LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES v. LUNDY LAW, LLP et al
Plaintiff: LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES
Defendant: TITAN OUTDOOR LLC,, L. LEONARD LUNDY and LUNDY LAW, LLP
Petitioner: DLA PIPER LLP (US), DR. DARREN LUGIANO, ESQUIRE CARL W. HITTINGER, DR. STEPHEN CAPUANO, DR. JOHN ROCK, DR. SAMUEL HOLLOWAY, BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP and DR. RONALD MERRIEL
Case Number: 2:2013cv02398
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 213 MULTIMEDIA FILES FOR UNSEALED DOC. NO. #174 ), IN HARD COPY, by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP.(amas)
November 27, 2018 Filing 212 NOTICE by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP of filing unsealed Doc. 174 #174 (Attachments: #1 Brief Response to Motion for Summary Judgment #174 , #2 Brief Memorandum of Law #174 , #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order #174 , #4 Exhibit 1-9 #174 , #5 Exhibit 10-13 #174 , #6 Exhibit 14 part 1 #174 , #7 Exhibit 14 part 2 #174 , #8 Exhibit 14 part 3 #174 , #9 Exhibit 14 part 4 #174 , #10 Exhibit 14 part 5 #174 , #11 Exhibit 14 part 6 #174 , #12 Exhibit 15 #174 , #13 Exhibit 16 part 1 #174 , #14 Exhibit 16 part 2 #174 , #15 Exhibit 16 part 3 #174 , #16 Exhibit 16 part 4 #174 , #17 Exhibit 16 part 5 #174 , #18 Exhibit 16 part 6 #174 , #19 Exhibit 16 part 7 #174 , #20 Exhibit 16 part 8 #174 , #21 Exhibit 16 part 9 #174 , #22 Exhibit 16 part 10 #174 , #23 Exhibit 16 part 11 #174 , #24 Exhibit 17-50 #174 , #25 Exhibit 51-55 #174 , #26 Exhibit 56 part 1 #174 , #27 Exhibit 56 part 2 #174 , #28 Exhibit 56 part 3 #174 , #29 Exhibit 57 part 1 #174 , #30 Exhibit 57 part 2 #174 , #31 Exhibit 58-65 #174 , #32 Exhibit 66-86 #174 )(LEONE, JUDY)
November 27, 2018 Filing 211 NOTICE by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP of Filing Unsealed Documents #144 #175 #176 #181 #183 (Attachments: #1 Brief Doc. 144, Motion for Third Amended Complaint #144 , #2 Brief Doc. 175, Reply Brief ISO Motion for Summary Judgment #175 , #3 Exhibit Doc. 175, Exs. 1-7 #175 , #4 Exhibit Doc. 175, Exs. 8-24 #175 , #5 Exhibit Doc. 175, Exs. 25-26 #175 , #6 Exhibit Doc. 175, Exs. 27-35 #175 , #7 Brief Doc. 176, Sur-Reply Brief #176 , #8 Exhibit Doc. 176, Exhibits #176 , #9 Brief Doc. 181, 183, Reply to Response to Sur-Reply #181 #183 )(LEONE, JUDY)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER THAT THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED. MOVANTS BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP AND CARL W. HITTINGER'S MOTION TO UNSEAL (DOC. NO. #199 ) IS GRANTED. PARTIES ARE ORDERED TO FILE ON THE DOCKET UNSEALED VERSIONS OF DOC NOS. #144 , #174 , #175 , #176 , #181 , AND #183 BY 11/21/2018, SUBJECT TO THE REDACTIONS AGREED TO BY THE PARTIES PREVIOUSLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 11/7/2018. 11/8/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Main Document 210 replaced on 11/8/2018) (amas, ).
September 3, 2018 Filing 209 REPLY to Response to Motion re #169 MOTION for Summary Judgment Redacted filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP. (MOSSMAN, ELLEN)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO UNSEAL DOC. NO. 57 AND DOC. NOS. #169 AND #169 -1. WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THIS ORDER, LUNDY LAW SHALL FILE ON THE PUBLIC DOCKET A COPY OF DOC. NO. #175 AS REDACTED PER AGREEMENT BY THE PARTIES AND WITHOUT ACCOMPANYING EXHIBITS. THE PARTIES DISPUTE WITH RESPECT TO THE UNSEALING OF THE FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS OUTLINED HEREIN, IS REFERRED TO SPECIAL DISCOVERY MASTER DAVID A. SONENSHEIN, ESQ. FOR RESOLUTION AND RECOMMENDATION OF AN APPROPRIATE ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/23/2018. 8/24/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
July 31, 2018 Filing 207 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by LYDIA M. FURST on behalf of DLA PIPER LLP (US)(FURST, LYDIA)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL UNSEAL THE ABOVE-REFERENCED DOCUMENTS #10 , #104 EXHIBIT A OF DOCUMENT #96 AND THE #203 TRANSCRIPT OF THE 2/4/2016 HEARING BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOOORE WELLS IN RESPONSE TO THIS COURT'S ORDER DATED 7/9/2018) AND PLACE THEM ON THE PUBLIC DOCKET. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/27/2018. 7/30/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR MOVANTS SHALL NOT REVIEW THE DOCUMENTS REFERENCED IN THE LETTER AND SHALL EITHER RETURN OR DESTROY SAID DOCUMENTS FORTHWITH. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/16/2018. 7/16/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MAIL UNREDACTED COPIES OF DOC. NOS. #100 AND #104 , EXHIBIT A OF DOCUMENT NO. #96 , AND THE TRANSCRIPT OF THE 2/4/2016 HEARING BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE WELLS TO DEFENDANTS COUNSEL. THESE DOCUMENTS SHALL BE UNSEALED UNLESS DEFENDANTS FILE SPECIFIC OBJECTIONS WITHIN 14 DAYS. FURTHER INFORMATION OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/9/2018. 7/9/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES OF DOC. NOS. 100, 104, EX A. TO DOC. NO. 96 AND 203 MAILED TO COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS AND MOVANTS AND E-MAILED.(amas)
June 15, 2018 Filing 203 TRANSCRIPT FILED UNDER SEAL. (amas) UNSEALED AS PER DOC. #206 . Modified on 7/31/2018 (sg, ). (sg, ).
