magistrate's October 30, 2017 Order, #156 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion for Leave to File a Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, #149 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Pre-Hearing Memorandum on Their Objections to the Magistrate's October 30, 2017 Order filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C.. (ZINSER, DIANA)
February 14, 2018 Filing 175 MOTION to Seal Merck's Pre-Argument Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judge Sitarski's October 30, 2017 Order filed by MERCK & CO., INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(FEE, R.)
February 14, 2018 Filing 174 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Amend the Scheduling Order by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C.. (ZINSER, DIANA) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 2/16/2018 (nd, ).
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLFF'S OBJECTIONS TO THE MAGISTRATE'S 10/30/2017 ORDER (ECF NO. 163) & DEFTS RESPONSE THERETO (ECF NO. 166), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON SAID MOTIONS SHALL BE HELD ON 2/21/2018 AT 10:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 15B, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 1/11/18. 1/16/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 9/7/2018. ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED ON 10/29/2018. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AND SERVE THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BY 2/15/2019, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 12/22/17. 12/26/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
December 20, 2017 Filing 171 STIPULATION re #153 Stipulation and Order,, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Amend Scheduling Order by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.**(FILED IN ERROR, COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)** (MACORETTA, JOHN) Modified on 12/22/2017 (tjd, ).
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER THAT MOTION TO SEAL EXHIBITS "A" AND "B" TO MERCK'S RESPONSE TO PLFFS' OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SITARSKI'S 10/30/2017 ORDER, IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/6/17. 12/7/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
December 4, 2017 Filing 169 NOTICE by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD re #163 Objections,, Letter to the Honorable C. Darnell Jones, II Regarding Objections to the Magistrate's 10/30/2017 Order (LERNER, KELLIE)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER: THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL #130 IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 11/28/2017. 11/28/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (rz)
November 27, 2017 Filing 167 EXHIBITS "A" AND "B" to Merck's response to plffs' objections to Magistrate Judge Sitarski's 10/30/2017 Order, filed by DEFT MERCK & CO., INC.. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2017: #1 sealed documents) (tjd, ).
November 27, 2017 Filing 166 Response in Opposition re #163 Objections,, (Merck's Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judge Sitarski's October 30, 2017 Order) by MERCK & CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" (under seal), #2 Exhibit "B" (under seal), #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (FEE, R.)
November 27, 2017 Filing 165 MOTION to Seal Exhibits "A" and "B" to Merck's Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judge Sitarski's October 30, 2017 Order filed by MERCK & CO., INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(FEE, R.)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF DAVID ROCHELSON, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/15/17.11/15/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
November 13, 2017 Filing 163 Notice of Objections to the Magistrate's 10/30/2017 Order, Memorandum, filed by PLFFS CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.(FILED UNDER SEAL)(kw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2017: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Sealed Document, #3 Sealed Document, #4 Sealed Document, #5 Sealed Document, #6 Sealed Document, #7 Sealed Document, #8 Sealed Document, #9 Sealed Document, #10 Sealed Document, #11 Sealed Document, #12 Sealed Document, #13 Sealed Document, #14 Sealed Document, #15 Sealed Document, #16 Sealed Document, #17 Sealed Document, #18 Sealed Document, #19 Sealed Document) (ems).
November 13, 2017 Filing 162 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Objections to The Magistrate's October 30, 2017 Order filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(LERNER, KELLIE)
November 3, 2017 Filing 161 NOTICE by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD Notice of Withdrawal of Lisa Furnald (LERNER, KELLIE)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT IS DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 10/30/2017.10/30/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ahf)
October 9, 2017 Filing 159 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of David Rochelson ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12378055.) filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.Certificate of Service.(ZINSER, DIANA)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER THAT PLFFS' MOTION REQUESTING PERMISSION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLFFS' REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 156) IS GRANTED & PLFFS' REPLY SHALL BE FILED UNDER SEAL.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 9/22/17. 9/25/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 20, 2017 Filing 157 Reply in further support of their motion for leave to file a second consolidated amended class action complaint, filed by PLFFS CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2017: #1 sealed documents) (tjd, ).
September 20, 2017 Filing 156 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion for Leave to File a Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(LERNER, KELLIE)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER THAT THOSE THREE MOTIONS (NO. 10-4374, ECF NO. 148 & 149) AND (MASTER FILE NO. 12-3555, ECF NO. 149) ARE REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI, U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR DISPOSITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC 636(b)(1)(A). SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/18/17. 9/19/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 14, 2017 Filing 154 RESPONSE in Opposition re #149 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by MERCK & CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A)(DYKSTRA, LISA)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 7/19/2018. ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 9/14/2018. PLFFS SHALL FILE & SERVE THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BY 12/21/2018, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 9/11/17. 9/12/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF RELATORS' AND PRIVATE ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO LEAVE TO FIEL A REPLY TO MERCK'S RESPOSNE TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SITARSKI'S 7/24/2017 DISCOVERY ORDER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/8/17. 9/11/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ti, )
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Amend the Scheduling Order by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.**(STIPULATION HAS BEEN SIGNED BY JUDGE, SEE DOCUMENT #153 )** (MACORETTA, JOHN) Modified on 9/12/2017 (tjd, ).
