ALLIANCE INDUSTRIES LIMITED v. A-1 SPECIALIZED SERVICES & SUPPLIES, INC.

Plaintiff: ALLIANCE INDUSTRIES LIMITED
Defendant: A-1 SPECIALIZED SERVICES & SUPPLIES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2013cv02510
Filed: May 7, 2013
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M. BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2015 152 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/8/15. 4/8/15 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
April 8, 2015 153 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT FOLLOWING EXTENSIVE BRIEFING AND A HEARING ON 3/31/15, THE COURT WILL GRANT A-1'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION TESTIMONY (ECF 95 & 96) BECAUSE PLAINTIFFS HAVE NOT MET THEIR BURDEN OF SHOWING THAT AN ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVI LEGE EXISTED AS TO THE COMMUNICATIONS WITH MR. MASSIAS AND MR. BULLOCK, WHOSE DEPOSITIONS HAVE BEEN NOTICED IN THIS CASE, AND MR. DANGE. THEREFORE, MR. MASSIAS AND MR. BULLOCK ARE ORDERED TO GIVE TESTIMONY AT THEIR DEPOSITIONS CONCERNING COMMUNICATIO NS AND TRANSACTIONS BETWEEN AND AMONG THE PRINCIPALS IN THIS CASE, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO PLAINTIFFS' ABILITY TO NOTE OBJECTIONS FOR THE RECORD AND TO RENEW ARGUMENT AT SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR AT TRIAL THAT ATTORNEY TESTIMONY OR COMMUNICATIONS SHOULD BE REGARDED AS PRIVILEGED. THE COURT WILL DENY A-1'S MOTION TO COMPEL AS TO MS. BARROUCHE. AS TO A-1'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (ECF 133 & 134), AT THE 3/31/15, HEARING, COUNSEL FOR A-1 AND PLAINTIFFS INDICATED THAT THEY HAD RESOLVED SOME OF THE DISPUTES AT ISSUE, BUT THAT THEY HAD BEEN UNABLE TO REACH A RESOLUTION REGARDING TWO MATTERS: (1) PLAINTIFFS' INSTRUCTION TO KUMAR AND SAMEER AT THEIR DEPOSITIONS NOT TO ANSWER CERTAIN QUESTIONS ON RELEVANCE GROUNDS AND (2) PLAINTIFFS� 39; REFUSAL TO PRODUCE CERTAIN SUPPORTING DOCUMENTATION FOR PLAINTIFFS' FINANCIAL STATEMENTS. AS INDICATED AT THE HEARING, THE COURT WILL GRANT A-1'S MOTION TO COMPEL AS FOLLOWS: PLAINTIFFS SHALL NOT INSTRUCT KUMAR AND SAMEER NOT TO ANSWER QUESTIONS, ON RELEVANCE GROUNDS, CONCERNING THE DEFENSE THAT KUMAR AND SURESH HAD AGREEED TO CAUSE PLAINTIFFS TO EXTINGUISH THE LEASES IN CONNECTION WITH A LARGER BUSINESS RESTRUCTURING. ANY ADDITIONAL DEPOSITION OF KUMAR AND SAMEER SHALL BE LIMITED TO 90 MINUTES. SUPPORTING DOCUMENTATION FOR THOSE FINANCIAL STATEMENTS PLAINTIFFS HAVE PRODUCED IN THIS CASE IS DISCOVERABLE AND SHALL BE PRODUCED BY PLAINTIFFS. A-1 WILL PAY THE COST OF THE PRODUCTION OF THESE SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/8/15. 4/8/15 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
March 12, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 3/12/14. 3/12/14 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
March 12, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY PURSUANT TO PRINCIPLES OF INTERNATIONAL COMMITTEE AND THE DOCTRINE FROM NON CONVENIENS IS DENIED, SUBJECT TO RENEWAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE IF MATERIAL CIRCUMSTANCES CHANGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 3/12/14. 3/12/14 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
April 30, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF REASONS FOR ADOPTION OF PROTECTIVE ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/30/14. 5/1/14 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
April 30, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 6/12/14 AT 4:00 PM IN COURTROOM 3A BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON, DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, INCLUDING MATERIAL SUBMITTED UNDER RULE 44.1, SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 10/15/14. DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 9/30/2014. THE NON-JURY TRIAL WILL START ON MONDAY, 12/8/14 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 3A, ASSUMING ISSUES REMAIN FOR TRIAL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/30/14. 5/1/14 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 11, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 9/11/14. 9/12/14 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 11, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 9/11/14. 9/12/14 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLIANCE INDUSTRIES LIMITED v. A-1 SPECIALIZED SERVICES & SUPPLIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLIANCE INDUSTRIES LIMITED
Represented By: ROY PRATHER, III
Represented By: ANDREW J. SOVEN
Represented By: STEVEN T. VOIGT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-1 SPECIALIZED SERVICES & SUPPLIES, INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW H. ADLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.