May 25, 2018 Filing 202 STATEMENT of Non-Opposition re #199 MOTION to Unseal Document (Renewed Motion) filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (HAINES, CLIFFORD) Modified on 5/29/2018 (md).
May 22, 2018 Filing 201 RESPONSE in Support re #199 MOTION to Unseal Document (Renewed Motion) filed by BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP, CARL W. HITTINGER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #1, #2 Proposed Order #2)(ORVETZ, STACY)
May 8, 2018 Filing 200 RESPONSE in Opposition re #199 MOTION to Unseal Document (Renewed Motion) filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HEIM, ROBERT)
April 25, 2018 Filing 199 MOTION to Unseal Document (Renewed Motion) filed by BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP, CARL W. HITTINGER.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(ORVETZ, STACY)
February 15, 2018 Filing 198 MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTON FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO. #169 ), IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/15/2018. 2/16/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
February 15, 2018 Filing 197 MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/15/2018. 2/16/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER THAT THE NON-PARTY MOVANTS' MOTION TO UNSEAL IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE NON-PARTY MOVANTS MAY RENEW THEIR MOTION TO UNSEAL WITHIN 30 DAYS AFTER THE CURRENT STAY IN THE STATE COURT LITIGATION IS LIFTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 11/13/2017.11/14/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
October 31, 2017 Filing 195 STATUS REPORT Response by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP. (HEIM, ROBERT)
October 30, 2017 Filing 194 STATUS REPORT by BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP, CARL W. HITTINGER. (KENT, KEVIN)
October 3, 2017 Filing 193 RESPONSE in Opposition re #192 MOTION to Unseal Document filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP. (HEIM, ROBERT)
September 29, 2017 Filing 192 DLA PIPER LLP (US)'S JOINDER TO MOTION TO UNSEAL, WITH MEMORANDUM AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(amas)
September 29, 2017 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance by LYDIA M. FURST on behalf of DLA PIPER LLP (US) with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(amas)
September 29, 2017 Filing 190 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH C. CRAWFORD on behalf of DLA PIPER LLP (US) with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(amas)
September 18, 2017 Filing 189 RESPONSE in Support re #184 MOTION to Unseal Document filed by BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP, CARL W. HITTINGER. (KENT, KEVIN)
September 12, 2017 Filing 188 RESPONSE in Opposition re #184 MOTION to Unseal Document filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (MITTS, MAURICE)
September 8, 2017 Filing 187 RESPONSE in Opposition re #184 MOTION to Unseal Document filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HEIM, ROBERT)
August 31, 2017 Filing 186 NOTICE of Appearance by STACY A. ORVETZ on behalf of BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP, CARL W. HITTINGER with Certificate of Service(ORVETZ, STACY)
August 31, 2017 Filing 185 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS M. CENTRELLA on behalf of BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP, CARL W. HITTINGER with Certificate of Service(CENTRELLA, NICHOLAS)
August 29, 2017 Filing 184 BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP AND CARL W. HITTINGER, ESQUIRE'S MOTION TO UNSEAL WITH MEMORANDUM AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(amas)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THREE-PAGE REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY (DOC. NO. #181 ), IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S THREE-PAGE REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY IS CONSIDERED FILED AS OF 6/20/2017. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 6/21/2017. 6/22/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
June 20, 2017 Filing 183 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY, FILED BY LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(amas) (lvj, ).
June 20, 2017 Filing 181 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THREE-PAGE REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY, FILED BY LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(FILED UNDER SEAL)(amas) (lvj, ).
June 15, 2017 Filing 180 (FILED IN ERROR, RE-FILED IN CORRECT CASE 06-2768) LETTER TO JUDGE GOLDBERG; FROM BRIAN SODIKOFF; DATED 6/14/2017 (amas) Modified on 6/16/2017 (amas). (Main Document 180 replaced on 6/16/2017) (amas, ).
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THREE PAGE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY (DOC. NO. #177 ), IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE IS CONSIDERED FILED AS OF 6/14/2017. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 6/15/2017.6/16/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
June 14, 2017 Filing 179 DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY, FILED BY L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP. (amas)
June 14, 2017 Filing 177 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Sur-Reply filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Response to Sur-Reply)(HEIM, ROBERT)
June 6, 2017 Filing 176 PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (RE: DOC. NO. #169 ), FILED BY LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (amas) (lvj, ).
