MEHIGAN et al v. ASCENA RETAIL GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MELINDA MEHIGAN, FONDA KUBIAK, MARGUERITE SINKLER GILDER, CAROLINE MANSOUR, CAROL ROUGVIE, TIFFANY BOLTON and KARA BELL
Defendant: ASCENA RETAIL GROUP, INC. and TWEEN BRANDS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00724
Filed: February 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: MARK A. KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 400 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/12/19. 2/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED PRO SE, MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ti, )
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERING CLASS MEMBERS' MOTION TO INTERVENE 263 , IT IS ORDERED THAT CLASS MEMBERS COMLISH AND ARTLIP'S MOTION IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR THEM TO RAISE OBJECTIONS TO FINAL DISTRIBUTIONS UNDER OUR 7/29/2016 ORDER 185 . SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 6/16/17. 6/16/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES, MAILED, AND E-MAILED.(ti, )
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER THAT THE CLASS MOTION FOR APPEAL BOND 219 IS GRANTED IN PART AND EACH PENDING NOTICE OF APPEAL SHALL BE SECURED BY AN APPEAL BOND FOR $1,235.32 POSTED ON OR BEFORE 10/24/2016. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 10/14/16. 10/14/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ti, )
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER THAT CLASS COUNSEL'S MOTIO TO CORRECT ITS PROFFERED LODESTAR 195 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; WE AMEND PARAGRAPH 3 OF OUR 7/29/2016 ORDER 185 TO PROVIDE, CONSISTENT WITH THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM, CLASS COUNSEL IS AWARDED & #036;4,831,846.25 IN ATTORNEYS' FEES AT THIS INITIAL STAGE REPRESENTING $2,761,055.00 FOR 5,048.56 APPROVED HOURS AND THE COURT'S 1.75 MULTIPLIER AWARDED UNDER OUR 7/29/2016 ORDER; AND, ALL OTHER ASPECTS OF OUR 7/29/2016 ORDER 185 REMAIN IN EFFECT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/12/16. 9/12/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES, MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ti, )
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, EXPENSES AND INCENTIVE AWARDS 99 AND SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDA 166 167 , FOLLOWING EVALUATION OF EVIDENCE, AFFIDAVITS AND ORAL ARGUMENT AT OUR FINAL FAIRN ESS HEARING AFTER NO INTERESTED PARTY OR CLASS MEMBER SOUGHT TO ADDUCE TESTIMONY AND FOR REASONS IN THE ACCOMPANYING OPINION, IT IS ORDERED PLAINTIFFS' MOTION 99 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/29/16. 7/29/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, MAILED AND E-MAILED.(gs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEHIGAN et al v. ASCENA RETAIL GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELINDA MEHIGAN
Represented By: KEVIN E. RAPHAEL
Represented By: EDWARD H. SKIPTON, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FONDA KUBIAK
Represented By: KEVIN E. RAPHAEL
Represented By: EDWARD H. SKIPTON, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGUERITE SINKLER GILDER
Represented By: KEVIN E. RAPHAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLINE MANSOUR
Represented By: KEVIN E. RAPHAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL ROUGVIE
Represented By: KEVIN E. RAPHAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIFFANY BOLTON
Represented By: KEVIN E. RAPHAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARA BELL
Represented By: KEVIN E. RAPHAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCENA RETAIL GROUP, INC.
Represented By: EZRA DODD CHURCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWEEN BRANDS, INC.
Represented By: EZRA DODD CHURCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?