OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A. v. GAMESA WIND US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A.
Defendant: MS REED, INC.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: GAMESA WIND US, LLC and MS REED INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC.
Counter Defendant: NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL S.L.
Cross Claimant: COMPASS TRANSWORLD LOGISTICS, S.A.
3Rd Party Defendant: COMPASS TRANSWORLD LOGISTICS
Not Yet Classified: BBC CHARTERING GMBH
Case Number: 2:2012cv04848
Filed: August 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: ANITA B BRODY
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2014 Filing 96 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE: Settlement Conference held on 6/10/2014. (amas)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 6/11/14. 6/12/14 ENTERED AND COPIES, E-MAILED.(ldb, )
June 9, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES DUE BY 6/9/2014. (mo, )
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER that GAMESA WIND US, LLC AND TOWERS AND METALLIC STRUCTURES, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF OPERDORA MARITMA DE GRANELES, SA.A. FOR FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, AND INTERROGTORIES (ECF NO. 69) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS FOLLOWSA:... 4. PLAINTIFF SHALL PROVIDE THE ABOVE ORDERED SUPPLEMENTAL REPONSES ON OR BEFORE JUNE 9, 2014.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 6/9/2014.6/9/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
June 5, 2014 Filing 93 ANSWER to Crossclaim re #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, by NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL S.L., Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(DJUPMAN, DEBRA) Modified on 6/6/2014 (md).
June 5, 2014 Filing 92 ANSWER to Counterclaim re #77 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim, by NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL S.L., Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(DJUPMAN, DEBRA) Modified on 6/6/2014 (md).
June 5, 2014 Filing 91 Proposed Pretrial Order on Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses to Discovery by GAMESA WIND US, LLC. (WINTON, JAMES)
June 4, 2014 Filing 90 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY: Motion Hearing held on 6/4/2014 re #69 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Discovery filed by GAMESA WIND US, LLC Court Reporter: JAMES F.G. SCHEIDT. (amas)
June 3, 2014 Filing 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE: Telephone Conference (re: Settlement) held on 6/2/2014. (amas)
May 23, 2014 Filing 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE: Telephone Settlement Conference held on 5/22/2014. (amas)
May 22, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/10/2014 09:30 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. (amas)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER THAT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER DATED 5/15/2014 (RE: DOC. NO. #83 ) IS AMENDED TO REFLECT THE FOLLOWING: THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN CHAMBERS BEFORE THE HONORABLE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE IN ROOM 3030 ON 6/10/2014, AT 9:30 AM, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 5/22/2014. 5/22/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
May 20, 2014 Filing 86 SUR-REPLY to GAMESA'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSTION TO GAMESA'S MOTION TO COMPEL... filed by (WANCHOO, RAHUL). (mo, )
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER - UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF, OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY TO THE REPLY OF DEFENDANTS, GAMESA WIND US, LLC AND TOWERS AND METALLIC STRUCTURE, INC., TO THE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO THE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, AND INTERROGATORIES IS HEREBY GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 5/20/2014. 5/20/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
May 16, 2014 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief filed by OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A..Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave, #2 Brief Proposed Sur-Reply Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Leave)(WANCHOO, RAHUL)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 6/10/2014, AT 1:30 PM, IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 3030), BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 5/15/2014. 5/16/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
May 15, 2014 Filing 82 NOTICE of Hearing: FOLLOWUP TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RE: UPCOMING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED WITH MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE FOR THURSDAY, MAY 22, 2014 AT 11:45 A.M. COUNSEL FOR THE GAMESA DEFENDANTS SHALL INITIATE THIS CALL AND ONCE ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, JOIN CHAMBERS IN THE TELECONFERENCE (CHAMBERS PH: 267-299-7790).(lds, )
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER that ORAL ARGUMENT REGARDING GAMESA WIND US, LLC AND TOWERS AND METALLIC STRUCTURES, INC'S MOTION TO COMPEL (ECF #69) WILL BE HELD ON JUNE 4, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM, 7B ON THE 7TH FLOOR, BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.), SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 5/14/2014. 5/15/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER... that NIC MAY FILE THE SECOND AMENDED FOURTH-PARTY COMPLAINT ATTACHED HERETO AS EXHIBIT "A" WITHIN SEVEN DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS STIPULATION. (SEE ECF NO. 76) THE PARTIES FURTHER STIPULATE AND AGREE that THE DEADLINE FOR CTL'S RESPONSE TO SAID FOURTH-PARTY COMPLAINT WILL BE JUNE 2, 2014. (SEE ECF NO. 77).. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 5/13/2014. 5/14/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF(mo, )
May 12, 2014 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by COMPASS TRANSWORLD LOGISTICS, S.A.(SEE PAPER #79 FOR PDF)(md)
May 12, 2014 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JAMES C. WINTON on behalf of COMPASS TRANSWORLD LOGISTICS, S.A.(WINTON, JAMES)
May 12, 2014 Filing 78 ANSWER to #13 Second Amended Complaint, with CROSSCLAIM against MS REED, INC., and NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL S.L., by COMPASS TRANSWORLD LOGISTICS, S.A., Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(WINTON, JAMES) Modified on 5/13/2014 (md).