May 26, 2017 Filing 175 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (RE: DOC. NO. #169 ), FILED BY L. LEONARD LUNDY AND LUNDY LAW, LLP. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(amas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2017: #1 SEALED DOCUMENT, #2 SEALED DOCUMENT) (lvj, ).
April 24, 2017 Filing 174 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANTS LUNDY LAW, LLP AND L. LEONARD LUNDY (RE: DOC. NO. #169 ), FILED BY LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, EXHIBITS. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (amas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2017: #1 SEALED DOCUMENT, #2 SEALED DOCUMENT) (lvj, ). Modified on 4/26/2017 (lvj, ). (EXHIBIT 19 ON DISK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2017: #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit) (nd, ).
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME (DOC. NO. #172 ), IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ITS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (RE: DOC. NO. #169 ), ON OR BEFORE 4/24/2017. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE THEIR REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON OR BEFORE 5/29/2017, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 4/3/2017.4/4/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
March 31, 2017 Filing 172 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #169 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.Certificate of Service.(MITTS, MAURICE)
March 22, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #169 MOTION for Summary Judgment . REPLIES DUE BY 5/22/2017. (amas)
March 22, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #169 MOTION for Summary Judgment . RESPONSES DUE BY 4/17/2017. (amas)
March 20, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #170 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #169 MOTION for Summary Judgment . RESPONSES DUE BY 4/17/2017. REPLIES DUE BY 5/22/2017. (jaa, )
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME (DOC. NO. #170 ), IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ITS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (RE: DOC. NO. #169 ), ON OR BEFORE APRIL 17. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE THEIR REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON OR BEFORE MAY 22, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 3/16/17. 3/21/17 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 3/22/2017 (amas).
March 15, 2017 Filing 170 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #169 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.Certificate of Service.(MITTS, MAURICE)
March 6, 2017 Filing 169 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Joint Statement of Stipulated Facts)(HEIM, ROBERT)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO QUASH (DOC. NO. #148 ), IS GRANTED. THE SUBPOENA ISSUED BY PLAINTIFF TO KEVIN MCNULTY, ESQUIRE IS HEREBY QUASHED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/28/2017.3/1/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
February 28, 2017 Filing 167 MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. #144 ), IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/28/2017. 3/1/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
February 28, 2017 Filing 166 MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/28/2017. 3/1/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR CONTEMPT OF COURT AND TO ASSESS SANCTIONS (DOC. NO. #160 ), IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/28/2017.3/1/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
February 15, 2017 Filing 164 RESPONSE in Opposition re #160 MOTION for Contempt of Court and to Assess Sanctions filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP. (MOSSMAN, ELLEN)
February 10, 2017 Filing 163 RESPONSE in Support re #160 MOTION for Contempt of Court and to Assess Sanctions filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (MITTS, MAURICE)
February 6, 2017 Filing 162 RESPONSE in Opposition re #160 MOTION for Contempt of Court and to Assess Sanctions filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
January 31, 2017 Filing 161 EXHIBIT C TO MOTION FOR COMTEMPT (RE: DOC. NO. #160 ), BY LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(amas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2017: #1 sealed document, #2 sealed document, #3 sealed document, #4 sealed document) (lvj, ).
January 30, 2017 Filing 160 MOTION for Contempt of Court and to Assess Sanctions filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(MITTS, MAURICE)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER THAT THE SCHEDULING ORDER IN THIS CASE IS AMENDED AS FOLLOWS: FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 1/15/2017. ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY 3/6/2017. FURTHER INFORMATION OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 12/13/2016. 12/13/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
December 8, 2016 Filing 158 SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION to Motion re #144 MOTION for Leave to File filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP. (MOSSMAN, ELLEN) Modified on 12/8/2016 (va, ).
November 28, 2016 Filing 157 RESPONSE in Support re #144 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (MITTS, MAURICE)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL DEFER RULING ON THE MOTION TO QUASH UNTIL BRIEFING ON THE MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT HAS CINCLUDED AND THE COURT RULES ON THAT MOTION. ALL OTHER DISCOVERY MUST BE COMPLETED BY 12/16/2016. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 11/18/2016. 11/21/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by ELLEN MOSSMAN on behalf of L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP with Certificate of Service(MOSSMAN, ELLEN)
November 18, 2016 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by JUDY LEE LEONE on behalf of L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP with Certificate of Service(LEONE, JUDY)
November 18, 2016 Filing 152 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by CAROLYN M. HAZARD on behalf of L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP(HAZARD, CAROLYN)
November 17, 2016 Filing 151 RESPONSE in Opposition re #144 MOTION for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO. #149 ), IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANTS ARE GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE A MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT THAT IS NOT MORE THAN THIRTY PAGES IN LENGTH, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 11/16/2016.11/21/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
November 9, 2016 Filing 150 RESPONSE to Motion re #149 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (MITTS, MAURICE)
November 8, 2016 Filing 149 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
November 2, 2016 Filing 148 MOTION to Quash of Non-Party, Darren S. Lugiano, D.C. filed by DARREN LUGIANO.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A)(BARATTA, ANDREW)
November 1, 2016 Filing 147 (FILED IN ERROR, RE-FILED IN CORRECT CASE 16-728)Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY Settlement Conference held on 10/31/2016. (amas) Modified on 11/2/2016 (amas, ). (Main Document 147 replaced on 11/2/2016) (amas, ).
