MURNAGHAN et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: JANET MURNAGHAN and FRANCIS MURNAGHAN
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES and KATHLEEN SEBELIUS
Case Number: 2:2013cv03083
Filed: June 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M. BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FRANCIS MURNAGHAN, JANET MURNAGHAN As To The Action(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR 10 A.M. ON 6/14/2013 IS VACATED UNTIL SUCH LATER DATE AS THE COURT DETERMINES; AND THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED ON 6/5/2013 IS EXTENDED UNTIL THE EARLIEST OF AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/13/2013. 6/13/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems)
June 13, 2013 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Continue \Postpone Preliminary Injunction Hearing and, Joint MOTION for Order / To Extend Temporary Restraining Order filed by FRANCIS MURNAGHAN, JANET MURNAGHAN.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(HARVEY, STEPHEN)
June 13, 2013 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON: Telephone Conference held on 6/12/2013 (ems)
June 11, 2013 Filing 15 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re 14 Transcript - PDF, 6/11/2013 Entered and Copies Emailed. (ems)
June 11, 2013 Filing 14 TRANSCRIPT of TRO Hearing held on 6/5/2013, before Judge MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/2/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/12/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2013. (ems)
June 11, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/12/2013 04:30 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. PLAINTIFF TO INITIATE CALL.(jb, )
June 7, 2013 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/7/2013. 6/7/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems)
June 7, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by SHEILA LIEBER on behalf of KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES with Certificate of Service(LIEBER, SHEILA)
June 7, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL SCHWEI on behalf of KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES with Certificate of Service(SCHWEI, DANIEL)
June 7, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by TAMRA T. MOORE on behalf of KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES with Certificate of Service(MOORE, TAMRA)
June 5, 2013 Filing 8 Audio File 06/05/2013 12:15PM, regarding TRO Hearing (Part 2) held on 06/05/2013, before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON (jlz, )
June 5, 2013 Filing 7 Audio File 06/05/2013 12:15 PM, regarding TRO Hearing (Part 1) held on 06/05/2013, before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON (jlz, )
June 5, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING SET FOR 6/14/2013 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 3A BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON.(jb, )
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR A TRO IS GRANTED AND THE SECRETARY SHALL DIRECT THE OPTN TO IMMEDIATELY CEASE APPLICATION OF THE UNDER 12 RULE AS TO SARAH MURNAGHAN SO THAT SHE CAN BE CONSIDERED FOR RECEIPT OF DONATED LUNGS FROM ADULTS BASED ON THE MEDICAL SEVERITY OF HER CONDITION AS COMPARED TO THE MEDICAL SEVERITY OF PERSONS OVER 12 IN THE OPTN SYSTEM. THIS ORDER SHALL REMAIN IN EFFECT UNLESS AND UNTIL THE COURT ORDERS OTHERWISE AT THE CONCLUSION OF THE HEARING ON A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. A HEARING ON THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION WILL BE HELD ON 6/14/2013 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 3A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/5/2013. 6/5/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems)
June 5, 2013 Filing 4 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (ems)
June 5, 2013 Filing 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON: TRO Hearing held on 6/5/2013. Court Reporter: Janice Lutz. (ems)
June 5, 2013 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by FRANCIS MURNAGHAN, JANET MURNAGHAN. (ems)
June 5, 2013 3 Summons Issued as to KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. Forwarded To: Counsel and Case Opening on 6/5/2013 (ems) 1 Additional Summonses Forwarded to Counsel on 6/6/2013. Modified on 6/6/2013 (ems).
June 5, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE082899), filed by JANET MURNAGHAN, FRANCIS MURNAGHAN. Exhibits. (ems) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2013: # 2 Designation Form) (sbt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MURNAGHAN et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET MURNAGHAN
Represented By: STEPHEN G. HARVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCIS MURNAGHAN
Represented By: STEPHEN G. HARVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: SHEILA LIEBER
Represented By: TAMRA T. MOORE
Represented By: DANIEL SCHWEI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN SEBELIUS
Represented By: SHEILA LIEBER
Represented By: TAMRA T. MOORE
Represented By: DANIEL SCHWEI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?