SMITH v. UNILIFE CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: |
TALBOT TODD SMITH |
Defendant: |
UNILIFE CORPORATION, UNLIFE MEDICAL SOLUTIONS, INC., ALAN SHORTALL and RAMIN MOJDEH |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv05101 |
Filed: |
August 30, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Philadelphia Office |
County: |
Outside the State of PA. |
Presiding Judge: |
MICHAEL M. BAYLSON |
Nature of Suit: |
Securities/Commodities/Exchanges |
Cause of Action: |
18 U.S.C. § 1514 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 6, 2015 |
Filing
183
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS APPLICAITON FOR ATTORNEYS FEES (DOC. 147) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AND DEFENDANTS WILL ISSUE A CHECK MADE PAYABLE TO HARDWICK BEFER LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF $33,419.00 WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/6/15. 4/7/15 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
|
January 7, 2015 |
Filing
144
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATON AND CLARIFICATION OF THE COURTS NOVEMBER 14, 2014 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (DOC. 127) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 1/7/15. 1/8/15 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
|
December 11, 2014 |
Filing
133
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIMS (DOC. 85) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/11/14. 12/11/14 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
|
November 24, 2014 |
Filing
124
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA THAT FOR THE REASONS OUTLINED HEREIN THE MOTION TO QUASH IS DENIED AS UNTIMELY AND THE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER IS GRANTED AS TO DISCOVERY OF BD. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 11/24/2014. 11/25/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
|
November 13, 2014 |
Filing
116
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO HOLD DEFENDANTS IN CONTEMPT (DOC. 67) IS DENIED. THE COURT WILL IN THE EXERCISE OF ITS DISCRETION AWARD ATTORNEYS FEES IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT FOR THE PREPARATION INCLUDING LEGAL RESEARCH AND WRITING OF THE BRIEFS THAT PLAINTIFF HAS FILED ON, ETC. PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND CONFIDENTIALITY ORDERS AND TO AMEND ORDER OF 6/26/14 (DOC. 1OO) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 11/13/14. 11/14/14 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
|
October 2, 2014 |
Filing
90
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLANTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED AND PLAINTIFF IS PERMITTED TO FILE HIS SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL AMENDED COMPLAINT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/2/14. 10/3/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
|
February 4, 2014 |
Filing
19
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHOULD SEEK ARGUMENT FROM OPPOSING COUNSEL OR FILE A MOTION TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 2/4/14. 2/4/14 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?