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE JULY 24, 2017 ORDER, ISSUED BY THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI, U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS THERETO, DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE, AND PLAINTIFFS' REPLY, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS ARE OVERRULED; AND JUDGE SITARSKI'S ORDER IS AFFIRMED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/7/17. 9/7/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (ti, )
September 1, 2017 Filing 149 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, WITH MEMORANDUM AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(FILED UNDER SEAL)(amas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2017: #1 sealed documents, #2 sealed documents, #3 sealed documents) (tjd, ).
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION REQUESTING PERMISSION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. #147 ), IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/31/2017.9/1/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
August 31, 2017 Filing 147 MOTION to Seal filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.Motion Requesting Permission to File Under Seal, Certificate of Service, and Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion)(LERNER, KELLIE)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER THAT RELATORS' & PRIVTE ANTITRUST PLFFS' MOTION REQUESTING PERMISSION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO REPLY TO MERCK'S RESPONSE TO PLFFS' OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SITARSKI'S 7/24/2017 DISCOVERY ORDER IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/30/17.8/30/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
August 28, 2017 Filing 145 PLFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO REPLY; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; PLFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE COURT'S 7/24/17 ORDER, FILED BY PLFFS CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2017: #1 sealed documents, #2 sealed documents, #3 sealed documents, #4 sealed documents, #5 sealed documents, #6 sealed documents, #7 sealed documents, #8 sealed documents, #9 sealed documents) (tjd, ).
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER THAT MOTION TO SEAL MERCK'S RESPONSE TO PLFFS' OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SITARSKI'S 7/24/2017 DISCOVERY ORDER IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/28/17.8/28/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND THE PROTECTIVE ORDER AS FOLLOWS: PATRICK GIBSON & ALAN MODLINGER ARE REMOVED AS DESIGNATED IN-HOUSE COUNSEL; & JAMES HOLSTON, TIMOTHY HOWARD, & TINA GONZALEZ BARTON ARE ADDED AS DESIGNED IN-HOUSE COUNSEL. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 8/28/17. 8/28/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND THE PROTECTIVE ORDER SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 8/28/17. 8/28/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ti, )
August 21, 2017 Filing 141 Response to (Doc. No. 138) Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judge Sitarski's 7/24/2017 Discovery Order with exhibits by MERCK & CO., INC. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ti, ) (lisad, ).
August 21, 2017 Filing 140 MOTION to Seal Document Merck's Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judge Sitarski's July 24, 2017 Discovery Order filed by MERCK & CO., INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DYKSTRA, LISA)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER THAT RELATORS' AND PRIVATE ANTITRUST PLFFS' MOTION REQUESTING PERMISSION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLFFS' OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE COURT'S 7/24/2017 ORDER, & REQUESTING PERMISSION TO FILE EXCESS PAGES IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/11/17.8/11/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
August 7, 2017 Filing 138 Objections to Magistrate Court's 7/24/2017 Order, filed by PLFFS CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2017: #1 sealed documents, #2 sealed documents, #3 sealed documents, #4 sealed documents, #5 sealed documents, #6 sealed documents, #7 sealed documents) (tjd, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2017: #8 sealed documents, #9 sealed documents, #10 sealed documents, #11 sealed documents, #12 sealed documents, #13 sealed documents, #14 sealed documents, #15 sealed documents, #16 sealed documents, #17 sealed documents, #18 sealed documents, #19 sealed documents) (tjd, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2017: #20 sealed documents, #21 sealed documents, #22 sealed documents, #23 sealed documents, #24 sealed documents, #25 sealed documents, #26 sealed documents, #27 sealed documents, #28 sealed documents, #29 sealed documents, #30 sealed documents, #31 sealed documents, #32 sealed documents, #33 sealed documents, #34 sealed documents, #35 sealed documents, #36 sealed documents, #37 sealed documents, #38 sealed documents) (tjd, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2017: #39 sealed documents, #40 sealed documents, #41 sealed documents, #42 sealed documents, #43 sealed documents, #44 sealed documents, #45 sealed documents, #46 sealed documents, #47 sealed documents, #48 sealed documents, #49 sealed documents, #50 sealed documents, #51 sealed documents) (tjd, ).
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF AARON SHEANIN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/26/17.7/27/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND MAILED/EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF REENA JAIN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/26/17.7/27/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND MAILED/EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
July 26, 2017 Filing 135 REPLY to Response to Motion re #130 MOTION to Compel Letter Motion to the Hon. Lynne A. Sitarski filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (LERNER, KELLIE)
July 26, 2017 Filing 134 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Aaron M. Sheanin ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12219553.) filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(ZINSER, DIANA)
July 26, 2017 Filing 133 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Reena Jain ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12219514.) filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(ZINSER, DIANA)
July 19, 2017 Filing 132 RESPONSE in Opposition re #130 MOTION to Compel Letter Motion to the Hon. Lynne A. Sitarski filed by MERCK & CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(FEE, R.)
