IN RE: PENN-MONT BENEFIT SERVICES, INC.
Petitioner: RACHEL MARTONE, GEORGE MCLAIN, DR. DAVID SPOKANE, ESQ. CHARLES C. PARSONS, ROB PERITZ, MARK GOODMAN, U.E. SYSTEMS, INC., DAVID RHODES, ROSA KERN, DANIEL KEITH NEWELL, ROBERT V. LARKIN, DAVID GILCREASE, HARRY R. LARKIN, DRS. MARTIN, DR ERIC KATZ, DR. ERIC KATZ, P.C., ROBERT W. CORL, PAMELA K. ERDMAN MD, INC., FREDERICK R. CAHALL, VICTORIA KATZ, OLOUAKAN COMLUCT, INC.,, WILSHIRE PALISADES LAW GROUP, P.C., KATRINA KNIEST, DR FRANK SIMONCINI, BENJAMIN FRADLIN, MICHAEL OSTERER, ANTHEM MEDICAL MANAGEMENT, INC., M&E ZENNI, INC., NORMA LEFKOWITZ, POWERCOM, INC., STEPHEN J. LARKIN, ENGINEERED SYSTEMS & PRODUCTS, INC., REBECCA EDMUNDSON, HAL KERN, ELISA ZENNI, II, FAINA FRADLIN, DR. PAMELA ERDMAN, DAVID LEFKOWITZ, CHARLES C. PARSONS & ASSOCIATES, KURT C GERHARDT, RESOURCE REALIZATIONS, INC., THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, WILLIAM SAMUEL NEWELL, III, DR JOHN CROUSHORE, MELISSA LANGLAIS, JAIME FARREL, ALAN BANDES, HAMID MOHSSENI and CARSON'S STEAK WAREHOUSE AND SALOON, INC.
Not Yet Classified: JOHN D. BRADDOCK, MICHAEL GRAHAM, JIM MALONE and TRUMAN GAILEY
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE and GUY G. GEBHARDT
Appellant: JOHN J. KORESKO, V
Debtor In Possession: PENN-MONT BENEFIT SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01487
Filed: March 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH T HEY
Referring Judge: MARY A MCLAUGHLIN
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASES ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND THAT PETITIONS MAY NOT BE REFILED IN ANY OTHER COURT UNLESS AND UNTIL THE PENNSYLVANIA DEBTORS OBTAIN APPROVAL AND AUTHORITY FROM THIS COURT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 4/23/15. 4/23/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
April 24, 2015 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASES ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND THAT PETITIONS MAY NOT BE REFILED IN ANY OTHER COURT UNLESS AND UNTIL THE PENNSYLVANIA DEBTORS OBTAIN APPROVAL AND AUTHORITY FROM THIS COURT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 4/23/15. 4/23/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
March 12, 2015 Filing 47 Statement in Response to the Court's Order Directing Parties in Interest to State Their View as to How the Court Should Proceed by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (BEATY, SEAN)
March 12, 2015 Filing 46 Statement of the United States Trustee in Response to Order of the Court Directing Parties in Interest to State their View as to How the Court Should Proceed in the these Matters by UNITED STATES TRUSTEE. (CONWAY, GEORGE)
March 10, 2015 Filing 45 Statement Pursuant to Court's February 26, 2015 Order by DANIEL KEITH NEWELL, WILLIAM SAMUEL NEWELL, III, DAVID RHODES. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ISRAEL, SAMUEL)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A STATEMENT OF THEIR VIEWS ON HOW THE COURT SHOULD PROCEED IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTERS IN LIGHT OF THE COURT'S DECISION IN KORESKO AND THE DOL'S MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/26/15. 2/27/15 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED.(jl, )
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ADD UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY TO THE DOCKET OF EACH CASE CAPTIONED. JUDGE HEY WILL BE ASSISTING WITH OVERSIGHT OF EACH OF THE CASES; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/25/15. 2/26/15 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
January 30, 2015 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD DIDONATO on behalf of DANIEL KEITH NEWELL, WILLIAM SAMUEL NEWELL, III, DAVID RHODES with Certificate of Service(DIDONATO, EDWARD)
January 30, 2015 Filing 41 Emergency MOTION for Relief from the Automatic Stay filed by DANIEL KEITH NEWELL, WILLIAM SAMUEL NEWELL, III, DAVID RHODES.Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(ISRAEL, SAMUEL)
January 30, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL H. ISRAEL on behalf of DANIEL KEITH NEWELL, WILLIAM SAMUEL NEWELL, III, DAVID RHODES with Certificate of Service(ISRAEL, SAMUEL)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER THAT PETITIONERS RENEWED MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS IS DENIED IN PART. PETTITIONER'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY AND A PARTIAL AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 9/11/14. 9/12/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED, COPY TO FISCAL DEPT.(jl, )
