COLLINSON v. THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Plaintiff: BRENT COLLINSON
Defendant: THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, CHARLES H. RAMSEY, GROSS, DAVID GRANER, SALVATORE MAIORANO, JOHN MCGRATH, KENNETH TAYLOR, JR., SHAWNIER COLLIER, YOUNG, ANTHONY BURTON, JUAN RAMIREZ and POLICE OFFICERS JOHN DOE NUMBERS 1 THROUGH TEN
Case Number: 2:2012cv06114
Filed: October 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: C. DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 39 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE COURT GRANTS DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, 40 , AS TO PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. T HE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA IS DISMISSED AS A DEFENDANT IN THIS CASE. THE COURT GRANTS DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, 40 , AS TO PLAINTIFF'S SECTION 1983 CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS P.O. SHAWNIER COLLIER, P.O. KENNETH TAYLOR, JR., SGT. JOHN MCGRATH, SGT. ANTHONY BURTON, CPL. YOUNG AND P.O. SALVATORE MAIORANO. THE COURT DENIES DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, 40 , AS TO PLAINTIFF'S SECTION 1983 CLAIMS FOR EXCESSIVE FORCE BY WAY OF BYSTANDER LIABILITY AGAINST DEFE NDANTS P.O. DAVID GRANDER AND LT. GROSS. ALL STATE CLAIMS AGAINST ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS REMAIN PENDING AS DEFENDANTS DID NOT SEEK SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THOSE CLAIMS. ALL SECTION 1983 CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT P.O. JOHN CRICHTON REMAIN PENDING AS DEFENDANTS DID NOT SEEK SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THOSE CLAIMS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/9/15. 6/10/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Main Document 42 replaced on 6/10/2015) (ti, ).
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS TO DISMISS POLICE COMMISSIONER RAMSEY, 19 , PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE 22 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT SAID MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE COURT DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE ALL CLAIMS AGAINST CMMR. RAMSEY IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AND THE CLAIM AGAINST CMMR. RAMSEY IN THIS PERSONAL CAPACITY UNDER COUNT I. THE COURT DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE THE CLAIM AGAINST CMMR. RAMSEY IN THIS PERSONAL CAPACITY UNDER COUNT II AND GRANTS PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND THE AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 1/14/15. 1/15/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 6 , AND ANY RESPONSE THERETO, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED. DEFENDANTS SHALL ANSWER THE COMPLAINT WITHIN THE TIME ALLOWED BY THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 10/18/13. 10/21/13 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLLINSON v. THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENT COLLINSON
Represented By: L. KENNETH CHOTINER
Represented By: STEVEN SCHATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES H. RAMSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID GRANER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALVATORE MAIORANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN MCGRATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH TAYLOR, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAWNIER COLLIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY BURTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUAN RAMIREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICERS JOHN DOE NUMBERS 1 THROUGH TEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?