May 12, 2014 Filing 77 ANSWER to #76 Second Amended Fourth Party Complaint, with CROSSCLAIM against MS REED, INC., and COUNTERCLAIM against NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL S.L., by COMPASS TRANSWORLD LOGISTICS, S.A., Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(WINTON, JAMES) Modified on 5/13/2014 (md).
May 9, 2014 Filing 76 THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL'S SECOND AMENDED FOURTH PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST COMPASS TRANSWORLD LOGISTICS, S.A.. Certificate of Service, Exhibits. (ems)
May 8, 2014 Filing 75 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL S.L.. COMPASS TRANSWORLD LOGISTICS, S.A. waiver sent on 3/4/2014, answer due 6/2/2014. (DJUPMAN, DEBRA)
May 8, 2014 Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion re #69 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Discovery and Declaration of J.C. Winton filed by GAMESA WIND US, LLC. (WINTON, JAMES)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER - UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS' GAMESA WIND US, LLC AND TOWERS AND METALLIC STRUCTURES, INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF FOR FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND INTERROGATORIES IS HEREBY GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 5/7/2014.5/8/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
May 6, 2014 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by GAMESA WIND US, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave, #2 Exhibit A, Proposed Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Leave)(WINTON, JAMES)
May 5, 2014 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of the Gamesa Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Compel Further Responses to Discovery filed by GAMESA WIND US, LLC, Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service, Certificate of Conference. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit A--Proposed Brief and Declaration of JCWinton, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Leave)(WINTON, JAMES) Modified on 5/6/2014 (md). (FILED IN ERROR BY COUNSEL, RE-FILED CORRECTLY AS DOC. NO. #72 ) Modified on 5/6/2014 (amas).
April 30, 2014 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re #69 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Discovery filed by OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Motion)(WANCHOO, RAHUL)
April 16, 2014 Filing 69 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Discovery filed by GAMESA WIND US, LLC.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, Declaration, Certificate of Conference, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion)(WINTON, JAMES)
April 2, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE of Hearing:FOLLOWUP TELEPHONE CONFERENCE re: settlement matters is scheduled in the above-captioned matter with Magistrate Judge David R. Strawbridge for 6/10/2014 at 4:30 p.m. Counsel for the Gamesa Defendants shall initiate this call and once all counsel are on the line, join Chambers in the teleconference (Chambers ph: 267-299-7790). (lds, )
April 1, 2014 Filing 67 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE: Telephone Conference held on 3/31/14 (dp, )
March 13, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE of Hearing: FOLLOWUP TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT MATTERS HAS BEEN RE-SET FOR 3/31/2014 04:45 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE (THE DATE OF MARCH 24 NOW POSES A CONFLICT ON COURT'S SCHEDULE). COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THIS CALL AND ONCE ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, TO THEN JOIN CHAMBERS INTO THE CALL (PH: 267-299-7790).(lds, )
February 27, 2014 Filing 65 ANSWER to #59 Answer to Crossclaim, of Gamesa Wind US, LLC and Towers and Metallic Structures, Inc., by NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL S.L., Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(DJUPMAN, DEBRA) Modified on 2/28/2014 (md).