November 1, 2016 Filing 146 (FILED IN ERROR, RE-FILED IN CORRECT CASE 16-728)Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY Settlement Conference held on 10/31/2016. (amas) Modified on 11/2/2016 (amas, ). (Main Document 146 replaced on 11/2/2016) (amas, ).
November 1, 2016 Filing 145 (FILED IN ERROR, RE-FILED IN CORRECT CASE 16-728) Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY Settlement Conference held on 10/31/2016. (amas) Modified on 11/2/2016 (amas, ). (Main Document 145 replaced on 11/2/2016) (amas, ).
October 31, 2016 Filing 144 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, FILED BY LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.MEMORANDUM, EXHIBIT INDEX. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(amas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2016: #1 sealed document) (lvjsl, ).
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT BOTH MOTIONS FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ARE GRANTED IN PART AND THE OBJECTIONS OF THE NON-PARTY DOCTORS ARE SUSTAINED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/18/2016. 10/20/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
October 18, 2016 Filing 142 MOTION for Protective Order of Non-Party Doctors, Stephen Capunao, D.C., Darren Lugiano, D.C., Samuel Holloway, D.C., Ronald Murriel, D.C., and John Rock, D.C. filed by STEPHEN CAPUANO, SAMUEL HOLLOWAY, DARREN LUGIANO, RONALD MERRIEL, JOHN ROCK.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(BARATTA, ANDREW)
October 12, 2016 MOTIONS DUE BY 10/31/2016. (amas)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ON OR BEFORE 9/30/2016 DEFENDANTS SHALL PRODUCE THE FOLLOWING CATEGORIES OF DOCUMENTS OUTLINED HEREIN TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. PLAINTIFF MAY FILE A MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD OR DROP CLAIMS OR PARTIES ON OR BEFORE 10/31/2016. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/12/2016. 10/13/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
October 5, 2016 Filing 140 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE Telephone Conference held on 6/16/2016 (amas)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR FEES AND COSTS IS APPROVED IN FULL. THE PARTIES ARE RESPONSIBLE FOR PAYMENT OF AN EQUAL HALF SHARE OF THE SAME. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/16/2016. 9/16/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2016: #1 ITEMIZED BILL) (amas, ).
September 8, 2016 Filing 138 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/8/2016. 9/9/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
August 1, 2016 Filing 137 RESPONSE in Opposition re #133 MOTION for Protective Order of Non-Party, Stephen Capuano, D.C. filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (MITTS, MAURICE)
August 1, 2016 Filing 136 RESPONSE in Opposition re #132 MOTION for Protective Order of Non-Party,Darren S. Lugiano, D.C. filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (MITTS, MAURICE)
July 29, 2016 Filing 135 REPLY to Response to Motion re #130 MOTION for Protective Order , #127 MOTION for Protective Order filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H)(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
July 19, 2016 Filing 134 RESPONSE in Opposition re #130 MOTION for Protective Order , #127 MOTION for Protective Order with respect to Plaintiff's Third-Party Subpoenas filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (MITTS, MAURICE)
July 18, 2016 Filing 133 MOTION for Protective Order of Non-Party, Stephen Capuano, D.C. filed by STEPHEN CAPUANO.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A)(BARATTA, ANDREW)
July 18, 2016 Filing 132 MOTION for Protective Order of Non-Party,Darren S. Lugiano, D.C. filed by DARREN LUGIANO.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A)(BARATTA, ANDREW)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL DISCOVERY MASTER AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/14/2016. 7/15/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
July 11, 2016 Filing 130 MOTION for Protective Order filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
July 7, 2016 Filing 129 NOTICE by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP re #128 MOTION for Protective Order , #127 MOTION for Protective Order Notice of Corrected Exhibit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit C, Part 1, #2 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit C, Part 2)(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
July 1, 2016 Filing 128 MOTION for Protective Order filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
July 1, 2016 Filing 127 MOTION for Protective Order filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES MAY REQUEST TO ADD OR DROP CLAIMS OR PARTIES ON OR BEFORE 8/15/2016. FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 12/16/2016. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE DUE BY 2/16/2017. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 6/17/2016. 6/20/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
June 14, 2016 Filing 125 REVISED ORDER THAT THE RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 6/16/2016, AT 10:00 AM, WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 6/14/2016. 6/15/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER THAT A RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 6/16/2016 AT 10:00 AM. THE PARTIES SHALL DEVELOP A PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN AND FILE THE REPORT ONE WEEK PRIOR TO THE SCHEDULED CONFERENCE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 6/9/16. 6/9/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gs)
April 19, 2016 Filing 123 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS Settlement Conference held on 4/18/2016. ESR. (ka, )