July 10, 2017 Filing 131 NOTICE of Change of Address by LEE ALBERT(ALBERT, LEE)
July 5, 2017 Filing 130 MOTION to Compel Letter Motion to the Hon. Lynne A. Sitarski filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(LERNER, KELLIE)
June 21, 2017 Filing 129 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MICHELLE C. ZOLNOSKI on behalf of All Plaintiffs (ZOLNOSKI, MICHELLE)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THAT THE 1/8/2016 SCHEDULING ORDER IS FURTHER AMENDED TO PERMIT THE PARTIES TO COMPLETE THE FOLLOWING DISCOVERY AFTER THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY ON 6/1/2017, ETC. FURTHERMORE, THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THAT ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 4/30/2018, ETC. ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 6/19/2018. PLFFS SHALL FILE THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BY 9/11/2018, ETC.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 5/25/17. 5/26/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THAT MERCK'S TIME TO RESPOND TO RELATOR' THIRD SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION AND PLFFS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES IS EXTENDED TO 6/21/2017 & RELATORS' TIME TO RESPOND TO MERCK'S SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES IS EXTENDED TO 6/22/2017.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 5/25/17. 5/26/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 10, 2017 Filing 126 NOTICE by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MICHELLE C. ZOLNOSKI (MACORETTA, JOHN)
May 8, 2017 Filing 125 Minute Entry/Report of Telephonic Discovery Dispute Conference for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI on 5/8/17. (kw, )
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF FREDERICK BRAUNSTEIN, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 5/4/17.5/5/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 4, 2017 Filing 123 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Frederick Braunstein ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12045674.) filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.Certificate of Service.(MACORETTA, JOHN)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF EAMON O'KELLY, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 5/3/2017. 5/4/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED; ECF APPLICATION SENT TO E. O'KELLY. (aeg)
May 1, 2017 Filing 121 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Eamon O'Kelly ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12037592.) filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.Certificate of Service.(MACORETTA, JOHN)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFT IS TO FILE ITS OPPOSITION TO PLFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL BY 5/9/2017 & PLFFS ARE TO FILE THEIR REPLY BRIEF TO THE MOTION BY 5/16/2017. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 4/27/17. 4/27/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
April 24, 2017 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET E. RODGERS SCHMIDT on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC. with Certificate of Service(RODGERS SCHMIDT, MARGARET)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER THAT PLFF'S LETTER MOTION TO COMPEL NON-PARTY GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS (ECF NO. 114) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 4/5/17. 4/5/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
April 5, 2017 Filing 117 RESPONSE to Motion re #114 MOTION to Compel GSK to Produce Documents filed by GLAXOSMITHKLINE (GSK). (WEISSER, BETH)
March 20, 2017 Filing 116 Minute Entry/Report of Telephone Discovery Dispute Conference for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI on 3/20/17. (kw, )
March 2, 2017 Filing 115 EXHIBIT D to motion to compel production of GSK, filed by PLFFS CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (kw, ) (tjd, ).
March 2, 2017 Filing 114 Letter to Judge Sitarski dated March 2, 2017 re: Request to Compel GSK to Produce Documents filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(MACORETTA, JOHN) Modified on 3/3/2017 (tjd).
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE FACT DISCOVERY COMPLETION DEADLINE SHALL BE EXTENDED TO 6/1/2017. ALL PARTIES WILL ACT IN GOOD FAITH TO HAVE DEPOSITIONS SCHEDULED WITHIN 30-45 DAYS OF THE DATE THE DEPOSITION IS NOTICED, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 3/1/17. 3/2/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF KATHLEEN S. HARDWAY, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 2/14/17. 2/27/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
February 8, 2017 Filing 111 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kathleen S. Hardway by MERCK & CO., INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-11857838.). (DYKSTRA, LISA)
January 10, 2017 Filing 110 NOTICE by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN of Change of Firm Affiliation and Address (GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE)
January 10, 2017 Filing 109 NOTICE by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN of Change of Firm Affiliation and Address. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY).(GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE) Modified on 1/10/2017 (fb).