February 27, 2014 Filing 64 ANSWER to Third-Party Defendant North Iberian Control, S.L.'s Counterclaim, as to #56 ANSWER to #18 Third Party Complaint with Crossclaim and Counterclaim, by MS REED INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC., Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service. (KALMAN, LEV) Modified on 2/28/2014 (md).
February 24, 2014 Filing 63 NOTICE of Hearing:FOLLOWUP TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT MATTERS IS SET FOR 3/24/2014 04:45 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THIS CALL AND ONCE ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, IS THEN TO JOIN CHAMBERS INTO THE CALL (PH: 267-299-7790).(lds, )
February 20, 2014 Filing 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE: Telephone Conference (re settlement) held on 2/19/2014 (amas)
February 4, 2014 Filing 61 Operadora Maritima De Graneles, S.A. ANSWER to #56 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim, by OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A., Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(WANCHOO, RAHUL) Modified on 2/5/2014 (md).
February 3, 2014 1 Summons Issued as to COMPASS TRANSWORLD LOGISTICS, S.A.. Forwarded To: THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT, FOURTH PARTY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 2/4/2014 (amas)
February 3, 2014 Filing 60 THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL'S AMENDED FOURTH PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST COMPASS TRANSWORLD LOGISTICS, S.A., FILED BY NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL S.L. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(amas)
February 3, 2014 Filing 59 ANSWER by Gamesa Wind US, LLC and Towers and Metallic Structures, Inc., to #56 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim, of North Iberian Control S.L., and CROSSCLAIM of Gamesa Wind US, LLC and Towers and Metallic Structures, Inc. against NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL S.L., by GAMESA WIND US, LLC, with Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(WINTON, JAMES) Modified on 2/4/2014 (md).
January 31, 2014 2 Summons Issued as to BBC CHARTERING GMBH, COMPASS TRANSWORLD LOGISTICS, S.A. Forwarded To: THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT, FOURTH PARTY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 1/31/2014 (amas)
January 31, 2014 Filing 58 THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL'S FOURTH PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST BBC CHARTERING GMBH AND COMPASS TRANSWORLD LOGISTICS, S.A., FILED BY NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL S.L. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(amas)
January 28, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE by GAMESA WIND US, LLC of Substitution of Counsel. Appearance of GARY LEVIN and LESLEY GROSSBERG, and Withdrawal of THEODORE KOBUS, with Certificate of Service. (GROSSBERG, LESLEY) Modified on 1/29/2014 (md).
January 17, 2014 Filing 56 ANSWER to #18 Third Party Complaint of MS Reed Industrial Services Inc., CROSSCLAIM For Indemnity/Contribution against GAMESA WIND US, LLC, OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A., COUNTERCLAIM for Contribution against MS REED INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC. by NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL S.L..(DJUPMAN, DEBRA)
December 19, 2013 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE: Telephone Conference (re: settlement) held on 12/19/2013. (ems)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER OF MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION (ECF NO. 53) that THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL S.L.'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT OF M.S. REED INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC. (ECF NO. 32) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 12/19/2013. 12/19/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
December 19, 2013 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 12/19/2013. 12/19/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
December 19, 2013 Filing 52 NOTICE of Hearing:FOLLOWUP TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT MATTERS IS SCHEDULED FOR 2/19/2014 04:30 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THIS CALL AND ONCE ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, TO THEN JOIN CHAMBERS INTO THE CALL (PH: 267-299-7790).(lds, )
October 29, 2013 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/18/2013 before Judge ANITA B. BRODY. Court Reporter: JAMES F.G. SCHEIDT. (amas)
October 2, 2013 Filing 50 NOTICE of Hearing:TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT MATTERS/POSSIBLY SCHEDULING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SET FOR 12/19/2013 09:15 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THIS CALL AND ONCE ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, TO JOIN CHAMBERS INTO THE CALL (CHAMBERS PH: 267-299-7790).(lds, )
September 25, 2013 Filing 49 Statement Rule 7.1 Statement with Certificate of Service by NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL S.L.. (MCCLURE, SHANNON)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SCHEDULING ORDER that ALL DISCOVERY DUE BY 9/1/2014; PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT REORTS DUE AUGUST 4, 2014; DEFENDANT'S REPORTS DUE AUGUST 18, 2014; DEPOSITIONS OF ALL EXPERTS TO BE COMPLETED BY SEPTEMBER 1, 2013 AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE SEPTEMBER 15, 2014..... SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 9/19/2013. 9/24/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
September 19, 2013 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY: Rule 16 Conference held on 9/18/2013 Court Reporter: JAMES F.G. SCHEIDT. (amas)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER that THE APPLICATION OF ERIKA J. LINDBERG, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 9/18/2013. 9/19/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF..(mo, ) COPY OF CM/ECF APPLICATION FORWARDED TO COUNSEL. Modified on 9/20/2013 (amas).