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER THAT A FOLLOW-UP SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR 4/18/2016, AT 3:30 PM, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 3/4/2016. 3/7/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL (DOC. NO. #89 ), IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 3/2/2016.3/3/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
March 1, 2016 Filing 120 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JULIAN D. PERLMAN on behalf of LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES(PERLMAN, JULIAN)
March 1, 2016 Filing 119 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JEFFRY W. DUFFY on behalf of LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES(DUFFY, JEFFRY)
March 1, 2016 Filing 118 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by CARL W. HITTINGER on behalf of LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES(HITTINGER, CARL)
February 29, 2016 Filing 117 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ABRAHAM C. REICH on behalf of LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES(REICH, ABRAHAM)
February 29, 2016 Filing 116 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ROBERT S. TINTNER on behalf of LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES(TINTNER, ROBERT)
February 29, 2016 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by GERARD M. MCCABE on behalf of LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MCCABE, GERARD)
February 29, 2016 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by GEOFFREY PAUL HULING on behalf of LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(HULING, GEOFFREY)
February 29, 2016 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by MAURICE R. MITTS on behalf of LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MITTS, MAURICE)
February 26, 2016 Filing 112 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS Telephone Conference held on 2/25/2016 (amas )
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT AND AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR 1/29/16 HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO 2/4/2016 AT 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 3-F. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 12/16/15. 12/16/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gs)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT AND AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON THE MOTION OF BAKER & HOSTETLER FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF (RE: DOC. NO. #89 ), WILL BE HELD ON 1/29/2016, AT 11:00 AM, IN COURTROOM 3-F, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 12/11/2015. 12/14/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL (DOC. NO. #89 ), IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS FOR RESOLUTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 12/7/2015. 12/8/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
November 5, 2015 Filing 108 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BRIAN SAVAGE on behalf of L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP(SAVAGE, BRIAN)
November 5, 2015 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA CHAPMAN on behalf of L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP with Certificate of Service(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
November 3, 2015 Filing 106 SUR-REPLY MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF (RE: DOC. NO. #89 ), FILED BY LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (amas)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY MEMORANDUM (DOC. NO. #102 ), IS GRANTED. THE CLERK MAY DOCKET THE SUR-REPLY MEMORANDUM ATTACHED TO THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 11/2/2015.11/4/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
November 2, 2015 Filing 104 DECLARATION OF LARRY PITT, ESQUIRE, BY LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(amas) (sg, )UNSEALED AS PER DOC. #206 . Modified on 7/31/2018 (sg, ).
November 2, 2015 Filing 102 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.Motion of Larry Pitt & Associates For Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum with Sur Reply Memorandum In Opposition to Baker & Hostetler LLP's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff and Certificate of Service.(TINTNER, ROBERT)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO. #97 ), IS GRANTED. THE DECLARATION MAY BE FILED UNDER SEAL AND SHARED ONLY WITH THE COURT AND BAKER HOSTETLER LLP. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/29/2015.11/2/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO. #99 ), IS GRANTED. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO FILE THE SECOND DECLARATION OF CARL W. HITTINGER UNDER SEAL AS SUBMITTED. THE SECOND DECLARATION OF CARL W. HITTINGER MAY BE SHARED ONLY WITH THE COURT AND WITH THE PLAINTIFF, INCLUDING PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL OF RECORD. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/29/2015.11/2/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
October 28, 2015 Filing 100 SECOND DECLARATION OF CARL W. HITTINGER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, BY LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(amas) UNSEALED AS PER DOC. #206 . Modified on 7/31/2018 (sg, ). (sg, ).
October 28, 2015 Filing 99 MOTION to Seal Document #98 Reply to Response to Motion filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HITTINGER, CARL)
October 28, 2015 Filing 98 REPLY to Response to Motion re #89 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(HITTINGER, CARL)
October 21, 2015 Filing 97 MOTION to Seal Document #96 Response in Opposition to Motion (Declaration Attached to Response) filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.Certificate of Service.(TINTNER, ROBERT)
October 21, 2015 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM of Law in Opposition re #89 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff with Declaration (under seal) and Certificate of Service filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (TINTNER, ROBERT) Modified on 10/22/2015 (lisad, ).
