IMPALA PLATINUM HOLDINGS LIMITED et al v. A-1 SPECIALZED SERVICES & SUPPLIES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: IMPALA PLATINUM HOLDINGS LIMITED and IMPALA REFINING SERVICES LIMITED
Defendant: A-1 SPECIALZED SERVICES & SUPPLIES, INC., SURESH K. KHOSLA, ASHOK KUMAR KHOSLA, OM K. KHOSLA and LEENA KHOSLA
Case Number: 2:2016cv01343
Filed: March 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Bucks
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M. BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 569 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO STAY IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/22/2017. 12/22/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER THAT IMPALA'S MOTION TO ALTER THE JUDGMENT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, AND KUMAR'S MOTION IS DENIED. THE JUDGMENT SHALL BE AMENDED TO REFLECT THE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN FAVOR IMPALA AND AGAINST KUMAR ON COUNT II OF IMPALA� 39;S AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR 10,006,400. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS THE MOTION FOR DIRECTED VERDICT IS HEREBY DENIED AS MOOT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE FOR THE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/30/2017. 6/30/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) Modified on 6/30/2017 (kp, ).
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR IMPALA AND KUMAR SHALL PROMPTLY DISCUSS THE POSTING OF SURETY BY KUMAR AS OUTLINED HEREIN. COUNSEL SHALL SUBMIT A JOINT PROPOSED ORDER, OR SEPARATE ORDERS, NO LATER THAN 5/23/2017.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/16/2017. 5/16/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 314 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 3/10/2017. 3/10/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS UNDER RICO, COUNT VI OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT, ARE GRANTED AND THE RICO CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IN ADDITION, THE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 209 AND 210 ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 3/3/17. 3/3/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gs)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 2/2/2017. 2/3/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO OVERRULE DEFENDANT OM P. KHOSLA'S CLAIM OF ATTORNEY CLIENT AND JOINT DEFENSE PRIVILEGE AND TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/15/2016. 12/16/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IMPALA PLATINUM HOLDINGS LIMITED et al v. A-1 SPECIALZED SERVICES & SUPPLIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IMPALA PLATINUM HOLDINGS LIMITED
Represented By: RICHARD L. BAZELON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IMPALA REFINING SERVICES LIMITED
Represented By: RICHARD L. BAZELON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-1 SPECIALZED SERVICES & SUPPLIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SURESH K. KHOSLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHOK KUMAR KHOSLA
Represented By: BRIAN SCHENKER
Represented By: ANDREW J. SOVEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OM K. KHOSLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEENA KHOSLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?