SHERFEY et al v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Plaintiff: STACY SHERFEY and NEIL SHERFEY
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MCNEIL-PPC, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON SALES & LOGISTICS COMPANY, LLC, WAL-MART STORES, INC., PETER B. LUTHER, ASHLEY A. MCEVOY, GARY BENEDICT, EDWIN K. KUFFNER, LORRAINE K. BAILER, WILLIAM C. WELDON, COLLEEN GOGGINS, ROSEMARY CRANE, INMAR, INC., CAROLINA SUPPLY CHAIN SERVICES, LLC and CAROLINA LOGISTICS SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv04162
Filed: July 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: ROBERT F. KELLY
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 6/10/2014. 6/12/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kk, )
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT (DOC. NO.56) IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANTS, INMAR INC., CAROLINA SUPPLY CHAIN SERVICES, LLC, AND CAROLINA LOGISTICS SERVICES, LLC ARE DISMISSED FROM THIS ACTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 4/25/2014. 4/25/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED (kk, )
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO REMAND (DOC. NO.18) IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS PETER B. LUTHER, ASHLEY A. MCEVOY, GARY BENEDICT, EDWIN K. KUFFNER, M.D., LORRAINE K. BAILER, WILLIAM C. WELDON, COLLEEN GOGGINS, AND ROSEMARY CRANE, ARE DISMISSED FROM THIS ACTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 1/29/2014. 1/29/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (kk, )
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND/OR ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RANDOM ASSIGNMENT AND TO STRIKE THE DEFENDATS' DESIGNATION OF RELATED ACTIONS (DOC. NO.7) IS GRANTED. THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO THE ASSIGNMENT CLERK FOR RANDOM ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 40.1(c)(1). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/17/2012. 8/17/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHERFEY et al v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACY SHERFEY
Represented By: THOMAS N. SWEENEY
Represented By: JOSEPH L. MESSA, JR.
Represented By: IRENE M MCLAFFERTY
Represented By: THOMAS N. SWEENEY
Represented By: JOSEPH L. MESSA, JR.
Represented By: IRENE M MCLAFFERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEIL SHERFEY
Represented By: THOMAS N. SWEENEY
Represented By: JOSEPH L. MESSA, JR.
Represented By: IRENE M MCLAFFERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: MEREDITH NISSEN REINHARDT
Represented By: MELISSA A GRAFF
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCNEIL-PPC, INC.
Represented By: MEREDITH NISSEN REINHARDT
Represented By: MELISSA A GRAFF
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON SALES & LOGISTICS COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: MELISSA A GRAFF
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: MEREDITH NISSEN REINHARDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES, INC.
Represented By: PATRICK J. MCDONNELL
Represented By: NANCY ELIZABETH ZANGRILLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER B. LUTHER
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: MELISSA A GRAFF
Represented By: MEREDITH NISSEN REINHARDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEY A. MCEVOY
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: MELISSA A GRAFF
Represented By: MEREDITH NISSEN REINHARDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY BENEDICT
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: MELISSA A GRAFF
Represented By: MEREDITH NISSEN REINHARDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWIN K. KUFFNER
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: MELISSA A GRAFF
Represented By: MEREDITH NISSEN REINHARDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORRAINE K. BAILER
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: MELISSA A GRAFF
Represented By: MEREDITH NISSEN REINHARDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM C. WELDON
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: MELISSA A GRAFF
Represented By: MEREDITH NISSEN REINHARDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLLEEN GOGGINS
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: MELISSA A GRAFF
Represented By: MEREDITH NISSEN REINHARDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSEMARY CRANE
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: MELISSA A GRAFF
Represented By: MEREDITH NISSEN REINHARDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INMAR, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN A. LONEY, JR.
Represented By: DAVID NEWMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLINA SUPPLY CHAIN SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN A. LONEY, JR.
Represented By: DAVID NEWMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLINA LOGISTICS SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN A. LONEY, JR.
Represented By: DAVID NEWMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?