October 21, 2015 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT S. TINTNER on behalf of LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES with Certificate of Service(TINTNER, ROBERT)
October 21, 2015 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by ABRAHAM C. REICH on behalf of LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES with Certificate of Service(REICH, ABRAHAM)
October 20, 2015 Filing 93 RESPONSE to Motion re #89 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff (Defendants' Response in Partial Opposition to Motion by Baker & Hostetler LLP for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff) filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HEIM, ROBERT)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER THAT ALL DEADLINES UNDER THE 9/9/2015 SCHEDULING ORDER IN THIS CASE ARE STAYED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/13/2015.10/14/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
October 8, 2015 Filing 91 Memorandum of Law in Support of Baker & Hostetler LLPs Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff and Emergency Motion for a Stay of the September 9, 2015 Scheduling Order re #89 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff, #90 Emergency MOTION to Stay the September 9, 2015 Scheduling Order filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (HITTINGER, CARL)
October 8, 2015 Filing 90 Emergency MOTION to Stay the September 9, 2015 Scheduling Order filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HITTINGER, CARL)
October 8, 2015 Filing 89 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.Declaration and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HITTINGER, CARL)
September 16, 2015 Filing 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE Telephone Conference held on 9/8/2015 (amas)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TERMINATE TITAN OUTDOOR LLC AS A PARTY TO THIS SUIT, CONSISTENT WITH THE COURT'S DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COUNT FOUR OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, BY OPINION AND ORDER DATED 9/30/2014. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/9/2015. 9/10/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER THAT WITH PERMISSION FROM THE COURT, WHICH MUST BE SOUGHT WITHIN 60 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, THE PARTIES MAY ADD OR DROP CLAIMS OR PARTIES. FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 2/8/2016. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE DUE BY 6/10/2016. FURTHER INFORMATION OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/9/2015. 9/10/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
September 2, 2015 Filing 85 Discovery Plan by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.(HITTINGER, CARL)
September 1, 2015 Filing 84 Discovery Plan by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP.(HEIM, ROBERT)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER THAT A RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD BY TELEPHONE ON 9/8/2015, AT 2:30 PM, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/6/2015. 8/10/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
July 6, 2015 Filing 82 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP.(HEIM, ROBERT)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND CERTIFICATION FOR APPEAL (DOC. NO. #69 ), IS DENIED. DEFENDANT IS ORDERED TO FILE AN ANSWER TO THE NON-DISMISSED CLAIMS WITHIN 21 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 6/15/2015.6/16/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION (DOC. NO. #68 ), IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 6/10/2015.6/11/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
November 21, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BRIAN SAVAGE on behalf of TITAN OUTDOOR LLC,(SAVAGE, BRIAN)
November 21, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by CAROLYN M. HAZARD on behalf of TITAN OUTDOOR LLC,(HAZARD, CAROLYN)
November 21, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ROBERT C. HEIM on behalf of TITAN OUTDOOR LLC,(HEIM, ROBERT)
November 21, 2014 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON A. LEVINE on behalf of TITAN OUTDOOR LLC, with Certificate of Service(LEVINE, JASON)
November 21, 2014 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T. HANGLEY on behalf of TITAN OUTDOOR LLC, with Certificate of Service(HANGLEY, WILLIAM)
November 17, 2014 Filing 74 Memorandum re #68 MOTION for Reconsideration re #66 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), of the Order of September 30, 2014, #69 MOTION for Judgment (Final Judgment and Certification of Appeal) filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (HITTINGER, CARL)
November 7, 2014 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re #68 MOTION for Reconsideration re #66 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), of the Order of September 30, 2014 filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP. (HEIM, ROBERT)
November 7, 2014 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition re #69 MOTION for Judgment (Final Judgment and Certification of Appeal) filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP. (HEIM, ROBERT)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER THAT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S ASKING THE COURT TO UNSEAL THE 5/2/2014 SURREPLY, IS DENIED FOR THE REASON OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/31/2014. 11/3/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION UNTIL 11/7/2014 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (RE: DOC. NO. #68 ) AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT (DOC. NO. #69 ), ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/17/2014. 10/17/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
October 14, 2014 Filing 69 MOTION for Judgment (Final Judgment and Certification of Appeal) filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit A-B)(HITTINGER, CARL)
October 14, 2014 Filing 68 MOTION for Reconsideration re #66 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), of the Order of September 30, 2014 filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit A-B)(HITTINGER, CARL)
October 3, 2014 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFRY W. DUFFY on behalf of LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES (DUFFY, JEFFRY)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED AS TO COUNTS 1, 2, 3, 4, & 7, AND GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART AS TO COUNT 6. COUNTS 1, 2, 3, 4, & 7 ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, ETC. DEFTS SHALL FILE THEIR ANSWERS TO COUNTS 5, 6, & 8 WITHIN 21 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/30/14. 10/1/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 30, 2014 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/30/14. 10/1/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JULIAN D. PERLMAN, ESQUIRE, IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/29/2014. 9/29/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL WITH ECF APP. AND E-MAILED.(amas)
September 25, 2014 Filing 63 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ROBERT E. CONNOLLY on behalf of LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES(CONNOLLY, ROBERT)
September 24, 2014 Filing 62 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JULIAN D. PERLMAN, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. SPONSER STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. ($40.00 FILING FEE RECEIVED, RECEIPT #108468) (amas)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FURTHER SUR-REPLY (DOC. NO. #60 ), IS DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/16/2014.9/17/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
September 16, 2014 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to File Further Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Verified Complaint filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Further Sur-Reply, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit C - 9/9/14 Richard Privitera Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit D - 9/2/14 Letter to the Court)(HITTINGER, CARL)
September 15, 2014 Filing 59 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ADAM D. BROWN on behalf of LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES(BROWN, ADAM)
September 11, 2014 Filing 58 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by LESLI C. ESPOSITO on behalf of LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES(ESPOSITO, LESLI)
May 2, 2014 Filing 57 PLAINTIFF'S UNREDACTED SUR-REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT (RE: DOC. NO. #45 ). (FILED UNDER SEAL) (amas)
May 2, 2014 Filing 56 REDACTED Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law of Larry Pitt & Associates in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Verified Complaint re #45 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts I-IV and VI-VII of Plaintiff's Second Amended Verified Complaint filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (HITTINGER, CARL) Modified on 5/5/2014 (lisad, ).