September 18, 2013 Filing 45 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ERIKA J. LINDBERG, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF GAMESA WIND US, LLC. SPONSER STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, PROPOSED ORDER. ($40.00 FILING FEE RECEIVED, RECEIPT #088572)(amas)
September 16, 2013 Filing 44 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Erika J. Lindberg filed by GAMESA WIND US, LLC.Application, Sponsor's STatement, Motion and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(WINTON, JAMES) ($40.00 FILING FEE RECEIVED, RECEIPT #088547) Modified on 9/18/2013 (amas).
September 12, 2013 Filing 43 Discovery Plan by All Parties.(WANCHOO, RAHUL)
September 11, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/18/2013 10:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY. (amas)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that THE AGREED MOTION TO RESET RULE 16 CONFERENCE (DOC. #41) IS GRANTED. THE RULE 16 CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 16, 2013 IS CANCELED AND RESCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 18, 2013 AT 10:00 A.M.. THE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN CHAMBERS, ROOM 7613 ON THE 7TH FLOOR OF THE U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET ST., PHILADELPHIA, PA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 9/5/2013. 9/9/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
September 4, 2013 Filing 41 Joint MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference filed by GAMESA WIND US, LLC..(WINTON, JAMES)
August 29, 2013 Filing 40 NOTICE of Hearing:A RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON SEPTEMBER 16, 2013 AT 10:00 A.M., IN JUDGE CHAMBERS, ROOM 7613 ON THE 7TH FLOOR, BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.8/29/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES SENT VIA ECF.(mo, )
August 26, 2013 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Support re #32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for Third Party Complaint with Certificate of Service filed by NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL S.L.. (MCCLURE, SHANNON)
August 21, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE of Change of Address by JAMES C. WINTON(WINTON, JAMES)
August 16, 2013 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for Third Party Complaint Opposition of Third-Party Plaintiff M.S. Reed Industrial Services, Inc. to the Motion of Third-Party Defendant North Iberian Control S.L. to Dismiss Third Party Complaint, with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by MS REED INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order Form of Order)(MOLLER, JEFFREY)
August 16, 2013 Filing 36 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GAMESA WIND US, LLC As To Third-Party Defendant Compass Transworld Logistics(WINTON, JAMES)
August 13, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by LEV KALMAN on behalf of MS REED INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC. with Certificate of Service(KALMAN, LEV)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE FOR M.S. REED TO FILE A RESPONSE TO NIC'S MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 8/16/13.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/9/13. (EMERGENCY JUDGE FOR JUDGE BRODY) 8/12/13 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ldb, )
July 26, 2013 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Agent of Santander Courts, Espana re: served Third Party Complaint and Summons upon Pedro Cavada Saint-Tripaga by personal on 05/23/2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MOLLER, JEFFREY)
July 26, 2013 Filing 32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for Third Party Complaint filed by NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL S.L..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum)(MCCLURE, SHANNON)
June 24, 2013 1 Summons Issued as to COMPASS TRANSWORLD LOGISTICS. Forwarded To: COUNSEL OF DEFENDANT AND THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF, GAMESA WIND US, LLC. on 6/25/2013. (amas)
June 24, 2013 Filing 31 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT GAMESA WIND US, LLC, AGAINST COMPASS TRANSWORLD LOGISTICS.(amas)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that GAMESA WIND US, LLC AND TOWERS AND METALLIC STRUCTURES, INC.'S RULE 19(a) MOTION TO JOIN A REQUIRED PARTY OR, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 20) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS FOLLOWS:.... THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 14(a) IS GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED. GAMESA WIND US, LLC MAY FILE A THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST CTL ON OR BEFORE JUNE 24, 2013.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 6/5/2013.6/6/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
