SCHWAB v. GOODRICH CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: SCOTT SCHWAB
Defendant: INDUCTOTHERM CORP., MCNEIL & NRM INC., EDWARD R. HART COMPANY, J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES CO., BORG-WARNER CORPORATION, OAKFABCO, INC., M.F. MURDOCK COMPANY, MCCORD GASKET COMPANY, VIACOM, INC., EXXON MOBILE CORPORATION, AQUA-CHEM, INC., SHELDON-DRULLARD REALTY CORP., RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION, AMETEK, INC., RED SEAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, CORHART REFRACTORIES, CRANE COMPANY, BEAZER EAST, INC., AMG INDUSTRIES, INC., GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORP., ADIENCE, INC., JOHN CRANE, INC., MAGNETEK, INC., XEF, INC., FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, SEPCO CORPORATION, CRANE ENVIRONMENTAL, INC., HOLLOW CENTER PACKING CO., TRECO CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC., AKRON GASKET & PACKING ENTERPRISES, INC., PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION, GEORGE V. HAMILTON, INC., 3M COMPANY, F.B. WRIGHT COMPANY OF OHIO, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., OKONITE INCORPORATED, GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO., DANA CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, BELL ASBESTOS MINES, LIMITED, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., UNIVERSAL REFRACTORIES, RTD HALLSTAR, INC., INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, MVS COMPANY, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, OGLEBAY NORTON COMPANY, BORG-WARNER AUTOMOTIVE INC., INDUCTOTHERM INDUSTRIES, EATON CORPORATION, OHIO VALLEY INSULATING COMPANY, INC., FMC CORPORATION, ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, MCMASTER-CARR, LESLIE CONTROLS, INC., AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., ECOF, INC., HARWICK STANDARD DISTRIBUTION CORP., ELECTRIC FURNACE CO., DONALD MCKAY-SMITH COMPANY, ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL CORPORATION, WARREN PUMPS, INC., MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC., ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO., INC., F.B. WRIGHT COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, ROCKBESTOS COMPANY, OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC., MARMOUNT CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, R.T. VANDERBILT COMPANY, INC., GENUINE PARTS COMPANY, GREENE TWEED & COMPANY, A.W. CHESTERTON CO., FOSECO, INC., LINDBERG MPH, TOTH INDUSTRIES, SOUTHERN TALC COMPANY, GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY, CLARK INDUSTRIAL INSULATION COMPANY, COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC., ESTER SOLUTIONS COMPANY, AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION, ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION, ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD., RILEY STOKER CORPORATION, SALEM FURNACE COMPANY, I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC., MCNEIL CORPORATION, TASCO INSULATING COMPANY, GOULDS PUMPS, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, ERICSSON, INC., ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC., MARMON GROUP, INC., HALLSTAR COMPANY, WEIL MCCLAIN DIVISION OF THE MARLEY COMPANY, NOCK REFRACTORIES, EASTERN MAGNESIA TALC COMPANY, THEIM CORPORATION, IMCERA, HERSH PACKING & RUBBER CO., SERVICE PRODUCTS, INC., FORD MOTOR COMPANY, JNO. J. DISCH CO., INSUL INTERNATIONAL INC., ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS, INC., GEORGIA TALC, CO., BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., JOHN DOE and NATIONAL LEAD COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2012cv60000
Filed: January 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING NON-BANKRUPT DEFENDANTS ARE TO BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 41(A) OF THE FRCP: THE HALLSTAR COMPANY, ESTER SOLUTIONS COMPANY AND RTD HALLSTAR, INC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/26/12. 4/27/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.[FDC]
April 25, 2012 Filing 150 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SCOTT SCHWAB (BEVAN, THOMAS)
April 17, 2012 Filing 149 MOTION to Modify the Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Voluntary Dismissal by The Hallstar Company, RTD Hallstar, Inc. and Ester Solutions Company filed by HALLSTAR COMPANY..(MCCRYSTAL, JAMES)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ALL DEFENDANTS IN CIVIL ACTION.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/16/12. 3/20/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
March 19, 2012 Filing 147 Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal by HALLSTAR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (MCCRYSTAL, JAMES)
March 5, 2012 Filing 146 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SCOTT SCHWAB As To ALL DEFENDANTS(BEVAN, THOMAS)
March 5, 2012 Filing 145 Response Answer to Pending and Future Cross Claims of Co Defendants by LINDBERG MPH. (EAGEN, MICHAEL)
February 29, 2012 Filing 144 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HARWICK STANDARD DISTRIBUTION CORP..(REYES, JOHN)
February 27, 2012 Filing 143 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MCNEIL & NRM INC..(REYES, JOHN)
February 23, 2012 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by BASIL A. DISIPIO on behalf of 3M COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(DISIPIO, BASIL)
February 23, 2012 Filing 141 Defendant Ametek, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims Filed By Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by AMETEK, INC..(FEIGI, DIANE)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR JOINDER ARE DISMISSED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 2/21/12. 2/21/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
February 21, 2012 Filing 139 JOINDER of Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC., Certificate of Service.(PATTON, EDWARD) Modified on 2/22/2012 (md).