May 1, 2014 Filing 55 CORRECTED ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENT (DOC. NO. 51 ), IS GRANTED PRELIMINARILY. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE, UNSEALED, A REDACTED COPY OF THE SUR-REPLY, AND SIMULTANEOUSLY FILE AN UN-REDACTED COPY OF THE SUR-REPLY UNDER SEAL. FILING MUST BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE 5/2/2014. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 5/1/2014.5/1/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
April 30, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #45 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts I-IV and VI-VII of Plaintiff's Second Amended Verified Complaint. REPLIES DUE BY 5/2/2014. (amas)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENT (DOC. NO. #51 ), IS GRANTED PRELIMINARILY. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE, UNSEALED, A REDACTED COPY OF THE SUR-REPLY, AND SIMULTANEOUSLY FILE A REDACTED COPY OF THE SUR-REPLY UNDER SEAL. FILING MUST BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE 5/2/2014. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 4/30/2014.5/1/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. #50 ), IS GRANTED AND PLAINTIFF IS PERMITTED TO FILE THE SUR-REPLY ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT "A" TO ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 4/24/2014.4/25/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
April 25, 2014 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP, TITAN OUTDOOR LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave)(HEIM, ROBERT)
April 24, 2014 Filing 51 MOTION to Seal Document #50 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Exhibit "A" filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HITTINGER, CARL)
April 24, 2014 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HITTINGER, CARL)
March 26, 2014 Filing 49 REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I-IV AND VI-VII OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT (RE: DOC. NO. #45 ), FILED BY L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP, TITAN OUTDOOR LLC,. (amas)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I-IV AND VI-VII OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. #47 ), IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS HEREBY DIRECTED TO FILE THE REPLY ATTACHED TO DEENDANTS' MOTION AS EXHIBIT A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 3/26/2014.3/27/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
March 24, 2014 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss Counts I-IV and VI-VII of Plaintiffs Second Amended Verified Complaint filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP, TITAN OUTDOOR LLC,.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss), #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave)(HEIM, ROBERT)
March 12, 2014 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts I-IV and VI-VII of Plaintiff's Second Amended Verified Complaint filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HITTINGER, CARL)
February 12, 2014 Filing 45 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts I-IV and VI-VII of Plaintiff's Second Amended Verified Complaint filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP, TITAN OUTDOOR LLC,.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(HEIM, ROBERT)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION THROUGH 2/12/2014 TO ANSWER, PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 1/24/2014. 1/27/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
January 23, 2014 Filing 43 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Titan Outdoor Holdings, Inc. with Certificate of Service by TITAN OUTDOOR LLC,.(HEIM, ROBERT)
January 23, 2014 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT C. HEIM on behalf of TITAN OUTDOOR LLC, with Certificate of Service(HEIM, ROBERT)
January 23, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN SAVAGE on behalf of TITAN OUTDOOR LLC, with Certificate of Service(SAVAGE, BRIAN)
January 23, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN M. HAZARD on behalf of TITAN OUTDOOR LLC, with Certificate of Service(HAZARD, CAROLYN)
January 8, 2014 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES re: Carl W. Hittinger served Summons and Complaint upon TITAN OUTDOOR LLC, by Mail/electronic. TITAN OUTDOOR LLC, served on 1/8/2014, answer due 1/29/2014. (HITTINGER, CARL)
January 2, 2014 1 Summons Issued as to TITAN OUTDOOR LLC,. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 1/2/2014 (amas, )
January 2, 2014 Filing 38 SECOND AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT against L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP, TITAN OUTDOOR LLC,, filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.(amas)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY (DOC. NO. #29 ), IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 12/13/2013.12/13/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM OPINION, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 12/13/2013. 12/13/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
December 13, 2013 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 12/13/2013. 12/13/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
December 11, 2013 Filing 34 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LAVE TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY IN THE FORM OF NON-PARTY SUBPOENAS (RE. DOC. NO. #29 ), FILED BY LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (amas)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW (DOC. NO. #32 ), IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF IS PERMITTED TO FILE THE REPLY BRIEF THAT IS ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT "A" TO ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY IN THE FORM OF NON-PARTY SUBPOENAS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 12/11/2013.12/12/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
November 21, 2013 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of its Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HITTINGER, CARL)
November 20, 2013 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #29 MOTION for Leave to File to Conduct Limited Discovery in the Form of Non-Party Subpoenas filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HEIM, ROBERT)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE SUR-REPLY (DOC. NO. #27 ), IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 11/18/2013.11/18/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
November 15, 2013 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File to Conduct Limited Discovery in the Form of Non-Party Subpoenas filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(HITTINGER, CARL)
November 8, 2013 Filing 28 Discovery Plan by All Parties.(HITTINGER, CARL)
November 7, 2013 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Three-Page Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave)(HEIM, ROBERT)
November 6, 2013 Filing 26 SUR-REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT (RE. DOC. NO. #19 ), FILED BY LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (amas)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. #24 ), IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF IS PERMITTED TO FILE THE SUR-REPLY BRIEF THAT IS ATTACHED TO THIER MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY AS EXHIBIT "A". SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 11/6/2013.11/6/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