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION PROTOCOL, AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 12/2/2016. 12/5/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (aeg)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER THAT TROMPETA'S CLAIMS AGAINST MERCK IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE AS WELL AS ALL CLAIMS BROUGHT AGAINST MERCK UNDER CALIFORNIA UCL ON BEHALF OF THE CALIFORNIA SUBCLASS ARE HEREBY DISMISSED IN THEIR ENTIRETY WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 4/13/16. 4/14/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (kw, )
April 12, 2016 Filing 106 STIPULATION of Dismissal STIPULATION AND (PROPOSED) ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFF BELLAFLOR TROMPETA, M.D., A MEDICAL CORPORATION by BELLAFLOR A. TROMPETA. (MACORETTA, JOHN)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 3/1/2017. ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 10/31/2017. PARTIES SHALL FILE A STATUS REPORT TO THE COURT BY 10/31/2017. ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 12/20/2017. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE & SERVE THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BY 3/1/2018. DEFT SHALL FILE & SERVE ITS OPPOSITION TO CLASS CERTIFICATION BY 4/5/2018, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 1/8/16. 1/12/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER THAT DEFT'S LETTER MOTION TO COMPEL PLFFS TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO DEFT'S DOCUMENT REQUEST NOS. 8. 28, & 30-32 IS GRANTED, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 11/30/15.12/1/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED.(kw, )
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLFF GEORGE NAKASHIMA'S CLAIMS AGAINST MERCK IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTION ARE HEREBY DISMISSED IN THEIR ENTIRETY WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 10/23/15. 10/26/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 23, 2015 Filing 102 STIPULATION of Dismissal STIPULATION AND (PROPOSED) ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFF GEORGE E. NAKASHIMA, M.D. by GEORGE E. NAKASHIMA, MD. (MACORETTA, JOHN)
September 18, 2015 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANA J. ZINSER on behalf of CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ZINSER, DIANA)
September 4, 2015 Filing 100 Letter to The Honorable Lynne A. Sitarski in reply re #98 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Documents Responsive to Document Request Nos. 8, 28, and 30-32 (Letter Motion to Judge Sitarski) filed by MERCK & CO., INC.. (DYKSTRA, LISA) Modified on 9/4/2015 (lisad, ).
August 28, 2015 Filing 99 Letter to The Honorable Lynne A. Sitarski re Opposition to #98 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Documents Responsive to Document Request Nos. 8, 28, and 30-32 (Letter Motion to Judge Sitarski) filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MACORETTA, JOHN) Modified on 8/31/2015 (lisad, ).
August 14, 2015 Filing 98 Letter MOTION to Judge Sitarski to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Documents Responsive to Document Request Nos. 8, 28, and 30-32 filed by MERCK & CO., INC... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DYKSTRA, LISA) Modified on 8/17/2015 (lisad, ).
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER THAT RELATORS MOTION IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT RELATORS SEEK TO COMPEL MERCK'S ANSWER TO INTERROGATORY NUMBER 1. RELATORS MOTION IS DENIED TO THE EXTENT RELATOR SEEKS TO COMPEL MERCK'S ANSWERS TO RFA 1,2,12,14,27,28,38,40,55,57,71 AND 72 AND INTERROGATORY NUMBER 1, ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 7/31/15. 7/31/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, ) (FILED IN ERROR PER CHAMBERS)
July 17, 2015 Filing 96 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI Telephonic Pretrial Conference held on 7/16/15. (ti, ) Modified on 7/21/2015 (ti, ). (FILED IN ERROR PER CHAMBERS)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER THAT AN IN-PERSON MEET AND CONFER WILL BE HELD ON 7/22/2015, AT 1:30 PM, IN COURTROOM 3-E, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106. IF APPROPRIATE, THE COURT SHALL CONDUCT AN ORAL ARGUMENT IMMEDIATELY THEREAFTER ON RELATORS' LETTER MOTION TO COMPEL, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 7/15/15. 7/16/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (ti, ) (FILED IN ERROR PER CHAMBERS)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER THAT AN IN-PERSON MEET AND CONFER CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 7/27/2015 AT 1:00 PM IN COURTROOM 3-E BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI. IF APPROPRIATE, THE COURT SHALL CONDUCT ORAL ARGUMENT IMMEDIATELY THEREAFTER ON RELATORS' LETTER MOTION TO COMPEL MERCK TO RESPOND TO CERTAIN INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (DOC. NO. 76). SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 7/15/2015. 7/16/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ahf) (FILED IN ERROR PER CHAMBERS)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF MICHELLE C. ZOLNOSKI, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 3/16/15. 3/17/5 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER THAT ATTORNEY LISA A. FURNALD'S APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE FOR CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN AND JOHN I. SUTTER, MD IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 3/5/2015. 3/9/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
March 2, 2015 Filing 91 APPLICATION for admission of LISA A. FURNALD, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by PLFFS CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (Filing fee paid on 3/3/15, #PPE116972) (kw, )
March 2, 2015 Filing 90 APPLICATION for admission of MICHELLE C. ZOLNOSKI, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by PLFF CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C. (Filing fee paid on 2/27/15, #PPE116856). (kw, )
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE SCHEDULING ORDER IS AMENDED AS FOLLOWS: FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 3/1/2016. ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 10/31/2016. ALL DISPOSTIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 12/9/2016. PLFFS SHALL FILE AND SERVE THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BY 2/7/2017, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 2/24/15. 2/26/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (kw, )
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INFORMATION. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 1/30/15. 2/2/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED ANDE-MAILED.(kw, )
January 30, 2015 Filing 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI Pretrial Conference held on 1/30/15. (jl, )
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH COURT APPROVAL RE: CERTAIN STATEMENTS; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 1/26/15. (Attachments: # 1 AGREEMENT) 1/26/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER THAT A CONFERENCE ON THE PENDING DISCOVERY MOTION IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON 1/22/2015 AT 2:00 P.M., BEFORE THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI, U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, IN COURTROOM 3-E, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 1/20/15. 1/20/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
December 30, 2014 Filing 82 Letter to The Hon. Lynne A. Sitarski re # 78 MOTION for Protective Order and to Compel Production of Documents filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, GEORGE E. NAKASHIMA, MD, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD, BELLAFLOR A. TROMPETA. (MACORETTA, JOHN) Modified on 12/31/2014 (lisad, ).