February 20, 2012 Filing 137 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CRANE COMPANY, CRANE ENVIRONMENTAL, INC..(ZUKOWSKI, MICHAEL)
February 20, 2012 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI on behalf of CRANE COMPANY, CRANE ENVIRONMENTAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(ZUKOWSKI, MICHAEL)
February 18, 2012 Filing 135 JOINDER in Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by AMG INDUSTRIES, INC., Certificate of Service.(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN) Modified on 2/21/2012 (md).
February 18, 2012 Filing 134 JOINDER in Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by GOULDS PUMPS, INC., Certificate of Service.(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN) Modified on 2/21/2012 (md).
February 18, 2012 Filing 133 JOINDER in Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., Certificate of Service.(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN) Modified on 2/21/2012 (md).
February 18, 2012 Filing 132 JOINDER in Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by UNIVERSAL REFRACTORIES, Certificate of Service.(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN) Modified on 2/21/2012 (md).
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT AMG'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN ANSWER INSTANTER IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 2/17/12.2/21/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
February 17, 2012 Filing 131 JOINDER in Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by TASCO INSULATING COMPANY, Certificate of Service.(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN) Modified on 2/21/2012 (md).
February 17, 2012 Filing 130 JOINDER in Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by BEAZER EAST, INC., Certificate of Service.(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN) Modified on 2/21/2012 (md).
February 17, 2012 Filing 129 JOINDER in Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, Certificate of Service.(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN) Modified on 2/21/2012 (md).
February 17, 2012 Filing 128 JOINDER in Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by ADIENCE, INC., Certificate of Service.(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN) Modified on 2/21/2012 (md).
February 17, 2012 Filing 127 JOINDER in Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by THEIM CORPORATION, Certificate of Service.(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN) Modified on 2/21/2012 (md).
February 17, 2012 Filing 126 ANSWER to Complaint and Answer to All Pending and Future Cross-Claims by MCNEIL & NRM INC..(REYES, JOHN)
February 17, 2012 Filing 125 Previously Filed in USDC ND OHIO on January 19, 2012 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Master Consolidated and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by TOTH INDUSTRIES.(SARDINA CARLOZZI, JENNIFER)
February 17, 2012 Filing 124 Defendant Ericsson, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims Filed By Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by ERICSSON, INC..(MITCHELL, WADE)
February 16, 2012 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN SQUIRE BOX on behalf of EXXON MOBILE CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(BOX, SUSAN)
February 16, 2012 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN SQUIRE BOX on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY with Certificate of Service(BOX, SUSAN)
February 16, 2012 Filing 121 Disclosure by AMG INDUSTRIES, INC..(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN)
February 16, 2012 Filing 120 ANSWER to Complaint and Cross-Claims by AMG INDUSTRIES, INC..(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN)
February 16, 2012 Filing 119 MOTION for Leave to File Answer to Complaint & Cross-Claims Instanter filed by AMG INDUSTRIES, INC...(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN)
February 16, 2012 Filing 118 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC..(PATTON, EDWARD)
February 16, 2012 Filing 117 Defendant Armstrong International, Inc.'s ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #15 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #72 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim, #18 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #15 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #72 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim, #18 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #15 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #72 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim, #18 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #15 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #72 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim, #18 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #15 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #72 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim, #18 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC..(PATTON, EDWARD)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT ALL FACT DISCOVERY MUST BE COMPLETED BY 6/14/12. ANY DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS AND MOTIONS TO PRECLUDE EXPERTS MUST BE FILED BY 10/15/12. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 2/14/12. 2/15/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