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER THAT JOHN KORESKO'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF NINETY DAYS IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO THE PETITIONERS' MOTIONS FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES IS DENIED. MR. KORESKO'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE PENDING MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEY FEES IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/16/14. 7/17/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
July 15, 2014 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #36 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by JOHN J. KORESKO, V.Certificate of Service.(KORESKO, JOHN)
July 11, 2014 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number PPE104198 re #21 Notice of Appeal filed by PENN-MONT BENEFIT SERVICES, INC. (jmg, )
July 1, 2014 Filing 36 MOTION for Relief from the Automatic Stay and for a Partial Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by REBECCA EDMUNDSON, JAIME FARREL, KATRINA KNIEST, MELISSA LANGLAIS, RACHEL MARTONE, GEORGE MCLAIN, ROB PERITZ, Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Motion, #3 Certificate of Service)(SILVERSTEIN, IRA) Modified on 7/2/2014 (fb).
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF KURT C. GERHARDT FOR MODIFICATION OF THE AUTOMATIC STAY TO PERMIT LITIGATION OF HIS THIRD PARTY CLAIMS AGAINST DEBTOR, PENN-MONT BENEFIT SERVICES, INC. IN A FLORIDA STATE COURT ACTION IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/19/14. 6/19/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND MAILED TO PRO SE.(jl, )
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER THAT THE ENTITY LISTED ABOVE (PENN-MONT BENEFIT SERVICES, INC.) WILL HAVE 30 DAYS TO RETAIN COUNSEL; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/18/14. 6/18/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER of USCA THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS HEREBY DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO TIMELY PROSECUTE INSOFAR AS APPELLANT TO PAY THE REQUISITE FEE OR FILE THE REQUIRED MOTION FOR IFP AS DIRECTED. A CERTIFIED COPY OF THIS ORDER BE ISSUED IN LIEU OF A FORMAL MANDATE; ETC. (jl, )
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER of USCA THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS HEREBY DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO TIMELY PROSECUTE INSOFAR AS APPELLANT TO PAY THE REQUISITE FEE OR FILE THE REQUIRED MOTION FOR IFP AS DIRECTED. A CERTIFIED COPY OF THIS ORDER BE ISSUED IN LIEU OF A FORMAL MANDATE; ETC. (jl, )
May 28, 2014 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #29 Notice of Appeal filed by PENN-MONT BENEFIT SERVICES, INC.. USCA Case Number 14-2833 (ems)
May 22, 2014 Filing 31 Clerk's Notice to USCA re #29 Notice of Appeal : (jl, )
May 22, 2014 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KURT C GERHARDT re #28 MOTION to Modify Automatic Stay Amended Certificate of Service (FOX, GREGORY)
May 22, 2014 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #15 Order,, by PENN-MONT BENEFIT SERVICES, INC.. Filing fee $ 505. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KORESKO, JOHN)
May 20, 2014 Filing 28 MOTION to Modify Automatic Stay filed by KURT C GERHARDT.Motion for Modification of Stay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(FOX, GREGORY)
April 22, 2014 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #24 Notice of Appeal filed by JOHN J. KORESKO, V. USCA Case Number 14-1940 (ems)
April 18, 2014 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #21 Notice of Appeal filed by PENN-MONT BENEFIT SERVICES, INC. USCA Case Number 14-1933 (ems)
April 16, 2014 Filing 27 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #26 Transcript - PDF 4/17/14 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed. (mbh, )
April 16, 2014 Filing 26 Amended Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on March 24, 2014, before Judge Mary A. McLaughlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dennis Hartman. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/7/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2014. (mbh, )
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DENIAL OF CERTAIN CREDITORS AND PARTIES IN INTEREST MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 4/16/14. 4/16/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
April 15, 2014 Filing 25 Clerk's Notice to USCA re #24 Notice of Appeal : (jl, )
April 15, 2014 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEAL by JOHN J. KORESKO, V Filing fee $ 0.. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jl, ) Modified on 4/18/2014 (jl, ).
