FREEDMAN et al v. FISHER et al
Plaintiff: GARY B. FREEDMAN and BRACHA STRIMBER
Defendant: STEVEN FISHER, MARGO TURNER, ASHISH H. JANI, KRISTINA A. MARTINEZ, BHUVIN M. BUDDHDEV, EUN KYUNG KOH, MANOJ R. MUTTREJA, ABINGTON MEDICAL SPECIALISTS ASSOCIATION, P.C., ABINGTON EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES and ABINGTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Case Number: 2:2013cv03145
Filed: June 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: C. DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. WILLIAM DITTER, JR ON 2/2/15. 2/3/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER THAT PLFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE ERRATA SHEET DATED 10/2/2014 OF DEFT MARGO TURNER, M.D. IS GRANTED. THE 10/2/2014 ERRATA SHEET & 10/10/2014 REVISED ERRATA SHEET ARE STRICKEN. DEFT MARGO TURNER, M.D. AND/OR HER COUNSEL SHALL MAKE NO REFERENCE TO THE 10/2/2014 ERRATA SHEET OR 10/10/2014 REVISED ERRATA SHEET AT THE TIME OF TRIAL.SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. WILLIAM DITTER, JR ON 10/28/14. 10/28/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MANOJ MUTTREJA, M.D, & ABINGTON MEDICAL SPECIALISTS, P.C., MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT VIII OF PLFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) IS DENIED. DEFTS' MANOJ MUTTREJA, M.D., & ABINGTON MEDICAL SPECIALISTS, P.C., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT VIII OF PLFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 56 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. WILLIAM DITTER, JR ON 9/30/14. 10/1/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER THAT PLFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES IS GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. WILLIAM DITTER, JR ON 6/11/14. 6/12/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FREEDMAN et al v. FISHER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY B. FREEDMAN
Represented By: H. LEON AUSSPRUNG, III
Represented By: JAMES EDWARD HOCKENBERRY
Represented By: JOSEPH S. LUKOMSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRACHA STRIMBER
Represented By: H. LEON AUSSPRUNG, III
Represented By: JAMES EDWARD HOCKENBERRY
Represented By: JOSEPH S. LUKOMSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN FISHER
Represented By: DONALD N. CAMHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGO TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHISH H. JANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTINA A. MARTINEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHUVIN M. BUDDHDEV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUN KYUNG KOH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANOJ R. MUTTREJA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABINGTON MEDICAL SPECIALISTS ASSOCIATION, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABINGTON EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES
Represented By: DONALD N. CAMHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABINGTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?