TAHA v. BENSALEM TOWNSHIP et al
Plaintiff: DARYOUSH TAHA
Defendant: BENSALEM TOWNSHIP, STEVEN MORAN, CHRISTOPHER M. BARRY, SR. and CHING-O-CHANG, LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv06867
Filed: December 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF IS AWARDED DAMAGES AGAINST DEFENDANT MUGSHOTS.COM, LLC AND UNPUBLISH LLC d/b/a MUGSHOTS.COM, LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF $150,000 AND THE CLERK OF COURT IS HEREBY DIRECTED TO TERMINATE THIS CASE AND MARK AS CLOSED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 2/12/21. 2/12/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(JL)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER THAT THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT IS APPROVED AND SHALL BE EFFECTUATED BY THE PARTIES IN ACCORDANCE WITH ITS TERMS; THE MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (ECF NO. 393 ) IS GRANTED; THE MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES, LITIGATION EXPENSES, AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVE SERVICE AWARD (ECF NO. 395 ) IS GRANTED; THIS CASE IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS BUCKS COUNTY PENNSYLVANIA AND BUCKS COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY; AND THE CLERK OF THE COURT SHALL ENTER THIS FINAL JUDGMENT FORTHWITH AND TERMINATE DEFENDANTS BUCKS COUNTY PENNSYLVANIA AND BUCKS COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY FROM THIS CASE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 11/30/2020. 11/30/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nd, )
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR FOR A NEW TRIAL AND MOTION TO ALTER JUDGMENT ARE DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/4/19. 10/4/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED. (JL)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE THE EXPERT REPORT AND PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OF SARAH LAGESON AND RICHARD SUBIA. THE MOTION AS TO LAGESON IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE MOTION AS TO SUBIA IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 4/29/19. 4/29/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED. DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 2/14/19. 2/14/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IS GRANTED. DARYOUSH TAHA IS APPOINTED CLASS REPRESENTATIVE. SEEGER WEISS LLP AND ABRAMSON & DENEBERG P.C. ARE APPOINTED CLASS COUNSEL; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 5/4/16. 5/4/16 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/28/16. 3/28/16 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED TO UNREP.(jl, )
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF CITIZEN INFORMATION ASSOCIATES, LLC FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED AND CIA IS DISMISSED AS A DEFENDANT TO THIS ACTION; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 12/30/15. 12/30/15 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT CITIZEN INFORMATION ASSOCIATES (CIA)'S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 3/25/14. 3/26/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(jl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAHA v. BENSALEM TOWNSHIP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARYOUSH TAHA
Represented By: ALAN E. DENENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENSALEM TOWNSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN MORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER M. BARRY, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHING-O-CHANG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?