ARSENAL, INC. et al v. AMMONS et al
Plaintiff: ARSENAL, INC. and 5301 LLC
Defendant: LARRY AMMONS, PETER AMMONS, MELISSA BULLARD, BEN AMMONS, AMMONS SUPERMARKET LLC and WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2014cv01289
Filed: March 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: ANITA B. BRODY
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER of MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION (ECF 168) that. DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF NO. 152) IS GRANTED;. PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF LIABILITY (ECF NO. 155) IS DENIED;. DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (ECF NO. 154) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 9/28/2017. 9/28/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION to Memorandum and/or Opinion Order (ECF No. 37) FILED ON DECEMBER 1, 2014.... SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 12/2/2014. 12/2/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) Modified on 12/2/2014 (mo, ).
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER of MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION TO FOLLOW that THE AMMONS DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF NO. 11) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SPECIFICALLY:.... SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 11/26/2014. 11/26/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARSENAL, INC. et al v. AMMONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARSENAL, INC.
Represented By: DAVID L. BRAVERMAN
Represented By: LISA ANN BUCKALEW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 5301 LLC
Represented By: DAVID L. BRAVERMAN
Represented By: LISA ANN BUCKALEW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY AMMONS
Represented By: DANIEL S. BERNHEIM, III
Represented By: EDWARD T. KOLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER AMMONS
Represented By: DANIEL S. BERNHEIM, III
Represented By: EDWARD T. KOLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELISSA BULLARD
Represented By: DANIEL S. BERNHEIM, III
Represented By: EDWARD T. KOLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEN AMMONS
Represented By: DANIEL S. BERNHEIM, III
Represented By: EDWARD T. KOLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMMONS SUPERMARKET LLC
Represented By: DANIEL S. BERNHEIM, III
Represented By: EDWARD T. KOLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION
Represented By: ANTHONY ARGIROPOULOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?