DEVON DRIVE LIONVILLE, LP et al v. PARKE BANCORP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DEVON DRIVE LIONVILLE, LP, NORTH CHARLOTTE ROAD POTTSTOWN, LP, MAIN STREET PECKVILLE, LP, RHOADS AVENUE NEWTOWN SQUARE, LP, VG WEST CHESTER PIKE, LP, 1301 PHOENIX, LP, JOHN M. SHEA and GEORGE SPAEDER
Defendant: PARKE BANCORP, INC., PARKE BANK, VITO S. PANTILIONE and RALPH GALLO
Case Number: 2:2015cv03435
Filed: June 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Delaware
Presiding Judge: J. CURTIS JOYNER
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AS OUTLINED IS GRANTED AND PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT SI FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF ADJUDICATIVE FACTS IS DENIED AS MOOT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/26/18. 7/26/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IS GRANTED. DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART, ETC. WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, THE REMAINING PLFFS DEVON DRIVE LIONVILLE, LP AND GEORGE SPAEDER SHALL EITHER FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT CONSISTENT WITH THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OR GIVE NOTICE THAT THEY WILL NOT PURSUE ANY FURTHER CLAIMS AGAINST DEFTS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/27/17. 11/27/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE (DOC. NO. 11) IS DENIED. DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLFFS' COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) (DOC. NO. 12) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN, ETC. PLFFS MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ATTEMPT TO CURE THE DEFICIENCIES EXPLAINED IN THE MEMORANDUM OPINION ON OR BEFORE 1/30/2017, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/29/16. 12/29/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEVON DRIVE LIONVILLE, LP et al v. PARKE BANCORP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVON DRIVE LIONVILLE, LP
Represented By: VINCENT N. BARBERA
Represented By: KEVIN F. BERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTH CHARLOTTE ROAD POTTSTOWN, LP
Represented By: VINCENT N. BARBERA
Represented By: KEVIN F. BERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAIN STREET PECKVILLE, LP
Represented By: VINCENT N. BARBERA
Represented By: KEVIN F. BERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHOADS AVENUE NEWTOWN SQUARE, LP
Represented By: VINCENT N. BARBERA
Represented By: KEVIN F. BERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VG WEST CHESTER PIKE, LP
Represented By: VINCENT N. BARBERA
Represented By: KEVIN F. BERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1301 PHOENIX, LP
Represented By: VINCENT N. BARBERA
Represented By: KEVIN F. BERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN M. SHEA
Represented By: VINCENT N. BARBERA
Represented By: KEVIN F. BERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE SPAEDER
Represented By: VINCENT N. BARBERA
Represented By: KEVIN F. BERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKE BANCORP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKE BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VITO S. PANTILIONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RALPH GALLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?