February 13, 2012 Filing 115 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by BORG-WARNER CORPORATION, EDWARD R. HART COMPANY, GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORP., MCMASTER-CARR, R.T. VANDERBILT COMPANY, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(MANDEL, BRUCE)
February 13, 2012 Filing 114 Response to Pending and Future Cross-Claims of Co-Defendants by MCCORD GASKET COMPANY. (HEALY, JEFFREY)
February 10, 2012 Filing 113 Response in Opposition to Pending and Future Cross-Claims of Co-Defendants by AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION. (ROSS, KAREN)
February 10, 2012 Filing 112 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION.(ROSS, KAREN)
February 10, 2012 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by KAREN E. ROSS on behalf of AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(ROSS, KAREN)
February 10, 2012 Filing 110 RESPONSE to Motion re #42 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by SCOTT SCHWAB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Errata 2)(BEVAN, THOMAS)
February 10, 2012 Filing 109 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by WEIL MCCLAIN DIVISION OF THE MARLEY COMPANY.(HONG, LAURA)
February 10, 2012 Filing 108 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by WARREN PUMPS, INC..(HONG, LAURA)
February 10, 2012 Filing 107 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by ROCKBESTOS COMPANY.(HONG, LAURA)
February 10, 2012 Filing 106 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by MARMON GROUP, INC..(HONG, LAURA)
February 10, 2012 Filing 105 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS, INC..(HONG, LAURA)
February 10, 2012 Filing 104 Separate Answer to Cross-Claims filed by Wheeler Protective Apparel, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint by OKONITE INCORPORATED.(KRAWCZAK, KENNETH)
February 10, 2012 Filing 103 Separate Answer to Cross-Claims filed by Toth Industries, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint by OKONITE INCORPORATED.(KRAWCZAK, KENNETH)
February 10, 2012 Filing 102 Separate Answer to Cross-Claims filed by Crane Environmental, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint by OKONITE INCORPORATED.(KRAWCZAK, KENNETH)
February 10, 2012 Filing 101 Separate Answer to Cross-Claims filed by Crane Co. ANSWER to Complaint by OKONITE INCORPORATED.(KRAWCZAK, KENNETH)
February 10, 2012 Filing 100 ANSWER to Complaint by WEIL MCCLAIN DIVISION OF THE MARLEY COMPANY.(HONG, LAURA)
February 10, 2012 Filing 99 ANSWER to Complaint by WARREN PUMPS, INC..(HONG, LAURA)
February 10, 2012 Filing 98 ANSWER to Complaint by ROCKBESTOS COMPANY.(HONG, LAURA)
February 10, 2012 Filing 97 ANSWER to Complaint by MARMON GROUP, INC..(HONG, LAURA)
February 10, 2012 Filing 96 ANSWER to Complaint by ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS, INC..(HONG, LAURA)
February 10, 2012 Filing 95 ANSWER to Complaint and Answer to All Pending and Future Cross-Claims by HARWICK STANDARD DISTRIBUTION CORP..(REYES, JOHN)
February 9, 2012 Filing 94 CLAIM Answer to Co-Defendants' Current and Future Cross-Claims by JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (KOTTHA, ARUN)
February 9, 2012 Filing 93 CLAIM Answer to Co-Defendants' Current and Future Cross-Claims by PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION. (KOTTHA, ARUN)
February 8, 2012 Filing 92 Response in Opposition to Pending and Future Cross-Claims of Co-Defendants by INDUCTOTHERM CORP.. (LEWIS, NICOLE)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER THAT THE COURT REFERS THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTION PENDING IN MDL 875 TO THE HON. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY FOR PROCEEDINGS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/3/12. 2/6/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
February 6, 2012 Filing 90 JOINDER in Defendant The HallStar Company's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by A.W. CHESTERTON CO., AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION, INDUCTOTHERM CORP., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MCCORD GASKET COMPANY, PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION, ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(LEWIS, NICOLE) Modified on 2/13/2012 (lisad, ).
