ARDITI v. SUBERS et al
Plaintiff: RAY A. ARDITI
Defendant: RICHARD SUBERS, RANDOLPH MCGOLDRICK, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 3, JOHN DOE 4 and BROOKHAVEN BOROUGH
Case Number: 2:2015cv05511
Filed: October 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Delaware
Presiding Judge: GENE E.K. PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDERED THAT DOCKET NO. 103 - DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ANY TESTIMONY, EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT THAT PLAINTIFF SUFFERED ANY PHYSICAL INJURIES ON MAY 31, 2015 IS DENIED. ORDERED THAT DOCKET NO. 104 - DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ANY TESTIMONY, EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO THE ISSUANCE OF A CITATION TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ACQUITTAL IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 1/9/17. 1/10/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Ordered THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOCKET NO. 78), OFFICER CLYMER'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOCKET NO. 80), DEFENDANT CHRIS NAEGELE'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOCKET NO. 82) AND CHARLES YOUNG'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOCKET NO. 84) ARE DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 12/16/16. 12/16/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOCKET NOS. 60, 61 AND 62) ARE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS SET FORTH IN THE ORDER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/25/16. 10/25/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT RANDOLPH MCGOLDRICK'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOCKET NO. 48) IS GRANTED. COUNTS I AND II OF PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT ARE DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT RANDOLPH MCGOLDRICK ONLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/15/16. 6/16/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARDITI v. SUBERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAY A. ARDITI
Represented By: STEPHEN THOMAS O'HANLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD SUBERS
Represented By: ROBERT P. DIDOMENICIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDOLPH MCGOLDRICK
Represented By: ROBERT P. DIDOMENICIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROOKHAVEN BOROUGH
Represented By: ROBERT P. DIDOMENICIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?