December 23, 2014 Filing 81 Letter to The Honorable Lynne A. Sitarski re response re # 78 MOTION for Protective Order and to Compel filed by MERCK & CO., INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A--Merck's Proposed Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit B--Relators' First Set of Document Requests, # 3 Exhibit C--Plaintiffs' Second Set of Document Requests, # 4 Exhibit D--December 23, 2014 Letter to Counsel, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Pertaining to DOJ Documents)(DYKSTRA, LISA) Modified on 12/29/2014 (lisad, ).
December 18, 2014 Filing 80 ANSWER to Complaint in Consolidated Action No. 14-06447 by MERCK & CO., INC., Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand, Certificate of Service.(FEE, R.) Modified on 12/19/2014 (md).
December 9, 2014 Filing 79 EXHIBIT C to Motion for protective order and to compel (Letter to Magistrate), filed by PLFFS CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kw, )
December 9, 2014 Filing 78 Letter MOTION for Protective Order and to Compel filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.Letter to Magistrate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Relators' and Private Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Comparison of Relators' and Private Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order to Merck's Proposed Protective Order, # 3 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents, # 4 Exhibit E - Relators' First Set of Document Requests, # 5 Exhibit F - Response and Objections of Defendant Merck & Co., Inc. to Plaintiff's First Request for the Production of Documents, # 6 Exhibit G - Merck's Responses and Objections to Relators' First Set of Document Requests, # 7 Exhibit H - Final Proposed Order for Motion to Compel the Production of Documents, # 8 Exhibit C - Filed Under Seal)(MACORETTA, JOHN) Modified on 12/11/2014 (lisad, ).
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT IN ACCORDANCE WITH PART IV OF THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER & RULE 42(a) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, THE NAKASHIMA ACTION SHALL BE CONSOLIDATED WITH THE CHATHOM PRIMARY CARE ACTION & THE KLEIN ACTION, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/5/14. 12/8/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF TARAS KIHICZAK, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/1/14. 12/2/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF THOMAS SEGAL, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/1/14. 12/2/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF HENRY H. ROSSBACHER, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/1/14. 12/2/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
November 24, 2014 Filing 73 APPLICATION for admission of THOMAS SEGAL, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by GEORGE E. NAKASHIMA, TROMPETA A. BELLAFLOR. (Filing fee paid on 11/24/14, #PPE111837) (kw, )
November 24, 2014 Filing 72 APPLICATION for admission of TARAS KIHICZAK, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by GEORGE E. NAKASHIMA, TROMPETA A. BELLAFLOR. (Filing fee paid on 11/24/14, #PPE111837) (kw, )
November 24, 2014 Filing 71 APPLICATION for admission of HENRY H. ROSSBACHER, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by GEORGE E. NAKASHIMA. (Filing fee paid on 11/24/14, #PPE111837) (kw, )
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER THAT ANY & ALL FUTURE DISCOVERY MOTIONS IN BOTH ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTERS ARE REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI, U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR DISPOSITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 636(b)(1)(A), ETC. DISCOVERY DUE BY 3/31/2016. PARTIES SHALL FILE A STATUS REPORT TO THE COURT BY 3/31/2016. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 4/29/16. PLFF SHALL FILE & SERVE ITS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BY 7/8/2016, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/13/14. 11/17/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER THAT A FED. R. CIV. P. 16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD BY TELEPHONE ON 11/13/2014, AT 1:30 P.M., ETC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PARTIES SHALL MAKE THE REQUIRED INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 26(a) WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 10/15/14. 10/16/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 14, 2014 Filing 68 Joint Report Pursuant to Rule 26(f) by MERCK & CO., INC.. (DYKSTRA, LISA) Modified on 10/15/2014 (lisad, ).
September 29, 2014 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by R. BRENDAN FEE on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC. with Certificate of Service(FEE, R.)
September 19, 2014 Filing 66 ANSWER to # 26 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand, Certificate of Service by MERCK & CO., INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(DYKSTRA, LISA) Modified on 9/22/2014 (lisad, ).
