GORDON et al v. KOHL'S CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: JENNIFER GORDON, VALERIE TANTLINGER and JENNIFER UNDERWOOD
Defendant: KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES, INC. and CAPITAL ONE, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00730
Filed: February 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE JURY DEMAND 240 IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 2/14/19. 2/14/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(fdc)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, AS OUTLINED HEREIN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES ARE TO MEET AND CONFER, AND SUBMIT A PROPOSED FORM OF NOTICE FOR THE COURT'S APPROVAL WITHIN 14 DAYS. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 11/13/2017. 11/13/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY (DOC. 177 ) IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. 163 ) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 8/7/2017. 8/7/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED WITH RESPECT TO THE FOLLOWING CLAIMS AS OUTLINED HEREIN, WHICH ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED WITH RESPECT TO THE FOLLWING CLAIMS AS OUTLINED HEREIN, INSOFAR AS THEY ACCRUED ON OR AFTER FEBRUARY 13, 2012. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/28/16. 3/28/16 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL AND COPY TO LEGAL.(jaa, ) Modified on 3/28/2016 (lisad, ).
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT KOHL'S CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION [#27] IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 8/10/15. 8/10/15 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GORDON et al v. KOHL'S CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER GORDON
Represented By: ANGELA EDWARDS
Represented By: PATRICK HOWARD
Represented By: CHARLES J. KOCHER
Represented By: LEE S. SHALOV
Represented By: WADE C. WILKINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIE TANTLINGER
Represented By: ANGELA EDWARDS
Represented By: PATRICK HOWARD
Represented By: CHARLES J. KOCHER
Represented By: LEE S. SHALOV
Represented By: WADE C. WILKINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER UNDERWOOD
Represented By: ANGELA EDWARDS
Represented By: PATRICK HOWARD
Represented By: CHARLES J. KOCHER
Represented By: LEE S. SHALOV
Represented By: WADE C. WILKINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES, INC.
Represented By: MARTIN C. BRYCE, JR.
Represented By: DANIEL J.T. MCKENNA
Represented By: SARAH SCHINDLER-WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE, N.A.
Represented By: MARTIN C. BRYCE, JR.
Represented By: DANIEL J.T. MCKENNA
Represented By: SARAH SCHINDLER-WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?