CLIENTRON CORP. v. DEVON IT, INC.
Plaintiff: CLIENTRON CORP.
Defendant: DEVON IT, INC.
Case Number: 2:2013cv05634
Filed: September 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the U.S.
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M. BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF CLIENTRON CORPORATION'S MOTION TO AMEND THE VERDICT ON PIERCING THE CORPORATE VEIL 329 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. IN ADDITION, DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY, 333 , IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/22/16. 7/22/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER THAT FOR REASONS STATED IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM OPINION, DEFENDANTS DEVEON IT, INC., JOHN BENNETT AND NANCE DIROCCO'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE CLIENTRON'S EXPERT KYLE ANNE MIDKIFF FROM PROVIDING OPINIONS OR TESTIMONY REGARDING PIERCING THE CORPORATE VEIL IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 3/29/16. 3/30/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER THAT MIL #1 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; MIL #2 IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; MIL #3 AND MIL #7 ARE HELD UNDER ADVISEMENT PENDING AN OFFER OF PROOF; MIL #4 THE COURT WILL RULE AFTER ARGUMENT IS PRESENTED ON THEIR POSITION AS TO FOREIGN LAW, PURSUANT TO RULE 44.1 WITHIN SEVEN (7) DAYS. MIL #5 IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; MIL #6 AND MIL #8 ARE DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; MIL #9 IS DENIED; MIL #10 IS DENIED; AND MIL #11 AND MIL #12 ARE HELD UNDER ADVISEMENT PENDING FURTHER FILINGS OR UNTIL TRIAL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 3/23/16. 3/24/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER THAT CLIENTRON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 186 IS DENIED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO RAISING THE ISSUE AT TRIAL; DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 184 IS DENIED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO RAISING THE ISSUE AT TRIAL; CLIENTRON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEVON IT'S COUNTERCLAIMS 185 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. CLIENTRON'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL 183 IS DENIED AS MOOT. DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY 202 IS GRANTED; CLIENTRON'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION 206 IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/22/15. 12/22/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS 154 IS GRANTED FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE FOREGOING MEMORANDUM, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/27/15. 8/28/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 91 , DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION 93 , PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN SUPPORT 94 , AND DEFENDANTS' SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION 95 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT DOCKETED AS OF 10/14/2014 84 WILL BE ORDERED FILED. DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 81 IS DENIED AS MOOT. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE STATUS CALL WILL BE HELD ON 1/22/2015, AT 12:45PM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 1/5/15. 1/6/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY IS HEREBY DENIED. THE COURT WILL MOVE FORWARD WITH THE CASE ACCORDING TO THE SCHEDULE DESCRIBED IN THE COURT'S ORDER OF 3/4/2014. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 3/10/14. 3/11/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLIENTRON CORP. v. DEVON IT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLIENTRON CORP.
Represented By: GEORGE J. KRUEGER
Represented By: JOHN D. VANLOBENSELS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEVON IT, INC.
Represented By: CHARLES A. MCCAULEY, III
Represented By: GARY M. SAMMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?