RILEY v. ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER et al

Plaintiff: DENISE RILEY
Defendant: ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER and SUSAN SNYDER
Case Number: 2:2013cv07205
Filed: December 11, 2013
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Bucks
Presiding Judge: J. CURTIS JOYNER
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE IS DENIED AS MOOT, AND THE MOTION FOR SANCTIONS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 10/6/2015. 10/6/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
May 28, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION IS GRANTED IN PART ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 5/27/14. 5/28/14 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
April 23, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 4/23/14. 4/24/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RILEY v. ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE RILEY
Represented By: ARI RISSON KARPF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: ANDREA MERYL KIRSHENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN SNYDER
Represented By: ANDREA MERYL KIRSHENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?