April 15, 2013 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION for Joinder of Compass Transworld Logistics as a Defendant filed by OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ricardo Rubio, #2 Exhibit "A")(WANCHOO, RAHUL)
April 4, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #20 MOTION for Joinder of Compass Transworld Logistics as a Defendant. SUR-REPLY DUE BY 4/15/2013. (mo, )
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY (ECF NO. 27) IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF MAY FILE A SUR-REPLY ON OR BEFORE APRIL 15, 2013.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 4/4/2013.4/4/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
April 3, 2013 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File A Sur-Reply filed by OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(JOHNSON, JAMES)
April 2, 2013 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION for Joinder of Compass Transworld Logistics as a Defendant filed by GAMESA WIND US, LLC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (mo, ) Modified on 4/2/2013 (mo, ).
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER - UPON DUE CONSIDERATION OF THE DEFENDANTS', GAMESA WIND US, LLC AND TOWERS AND METALLIC STRUCTURES, INC., MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED THAT: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' RULE 19(a) MOTION TO JOIN A REQUIRED PARTY, OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT IS HEREBY GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 4/2/2013.4/2/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
March 28, 2013 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Rule 19(a) Motion to Join a Required Party filed by GAMESA WIND US, LLC.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Leave, #2 Brief Reply Brief, #3 Declaration Declaration of Michelle Benavides, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Michelle Benavides)(WINTON, JAMES)
March 15, 2013 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION for Joinder of Compass Transworld Logistics as a Defendant filed by OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, #2 Declaration of Rahul Wanchoo, #3 Exhibit "A", #4 Exhibit "B", #5 Exhibit "C", #6 Text of Proposed Order that CTL is Not a Required Party)(WANCHOO, RAHUL)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER... that THE TIME FOR PLAINTIFF, OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A., TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT GAMESA WIND US, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS SHALL BE EXTENDED FROM MARCH 1, 2013 TO MARCH 15, 2013.... APPROVED BY THE COURT:. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 2/27/2013. 2/27/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
February 25, 2013 Filing 21 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT GAMESA WIND US, LLC D/B/A TOWERS AND METALLIC STRUCTURES INC.'S RULE 19(a) MOTION TO JOIN AN ADDITIONAL PARTY OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT by OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(JOHNSON, JAMES) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)Modified on 2/26/2013 (nd, ).
February 14, 2013 Filing 20 MOTION for Joinder of Compass Transworld Logistics as a Defendant filed by GAMESA WIND US, LLC.Memorandum, Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of James C. Winton, #3 Exhibit "A", #4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Joinder of CTL by Plaintiff, #5 Text of Proposed Order Alternative Order Granting Leave to File Third-Party Complaint)(WINTON, JAMES)
January 15, 2013 Filing 19 ANSWER to #15 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim with Affirmative Defenses Answer to Cross-Claim of MS Reed by Gamesa Wind US, LLC and Towers and Metallic Structures, Inc. by GAMESA WIND US, LLC. Certificate of Service.(WINTON, JAMES) Modified on 1/16/2013 (ahf, ).
January 2, 2013 2 Summons Issued as to NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL S.L.. Forwarded To: THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 1/2/2013 (amas)
January 2, 2013 Filing 18 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT OF M.S. REED INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC. AGAINST NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL S.L. (amas)
December 28, 2012 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MS REED INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC..(MOLLER, JEFFREY)
December 28, 2012 Filing 16 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MS REED INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC.. Certificate of Service.(MOLLER, JEFFREY) Modified on 12/31/2012 (ahf, ).
