ROSSITER v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Plaintiff: KENNETH ROSSITER
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA and CHARLES H. RAMSEY
Case Number: 2:2013cv03429
Filed: June 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: JOEL H. SLOMSKY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTIOUN FOR RECONSIDERATIONIS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 12/29/2015. 12/29/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED. FROM THE COURT'S REVIEW OF ALL SUPPORTING PAPERS AND EXHIBITS, I AM PERSUADED THAT DEFENDANT IS NOT ENTITILED TO QUALIFIED IMMUNITY, AND THAT THERE IS A GENUINE ISSUE OF MATERIAL FACT THAT PRECLUDES A GRANT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 12/2/15. 12/2/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gs)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (DOC NO. 4 ) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 3/17/2014. 3/18/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROSSITER v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH ROSSITER
Represented By: MAXWELL S. KENNERLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES H. RAMSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?