April 15, 2014 Filing 22 Clerk's Notice to USCA re #21 Notice of Appeal. (amas)
April 15, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #12 Order by PENN-MONT BENEFIT SERVICES, INC.. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (KORESKO, JOHN) Modified on 4/15/2014 (nd).
April 4, 2014 Filing 20 MOTION for Reconsideration of Denial of Certain Creditors and Parties in Interest for Relief from the Automatic Stay filed by ANTHEM MEDICAL MANAGEMENT, INC., ALAN BANDES, CARSON'S STEAK WAREHOUSE AND SALOON, INC., CHARLES C. PARSONS & ASSOCIATES, JOHN CROUSHORE, DR. ERIC KATZ, P.C., DRS. MARTIN, ENGINEERED SYSTEMS & PRODUCTS, INC., PAMELA ERDMAN, BENJAMIN FRADLIN, FAINA FRADLIN, DAVID GILCREASE, MARK GOODMAN, ERIC KATZ, VICTORIA KATZ, HAL KERN, ROSA KERN, DAVID LEFKOWITZ, NORMA LEFKOWITZ, M&E ZENNI, INC., HAMID MOHSSENI, MICHAEL OSTERER, PAMELA K. ERDMAN MD, INC., CHARLES C. PARSONS, POWERCOM, INC., RESOURCE REALIZATIONS, INC., FRANK SIMONCINI, DAVID SPOKANE, U.E. SYSTEMS, INC., WILSHIRE PALISADES LAW GROUP, P.C., ELISA ZENNI, II.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Motion, #2 Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SILVERSTEIN, IRA)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT THE LANGLAIS PETITIONERS MOTIONS FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY AND FOR PARTIAL RELEASE OF THE SUPERSEDEAS BOND FUNDS ARE GRANTED. THE BANKRUPTCY STAY IS LIFTED AND ANNULLED WITH RESPECT TO THE PROCEEDING IN LANGLAIS. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO RELEASE $3,8000,000.00 OF THE SUPERSEDEAS FUNDS ON OR AFTER 4/18/14. THE CHECKS SHALL BE SENT BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO OR PICKED UP IN PERSON BY: DALE J. MORGADO, ESQ.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 4/3/14. 4/3/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED, COPY TO FISCAL.(jl, )
April 3, 2014 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE LANGLAIS PETITIONERS MOTIONS FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY AND FOR PARTIAL RELEASE OF THE SUPERSEDEAS BOND FUNDS ARE GRANTED. THE BANKRUPTCY STAY IS LIFTED AND ANNULLED WITH RESPECT TO THE PROCEEDING IN LANGLAIS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 4/3/14. 4/3/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
April 2, 2014 Filing 17 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #16 Transcript - PDF, 4/2/14 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (jl, )
April 2, 2014 Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT of held on 3/24/14, before Judge MCLAUGHLIN. Court Reporter/Transcriber DENNIS HARTMAN. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/23/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2014. ORAL ARGUMENT HEARING(jl, )
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT WHERE ONE OF THE ABOVE CAPTIONED DEBTORS SEEKS TO UTILIZE COUNSEL OR A PROFESSIONAL AS CONTEMPLATED UNDER THE BANKRUPTCY CODE, THE DEBTOR SHALL FILE AN APPLICATION UNDER SECTION 327-329 OF TITLE 11 U.S.C. WITH THIS COURT TO RETAIN SAID COUNSEL AND/OR OTHER PROFESSIONAL PERSONS WHICH MAY BE RESPONDED TO BY INTERESTED PARTIES AND SHALL BE DETERMINED BY THIS COURT UPON NOTICE AND AFTER OPPORTUNITY TO BE HEARD; AND IN PARTICULAR PENN-MONT SHALL MAKE APPLICATION AS AFORESAID TO RETAIN COUNSEL BEFORE PROCEEDING IN PURSUING LITIGATION PENDING IN THE MATTER OF PENN-MONT BENEFIT SERVICES VS UNITED STATES, 13-4130; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/27/14. 3/27/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