February 6, 2012 Filing 89 ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #15 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #18 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #72 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim , ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #15 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #18 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #72 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim , ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #15 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #18 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #72 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim , ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #15 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #18 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #72 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim and Answer to All Future Crossclaims by FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION.(EVANCHAN, NICHOLAS)
February 6, 2012 Filing 88 Answer of Defendant RTD Hallstar Inc to the Cross-Claims Asserted by Any Other Co-Defendants ANSWER to Complaint by RTD HALLSTAR, INC..(MCCRYSTAL, JAMES)
February 6, 2012 Filing 87 Answer of Defendant Ester Solutions Company to the Cross-Claims Asserted by any Other Co-Defendants ANSWER to Complaint by ESTER SOLUTIONS COMPANY.(MCCRYSTAL, JAMES)
February 6, 2012 Filing 86 Answer of Defendant The Hallstar Company to Cross-Claims Asserted by Any Other Co-Defendants ANSWER to Complaint by HALLSTAR COMPANY.(MCCRYSTAL, JAMES)
February 3, 2012 Filing 85 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with certificate of service by LINDBERG MPH.(EAGEN, MICHAEL)
February 2, 2012 Filing 84 Defendant Ametek, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims Filed By Defendant Wheeler Protective Apparel, Inc. and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by AMETEK, INC..(FEIGI, DIANE)
February 2, 2012 Filing 83 Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Successor By Merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims Filed By Defendant Wheeler Protective Apparel, Inc. and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by BUFFALO PUMPS, INC..(PAPP, EDWARD)
February 2, 2012 Filing 82 Defendant I.U. North America, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims Filed By Defendant Wheeler Protective Apparel, Inc. and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC..(PAPP, EDWARD)
February 2, 2012 Filing 81 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC..(MLINAC, STEPHEN)
February 2, 2012 Filing 80 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION.(MLINAC, STEPHEN)
February 2, 2012 Filing 79 Defendant Ericsson, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims Filed By Defendant Wheeler Protective Apparel, Inc. and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by ERICSSON, INC..(MITCHELL, WADE)
February 2, 2012 Filing 78 Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Successor By Merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims Filed By Defendant Toth Industries, Inc. and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by BUFFALO PUMPS, INC..(PAPP, EDWARD)
February 2, 2012 Filing 77 Defendant I.U. North America, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims Filed By Defendant Toth Industries, Inc. and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC..(PAPP, EDWARD)
January 30, 2012 Filing 76 Response Defendant The Hallstar Company to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by HALLSTAR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (MCCRYSTAL, JAMES)
January 30, 2012 Filing 75 Defendant Ericsson, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims Filed by Defendant Toth Industries, Inc. and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by ERICSSON, INC..(MITCHELL, WADE)
January 30, 2012 Filing 74 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SCOTT SCHWAB As To Nock Refractories(BEVAN, THOMAS)
January 30, 2012 Filing 73 Defendant Ametek, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims Filed by Defendant Toth Industries, Inc. and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by AMETEK, INC..(FEIGI, DIANE)
January 27, 2012 Filing 72 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants by WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL CORPORATION.(DANOS, JOSHUA)
January 27, 2012 Filing 71 ANSWER to Complaint by MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC..(RIESTER, JENNIFER)
January 26, 2012 Filing 70 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL CORPORATION.(DANOS, JOSHUA)
January 26, 2012 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA WESLEY DANOS on behalf of WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(DANOS, JOSHUA)
January 26, 2012 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD S. RANIERI on behalf of MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC. (RANIERI, RICHARD)
January 25, 2012 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC S. DANIEL on behalf of EASTERN MAGNESIA TALC COMPANY with Certificate of Service(DANIEL, ERIC)
January 25, 2012 Filing 66 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by EASTERN MAGNESIA TALC COMPANY.(DESANTIS, FRANK)
January 25, 2012 Filing 65 ANSWER to Complaint by EASTERN MAGNESIA TALC COMPANY.(DESANTIS, FRANK)
January 25, 2012 Filing 64 NOTICE by EASTERN MAGNESIA TALC COMPANY Stipulated Extension of Time to Answer, Plead or Otherwise Move (DESANTIS, FRANK)
January 25, 2012 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK R. DESANTIS on behalf of EASTERN MAGNESIA TALC COMPANY with Certificate of Service(DESANTIS, FRANK)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER THAT THE COURT REFERS THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTION PENDING IN MDL 875 TO THE HON. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY FOR PROCEEDINGS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/24/12. 1/25/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 24, 2012 Filing 61 NOTICE by ESTER SOLUTIONS COMPANY Corporate Disclosure Statement (MCCRYSTAL, JAMES)
January 24, 2012 Filing 60 ANSWER to Complaint together with of Defendant Ester Solutions Company Answer by ESTER SOLUTIONS COMPANY.(MCCRYSTAL, JAMES)