September 5, 2014 Filing 65 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/5/14. 9/5/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 12-3555 (DKT NO. 40), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT SAID MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 10-4374 (DKT NO. 45), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT SAID MOTION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/4/14. 9/5/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ti, ) Modified on 9/5/2014 (lisad, ).
September 4, 2014 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/4/14. 9/5/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ti, )
July 2, 2014 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT S. KITCHENOFF on behalf of CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C. with Certificate of Service(KITCHENOFF, ROBERT)
June 19, 2013 Filing 61 Response re # 60 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority by MERCK & CO., INC.. (DYKSTRA, LISA)
June 13, 2013 Filing 60 NOTICE by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD re # 43 Response in Opposition to Motion, Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Automotive Parts decision)(SALZMAN, HOLLIS)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER THAT MOTION TO WITHDRAW MARK B. GOLDSTEIN IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 3/25/13. 3/27/13 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF M. STEPHEN DAMPIER, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 3/20/13. 3/22/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER THAT SECTION IV, PARAGRAPH A OF THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ENTERED ON 8/2/2012 IS HEREBY MODIFIED AS FOLLOWS: ROBINS, KAPLAN, MILLER & CIRESI, L.L.P. IS SUBSTITUTED IN PLACE OF LABATON SUCHAROW LLP AS PLFFS' CO-LEAD COUNSEL IN THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 3/18/13.3/20/13 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
March 19, 2013 Filing 56 APPLICATION for admission of M. STEPHEN DAMPIER, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by PLFF CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C. (filing fee paid on 3/19/13) (kw, )
March 18, 2013 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN D. PENNY on behalf of ANDREW KLEIN with Certificate of Service(PENNY, BRIAN)
March 5, 2013 Filing 54 NOTICE by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C. of Change of Firm Affiliation (FRIEDMAN, ELIZABETH)
February 28, 2013 Filing 53 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE OF MARK B. GOLDSTEIN filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C..Certificate.(GOLDSTEIN, MARK)
February 20, 2013 Filing 52 Reply Brief in support of Merck & Co., Inc.'s motion to dismiss plffs' amended complaint, filed by DEFT MERCK & CO., INC. (kw, )
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER THAT DEFT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE THE REPLY BRIEF IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTION FORTHWITH. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 2/19/13.2/21/13 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
February 20, 2013 Filing 50 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Order filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C..Certificate of Service.(SALZMAN, HOLLIS)
February 19, 2013 Filing 49 NOTICE by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C. of Change of Firm Affiliation (SALZMAN, HOLLIS)
February 13, 2013 Filing 48 NOTICE by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C. of Change of Firm Affiliation . Certificate of Service. (PERSKY, BERNARD) Modified on 2/14/2013 (ahf, ).
February 13, 2013 Filing 47 NOTICE by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C. of Change of Firm Affiliation . Certificate of Service.(LERNER, KELLIE) Modified on 2/14/2013 (ahf, ).
February 1, 2013 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by MERCK & CO., INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - Reply Brief)(DYKSTRA, LISA)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF ELIZABETH L. FRIEDMAN, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 1/14/13. 1/15/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF BERNARD PERSKY, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. ATTORNEY BERNARD PERSKY for CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C. ADDED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 1/14/2013. 1/15/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (aeg, )
January 11, 2013 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re # 40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(KODROFF, JEFFREY)
January 11, 2013 Filing 42 APPLICATION for admission of ELIZABETH L. FRIEDMAN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by PLFF CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C. (filing fee paid on 1/11/13) (kw, )
January 11, 2013 Filing 41 APPLICATION for admission of BERNARD PERSKY, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by PLFF CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C. (filing fee paid on 1/11/13) (kw, )
November 19, 2012 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by MERCK & CO., INC..Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(DYKSTRA, LISA)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER THAT BY 11/19/2012, DEFT SHALL FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING OR OTHERWISE MOVE PURSUANT TO RULE 12. BY 1/11/2013, PLFFS SHALL FILE AN OPPOSITION. BY 2/1/2013, DEFT SHALL FILE LEAVE FOR A REPLY BRIEF, ATTACHING THE PROPOSED REPLY BRIEF THERETO, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/15/12. 11/16/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF JAMES B. ZOURAS, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 10/24/12. 10/25/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF MARK B. GOLDSTEIN, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 10/24/12. 10/25/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF RYAN F. STEPHAN, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 10/24/12. 10/25/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 22, 2012 Filing 35 APPLICATION for admission of RYAN F. STEPHAN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by PLFFS CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (filing fee paid on 10/22/12) (kw, )
October 22, 2012 Filing 34 APPLICATION for admission of MARK B. GOLDSTEIN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by PLFFS CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (filing fee paid on 10/22/12) (kw, )
October 22, 2012 Filing 33 APPLICATION for admission of JAMES B. ZOURAS, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by PLFFS CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN, JOHN I. SUTTER, MD. (filing fee paid on 10/22/12) (kw, )
October 18, 2012 Filing 32 NOTICE by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN of Change of Firm Affiliation (ALBERT, LEE)
