UNITED NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: UNITED NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY and PENN-AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY
Thirdparty_defendant: DIAMOND STATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Thirdparty_plaintiff: INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY
Counter_claimant: INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY
Counter_defendant: PENN-AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY and UNITED NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2014cv06425
Filed: November 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER THAT MOTION OF DEFT INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. #79) IS GRANTED. MOTION OF PLFF PENN-AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. #74) IS DENIED; MOTION OF PENN-AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY FOR PARTIA L SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. #76) IS DENIED. MOTION OF PENN-AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. #77) IS DENIED. MOTION OF PENN-AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. #73) IS DENIED AS MOOT. MOTION OF INDIAN HARBOR I NSURANCE COMPANY TO STRIKE THE REPORT & PROPOSED TESTIMONY OF PLFFS' EXPERT JAMES T. MARNEN (DOC. #75) IS DENIED AS MOOT; & MOTION OF INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY TO STRIKE THE REPORT & PROPOSED TESTIMONY OF PLFFS' EXPERT MICHAEL F. AYLWARD (DOC. #78) IS DENIED AS MOOT.SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 2/8/16. 2/8/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER THAT MOTION OF PENN-AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. #72) IS DENIED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 12/9/15. 12/9/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT DIAMOND STATE INSURANCE COMPANY TO DISMISS THE THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT OF THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 3/6/15. 3/6/15 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFT INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY & AGAINST PLFF UNITED NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON COUNTS I, II, & III OF THE COMPLAINT, ETC. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFT INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY & AGAINST PLFFS UNITED NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY & PENN-AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY ON COUNT IV OF THE COMPLAINT.SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 2/2/15. 2/3/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ANTHONY L. MISCIOSCIA
Represented By: GALE WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENN-AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ANTHONY L. MISCIOSCIA
Represented By: GALE WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CARA TSENG DUFFIELD
Represented By: JASON P. GOSSELIN
Represented By: DAVID H. TOPOL
Represented By: KAREN L. TOTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: DIAMOND STATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CARA TSENG DUFFIELD
Represented By: JASON P. GOSSELIN
Represented By: DAVID H. TOPOL
Represented By: KAREN L. TOTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CARA TSENG DUFFIELD
Represented By: JASON P. GOSSELIN
Represented By: DAVID H. TOPOL
Represented By: KAREN L. TOTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: PENN-AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ANTHONY L. MISCIOSCIA
Represented By: GALE WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: UNITED NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ANTHONY L. MISCIOSCIA
Represented By: GALE WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?