POE v. SOUTHEAST DELCO SCHOOL DISTRICT et al
Plaintiff: MARTHA POE
Defendant: SOUTHEAST DELCO SCHOOL DISTRICT, MICHAEL A.P. JORDAN, ASHWINA MOSAKOWSKI and PAUL E. HOCHSCHWENDER
Case Number: 2:2015cv02369
Filed: April 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Delaware
Presiding Judge: GERALD A. MCHUGH
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS IS GRANTED. FEES ARE AWARDED IN THE TOTAL AMOUNT OF $80,107.25 AND COSTS TO BE REIMBURSED IN THE TOTAL AMOUNT OF $24,957.46. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 6/7/2018. 6/8/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS MOTIONS ARE GRANTED AS TO PLAINTIFFS 1983 CLAIMS AGAINST THE DISTRICT, BUTZ, AND RYAN. SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS ALSO GRANTED AS TO PLAINTIFFS POE'S TITLE IX CLAIM AGAINST THE DISTRICT. DEFENDANTS' MOTION WILL BE DENIED AS TO THE STATE CREATED DANGER CLAIM AGAINST DEFENDANT JORDAN, AND AS TO THE TITLE IX CLAIMS BY ALL PLAINTIFF OTHER THAN PLAINTIFF POE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 9/27/2017. 9/27/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(sg, )
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 12/16/15. 12/17/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POE v. SOUTHEAST DELCO SCHOOL DISTRICT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTHA POE
Represented By: GERALD J. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHEAST DELCO SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: ROBERT M. DIORIO
Represented By: JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL A.P. JORDAN
Represented By: JOHN E. FREUND, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHWINA MOSAKOWSKI
Represented By: JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL E. HOCHSCHWENDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?