October 17, 2012 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN PETER RODDY on behalf of JOHN I. SUTTER, MD (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Certificate of Filing and Service))(RODDY, KEVIN)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF KEVIN P. RODDY, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 10/10/2012. 10/11/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
October 9, 2012 Filing 29 APPLICATION for admission of KEVIN P. RODDY, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by PLFF JOHN I. SUTTER, MD.(filing fee paid on 10/9/12) (kw, )
September 28, 2012 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT on behalf of CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN with Certificate of Service(FINKELMAN BENNETT, NATALIE)
September 28, 2012 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN on behalf of CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN with Certificate of Service(GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE)
September 20, 2012 Filing 26 CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT against MERCK & CO., INC., Certificate of Service; jury demand, filed by PLFFS CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN.(kw, )
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLFFS SHALL FILE A CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THE CONSOLIDATED ACTION NO LATER THAN 9/20/2012, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/4/12. 9/7/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
August 3, 2012 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C., ANDREW KLEIN re: Manny Bayo served Summons and Complaint upon MERCK & CO., INC. by Personal Service. MERCK & CO., INC. served on 7/17/2012, answer due 8/7/2012. (KODROFF, JEFFREY)
August 2, 2012 Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER THAT C.A. #12-3555 & C.A. #12-3857 ARE CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES, ETC. A MASTER DOCKET & A MASTER FILE ARE HEREBY ESTABLISHED FOR THIS & ALL RELATED CASES SUBSEQUENTLY FILED IN OR TRANSFERRED TO THIS COURT. WHEN A PLEADING OR OTHER COURT PAPER IS FILED & THE CAPTION SHOWS THAT IT IS APPLICABSLE TO FEWER THAN ALL ACTIONS BEFORE THIS COURT, THE CLERK NEED ONLY FILE SUCH PLEADING OR OTHER COURT PAPER IN THE MASTER FILE, ETC. EVERY PLEADING FILED IN THIS PROCEEDING SHALL BEAR THE FOLLOWING CAPTION: IN RE: MERCK MUMPS VACCINE ANTITRUST LITIGATION. WHEN A PLEADING OR OTHER COURT PAPER IS INTENDED TO BE APPLICABLE TO ALL ACTIONS, THE WORDS "ALL ACTIONS" SHALL APPEAR IMMEDIATELY AFTER THE WORDS "THIS DOCUMENT RELATES TO" IN THE CAPTION SET OUT HEREIN, ETC. PLFFS & DEFT AGREE THAT PLFF SHALL FILE A CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THE CONSOLIDATED ACTION NO LATER THAN 8/31/12; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/2/12. 8/3/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (kw, )
July 25, 2012 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Order filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C..Joint Motion for Entry of Case Management Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Case Management Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(KODROFF, JEFFREY)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF HOLLIS SALZMAN, ESQ. TO PRACICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/19/12. 7/19/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF KELLIE LERNER, ESQ. TO PRACICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/19/12. 7/19/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF ANDRA WANIEK, ESQ. TO PRACICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/19/12. 7/19/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 17, 2012 Filing 18 APPLICATION for admission of KELLIE LERNER, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by PLFF CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C. (filing fee paid on 7/17/12) (kw, )
July 17, 2012 Filing 17 APPLICATION for admission of HOLLIS SALZMAN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by PLFF CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C. (filing fee paid on 7/17/12) (kw, )
July 17, 2012 Filing 16 APPLICATION for admission of ANDRA WANIEK, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by PLFF CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C. (filing fee paid on 7/17/12) (kw, )
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF DINO S. SANGIAMO, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/9/12. 7/10/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF SALLY W. BRYAN, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/9/12. 7/10/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF SCOTT A. STEMPEL, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/9/12. 7/10/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF EYITAYO ST. MATTHEW-DANIEL, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/9/12. 7/10/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 6, 2012 Filing 11 APPLICATION for admission of DINO S. SANGIAMO, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT MERCK & CO., INC. (filing fee paid on 7/6/12) (kw, )
July 6, 2012 Filing 10 APPLICATION for admission of SALLY W. BRYAN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT MERCK & CO., INC. (filing fee paid on 7/6/12) (kw, )
July 6, 2012 Filing 9 APPLICATION for admission of SCOTT A. STEMPEL ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT MERCK & CO., INC. (filing fee paid on 7/6/12) (kw, )
July 6, 2012 Filing 8 APPLICATION for admission of EYITAYO ST. MATTHEW-DANIEL, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT MERCK & CO., INC. (filing fee paid on 7/6/12) (kw, )
July 3, 2012 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C..(RESNICK, STEVEN)
July 2, 2012 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Certified Mail re: served Plaintiff's Complaint upon Merck & Co, Inc. by Certified Mail on June 27, 2012 (RESNICK, STEVEN)
June 29, 2012 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MERCK & CO., INC..(SITARCHUK, ERIC)
June 29, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by LISA DYKSTRA on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC. with Certificate of Service(DYKSTRA, LISA)
June 29, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC W. SITARCHUK on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC. with Certificate of Service(SITARCHUK, ERIC)
June 25, 2012 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN D. RESNICK on behalf of CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C. (RESNICK, STEVEN)
June 25, 2012 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C.. (rt)
June 25, 2012 Summons Issued as to MERCK & CO., INC.. One Given To: Counsel on June 25, 2012 (rt)
June 25, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MERCK & CO., INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 065150.), filed by CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C..(rt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C. v. MERCK & CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHATOM PRIMARY CARE, P.C.