March 27, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE by UNITED STATES TRUSTEE re #10 Suspense Order, Set/Clear Flags,,,, describing activities permitted while case is suspended and process for retention of counsel and professionals (BAKER, FREDERIC)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF CERTAIN CREDITORS AND PARTIES IN INTEREST FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/26/14. 3/27/14 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED.(jl, )
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/26/14. 3/26/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE MOTION OF HARRY R. LARKIN, ROBERT V. LARKIN, STEPHEN J. LARKIN, ROBERT W. CORL, FREDERICK R. CAHALL, AND OLOUAKAN COMLUCT, INC., FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY, AND FOLLOWING THE HEARING ON 3/24/2014, ON THIS MOTION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED. THE COURT DENIES THE MOVANTS' REQUEST FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 362(d), ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/25/14. 3/26/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES AND E-MAILED. (ti, )
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE US TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO SUSPEND THE PROCEEDINGS IN ALL CASES PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 305 AND THE WAGNER LAW GROUP'S MOTION TO SUSPEND INVOLUNTARY PETITIONS UNDER 11 U.S.C. 305, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, ALL PROCEEDINGS IN THESE CASES ARE SUSPENDED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE AUTOMATIC STAY WILL REMAIN IN PLACE WHILE THESE BANKRUPTCY CASES ARE SUSPENDED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT FREDERIC BAKER, THE US TRUSTEE, SHALL SUBMIT A PROPOSED ORDER TO THE COURT, ON OR BEFORE 4/1/2014, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/25/14. 3/26/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PROSE PARTIES AND COUNSEL, AND E-MAILED. (ti, ) Modified on 3/31/2014 (ti, ).
March 26, 2014 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN: Oral Argument held on 3/24/14 Court Reporter: Kelly Haggerty. (ti, )
March 24, 2014 Filing 8 MOTION for Relief From Automatic Stay filed by ANTHEM MEDICAL MANAGEMENT, INC., CARSON'S STEAK WAREHOUSE AND SALOON, INC., CHARLES C. PARSONS & ASSOCIATES, DR. ERIC KATZ, P.C., ENGINEERED SYSTEMS & PRODUCTS, INC., M&E ZENNI, INC., PAMELA K. ERDMAN MD, INC., POWERCOM, INC., RESOURCE REALIZATIONS, INC., DAVID SPOKANE, U.E. SYSTEMS, INC., WILSHIRE PALISADES LAW GROUP, P.C..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Motion)(SILVERSTEIN, IRA) Modified on 3/26/2014 (sg, ).
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT MR. KORESKO MAY PARTICIPATE IN THE MARCH 24 HEARING BY TELEPHONE. MR. KORESKO IS DIRECTED TO CALL CHAMBERS IN ORDER TO PARTICIPATE IN THE HEARING. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/20/14. 3/21/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PROSE PARTIES AND COUNSEL, AND E-MAILED. (ti, ) Modified on 3/31/2014 (ti, ).