November 6, 2013 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HITTINGER, CARL)
October 28, 2013 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP. (HEIM, ROBERT)
October 18, 2013 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HITTINGER, CARL)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL BE ALLOWED UP TO TWENTY-FIVE (25) PAGES IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT, WHICH IS DUE 10/18/2013, AND DEFENDANT SHALL BE ALLOWED UP TO FIFTEEN (15) PAGES IN WHICH TO REPLY THERETO. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/15/2013. 10/16/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF HAS UP TO 10/18/2013 TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAITIFF'S FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. #19 ). SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/16/2013. 9/16/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
September 12, 2013 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by L. LEONARD LUNDY, LUNDY LAW, LLP.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(HEIM, ROBERT)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL BE ALLOWED UP TO TWENTY (20) PAGES IN WHICH TO SUPPORT ANY MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT, AND PLAINTIFF SHALL BE ALLOWED UP TO TWENTY (20) PAGES IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO ANY SUCH MOTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/12/2013. 9/12/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE UP TO AND INCLUDING 9/12/2013 TO ANSWER, PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/19/2013. 8/19/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
August 12, 2013 Filing 16 First Amended Verified Amended Complaint against LEONARD LUNDY L. and LUNDY LAW, LLP filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES, Certificate of Service.(mbh, )
July 11, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT E. CONNOLLY on behalf of LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES with Certificate of Service(CONNOLLY, ROBERT)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF WILL FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT #11 AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/8/2013.7/8/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE A THIRTY-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME - THROUGH 8/12/2031 - TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/2/2013. 7/3/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
June 28, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM D. BROWN on behalf of LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES with Certificate of Service(BROWN, ADAM)
June 28, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LEONARD LUNDY L., LUNDY LAW, LLP.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(HEIM, ROBERT)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT All Defendants SHALL HAVE THROUGH JUNE 28, 2013 TO ANSWER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 5/30/2013. 5/31/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(uh, )
May 29, 2013 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by LUNDY LAW, LLP.(HEIM, ROBERT)
May 29, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN SAVAGE on behalf of LEONARD LUNDY L., LUNDY LAW, LLP with Certificate of Service(SAVAGE, BRIAN)
May 29, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN M. HAZARD on behalf of LEONARD LUNDY L., LUNDY LAW, LLP with Certificate of Service(HAZARD, CAROLYN)
May 29, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT C. HEIM on behalf of LEONARD LUNDY L., LUNDY LAW, LLP with Certificate of Service(HEIM, ROBERT)
May 9, 2013 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES re: Tom Fredericks served Summons and Complaint upon LEONARD LUNDY L. by In Hand. LEONARD LUNDY L. served on 5/8/2013, answer due 5/29/2013. (HITTINGER, CARL)
May 9, 2013 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES re: Tom Fredericks served Summons and Complaint upon LUNDY LAW, LLP by In Hand. LUNDY LAW, LLP served on 5/8/2013, answer due 5/29/2013. (HITTINGER, CARL)
May 6, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by LESLI C. ESPOSITO on behalf of LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES (ESPOSITO, LESLI)
May 2, 2013 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES.(jmv, )
May 2, 2013 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (jmv, )
May 2, 2013 Summons Issued as to LEONARD LUNDY L., LUNDY LAW, LLP. Forwarded To: 2 Origs mailed to counsel on 5/2/13 (jmv, )
May 2, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LEONARD LUNDY L., LUNDY LAW, LLP ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number PPE081166.), filed by LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jmv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES v. LUNDY LAW, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITAN OUTDOOR LLC,
Represented By: ROBERT C. HEIM
Represented By: WILLIAM T. HANGLEY
Represented By: JASON A. LEVINE
Represented By: CAROLYN M. HAZARD
Represented By: BRIAN SAVAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. LEONARD LUNDY
Represented By: ELLEN MOSSMAN
Represented By: ROBERT C. HEIM
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Represented By: JUDY LEE LEONE
Represented By: CAROLYN M. HAZARD
Represented By: BRIAN SAVAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUNDY LAW, LLP
Represented By: ELLEN MOSSMAN
Represented By: ROBERT C. HEIM
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Represented By: JUDY LEE LEONE
Represented By: CAROLYN M. HAZARD
Represented By: BRIAN SAVAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DLA PIPER LLP (US)
Represented By: JOSEPH C. CRAWFORD
Represented By: LYDIA M. FURST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DR. DARREN LUGIANO
Represented By: ANDREW PATRICK BARATTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ESQUIRE CARL W. HITTINGER
Represented By: NICHOLAS M. CENTRELLA
Represented By: KEVIN DOOLEY KENT
Represented By: STACY A. ORVETZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DR. STEPHEN CAPUANO
Represented By: ANDREW PATRICK BARATTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DR. JOHN ROCK
Represented By: ANDREW PATRICK BARATTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DR. SAMUEL HOLLOWAY
Represented By: ANDREW PATRICK BARATTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP
Represented By: NICHOLAS M. CENTRELLA
Represented By: KEVIN DOOLEY KENT
Represented By: STACY A. ORVETZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DR. RONALD MERRIEL
Represented By: ANDREW PATRICK BARATTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY PITT & ASSOCIATES
Represented By: GERARD M. MCCABE
Represented By: CARL W. HITTINGER
Represented By: ABRAHAM C. REICH
Represented By: MAURICE R. MITTS
Represented By: JULIAN D. PERLMAN
Represented By: ROBERT S. TINTNER
Represented By: LESLI C. ESPOSITO
Represented By: ROBERT E. CONNOLLY
Represented By: GEOFFREY PAUL HULING
Represented By: JEFFRY W. DUFFY
Represented By: CLIFFORD E. HAINES
Represented By: ADAM D. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?