Represented By: LEE ALBERT
Represented By: NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT
Represented By: JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN
Represented By: ROBERT S. KITCHENOFF
Represented By: JEFFREY L. KODROFF
Represented By: KELLIE LERNER
Represented By: JOHN A. MACORETTA
Represented By: STEVEN D. RESNICK
Represented By: HOLLIS L. SALZMAN
Represented By: DAN DRACHLER
Represented By: RYAN F. STEPHAN
Represented By: BERNARD PERSKY
Represented By: MICHELLE C. CLERKIN
Represented By: MARK B. GOLDSTEIN
Represented By: EAMON O'KELLY
Represented By: JAMES B. ZOURAS
Represented By: DIANA J. ZINSER
Represented By: DAVID ROCHELSON
Represented By: ELIZABETH L. FRIEDMAN
Represented By: AARON M. SHEANIN
Represented By: ANDRA WANIEK
Represented By: REENA JAIN
Represented By: JENNIFER C. JONES
Represented By: LISA A. FURNALD
Represented By: FREDERICK A. BRAUNSTEIN
Represented By: M. STEPHEN DAMPIER
Represented By: RICHARD M. GOLOMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DR. ANDREW KLEIN
Represented By: LEE ALBERT
Represented By: NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT
Represented By: JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN
Represented By: JEFFREY L. KODROFF
Represented By: KELLIE LERNER
Represented By: JOHN A. MACORETTA
Represented By: HOLLIS L. SALZMAN
Represented By: BRIAN D. PENNY
Represented By: DAN DRACHLER
Represented By: RYAN F. STEPHAN
Represented By: MICHELLE C. CLERKIN
Represented By: MARK B. GOLDSTEIN
Represented By: EAMON O'KELLY
Represented By: JAMES B. ZOURAS
Represented By: DIANA J. ZINSER
Represented By: DAVID ROCHELSON
Represented By: AARON M. SHEANIN
Represented By: REENA JAIN
Represented By: WILLIAM G. CALDES
Represented By: JENNIFER C. JONES
Represented By: LISA A. FURNALD
Represented By: MARY ANN GEPPERT
Represented By: FREDERICK A. BRAUNSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN I. SUTTER, M.D.
Represented By: NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT
Represented By: JEFFREY L. KODROFF
Represented By: KELLIE LERNER
Represented By: JOHN A. MACORETTA
Represented By: HOLLIS L. SALZMAN
Represented By: DAN DRACHLER
Represented By: RYAN F. STEPHAN
Represented By: MICHELLE C. CLERKIN
Represented By: MARK B. GOLDSTEIN
Represented By: EAMON O'KELLY
Represented By: JAMES B. ZOURAS
Represented By: DIANA J. ZINSER
Represented By: DAVID ROCHELSON
Represented By: KEVIN PETER RODDY
Represented By: AARON M. SHEANIN
Represented By: REENA JAIN
Represented By: JENNIFER C. JONES
Represented By: LISA A. FURNALD
Represented By: FREDERICK A. BRAUNSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK & CO., INC.
Represented By: R. BRENDAN FEE
Represented By: DINO S. SANGIAMO
Represented By: KATHLEEN SULLIVAN HARDWAY
Represented By: ERIC W. SITARCHUK
Represented By: SALLY W. BRYAN
Represented By: MARGARET E. RODGERS SCHMIDT
Represented By: CHRISTINA L. GAARDER
Represented By: LISA DYKSTRA
Represented By: CRAIG A. THOMPSON
Represented By: ZACHARY M. JOHNS
Represented By: SCOTT A. STEMPEL
Represented By: EYITAYO ST.MATTHEW-DANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BELLAFLOR A. TROMPETA
Represented By: JOHN A. MACORETTA
Represented By: JEFFREY L. KODROFF
Represented By: TARAS KIHICZAK
Represented By: THOMAS SEGAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GEORGE E. NAKASHIMA, M.D.
Represented By: JEFFREY L. KODROFF
Represented By: JOHN A. MACORETTA
Represented By: HENRY H. ROSSBACHER
Represented By: TARAS KIHICZAK
Represented By: THOMAS SEGAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GLAXOSMITHKLINE (GSK)
Represented By: BETH L. WEISSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?