December 24, 2012 Filing 15 M.S. Reed Industrial Services, Inc.'s ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint of Operadora Maritima deGraneles, S.A., Second CROSSCLAIM against GAMESA WIND US, LLC by MS REED, INC..(MOLLER, JEFFREY)
December 20, 2012 Filing 14 Gamesa Wind US, LLC and Towers and Metallic Structures, Inc. ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint and, CROSSCLAIM of Gamesa Wind US LLC and Towers and Metallic Structures, Inc. against MS REED INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.. by GAMESA WIND US, LLC.(WINTON, JAMES) Modified on 12/21/2012 (ahf, ).
December 5, 2012 1 Summons Issued as to MS REED, INC.. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 12/5/2012 (amas)
December 5, 2012 Filing 13 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against GAMESA WIND US, LLC, MS REED, INC., filed by OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A..(amas)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER that DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) IS WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE; AND PLAINTIFF WILL FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH FURTHER SPECIFICITY PURSUANT TO RULE 8 OF THE F.R.CIV.P. AND THAT COMPLAINT SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 7, 2012.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 11/19/2012. 11/20/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
November 20, 2012 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A.. MS REED INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC. waiver sent on 10/19/2012, answer due 12/18/2012. (JOHNSON, JAMES)
November 16, 2012 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Gamea Wind US, LLC and Towers and Metallic Structures, Inc., Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Amended Complaint By Allowing Dismissal Without Prejudice of the Motion and to Allow Plaintiff to Re-File an Amended Complaint with More Specificity by OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A.. (JOHNSON, JAMES). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). Modified on 11/19/2012 (ahf, ).
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that THE APPLICATION OF JAMES C. WINTON, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 11/14/2012. 11/15/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
November 9, 2012 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of James C. Winton filed by GAMESA WIND US, LLC. Sponsor's Statement, Certificate of Service.(KOBUS, THEODORE) Modified on 11/13/2012 (lisad, ).(Filing Fee Paid 11/13/2012, $40, receipt no. 072232) Modified on 11/14/2012 (kp, ).
November 9, 2012 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Gamea Wind US, LLC and Towers and Metallic Structures, Inc., Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Amended Complaint filed by GAMESA WIND US, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Amended Complaint)(KOBUS, THEODORE)
November 9, 2012 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Gamesa Techonology Corporation, Inc. with Certificate of Service by GAMESA WIND US, LLC.(KOBUS, THEODORE)
October 9, 2012 Summons Issued as to GAMESA WIND US, LLC, MS REED INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC.. Forwarded To: counsel on 10/9/12 (gn, )
October 9, 2012 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defts' GAMESA WIND US, LLC, MS REED INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC., filed by OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A.(gn, )
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that THE APPLICATION OF RAHUL WANCHOO, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 9/17/2012. 9/19/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )
September 12, 2012 Filing 3 APPLICATION by OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A. FOR PRO HAC VICE OF RAHUL WANCHOO, ESQ., STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERICE. ($40.00 FILFING FEE PAID ON 9/12/12, RECEIPT #069308) (gn, )
August 23, 2012 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Candela Shipping S.L., Mr. Ignacio Baquerizo, and Berge Shipbrokers S.A. by OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A..(rt)
August 23, 2012 Summons Issued as to GAMESA WIND US, LLC, MS REED, INC. Two Forwarded To: Counsel on August 23, 2012 (rt)
August 23, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GAMESA WIND US, LLC, MS REED, INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 068321.), filed by OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A..(rt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A. v. GAMESA WIND US, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS REED, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY STEVEN MOLLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: GAMESA WIND US, LLC
Represented By: THEODORE J. KOBUS, III
Represented By: JAMES C. WINTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: MS REED INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY STEVEN MOLLER
Represented By: LEV KALMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: NORTH IBERIAN CONTROL S.L.
Represented By: DEBRA DJUPMAN WARRING
Represented By: SHANNON ELISE MCCLURE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: COMPASS TRANSWORLD LOGISTICS, S.A.
Represented By: JAMES C. WINTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: COMPASS TRANSWORLD LOGISTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BBC CHARTERING GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OPERADORA MARITIMA DE GRANELES, S.A.
Represented By: JAMES JOHNSON
Represented By: RAHUL WANCHOO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?