January 23, 2012 Filing 59 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GENUINE PARTS COMPANY.(WOLF, THOMAS)
January 23, 2012 Filing 58 Defendant Genuine Parts Company's ANSWER to Complaint and Answer to Any Counterclaims by GENUINE PARTS COMPANY.(WOLF, THOMAS)
January 23, 2012 Filing 57 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC...(MARTILLOTTA, SAMUEL)
January 23, 2012 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS L. EVANCHAN on behalf of FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(EVANCHAN, NICHOLAS)
January 20, 2012 Filing 55 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SHELDON-DRULLARD REALTY CORP.(fdc)
January 20, 2012 Filing 54 Answer of Defendant Sheldon-Drullard Realty Corp. to Plaintiff's Complaint and Answer of Defendant Sheldon-Drullard Realty Corp. to all Cross-Claims, Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand, Certificate of Service.(fdc)
January 20, 2012 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by DEREK M. BRONDOU on behalf of HARPER INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, Certificate of Service. (fdc)
January 20, 2012 Filing 52 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by OKONITE INCORPORATED.(KRAWCZAK, KENNETH)
January 20, 2012 Filing 51 Defendant I.U. North America, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims Filed by Defendant Crane Co. and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC..(PAPP, EDWARD)
January 20, 2012 Filing 50 Defendant's The Okonite Company's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by OKONITE INCORPORATED.(KRAWCZAK, KENNETH)
January 20, 2012 Filing 49 Defendant I.U. North America, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims Filed by Defendant Crane Environmental, Inc. and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC..(PAPP, EDWARD)
January 20, 2012 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH F. KRAWCZAK on behalf of OKONITE INCORPORATED with Certificate of Service(KRAWCZAK, KENNETH)
January 20, 2012 Filing 47 Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Successor By Merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims Filed by Defendant Crane Co. and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by BUFFALO PUMPS, INC..(PAPP, EDWARD)
January 20, 2012 Filing 46 Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Successor By Merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims Filed by Defendant Crane Environmental, Inc. and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by BUFFALO PUMPS, INC..(PAPP, EDWARD)
January 20, 2012 Filing 45 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CLARK INDUSTRIAL INSULATION COMPANY.(REBER, W.)
January 19, 2012 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint and Answer to Cross-Claims by ADIENCE, INC..(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN)
January 19, 2012 Filing 43 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SOUTHERN TALC COMPANY.(fdc)
January 19, 2012 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by A.W. CHESTERTON CO., AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION, INDUCTOTHERM CORP., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MCCORD GASKET COMPANY, PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION, ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(LEWIS, NICOLE)
January 19, 2012 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint by SOUTHERN TALC COMPANY, Certificate of Service.(fdc)
January 19, 2012 Filing 40 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by GOULDS PUMPS, INC..(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN)
January 19, 2012 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint and Answer to Cross-Claims by GOULDS PUMPS, INC..(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN)
January 19, 2012 Filing 38 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by THEIM CORPORATION.(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN)
January 19, 2012 Filing 37 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by UNIVERSAL REFRACTORIES.(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN)
January 19, 2012 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint and Answer to Cross-Claims by THEIM CORPORATION.(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN)
January 19, 2012 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint and Answer to Cross-Claims by UNIVERSAL REFRACTORIES.(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN)
January 19, 2012 Filing 34 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN)
January 19, 2012 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint and Answer to Cross-Claims by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN)
January 19, 2012 Filing 32 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY.(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN)
January 19, 2012 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint and Answer to Cross-Claims by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY.(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN)
January 19, 2012 Filing 30 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by BEAZER EAST, INC..(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN)
January 19, 2012 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint and Answer to Cross-Claims by BEAZER EAST, INC..(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN)
January 19, 2012 Filing 28 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by TASCO INSULATING COMPANY.(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN)
January 19, 2012 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint together with to Complaint and Cross-Claims by TASCO INSULATING COMPANY.(ALEXANDERSEN, KEVIN)
January 19, 2012 Filing 26 ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #15 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #18 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #15 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #18 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #15 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #18 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by CLARK INDUSTRIAL INSULATION COMPANY.(REBER, W.)
