ODI v. ALEXANDER et al
Plaintiff: JOHN ODI
Defendant: GARY ALEXANDER, BEVERLY MACKERETH, LINDA ROBSON and JANE RICHARDS
Case Number: 2:2015cv04903
Filed: August 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Delaware
Presiding Judge: R. BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND ALL DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT THEREOF AND IN OPPOSITION THERETO, AND FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE MEMORANDUM FILED HEREWITH IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 5/2/19. 5/3/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 2/27/2018. 2/27/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS ARE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 3/7/2017. 3/8/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ODI v. ALEXANDER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN ODI
Represented By: ROBIN A. FEENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY ALEXANDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEVERLY MACKERETH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA ROBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE RICHARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?