March 20, 2014 Filing 6 MOTION for Relief From Automatic Stay filed by FREDERICK R. CAHALL, ROBERT W. CORL, HARRY R. LARKIN, ROBERT V. LARKIN, STEPHEN J. LARKIN, OLOUAKAN COMLUCT, INC.,.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Motion, #3 Certificate of Service)(SILVERSTEIN, IRA)
March 19, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ASHTON S. PHILLIPS on behalf of THOMAS PEREZ (PHILLIPS, ASHTON)
March 17, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing ORAL ARGUMENT ON PENDING MOTIONS SET FOR 3/24/2014 09:30 AM, COURTROOM 13-A, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA.(ti, )
March 14, 2014 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #2 MOTION for Relief from the Automatic Stay and Request for Expedited Hearing (BEATY, SEAN)
March 14, 2014 Filing 2 MOTION for Relief from the Automatic Stay and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BEATY, SEAN)
March 12, 2014 Filing 1 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court RE: WITHDRAWAL OF REFERENCE. (jmv, ) (sbt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: PENN-MONT BENEFIT SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RACHEL MARTONE
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GEORGE MCLAIN
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DR. DAVID SPOKANE
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ESQ. CHARLES C. PARSONS
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROB PERITZ
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARK GOODMAN
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: U.E. SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DAVID RHODES
Represented By: SAMUEL H. ISRAEL
Represented By: EDWARD DIDONATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROSA KERN
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DANIEL KEITH NEWELL
Represented By: SAMUEL H. ISRAEL
Represented By: EDWARD DIDONATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROBERT V. LARKIN
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DAVID GILCREASE
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HARRY R. LARKIN
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DRS. MARTIN
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DR ERIC KATZ
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DR. ERIC KATZ, P.C.
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROBERT W. CORL
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PAMELA K. ERDMAN MD, INC.
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FREDERICK R. CAHALL
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VICTORIA KATZ
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: OLOUAKAN COMLUCT, INC.,
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WILSHIRE PALISADES LAW GROUP, P.C.
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KATRINA KNIEST
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DR FRANK SIMONCINI
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BENJAMIN FRADLIN
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHAEL OSTERER
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANTHEM MEDICAL MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: M&E ZENNI, INC.
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NORMA LEFKOWITZ
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: POWERCOM, INC.
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STEPHEN J. LARKIN
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ENGINEERED SYSTEMS & PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: REBECCA EDMUNDSON
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HAL KERN
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ELISA ZENNI, II
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FAINA FRADLIN
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DR. PAMELA ERDMAN
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DAVID LEFKOWITZ
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CHARLES C. PARSONS & ASSOCIATES
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KURT C GERHARDT
Represented By: GREGORY W. FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RESOURCE REALIZATIONS, INC.
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: SEAN P. BEATY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WILLIAM SAMUEL NEWELL, III
Represented By: SAMUEL H. ISRAEL
Represented By: EDWARD DIDONATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DR JOHN CROUSHORE
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MELISSA LANGLAIS
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JAIME FARREL
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALAN BANDES
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HAMID MOHSSENI
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CARSON'S STEAK WAREHOUSE AND SALOON, INC.
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JOHN D. BRADDOCK
Represented By: JULIANNA GROOT
Represented By: BRETT A. MEARKLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MICHAEL GRAHAM
Represented By: JULIANNA GROOT
Represented By: BRETT A. MEARKLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JIM MALONE
Represented By: JULIANNA GROOT
Represented By: BRETT A. MEARKLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TRUMAN GAILEY
Represented By: JULIANNA GROOT
Represented By: BRETT A. MEARKLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Represented By: GEORGE M. CONWAY
Represented By: FREDERIC J. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: GUY G. GEBHARDT
Represented By: JILL E. KELSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JOHN J. KORESKO, V
Represented By: JOHN J. KORESKO, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: PENN-MONT BENEFIT SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW HAMERMESH
Represented By: BRETT A. MEARKLE
Represented By: JOHN J. KORESKO, V
Represented By: SCOTT ALAN ORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?