January 19, 2012 Filing 25 Defendant Ametek, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims Filed By Defendant Crane Environmental, Inc. and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by AMETEK, INC..(FEIGI, DIANE)
January 19, 2012 Filing 24 Defendant Ametek, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims Filed By Defendant Crane Co. and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by AMETEK, INC..(FEIGI, DIANE)
January 19, 2012 Filing 23 Defendant Ericsson, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims Filed by Defendant Crane Environmental, Inc. and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by ERICSSON, INC..(MITCHELL, WADE)
January 19, 2012 Filing 22 Defendant Ericsson, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims Filed by Defendant Crane Co. and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by ERICSSON, INC..(MITCHELL, WADE)
January 18, 2012 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by OAKFABCO, INC..(RICHERT, RONALD)
January 18, 2012 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by OAKFABCO, INC..(RICHERT, RONALD)
January 18, 2012 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD J. RICHERT on behalf of OAKFABCO, INC. with Certificate of Service(RICHERT, RONALD)
January 18, 2012 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GEORGE V. HAMILTON, INC..(RICHERT, RONALD)
January 18, 2012 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GEORGE V. HAMILTON, INC..(RICHERT, RONALD)
January 18, 2012 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD J. RICHERT on behalf of GEORGE V. HAMILTON, INC. with Certificate of Service(RICHERT, RONALD)
January 18, 2012 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC..(RICHERT, RONALD)
January 18, 2012 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC..(RICHERT, RONALD)
January 18, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD J. RICHERT on behalf of HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. with Certificate of Service(RICHERT, RONALD)
January 17, 2012 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by ELECTRIC FURNACE CO..(REBER, W.)
January 16, 2012 Filing 11 Defendant, Cooper Industries, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint together with an Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC..(MLINAC, STEPHEN)
January 16, 2012 Filing 10 Defendant, Allied Glove Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint together with and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION.(MLINAC, STEPHEN)
January 16, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE by SCOTT SCHWAB of filing of Motion to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BEVAN, THOMAS)
January 13, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON WAYNE RUBIN on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (RUBIN, JASON)
January 13, 2012 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by EATON CORPORATION.(RUBIN, JASON)
January 12, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN R. MLINAC on behalf of COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(MLINAC, STEPHEN)
January 12, 2012 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN R. MLINAC on behalf of ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(MLINAC, STEPHEN)
January 12, 2012 Filing 1 ANSWER to Complaint by TRECO CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC..(SCHUSTER, RICHARD)
January 10, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL (pod, )
January 10, 2012 Filing 7 AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONS TO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES, DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (pod, )
January 10, 2012 Filing 6 TRANSFER ORDER NO. 1146 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASES FROM THE U.S.D.C. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (pod, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHWAB v. GOODRICH CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUCTOTHERM CORP.
Represented By: NICOLE B. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCNEIL & NRM INC.
Represented By: JOHN LEE REYES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD R. HART COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES N. KLINE
Represented By: BRUCE P. MANDEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORG-WARNER CORPORATION
Represented By: JAMES N. KLINE
Represented By: BRUCE P. MANDEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OAKFABCO, INC.
Represented By: RONALD J. RICHERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.F. MURDOCK COMPANY
Represented By: KEVIN O. KADLEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCCORD GASKET COMPANY
Represented By: JEFFREY M. WHITESELL
Represented By: JEFFREY A. HEALY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM, INC.
Represented By: REGINALD S. KRAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXXON MOBILE CORPORATION
Represented By: BRAD A RIMMEL
Represented By: SUSAN SQUIRE BOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AQUA-CHEM, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY W. RUPLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELDON-DRULLARD REALTY CORP.
Represented By: DEREK M. BRONDOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMETEK, INC.
Represented By: DIANE L. FEIGI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RED SEAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN A. KRISTAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORHART REFRACTORIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEAZER EAST, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN C. ALEXANDERSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMG INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN C. ALEXANDERSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORP.
Represented By: BRUCE P. MANDEL
Represented By: JAMES N. KLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADIENCE, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN C. ALEXANDERSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN H. DANIELS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAGNETEK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XEF, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION
Represented By: NICHOLAS L. EVANCHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEPCO CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE ENVIRONMENTAL, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLLOW CENTER PACKING CO.
Represented By: KEVIN O. KADLEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRECO CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD D. SCHUSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKRON GASKET & PACKING ENTERPRISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION
Represented By: JENNIFER REBECCA WOLOSCHYN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. CARYL
Represented By: ARUN J. KOTTHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE V. HAMILTON, INC.
Represented By: RONALD J. RICHERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: RICHARD D. SCHUSTER
Represented By: BASIL A. DISIPIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.B. WRIGHT COMPANY OF OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN C. ALEXANDERSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKONITE INCORPORATED
Represented By: KENNETH F. KRAWCZAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO.
