AUGUSTIN et al v. City of Philadelphia
Plaintiff: LEA AUGUSTIN, GERARD AUGUSTIN, THOMAS MCSORLEY, DONNA MCSORLEY and RICHMOND WATERFRONT INDUSTRIAL PARK, LLC
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Case Number: 2:2014cv04238
Filed: July 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: J. CURTIS JOYNER
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 DECISION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL DECLARATORY AND FINAL INTERIM INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (DOC. NO. 66 ), IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/4/2016. 1/5/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO. 64 ), IS GRANTED AND THE PLAINTIFF CLASS IS HEREBY CERETIFIED AND DEFINED AS CONSISTING OF THE FOLLOWING PERSONS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 11/30/2016. 12/1/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO. 20 ), IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 3/17/2106. 3/18/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AUGUSTIN et al v. City of Philadelphia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEA AUGUSTIN
Represented By: IRV ACKELSBERG
Represented By: EDWARD A. DIVER
Represented By: JOHN J. GROGAN
Represented By: SETH KREIMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERARD AUGUSTIN
Represented By: IRV ACKELSBERG
Represented By: EDWARD A. DIVER
Represented By: JOHN J. GROGAN
Represented By: SETH KREIMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS MCSORLEY
Represented By: IRV ACKELSBERG
Represented By: EDWARD A. DIVER
Represented By: JOHN J. GROGAN
Represented By: SETH KREIMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA MCSORLEY
Represented By: IRV ACKELSBERG
Represented By: EDWARD A. DIVER
Represented By: JOHN J. GROGAN
Represented By: SETH KREIMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHMOND WATERFRONT INDUSTRIAL PARK, LLC
Represented By: IRV ACKELSBERG
Represented By: EDWARD A. DIVER
Represented By: JOHN J. GROGAN
Represented By: SETH KREIMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: JEFFREY M. SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?