Represented By: RICHARD D. SCHUSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA CORPORATION
Represented By: RICHARD D. SCHUSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODRICH CORPORATION
Represented By: RICHARD D. SCHUSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELL ASBESTOS MINES, LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.
Represented By: RICHARD D. SCHUSTER
Represented By: RONALD J. RICHERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSAL REFRACTORIES
Represented By: KEVIN C. ALEXANDERSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTD HALLSTAR, INC.
Represented By: JAMES L. MCCRYSTAL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY
Represented By: KEVIN C. ALEXANDERSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVS COMPANY
Represented By: KEVIN O. KADLEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: JENNIFER REBECCA WOLOSCHYN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. CARYL
Represented By: ARUN J. KOTTHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OGLEBAY NORTON COMPANY
Represented By: STEPHEN H. DANIELS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORG-WARNER AUTOMOTIVE INC.
Represented By: JAMES N. KLINE
Represented By: BRUCE P. MANDEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUCTOTHERM INDUSTRIES
Represented By: NICOLE B. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Represented By: HARRY T. QUICK
Represented By: JASON WAYNE RUBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OHIO VALLEY INSULATING COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: JAMES N. KLINE
Represented By: BRUCE P. MANDEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: JENNIFER REBECCA WOLOSCHYN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCMASTER-CARR
Represented By: JAMES N. KLINE
Represented By: BRUCE P. MANDEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LESLIE CONTROLS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD D. SCHUSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECOF, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARWICK STANDARD DISTRIBUTION CORP.
Represented By: JOHN LEE REYES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTRIC FURNACE CO.
Represented By: W. MATTHEW REBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD MCKAY-SMITH COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: EDWARD O. PATTON
Represented By: SAMUEL R. MARTILLOTTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Represented By: RICHARD D. SCHUSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSHUA WESLEY DANOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: LAURA K. HONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD S. RANIERI
Represented By: JENNIFER A. RIESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO., INC.
Represented By: KEVIN O. KADLEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.B. WRIGHT COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKBESTOS COMPANY
Represented By: LAURA K. HONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC.
Represented By: REGINALD S. KRAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARMOUNT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.T. VANDERBILT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: JAMES N. KLINE
Represented By: BRUCE P. MANDEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENUINE PARTS COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS R. WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENE TWEED & COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON CO.
Represented By: JOHN PATTERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSECO, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD D. SCHUSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDBERG MPH
Represented By: MICHAEL D. EAGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOTH INDUSTRIES
Represented By: JENNIFER SARDINA CARLOZZI
Represented By: THOMAS J. ANTONINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN TALC COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL P. QUINLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK INDUSTRIAL INSULATION COMPANY
Represented By: W. MATTHEW REBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN R. MLINAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESTER SOLUTIONS COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES L. MCCRYSTAL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION
Represented By: E. ROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION
Represented By: STEPHEN R. MLINAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RILEY STOKER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALEM FURNACE COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES N. KLINE
Represented By: BRUCE P. MANDEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: EDWARD D. PAPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCNEIL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TASCO INSULATING COMPANY
Represented By: KEVIN C. ALEXANDERSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN C. ALEXANDERSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: REGINALD S. KRAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERICSSON, INC.
Represented By: WADE A. MITCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARMON GROUP, INC.
Represented By: LAURA K. HONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HALLSTAR COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES L. MCCRYSTAL, JR.
Represented By: MATTHEW L. SNYDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIL MCCLAIN DIVISION OF THE MARLEY COMPANY
Represented By: LAURA K. HONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOCK REFRACTORIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASTERN MAGNESIA TALC COMPANY
Represented By: ERIC S. DANIEL
Represented By: FRANK R. DESANTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THEIM CORPORATION
Represented By: KEVIN C. ALEXANDERSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMCERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERSH PACKING & RUBBER CO.
Represented By: KEVIN O. KADLEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERVICE PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: BRAD A RIMMEL
Represented By: SUSAN SQUIRE BOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JNO. J. DISCH CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSUL INTERNATIONAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS, INC.
Represented By: LAURA K. HONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA TALC, CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: EDWARD D. PAPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL LEAD COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT SCHWAB
Represented By: PATRICK M. WALSH
Represented By: THOMAS W. BEVAN
Represented By: JOSHUA P. GRUNDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?